Rosario v. Fresh Smoothies LLC et al
Plaintiff: Yajaira Rosario
Defendant: John Francis Rivera, Fresh Smoothies LLC, Robinson Capello and Fresh Frutii LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv05831
Filed: July 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lewis J Liman
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: It is hereby: ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an Initial Pretrial Conference by TELEPHONE on October 27, 2020, at 11:00 a.m. Parties are directed to dial into the Court's teleconference number at 888-251-2909, Access Code 2123101, and follow the necessary prompts. Initial Conference set for 10/27/2020 at 11:00 AM before Judge Lewis J. Liman. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 8/3/2020) (va)
July 28, 2020 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to John Francis Rivera. (sj)
July 28, 2020 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Robinson Capello. (sj)
July 28, 2020 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Fresh Frutii LLC. (sj)
July 28, 2020 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Fresh Smoothies LLC. (sj)
July 28, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
July 28, 2020 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
July 28, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lewis J. Liman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
July 27, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nicole Deanna Grunfeld on behalf of Yajaira Rosario..(Grunfeld, Nicole)
July 27, 2020 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to John Francis Rivera, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Yajaira Rosario..(Ciliotta, Nicola)
July 27, 2020 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Robinson Capello, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Yajaira Rosario..(Ciliotta, Nicola)
July 27, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Fresh Frutii LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Yajaira Rosario..(Ciliotta, Nicola)
July 27, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Fresh Smoothies LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Yajaira Rosario..(Ciliotta, Nicola)
July 27, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Ciliotta, Nicola)
July 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Robinson Capello, Fresh Frutii LLC, Fresh Smoothies LLC, John Francis Rivera. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-20868680)Document filed by Yajaira Rosario..(Ciliotta, Nicola)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rosario v. Fresh Smoothies LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Francis Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fresh Smoothies LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robinson Capello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fresh Frutii LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yajaira Rosario
Represented By: Nicole Deanna Grunfeld
Represented By: Nicola Ciliotta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?