Cruz v. Arborwear, LLC
Plaintiff: Shael Cruz
Defendant: Arborwear, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv05656
Filed: July 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Gregory H Woods
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) Arborwear, LLC. Document filed by Shael Cruz. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Mizrahi, Joseph)
August 6, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Arborwear, LLC waiver sent on 8/4/2020, answer due 10/5/2020. Document filed by Shael Cruz..(Mizrahi, Joseph)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEDIATION REFERRAL ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that this case is referred for mediation to the Court-annexed Mediation Program. The parties are hereby notified that Local Rule 83.9 shall govern the mediation and are directed to participate in the mediation in good faith. The mediation should take place at least two weeks prior to the Initial Pretrial Conference, which is currently scheduled for November 9, 2020 at 4:30 p.m. by separate Order to be entered today. The mediation will have no effect upon any scheduling Order issued by this Court without leave of this Court. SO ORDERED. Please reference the following when corresponding with the Mediation Office. E-mail MediationOffice@nysd.uscourts.gov, telephone (212) 805-0643, and facsimile (212) 805-0647. Mediator to be Assigned by 8/3/2020. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 7/24/2020) (kv)
July 24, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 11/9/2020 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 12C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Gregory H. Woods. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 7/24/2020) (kv)
July 23, 2020 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Arborwear, LLC..(pc)
July 23, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
July 23, 2020 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
July 23, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Gregory H. Woods. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
July 22, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Arborwear, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Shael Cruz..(Mizrahi, Joseph)
July 22, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Mizrahi, Joseph)
July 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Arborwear, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-20792671)Document filed by Shael Cruz..(Mizrahi, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cruz v. Arborwear, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shael Cruz
Represented By: Joseph H Mizrahi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arborwear, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?