Young v. Drury University
Plaintiff: Lawrence Young
Defendant: Drury University
Case Number: 1:2020cv05718
Filed: July 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
Presiding Judge: Ronnie Abrams
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Application granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 8/28/2020) Drury University answer due 9/25/2020 (ks) Modified on 9/2/2020 (ks).
August 27, 2020 Filing 8 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Peter T. Shapiro dated August 27, 2020. Document filed by Drury University..(Shapiro, Peter)
August 27, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Peter T. Shapiro on behalf of Drury University..(Shapiro, Peter)
August 10, 2020 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Drury University served on 8/6/2020, answer due 8/27/2020. Service was accepted by Bonnie Welcox, designated. Document filed by Lawrence Young..(Gottlieb, Jeffrey)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby: ORDERED that, within thirty (30) days of service of the summons and complaint, the parties must meet and confer for at least one hour in a good-faith attempt to settle this action. To the extent the parties are unable to settle the case themselves, they must also discuss whether further settlement discussions through the district's court-annexed mediation program or before a magistrate judge would be productive at this time. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that within fifteen (15) additional days (i.e., within forty-five (45) days of service of the summons and complaint), the parties must submit a joint letter requesting that the Court either (1) refer the case to mediation or a magistrate judge (and indicate a preference between the two options), or (2) schedule an initial status conference in the matter. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 7/24/2020) (rj)
July 24, 2020 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Drury University..(pc)
July 24, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
July 24, 2020 Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
July 24, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Ronnie Abrams. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
July 23, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Drury University, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Lawrence Young..(Gottlieb, Jeffrey)
July 23, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Gottlieb, Jeffrey)
July 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Drury University. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-20817569)Document filed by Lawrence Young..(Gottlieb, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Young v. Drury University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence Young
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Gottlieb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Drury University
Represented By: Peter T. Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?