Ward v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: James P. Ward
Defendant: Miankanze Bamba and United States of America
Case Number: 1:2020cv05676
Filed: July 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: J Paul Oetken
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1346t
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2020 Filing 9 LETTER from M. Bamba, re: As of this date, counsel has not been assigned, and I am requesting an extension of filing an Answer/timely response until I am able to clarify that I am, in fact, being represented by counsel supplied by my employer. Document filed by Miankanze Bamba.(sc)
August 18, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Miankanze Bamba served on 8/4/2020, answer due 8/25/2020. Service was accepted by Amid Bamba, Defendant's Adult Son. Document filed by James P. Ward. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service re Defendant Bamba).(Warshawsky, Steven)
August 18, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint served. United States of America served on 7/28/2020, answer due 9/28/2020. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by James P. Ward. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service re Defendant Bamba).(Warshawsky, Steven)
July 23, 2020 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States of America..(jgo)
July 23, 2020 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Miankanze Bamba..(jgo)
July 23, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
July 23, 2020 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
July 23, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge J. Paul Oetken. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
July 23, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Steven Michael Warshawsky. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to Queens;. (jgo)
July 22, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Miankanze Bamba, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by James P. Ward..(Warshawsky, Steven)
July 22, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States of America, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by James P. Ward..(Warshawsky, Steven)
July 22, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Warshawsky, Steven)
July 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Miankanze Bamba, United States of America. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-20802114)Document filed by James P. Ward..(Warshawsky, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ward v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miankanze Bamba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James P. Ward
Represented By: Steven Michael Warshawsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?