Chen v. Wolf et al
Plaintiff: Yiqin Chen
Defendant: Acting Director Ken Cuccinelli, Mark Hazuda, Acting Sec. of DHS Chad Wolf, William Barr, Ken Cuccinelli and Chad Wolf
Case Number: 1:2020cv06281
Filed: August 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew L Carter
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1361
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2020 Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Conference set for 1/8/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andrew L. Carter Jr.. (rj)
September 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint/Petition in the Nature of Mandamus. Conference scheduled for January 8, 2021 at 10 a.m. SO ORDERED. William Barr answer due 1/4/2021; Ken Cuccinelli answer due 1/4/2021; Mark Hazuda answer due 1/4/2021; Chad Wolf answer due 1/4/2021. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 9/13/2020) (rj)
September 3, 2020 Filing 8 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and to adjourn conference addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Simon Nakajima dated September 3, 2020. Document filed by William Barr, Ken Cuccinelli, Mark Hazuda, Chad Wolf..(Nakajima, Simon)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: The Court will conduct a telephone status conference in this action on September 13, 2020 at 10 a.m. Plaintiff should initiate the call to the other parties, and once all relevant parties are on the line, should contact the Court at 1-888-363-4749 (Conference Code: 3768660) on the date and time specified above. SO ORDERED. (Telephone Conference set for 9/13/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andrew L. Carter Jr.) (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 8/28/2020) (rjm)
August 25, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Simon Nakajima on behalf of William Barr, Ken Cuccinelli, Mark Hazuda, Chad Wolf..(Nakajima, Simon)
August 12, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Yiqin Chen served on 8/12/2020, answer due 10/13/2020. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Yiqin Chen..(Zheng, Taobo)
August 12, 2020 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to William Barr, Ken Cuccinelli, Mark Hazuda, Chad Wolf..(jgo)
August 12, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
August 12, 2020 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
August 12, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
August 12, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Taobo Zheng. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Acting Sec. of DHS Chad Wolf; Acting Director Ken Cuccinelli;Mark Hazuda; William Barr. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party text was omitted;. (jgo)
August 11, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Chad Wolf, Ken Cuccinelli, Mark Hazuda, William Barr, re: #1 Complaint/Petition in the Nature of Mandamus. Document filed by Yiqin Chen..(Zheng, Taobo)
August 11, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Zheng, Taobo)
August 11, 2020 Filing 1 FIRST COMPLAINT IN THE NATURE OF MANDAMUS against William Barr, Ken Cuccinelli, Mark Hazuda, Chad Wolf (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21101999).Document filed by Yiqin Chen..(Zheng, Taobo)
August 11, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Taobo Zheng. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (jgo)
August 11, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO FILE CIVIL INITIAL PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Taobo Zheng to electronically file the initial pleading in this case. Failure to file the initial pleading may result in the dismissal of the case pursuant to Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131. Initial Pleading due by 8/17/2020. (jgo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chen v. Wolf et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Director Ken Cuccinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Hazuda
Represented By: Simon Nakajima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Sec. of DHS Chad Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Barr
Represented By: Simon Nakajima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Cuccinelli
Represented By: Simon Nakajima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Wolf
Represented By: Simon Nakajima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yiqin Chen
Represented By: Taobo Zheng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?