Shkreta v. Colonnade Management Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Xhejni Shkreta
Defendant: Columbus Properties, Inc., John Dimurro and Colonnade Management Corporation
Case Number: 1:2020cv06134
Filed: August 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Ronnie Abrams
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2020 NOTICE OF MEDIATOR ASSIGNMENT - Notice of assignment of mediator. Mediator Schedule due by 10/15/2020..(rpr)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MEDIATION REFERRAL ORDER FOR CASES FILED UNDER THE FAIR LABOR STANDARDS ACT 29 U.S.C. Sec. 201 et seq. This case, involving claims under the Fair Labor Standards Act (FLSA), 29 U.S.C. Sec. 201 et seq., has been assigned to this Court for all purposes. In the Courts experience, cases involving FLSA claims often benefit from early mediation. To that end, prior to a Rule 16(b) case management conference the Court is referring this case to the Mediation Office for settlement purposes under Local Civil Rule 83.9. To facilitate mediation the parties shall, within four weeks of this Order, confer and provide the items set forth in this Order. Mediator to be Assigned by 9/21/2020. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 12/10/19) (rpr)
September 8, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by John Dimurro..(Wenner, Scott)
August 31, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by Colonnade Management Corporation, Columbus Properties, Inc...(Wenner, Scott)
August 31, 2020 Filing 10 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Columbus Properties, Inc. for Colonnade Management Corporation. Document filed by Colonnade Management Corporation..(Wenner, Scott)
August 31, 2020 Filing 9 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Oetker Group for Columbus Properties, Inc.. Document filed by Columbus Properties, Inc...(Wenner, Scott)
August 31, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Scott J. Wenner on behalf of Colonnade Management Corporation, Columbus Properties, Inc., John Dimurro..(Wenner, Scott)
August 21, 2020 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. John Dimurro served on 8/17/2020, answer due 9/8/2020. Service was accepted by Belkis Perata, CO-WORKER. Document filed by Xhejni Shkreta..(Kirschenbaum, Daniel)
August 21, 2020 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Columbus Properties, Inc. served on 8/10/2020, answer due 8/31/2020. Service was accepted by Heather Munholland, AUTHORIZED INDIVIDUAL. Document filed by Xhejni Shkreta..(Kirschenbaum, Daniel)
August 21, 2020 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Colonnade Management Corporation served on 8/10/2020, answer due 8/31/2020. Service was accepted by Heather Munholland, AUTHORIZED INDIVIDUAL. Document filed by Xhejni Shkreta..(Kirschenbaum, Daniel)
August 6, 2020 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Colonnade Management Corporation, Columbus Properties, Inc., John Dimurro..(jgo)
August 6, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
August 6, 2020 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
August 6, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Ronnie Abrams. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
August 5, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Colonnade Management Corporation, Columbus Properties, Inc., and John Dimurro, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Xhejni Shkreta..(Kirschenbaum, Daniel)
August 5, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Kirschenbaum, Daniel)
August 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Colonnade Management Corporation, Columbus Properties, Inc., John Dimurro. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21014932)Document filed by Xhejni Shkreta..(Kirschenbaum, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shkreta v. Colonnade Management Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xhejni Shkreta
Represented By: Daniel Maimon Kirschenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Columbus Properties, Inc.
Represented By: Scott J. Wenner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Dimurro
Represented By: Scott J. Wenner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colonnade Management Corporation
Represented By: Scott J. Wenner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?