d'Amico Dry d.a.c. v. Tremond Metals Corporation
Petitioner: d'Amico Dry d.a.c.
Respondent: Tremond Metals Corporation
Case Number: 1:2020cv06256
Filed: August 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: John Peter Cronan
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09:201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge John Peter Cronan. Judge Laura Taylor Swain is no longer assigned to the case. (laq)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Initial Conference set for 11/6/2020 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 17C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 8/19/2020) (va)
August 12, 2020 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Tremond Metals Corporation..(jgo)
August 11, 2020 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Tremond Metals Corporation, re: #4 Amended Petition,. Document filed by d'Amico Dry d.a.c...(Tisdale, Thomas)
August 11, 2020 Filing 4 AMENDED PETITION amending #1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration against Tremond Metals Corporation.Document filed by d'Amico Dry d.a.c.. Related document: #1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1).(Tisdale, Thomas)
August 11, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
August 11, 2020 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
August 11, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
August 11, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Thomas Leonard Tisdale. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 09:0009; Dollar Demand $92,406,000; County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 09:0201; the Dollar Demand has been modified to $92,000; the County code has been modified to XX Out of U.S.. (sj)
August 7, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Tisdale, Thomas)
August 7, 2020 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent dAmico Societa di Navigazione SpA, Corporate Parent dAmico International S.A., Other Affiliate Medi Supra Pool Management Ltd., Other Affiliate Medi PMax Pool Management Ltd., Other Affiliate Medbulk Maritime LTD. for d'Amico Dry d.a.c.. Document filed by d'Amico Dry d.a.c...(Tisdale, Thomas)
August 7, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION TO PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21058026).Document filed by d'Amico Dry d.a.c.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1).(Tisdale, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: d'Amico Dry d.a.c. v. Tremond Metals Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Tremond Metals Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: d'Amico Dry d.a.c.
Represented By: Thomas Leonard Tisdale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?