Law Enforcement Health Benefits, Inc. v. AbbVie Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Law Enforcement Health Benefits, Inc., Teamsters Local 237 Retirees' Benefit Fund and Teamsters Local 237 Welfare Fund
Defendant: Allergan Sales, LLC, Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., AbbVie Inc., Forest Laboratories, LLC, Forest Laboratories Inc., Allergan Inc., Forest Laboratories Irealand, Ltd. and Allergan USA, Inc.
Applicant: Mayor and City Council of Baltimore
Case Number: 1:2020cv05901
Filed: July 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lewis J Liman
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 28:1331at
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2020 Filing 17 LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Mayor and City Council of Baltimore dated Sept. 9, 2020 re: Application for Appointment of Cohen Milstein as Interim Co-Lead Counsel for the Proposed End-Payor Class. Document filed by Mayor and City Council of Baltimore. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1).(Robertson, Sharon)
September 9, 2020 Filing 16 LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Robert G. Eisler dated September 9, 2020 re: Application for Appointment of Interim Class Counsel on behalf of a proposed class of indirect purchasers. Document filed by Law Enforcement Health Benefits, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Firm Resume).(Eisler, Robert)
September 9, 2020 Filing 15 LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Dena C. Sharp dated September 9, 2020 re: Application for Appointment as Interim Lead Counsel. Document filed by Teamsters Local 237 Welfare Fund, Teamsters Local 237 Retirees' Benefit Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Firm Resume).(Sharp, Christina)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: The Court is in receipt of motions by certain plaintiffs in these related actions informing the Court that those plaintiffs intend to seek the appointment of Interim Lead or Co-Lead Class Counsel pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 23(g)(3) and The Manual for Complex Litigation (Fourth Edition) ("Manual") 10.22. The Court agrees that it is more sensible to delay preparation of a case management plan and the Initial Pretrial Conference until after a decision on a motion to appoint lead counsel. Accordingly, the Initial Pretrial Conference currently scheduled for September 16, 2020 is ADJOURNED pending further order of the Court, and the parties are relieved, temporarily, of the obligation to prepare a proposed case management plan and scheduling order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the End-Payor Plaintiffs shall submit leadership applications by September 9, 2020. Each applicant shall submit a single-spaced letter, not exceeding five pages, with no more than one attachment consisting of a firm or individual applicant resume. No opposition or reply to any application is permitted without permission of the Court. An initial pretrial conference will be scheduled upon a decision on the leadership applications. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 9/4/2020) (va)
September 3, 2020 Filing 13 LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Robert G. Eisler dated September 3, 2020 re: Guidance on Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order. Document filed by Law Enforcement Health Benefits, Inc...(Eisler, Robert)
August 20, 2020 Filing 12 LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from J. Mark Gidley dated August 20, 2020 re: Confirmation that all Defendants intend to file a timely motion to dismiss in response to the complaint. Document filed by AbbVie Inc., Allergan Inc., Allergan Sales, LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Forest Laboratories Inc., Forest Laboratories Irealand, Ltd., Forest Laboratories, LLC..(Gidley, John)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that any party objecting to consolidation shall file a letter on ECF, not to exceed two pages, by August 24, 2020. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an Initial Pretrial Conference by TELEPHONE on September 16, 2020, at 11:00 a.m. Parties are directed to dial into the Court's teleconference number at 888-251-2909, Access Code 2123101, and follow the necessary prompts. Initial Conference set for 9/16/2020 at 11:00 AM before Judge Lewis J. Liman. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 8/17/2020) (va)
August 14, 2020 Filing 10 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time until October 22, 2020 to respond to Plaintiffs' Complaints addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from J. Mark Gidley dated August 14, 2020. Document filed by AbbVie Inc., Allergan Inc., Allergan Sales, LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Forest Laboratories Inc., Forest Laboratories Irealand, Ltd., Forest Laboratories, LLC..(Gidley, John)
August 14, 2020 Filing 9 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent AbbVie Inc. for Allergan Inc., Allergan Sales, LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Forest Laboratories Inc., Forest Laboratories Irealand, Ltd., Forest Laboratories, LLC. Document filed by AbbVie Inc., Allergan Inc., Allergan Sales, LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Forest Laboratories Inc., Forest Laboratories Irealand, Ltd., Forest Laboratories, LLC..(Gidley, John)
August 14, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John Mark Gidley on behalf of AbbVie Inc., Allergan Inc., Allergan Sales, LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Forest Laboratories Inc., Forest Laboratories Irealand, Ltd., Forest Laboratories, LLC..(Gidley, John)
August 12, 2020 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (wb)
August 12, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Lewis J. Liman. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(wb)
August 12, 2020 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:20-cv-05538-LJL. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb)
July 30, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Deborah A. Elman on behalf of Law Enforcement Health Benefits, Inc...(Elman, Deborah)
July 30, 2020 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to AbbVie Inc., Allergan Inc., Allergan Sales, LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Forest Laboratories Inc., Forest Laboratories Irealand, Ltd., Forest Laboratories, LLC..(pc)
July 30, 2020 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Lewis J. Liman as possibly related to 20cv5538. (pc)
July 30, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(pc)
July 30, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
July 30, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Robert Gerard Eisler. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Law Enforcement Health Benefits, Inc.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (pc)
July 29, 2020 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to AbbVie Inc., Allergan, Inc., Allergan Sales, LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Forest Laboratories, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Forest Laboratories Ireland, Ltd., and Forest Laboratories, LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Law Enforcement Health Benefits, Inc...(Eisler, Robert)
July 29, 2020 Filing 4 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 20-cv-05538 (LJL). Document filed by Law Enforcement Health Benefits, Inc...(Eisler, Robert)
July 29, 2020 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Law Enforcement Health Benefits, Inc...(Eisler, Robert)
July 29, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Eisler, Robert)
July 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AbbVie Inc., Allergan Inc., Allergan Sales, LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Forest Laboratories Inc., Forest Laboratories Irealand, Ltd., Forest Laboratories, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-20907386)Document filed by Law Enforcement Health Benefits, Inc...(Eisler, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Law Enforcement Health Benefits, Inc. v. AbbVie Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Sales, LLC
Represented By: John Mark Gidley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd.
Represented By: John Mark Gidley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AbbVie Inc.
Represented By: John Mark Gidley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forest Laboratories, LLC
Represented By: John Mark Gidley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forest Laboratories Inc.
Represented By: John Mark Gidley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Inc.
Represented By: John Mark Gidley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forest Laboratories Irealand, Ltd.
Represented By: John Mark Gidley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan USA, Inc.
Represented By: John Mark Gidley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Law Enforcement Health Benefits, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Gerard Eisler
Represented By: Deborah A. Elman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teamsters Local 237 Retirees' Benefit Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teamsters Local 237 Welfare Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Applicant: Mayor and City Council of Baltimore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?