Steadfast Financial LP et al v. Steadfast Advisory Group, LLC
Plaintiff: Steadfast Financial LP and Steadfast Capital Management LP
Defendant: Steadfast Advisory Group, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv05767
Filed: July 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jesse M Furman
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SCHEDULING DEFAULT JUDGMENT BRIEFING AND SHOW CAUSE HEARING. It is hereby ORDERED that any motion for default judgment shall be filed, in accordance with the Court's Individual Rules and Practices for Civil Cases (available at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judge/Furman), no later than October 5, 2020. Defendant shall file any opposition to the motion for default judgment no later than October 12, 2020. Defendant is cautioned that a limited liability company may appear in federal court only through licensed counsel, see Lattanzio v. COMTA, 481 F.3d 137, 140 (2d Cir. 2007), and where a limited liability company "repeatedly fails to appear by counsel, a default judgment may be entered against it," Grace v. Bank Leumi Tr. Co. of N.Y., 443 F.3d 180, 192 (2d Cir. 2006) (internal quotation marks omitted). If a motion for default judgment is filed, it is further ORDERED that Defendant appear and show cause before this Court, Courtroom 1105 of the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Centre Street, New York, New York, on November 5, 2020, at 3:15 p.m., why an order should not be issued granting a default judgment against Defendant. Prior to that date, Plaintiffs must file the proposed default judgment order electronically, using the ECF Filing Event "Proposed Default Judgment," for the Clerk's approval. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiffs serve Defendant via overnight courier (1) with a copy of this Order within one business day of the date of this Order; and (2) with a copy of the motion for default judgment and all supporting papers within one business day of the date of any such motion. In each case, within two business days of service, Plaintiffs must file proof of such service on the docket. SO ORDERED. ( Show Cause Hearing set for 11/5/2020 at 03:15 PM in Courtroom 1105, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jesse M. Furman.), ( Motions due by 10/5/2020., Responses due by 10/12/2020) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 9/21/20) (yv)
August 26, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Steadfast Advisory Group, LLC served on 8/10/2020, answer due 8/31/2020. Service was accepted by Nancy Dougherty, New York Secretary of State. Document filed by Steadfast Financial LP; Steadfast Capital Management LP..(Pearson, Lisa)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: It is hereby ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court on November 5, 2020 at 3:15 p.m. in Courtroom 1105 of the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Centre Street, New York, New York. All counsel are required to register promptly as filing users on ECF and to familiarize themselves with the SDNY ECF Rules & Instructions, which are available at https://www.nysd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing. All counsel must also familiarize themselves with the Court's Individual Rules, which are available at https://www.nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-jesse-m-furman. Absent leave of Court obtained by letter-motion filed before the conference, all pretrial conferences must be attended by the attorney who will serve as principal trial counsel. And as set forth herein. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 11/5/2020 at 03:15 PM in Courtroom 1105, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jesse M. Furman. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 7/27/2020) (ama)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: It is hereby ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court on November 5, 2020 at 3:15 p.m. in Courtroom 1105 of the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Centre Street, New York, New York. All counsel are required to register promptly as filing users on ECF and to familiarize themselves with the SDNY ECF Rules & Instructions, which are available at https://www.nysd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing. All counsel must also familiarize themselves with the Court's Individual Rules, which are available at https://www.nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-jesse-m-furman. Absent leave of Court obtained by letter-motion filed before the conference, all pretrial conferences must be attended by the attorney who will serve as principal trial counsel. Additionally, in accordance with Paragraph 2.B of the Court's Individual Rules and Practices, the parties are hereby ORDERED to file on ECF a joint letter, described below, as well as a proposed Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order attached as an exhibit to the joint letter, no later than Thursday of the week prior to the initial pretrial conference. The parties shall use this Court's form Proposed Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order, which is also available at https://www.nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-jesse-m-furman. Any open legal issues can be addressed at the conference. The joint letter shall not exceed five (5) pages, and shall provide the following information in separate paragraphs as further set forth in this Order. Counsel who have entered a notice of appearance as of the issuance of this order are directed (1) to notify counsel for all other parties in this action who have not yet appeared by serving upon each of them a copy of this order and the Court's Individual Rules and Practices forthwith, and (2) to file proof of such notice with the Court. If unaware of the identity of counsel for any of the parties, counsel receiving this order must forthwith send a copy of this order and the Court's Individual Rules and Practices to that party personally. SO ORDERED. ( Initial Conference set for 11/5/2020 at 03:15 PM in Courtroom 1105, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jesse M. Furman.) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 7/27/20) (yv)
July 27, 2020 Filing 7 AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 15 U.S.C. 1116, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following trademark(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)..(pc) (Main Document 7 replaced on 7/27/2020) (pc).
July 27, 2020 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Steadfast Advisory Group, LLC..(pc)
July 27, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
July 27, 2020 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
July 27, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jesse M. Furman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
July 24, 2020 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Steadfast Advisory Group, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Steadfast Capital Management LP, Steadfast Financial LP..(Pearson, Lisa)
July 24, 2020 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Steadfast Capital Management LP, Steadfast Financial LP..(Pearson, Lisa)
July 24, 2020 Filing 3 AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review..(Pearson, Lisa)
July 24, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Pearson, Lisa)
July 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Steadfast Advisory Group, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-20838542)Document filed by Steadfast Financial LP, Steadfast Capital Management LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B).(Pearson, Lisa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Steadfast Financial LP et al v. Steadfast Advisory Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steadfast Advisory Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steadfast Financial LP
Represented By: Lisa Pearson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steadfast Capital Management LP
Represented By: Lisa Pearson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?