Those Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy No. PRPNA1501257 et al v. Morgan Management, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Those Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy No. URS2527920.16, Lexington Insurance Company, Everest Indemnity Insurance Company, Those Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy No. PRPNA1501257 and Those Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy No. PRPNA1601257
Defendant: Morgan Management, LLC, Grand Atlas Property Management, LLC, Todd Morgan, ABC Corps 1-10, John Does 1-10, Robert Morgan, Scott Cresswell and Kevin Morgan
Case Number: 1:2020cv05707
Filed: July 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew L Carter
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332jd
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2020 Filing 26 LETTER addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Howard E. Cotton dated September 18, 2020 re: Requesting an Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint. Document filed by Robert Morgan, Todd Morgan..(Cotton, Howard)
September 18, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Howard E. Cotton on behalf of Robert Morgan, Todd Morgan..(Cotton, Howard)
September 14, 2020 Filing 24 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Service was made by Affixing the Summons to the door of dwelling place or usual place of abode within New York and by Mailing the Summons to such person at his last known residence on September 1, 2020. Document filed by Those Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy No. PRPNA1601257, Lexington Insurance Company, Those Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy No. PRPNA1501257, Those Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy No. URS2527920.16, Everest Indemnity Insurance Company..(Leibowitz, Eric)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #21 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, SO ORDERED., Scott Cresswell answer due 10/30/2020. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 8/26/2020) (rj)
August 25, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joseph Andrew Matteo on behalf of Kevin Morgan..(Matteo, Joseph)
August 25, 2020 Filing 21 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer on behalf of Scott Cresswell addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Eric Leibowitz dated August 25, 2020. Document filed by Everest Indemnity Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, Those Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy No. PRPNA1501257, Those Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy No. PRPNA1601257, Those Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy No. URS2527920.16..(Leibowitz, Eric)
August 25, 2020 Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Kevin Morgan waiver sent on 8/25/2020, answer due 10/26/2020. Document filed by Those Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy No. PRPNA1601257; Lexington Insurance Company; Those Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy No. PRPNA1501257; Those Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy No. URS2527920.16; Everest Indemnity Insurance Company..(Leibowitz, Eric)
August 24, 2020 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Scott Cresswell served on 8/10/2020, answer due 8/31/2020. Service was accepted by Scott Cresswell. Document filed by Those Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy No. PRPNA1601257; Lexington Insurance Company; Those Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy No. PRPNA1501257; Those Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy No. URS2527920.16; Everest Indemnity Insurance Company..(Leibowitz, Eric)
August 24, 2020 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Morgan Management, LLC served on 8/17/2020, answer due 9/8/2020. Service was accepted by Colleen Bonahan, authorized agent at the Office of the New York Secretary of State. Document filed by Those Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy No. PRPNA1601257; Lexington Insurance Company; Those Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy No. PRPNA1501257; Those Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy No. URS2527920.16; Everest Indemnity Insurance Company..(Leibowitz, Eric)
August 24, 2020 Filing 17 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Grand Atlas Property Management, LLC served on 8/17/2020, answer due 9/8/2020. Service was accepted by Colleen Bonahan. Document filed by Those Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy No. PRPNA1601257; Lexington Insurance Company; Those Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy No. PRPNA1501257; Those Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy No. URS2527920.16; Everest Indemnity Insurance Company..(Leibowitz, Eric)
July 27, 2020 Filing 16 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Todd Morgan..(dnh)
July 27, 2020 Filing 15 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Robert Morgan..(dnh)
July 27, 2020 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Morgan Management, LLC..(dnh)
July 27, 2020 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kevin Morgan..(dnh)
July 27, 2020 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Grand Atlas Property Management, LLC..(dnh)
July 27, 2020 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Scott Cresswell..(dnh)
July 24, 2020 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Todd Morgan, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Everest Indemnity Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, Those Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy No. PRPNA1501257, Those Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy No. PRPNA1601257, Those Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy No. URS2527920.16..(Leibowitz, Eric)
July 24, 2020 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Robert Morgan, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Everest Indemnity Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, Those Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy No. PRPNA1501257, Those Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy No. PRPNA1601257, Those Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy No. URS2527920.16..(Leibowitz, Eric)
July 24, 2020 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Morgan Management, LLC, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Everest Indemnity Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, Those Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy No. PRPNA1501257, Those Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy No. PRPNA1601257, Those Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy No. URS2527920.16..(Leibowitz, Eric)
July 24, 2020 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kevin Morgan, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Everest Indemnity Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, Those Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy No. PRPNA1501257, Those Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy No. PRPNA1601257, Those Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy No. URS2527920.16..(Leibowitz, Eric)
July 24, 2020 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Grand Atlas Property Management, LLC, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Everest Indemnity Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, Those Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy No. PRPNA1501257, Those Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy No. PRPNA1601257, Those Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy No. URS2527920.16..(Leibowitz, Eric)
July 24, 2020 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Scott Cresswell, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Everest Indemnity Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, Those Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy No. PRPNA1501257, Those Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy No. PRPNA1601257, Those Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy No. URS2527920.16..(Leibowitz, Eric)
July 24, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Eric Ronald Leibowitz to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Request for Issuance of Summons,,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): multiple summons requests should not be filed in a single PDF; each summons request must be filed seperately or file one summons request with a rider/addendum listing all of the defendants, and write 'SEE ATTACHED' in the 'To' section. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the corrected summons form PDF. (pne)
July 24, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
July 24, 2020 Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pne)
July 24, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pne)
July 23, 2020 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST 'As To' PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Morgan Management, LLC; Grand Atlas Property Management, LLC; Scott Cresswell; Robert Morgan; Todd Morgan; Kevin Morgan, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Everest Indemnity Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, Those Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy No. PRPNA1501257, Those Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy No. PRPNA1601257, Those Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy No. URS2527920.16..(Leibowitz, Eric) Modified on 7/24/2020 (pne).
July 23, 2020 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate American International Group, Inc., Other Affiliate AIG Property Casualty U.S., Inc., Other Affiliate AIG Property Casualty Inc. for Lexington Insurance Company; Other Affiliate Hiscox Ltd., Other Affiliate Hiscox Syndicate 3624, Other Affiliate Hiscox Dedicated Corporate Member Ltd., Other Affiliate Hiscox PLC for Those Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy No. URS2527920.16; Other Affiliate Everest Reinsurance Company, Other Affiliate Everest Reinsurance Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Everest Underwriting Group (Ireland), Limited, Other Affiliate Everest Re Group Ltd. (Bermuda) for Everest Indemnity Insurance Company; Other Affiliate Talbot Syndicate 1183, Other Affiliate Faraday Syndicate 435, Other Affiliate Apollo Syndicate 1969, Other Affiliate AmTrust Syndicate 1206, Other Affiliate Advent Syndicate 780, Other Affiliate Hiscox Syndicate 33, Other Affiliate QBE Syndicate 1886, Other Affiliate Sirius, Other Affiliate Hardy Syndicate 382 for Those Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy No. PRPNA1601257; Other Affiliate Talbot Syndicate 1183, Other Affiliate Markel Syndicate 3000, Other Affiliate Faraday Syndicate 435, Other Affiliate Apollo Syndicate 1969, Other Affiliate Sirius Syndicate 1945, Other Affiliate AmTrust Syndicate 1206, Other Affiliate Advent Syndicate 780, Other Affiliate Hiscox Syndicate 33, Other Affiliate QBE Syndicate 1886, Other Affiliate Navigators Syndicate 1221 for Those Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy No. PRPNA1501257. Document filed by Everest Indemnity Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, Those Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy No. PRPNA1501257, Those Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy No. PRPNA1601257, Those Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy No. URS2527920.16..(Leibowitz, Eric)
July 23, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Leibowitz, Eric)
July 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ABC Corps 1-10, Scott Cresswell, Grand Atlas Property Management, LLC, John Does 1-10, Kevin Morgan, Robert Morgan, Todd Morgan, Morgan Management, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-20814971)Document filed by Those Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy No. PRPNA1601257, Lexington Insurance Company, Those Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy No. PRPNA1501257, Those Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy No. URS2527920.16, Everest Indemnity Insurance Company..(Leibowitz, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Those Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy No. PRPNA1501257 et al v. Morgan Management, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Those Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy No. URS2527920.16
Represented By: Eric Ronald Leibowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lexington Insurance Company
Represented By: Eric Ronald Leibowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Everest Indemnity Insurance Company
Represented By: Eric Ronald Leibowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Those Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy No. PRPNA1501257
Represented By: Eric Ronald Leibowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Those Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy No. PRPNA1601257
Represented By: Eric Ronald Leibowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Management, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grand Atlas Property Management, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Morgan
Represented By: Howard E. Cotton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Corps 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Morgan
Represented By: Howard E. Cotton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Cresswell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Morgan
Represented By: Joseph Andrew Matteo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?