Hay v. New York Media LLC et al
Plaintiff: Bruce Hay
Defendant: Kera Bolonik, David Korzenik and New York Media LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv06135
Filed: August 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: J Paul Oetken
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2020 Pro Se Payment of Fee Processed: $400.00 Check processed by the Finance Department on 9/24/2020, Receipt Number 465401267239. (sw)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Thus, in order to invoke this Court's diversity jurisdiction, Plaintiff must allege that the citizenship of each member of the LLC defendant was diverse from that of Plaintiff at the date of this action's filing. Therefore, Plaintiff shall, on or before October 7, 2020, either (1) show cause as to why its complaint should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction, or (2) move to file an amended complaint that properly pleads jurisdiction. If Plaintiff fails to do so, this action may be dismissed. So Ordered ( Motions due by 10/7/2020.) (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 9/23/2020) (js)
September 22, 2020 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (bcu)
September 22, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge J. Paul Oetken. Judge Colleen McMahon is no longer assigned to the case..(bcu)
September 22, 2020 Civil Case Opening Fee Payment: for #1 Complaint. Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21772704..(Weiss, Jillian)
September 22, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jillian Todd Weiss on behalf of Bruce Hay..(Weiss, Jillian)
August 25, 2020 Mailed a copy of #3 Order Directing Payment of Fee or IFP Application, to Bruce Hay at 1525 Massachusetts Ave., Cambridge, MA 02138. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement ifp) (dsh)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DIRECTING PAYMENT OF FEE OR IFP APPLICATION: Plaintiff is directed to render payment of the filing fee or submit an IFP application to this Court's Pro Se Office within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. The Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to my docket. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). Filing Fee due by 9/23/2020. In Forma Pauperis (IFP) Application due by 9/23/2020. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 08/24/2020) (Attachments: #1 Supplement ifp) (bl) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
August 19, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Colleen McMahon. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(wb)
August 5, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (sac)
August 5, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (sac)
August 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kera Bolonik, David Korzenik, New York Media LLC. Document filed by Bruce Hay. (sac) (Main Document 1 replaced on 8/10/2020) (sac).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hay v. New York Media LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce Hay
Represented By: Jillian Todd Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kera Bolonik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Korzenik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York Media LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?