Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Maryland v. Abbvie, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Maryland, Teamsters Local 237 Welfare Fund, Teamsters Local 237 Retirees' Benefit Fund and Mayor and City Council of Baltimore
Defendant: Allergan Sales, LLC, Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Allergan, Inc., Forest Laboratories, Inc., Forest Laboratories Ireland Ltd, Forest Laboratories, LLC, Abbvie, Inc. and Allergan USA, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv05826
Filed: July 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lewis J Liman
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2020 Filing 39 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Forest Laboratories Ireland Ltd served on 8/25/2020, answer due 10/26/2020. Service was accepted by Mr. Michael Foley. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Mayor and City Council of Baltimore..(Robertson, Sharon)
September 9, 2020 Filing 38 LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Mayor and City Council of Baltimore dated Sept. 9, 2020 re: Application for Appointment of Cohen Milstein as Interim Co-Lead Counsel for the Proposed End-Payor Class. Document filed by Mayor and City Council of Baltimore. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1).(Robertson, Sharon)
September 9, 2020 Filing 37 LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Dena C. Sharp dated September 9, 2020 re: Application for Appointment as Interim Lead Counsel. Document filed by Teamsters Local 237 Welfare Fund, Teamsters Local 237 Retirees' Benefit Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Firm Resume).(Sharp, Christina)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER: The Court is in receipt of motions by certain plaintiffs in these related actions informing the Court that those plaintiffs intend to seek the appointment of Interim Lead or Co-Lead Class Counsel pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 23(g)(3) and The Manual for Complex Litigation (Fourth Edition) ("Manual") 10.22. The Court agrees that it is more sensible to delay preparation of a case management plan and the Initial Pretrial Conference until after a decision on a motion to appoint lead counsel. Accordingly, the Initial Pretrial Conference currently scheduled for September 16, 2020 is ADJOURNED pending further order of the Court, and the parties are relieved, temporarily, of the obligation to prepare a proposed case management plan and scheduling order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the End-Payor Plaintiffs shall submit leadership applications by September 9, 2020. Each applicant shall submit a single-spaced letter, not exceeding five pages, with no more than one attachment consisting of a firm or individual applicant resume. No opposition or reply to any application is permitted without permission of the Court. An initial pretrial conference will be scheduled upon a decision on the leadership applications. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 9/4/2020) (va)
September 3, 2020 Filing 35 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order and Request for Guidance re: End-Payor Plaintiffs' Leadership Applications addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Sharon Robertson dated September 3, 2020. Document filed by Mayor and City Council of Baltimore..(Robertson, Sharon)
August 24, 2020 Filing 34 LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Sharon Robertson dated August 24, 2020 re: End-Payor Plaintiffs' Objection to Consolidation of the Direct Purchaser Action (J M Smith Corporation d/b/a Smith Drug Company v. AbbVie, Inc., et al., No. 1:20-cv-5735-LJL), with the End-Payor Actions. Document filed by Mayor and City Council of Baltimore..(Robertson, Sharon)
August 20, 2020 Filing 33 LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from J. Mark Gidley dated August 20, 2020 re: Confirmation that all Defendants intend to file a timely motion to dismiss in response to the complaint. Document filed by Abbvie, Inc., Allergan Sales, LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Allergan, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Forest Laboratories Ireland Ltd, Forest Laboratories, Inc., Forest Laboratories, LLC..(Gidley, John)
August 18, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Archana Tamoshunas on behalf of Mayor and City Council of Baltimore..(Tamoshunas, Archana)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that any party objecting to consolidation shall file a letter on ECF, not to exceed two pages, by August 24, 2020. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an Initial Pretrial Conference by TELEPHONE on September 16, 2020, at 11:00 a.m. Parties are directed to dial into the Court's teleconference number at 888-251-2909, Access Code 2123101, and follow the necessary prompts. Initial Conference set for 9/16/2020 at 11:00 AM before Judge Lewis J. Liman. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 8/17/2020) (va)
August 14, 2020 Filing 30 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time until October 22, 2020 to respond to Plaintiffs' Complaints addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from J. Mark Gidley dated August 14, 2020. Document filed by Abbvie, Inc., Allergan Sales, LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Allergan, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Forest Laboratories Ireland Ltd, Forest Laboratories, Inc., Forest Laboratories, LLC..(Gidley, John)
August 14, 2020 Filing 29 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent AbbVie Inc. for Allergan Sales, LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Allergan, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Forest Laboratories Ireland Ltd, Forest Laboratories, Inc., Forest Laboratories, LLC. Document filed by Abbvie, Inc., Allergan Sales, LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Allergan, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Forest Laboratories Ireland Ltd, Forest Laboratories, Inc., Forest Laboratories, LLC..(Gidley, John)
August 14, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John Mark Gidley on behalf of Abbvie, Inc., Allergan Sales, LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Allergan, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Forest Laboratories Ireland Ltd, Forest Laboratories, Inc., Forest Laboratories, LLC..(Gidley, John)
August 14, 2020 Filing 27 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Forest Laboratories, LLC served on 8/4/2020, answer due 8/25/2020. Service was accepted by Ms. Robin Huttbanks. Document filed by Mayor and City Council of Baltimore..(Robertson, Sharon)
August 14, 2020 Filing 26 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Forest Laboratories, Inc. served on 8/4/2020, answer due 8/25/2020. Service was accepted by Ms. Lynanne Gares. Document filed by Mayor and City Council of Baltimore..(Robertson, Sharon)
August 14, 2020 Filing 25 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Allergan USA, Inc. served on 8/7/2020, answer due 8/28/2020. Service was accepted by Ms. Dani Walker. Document filed by Mayor and City Council of Baltimore..(Robertson, Sharon)
August 14, 2020 Filing 24 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Allergan Sales, LLC served on 8/7/2020, answer due 8/28/2020. Service was accepted by Ms. Dani Walker. Document filed by Mayor and City Council of Baltimore..(Robertson, Sharon)
August 14, 2020 Filing 23 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Allergan, Inc. served on 8/4/2020, answer due 8/25/2020. Service was accepted by Ms. Robin Huttbanks. Document filed by Mayor and City Council of Baltimore..(Robertson, Sharon)
August 14, 2020 Filing 22 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Abbvie, Inc. served on 8/6/2020, answer due 8/27/2020. Service was accepted by Ms. Phyllis Mascio. Document filed by Mayor and City Council of Baltimore..(Robertson, Sharon)
July 29, 2020 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (wb)
July 29, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Lewis J. Liman. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(wb)
July 29, 2020 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:20-cv-05538-LJL. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb)
July 28, 2020 Filing 21 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 20-cv-05538 (LJL). Document filed by Mayor and City Council of Baltimore..(Robertson, Sharon)
July 28, 2020 Filing 20 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Forest Laboratories, LLC..(pne)
July 28, 2020 Filing 19 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Forest Laboratories Ireland Ltd..(pne)
July 28, 2020 Filing 18 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Forest Laboratories, Inc...(pne)
July 28, 2020 Filing 17 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd...(pne)
July 28, 2020 Filing 16 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Allergan USA, Inc...(pne)
July 28, 2020 Filing 15 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Allergan Sales, LLC..(pne)
July 28, 2020 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Allergan, Inc...(pne)
July 28, 2020 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Abbvie, Inc...(pne)
July 28, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Sharon Kunjumon Robertson. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Mayor and City Council of Baltimore. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party text was omitted. (pne)
July 28, 2020 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Lewis J. Liman as possibly related to 20CV5538. (pne)
July 28, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
July 28, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(pne)
July 28, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT RELATED CASE STATEMENT. Notice to attorney Sharon Kunjumon Robertson to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Statement of Relatedness. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the related case statement is not correct; case number on the first page of the PDF does not match the case number entered in the docket entry text. Re-file the document using the event type Statement of Relatedness found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer - enter the related case number when prompted - and attach the corrected PDF. (pne)
July 27, 2020 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Forest Laboratories, LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Maryland..(Robertson, Sharon)
July 27, 2020 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Forest Laboratories Ireland, Ltd., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Maryland..(Robertson, Sharon)
July 27, 2020 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Forest Laboratories, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Maryland..(Robertson, Sharon)
July 27, 2020 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Forest Laboratories Holding Ltd, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Maryland..(Robertson, Sharon)
July 27, 2020 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Allergan USA, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Maryland..(Robertson, Sharon)
July 27, 2020 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Allergan Sales, LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Maryland..(Robertson, Sharon)
July 27, 2020 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Allergan, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Maryland..(Robertson, Sharon)
July 27, 2020 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to AbbVie, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Maryland..(Robertson, Sharon)
July 27, 2020 Filing 4 RELATED CASE AFFIRMATION of Sharon Robertson re: that this action be filed as related to 20-cv-05538 (LJL). Document filed by Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Maryland..(Robertson, Sharon)
July 27, 2020 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Maryland..(Robertson, Sharon)
July 27, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Robertson, Sharon)
July 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Abbvie, Inc., Allergan Sales, LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Allergan, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Forest Laboratories Ireland Ltd, Forest Laboratories, Inc., Forest Laboratories, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-20868181)Document filed by Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Maryland..(Robertson, Sharon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Maryland v. Abbvie, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Sales, LLC
Represented By: John Mark Gidley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd.
Represented By: John Mark Gidley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan, Inc.
Represented By: John Mark Gidley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forest Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: John Mark Gidley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forest Laboratories Ireland Ltd
Represented By: John Mark Gidley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forest Laboratories, LLC
Represented By: John Mark Gidley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbvie, Inc.
Represented By: John Mark Gidley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan USA, Inc.
Represented By: John Mark Gidley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Maryland
Represented By: Sharon Kunjumon Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teamsters Local 237 Welfare Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teamsters Local 237 Retirees' Benefit Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mayor and City Council of Baltimore
Represented By: Sharon Kunjumon Robertson
Represented By: Archana Tamoshunas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?