Kemper Independence Insurance Company v. Porto, Jr. et al
Plaintiff: Kemper Independence Insurance Company
Defendant: Anthony Porto, Jr. and William Haughey
Case Number: 1:2020cv05945
Filed: July 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jesse M Furman
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Anthony Porto, Jr. served on 9/21/2020, answer due 10/13/2020. Service was accepted by Anthony Porto, Jr.. Document filed by Kemper Independence Insurance Company..(Kohane, Dan)
August 6, 2020 Filing 9 LETTER addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Dan D. Kohane dated August 5, 2020 re: responding to Court's Order of 8/3/20 regarding diversity of citizenship. Document filed by Kemper Independence Insurance Company..(Kohane, Dan)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER. Kemper is hereby ORDERED to file, no later than August 10, 2020, a letter-brief, citing appropriate authority, showing that Mr. Haughey is properly treated as a nominal defendant and that his presence does not destroy diversity of citizenship. If Kemper fails to file a letter, or fails to persuade the Court that Mr. Haugheys citizenship can be ignored for diversity purposes, the case will be dismissed without prejudice without further notice. Furthermore, Defendants may respond to Kemper's letter within one week of filing an answer. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 8/3/20) (yv)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: It is hereby ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court on October 7, 2020 at 3:30 p.m. in Courtroom 1105 of the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Centre Street, New York, New York. All counsel are required to register promptly as filing users on ECF and to familiarize themselves with the SDNY ECF Rules & Instructions, which are available at https://www.nysd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing. All counsel must also familiarize themselves with the Court's Individual Rules, which are available at https://www.nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-jesse-m-furman. Absent leave of Court obtained by letter-motion filed before the conference, all pretrial conferences must be attended by the attorney who will serve as principal trial counsel. Additionally, in accordance with Paragraph 2.B of the Court's Individual Rules and Practices, the parties are hereby ORDERED to file on ECF a joint letter, described below, as well as a proposed Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order attached as an exhibit to the joint letter, no later than Thursday of the week prior to the initial pretrial conference. The parties shall use this Court's form Proposed Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order, which is also available at https://www.nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-jesse-m-furman. Any open legal issues can be addressed at the conference. The joint letter shall not exceed five (5) pages, and shall provide the following information in separate paragraphs as further set forth in this Order. Counsel who have entered a notice of appearance as of the issuance of this order are directed (1) to notify counsel for all other parties in this action who have not yet appeared by serving upon each of them a copy of this order and the Court's Individual Rules and Practices forthwith, and (2) to file proof of such notice with the Court. If unaware of the identity of counsel for any of the parties, counsel receiving this order must forthwith send a copy of this order and the Courts Individual Rules and Practices to that party personally. SO ORDERED. ( Initial Conference set for 10/7/2020 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 1105, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jesse M. Furman.) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 8/3/20) (yv)
July 31, 2020 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to William Haughey..(jgo)
July 31, 2020 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Anthony Porto, Jr...(jgo)
July 31, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
July 31, 2020 Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
July 31, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jesse M. Furman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
July 31, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Dan David Kohane. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Citizenship Defendant code 2 (Citizen of Another State); County code XX Out of U.S.;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Citizenship Defendant code has been modified to 1 (Citizen of This State); the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (jgo)
July 30, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Anthony Porto Jr., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Kemper Independence Insurance Company..(Kohane, Dan)
July 30, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to William Haughey, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Kemper Independence Insurance Company..(Kohane, Dan)
July 30, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Kohane, Dan)
July 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against William Haughey, Anthony Porto, Jr.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-20929534)Document filed by Kemper Independence Insurance Company..(Kohane, Dan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kemper Independence Insurance Company v. Porto, Jr. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Porto, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Haughey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kemper Independence Insurance Company
Represented By: Dan David Kohane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?