Paguada v. Portmeirion Group Designs, LLC
Plaintiff: Josue Paguada
Defendant: Portmeirion Group Designs, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv05731
Filed: July 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Ronnie Abrams
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2020 Case Stayed (rj)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #10 Notice of Settlement filed by Josue Paguada. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. Within 30 days, the parties shall submit a Stipulation of Dismissal pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1) (A)(ii) or otherwise submit a joint status letter informing the Court of the status of the settlement agreement.SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 9/16/2020) (rj)
September 15, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Settlement . Document filed by Josue Paguada..(Khaimov, Mars)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: granting #8 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Application Granted. SO ORDERED. Portmeirion Group Designs, LLC answer due 9/11/2020. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 8/14/2020) (ama)
August 13, 2020 Filing 8 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint : Request for an Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Ian T. Clarke-Fisher dated August 13, 2020. Document filed by Portmeirion Group Designs, LLC..(Clarke-Fisher, Ian)
August 13, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ian T. Clarke-Fisher on behalf of Portmeirion Group Designs, LLC..(Clarke-Fisher, Ian)
August 4, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Portmeirion Group Designs, LLC served on 7/29/2020, answer due 8/19/2020. Service was accepted by Sean O'Hara, Agent. Document filed by Josue Paguada..(Khaimov, Mars)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby: ORDERED that, within thirty (30) days of service of the summons and complaint, the parties must confer for at least one hour in a good-faith attempt to settle this action. To the extent the parties are unable to settle the case themselves, they must also discuss whether further settlement discussions through the district's court-annexed mediation program or before a magistrate judge would be productive at this time. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that within fifteen (15) additional days (i.e., within forty-five (45) days of service of the summons and complaint), the parties must submit a joint letter requesting that the Court either (1) refer the case to mediation or a magistrate judge (and indicate a preference between the two options), or (2) schedule an initial status conference in the matter. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 7/31/2020) (rj)
July 24, 2020 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Portmeirion Group Designs, LLC..(pc)
July 24, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
July 24, 2020 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
July 24, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Ronnie Abrams. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
July 23, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Portmeirion Group Designs, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Josue Paguada..(Khaimov, Mars)
July 23, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Khaimov, Mars)
July 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Portmeirion Group Designs, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-20819062)Document filed by Josue Paguada..(Khaimov, Mars)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Paguada v. Portmeirion Group Designs, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Portmeirion Group Designs, LLC
Represented By: Ian T. Clarke-Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josue Paguada
Represented By: Mars Khaimov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?