Reed v. Rmbs Reo Holdings, LLC
Petitioner: John K. Reed
Respondent: Rmbs Reo Holdings, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv05891
Filed: July 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
Presiding Judge: Sarah L Cave
Referring Judge: George B Daniels
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09:1
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2020 Filing 9 REQUEST(Motion) FOR PAYMENT OF COMPOUNDING INTEREST AND RECOVERY OF COSTS & EXPENSES REGARDING DEFAULT JUDGMENT PERTAINING TO AN ARBITRATION AWARD, RE: CONTRACT NO. 201910173101. Document filed by John K. Reed.(sc)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INFORMATION PACKAGE MAILED to John K. Reed, at 1611 Olive Street Santa Barbara, CA 93101, on 8/6/2020 Re: #5 Order of Service, via REGULAR MAIL. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: a copy of the order of service or order to answer and other orders entered to date, the individual practices of the district judge and magistrate judge assigned to your case, Instructions for Litigants Who Do Not Have Attorneys, Notice Regarding Privacy and Public Access to Electronic Case Files, a flyer about the free legal assistance clinic located in the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse (only in non prisoner cases), a Motions guide, a notice that the Pro Se Manual has been discontinued, a Notice of Change of Address form to use if your contact information changes, a handout explaining matters handled by magistrate judges and consent form to complete if all parties agree to proceed for all purposes before the magistrate judge, a form for you to complete if you consent to receive filings electronically (only in nonprisoner cases). (bwa)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PRO SE PRETRIAL ORDER: Pro se Plaintiff and counsel for all parties are hereby notified that this case is referred to Magistrate Sarah L.Cave for the purposes of Case Management and Scheduling pursuant to Federal Rule Civil Procedure 16. You are directed to furnish all attorneys in this action with copies of this order and enclosures. If you are unaware of the identity of counsel for any of the parties, you must send a copy of the notice and rules to that party personally. All correspondence to the Court should be addressed to the chambers of Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave and submitted to the Pro Se Intake Unit, located in the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York 10007 telephone (212) 805-0175. Any procedural questions by Pro Se plaintiff should be addressed to the Office of Pro Se Intake Unit at (212) 805-0175. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 8/5/2020) (ks)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF REFERENCE TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement) and Dispositive Motion (i.e., motion requiring a Report and Recommendation). Referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 8/5/2020) (ks)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF SERVICE: The Clerk of Court is directed to issue a summons as to Respondent RMBS REO Holdings, LLC. The Clerk of Court is further directed to mail to Petitioner this order, the summons, and an information package, and note service on the docket. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 8/5/2020) (ks) Transmission to Pro Se Assistants for processing.
July 31, 2020 Mailed a copy of Summons Issued to John K. Reed at 1611 Olive Street Santa Barbara, CA 93101. (bwa)
July 31, 2020 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Rmbs Reo Holdings, LLC. (bwa)
July 23, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Rmbs Reo Holdings, LLC, re: #1 (PETITION) REQUEST FOR AFFIRMATION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT REGARDING ARBITRATION AWARD RE: CONTRACT NO. 201910173101. Document filed by John K. Reed. (sac)
July 23, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PRO SE APPEARANCE by John K. Reed. (sac)
July 23, 2020 Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sac)
July 23, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (sac)
July 23, 2020 Filing 1 (PETITION) REQUEST FOR AFFIRMATION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT REGARDING ARBITRATION AWARD RE: CONTRACT NO. 201910173101. (Filing Fee $400.00, Receipt Number 465401263949).Document filed by John K. Reed. (Attachments: #1 Miscellaneous Case Cover Sheet) (sac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reed v. Rmbs Reo Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Rmbs Reo Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: John K. Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?