Virtu Financial Inc. et al v. AXIS Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Virtu Americas LLC and Virtu Financial Inc.
Defendant: AXIS Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv06293
Filed: August 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: George B Daniels
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2020 Filing 34 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by AXIS Insurance Company..(Finnerty, Joseph)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #32 Letter, filed by AXIS Insurance Company. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Responses due by 10/23/2020) (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 9/21/2020) (cf)
September 17, 2020 Filing 32 LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Joseph G. Finnerty III dated September 17, 2020 re: Extension of Defendant's Time to Oppose Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Document filed by AXIS Insurance Company..(Finnerty, Joseph)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER: Defendant's request that this Court defer Defendant's time to respond to Plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment until after completion of discovery is DENIED. Defendant may include in its response to Plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment any arguments regarding whether Plaintiffs' motion is premature and should be denied pending completion of discovery. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 9/10/2020) (ks)
September 9, 2020 Filing 30 LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Robin L. Cohen dated September 9, 2020 re: in response to Defendant's request for rule 56(d) relief.. Document filed by Virtu Americas LLC, Virtu Financial Inc...(Cohen, Robin)
September 9, 2020 Filing 29 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Axis Specialty US Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent AXIS Specialty Global Holdings Limited, Corporate Parent Axis Capital Holdings Limited for AXIS Insurance Company. Document filed by AXIS Insurance Company..(Finnerty, Joseph)
September 9, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Eric Shawn Connuck on behalf of AXIS Insurance Company..(Connuck, Eric)
September 9, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Megan A. Shea on behalf of AXIS Insurance Company..(Shea, Megan)
September 9, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joseph Gregory Finnerty, III on behalf of AXIS Insurance Company..(Finnerty, Joseph)
September 8, 2020 Filing 25 LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Joseph G. Finnerty III dated September 8, 2020 re: plaintiff's motion for summary judgment. Document filed by AXIS Insurance Company..(Finnerty, Joseph)
September 4, 2020 Filing 24 ***SELECTED PARTIES***RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Virtu Financial Inc., Virtu Americas LLC, AXIS Insurance Company. Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #16 .(Cohen, Robin)
September 4, 2020 Filing 23 ***SELECTED PARTIES***DECLARATION of Justin Waldie in Support re: #17 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment ., #16 LETTER MOTION to Seal addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Robin L. Cohen dated September 4, 2020.. Document filed by Virtu Financial Inc., Virtu Americas LLC, AXIS Insurance Company. Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #16 .(Cohen, Robin)
September 4, 2020 Filing 22 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #17 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment ., #16 LETTER MOTION to Seal addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Robin L. Cohen dated September 4, 2020. . Document filed by Virtu Financial Inc., Virtu Americas LLC, AXIS Insurance Company. Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #16 .(Cohen, Robin)
September 4, 2020 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #17 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment . (Redacted). Document filed by Virtu Americas LLC, Virtu Financial Inc...(Cohen, Robin)
September 4, 2020 Filing 20 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Virtu Americas LLC, Virtu Financial Inc...(Cohen, Robin)
September 4, 2020 Filing 19 DECLARATION of Justin Waldie in Support re: #17 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Virtu Americas LLC, Virtu Financial Inc...(Cohen, Robin)
September 4, 2020 Filing 18 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - (SEE DOCUMENT #21) MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #17 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment . (Redacted). Document filed by Virtu Americas LLC, Virtu Financial Inc...(Cohen, Robin) Modified on 9/10/2020 (lb).
September 4, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment . Document filed by Virtu Americas LLC, Virtu Financial Inc...(Cohen, Robin)
September 4, 2020 Filing 16 LETTER MOTION to Seal addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Robin L. Cohen dated September 4, 2020. Document filed by Virtu Americas LLC, Virtu Financial Inc...(Cohen, Robin)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #14 Letter filed by AXIS Insurance Company. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. AXIS Insurance Company answer due 10/5/2020. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 9/1/2020) (kv)
August 31, 2020 Filing 14 LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Joseph G. Finnerty III dated August 31, 2020 re: Defendant's time to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. Document filed by AXIS Insurance Company..(Finnerty, Joseph)
August 18, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of scheduled pretrial conference re: #6 Order for Initial Pretrial Conference,. Document filed by Virtu Americas LLC, Virtu Financial Inc...(Cohen, Robin)
August 18, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. AXIS Insurance Company served on 8/14/2020, answer due 9/4/2020. Service was accepted by Barry Smith. Document filed by Virtu Financial Inc.; Virtu Americas LLC..(Lelutiu, Radu)
August 18, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Radu A. Lelutiu on behalf of Virtu Americas LLC, Virtu Financial Inc...(Lelutiu, Radu)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #7 Letter Motion to Seal. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 8/12/2020) (rj)
August 12, 2020 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to AXIS Insurance Company. (sj)
August 12, 2020 Filing 8 ***SELECTED PARTIES***REDACTION to #7 LETTER MOTION to Seal addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Robin L. Cohen dated August 12, 2020. by Virtu Financial Inc., Virtu Americas LLC, AXIS Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B, #2 Exhibit D, #3 Exhibit E)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #7 .(Cohen, Robin)
August 12, 2020 Filing 7 LETTER MOTION to Seal addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Robin L. Cohen dated August 12, 2020. Document filed by Virtu Americas LLC, Virtu Financial Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B Redacted, #2 Exhibit D Redacted, #3 Exhibit E Redacted).(Cohen, Robin)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 1/20/2021 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 11A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge George B. Daniels, and as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 8/12/2020) (jwh)
August 12, 2020 ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number 5 Electonic Summons Issued. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (sj)
August 11, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge George B. Daniels. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
August 11, 2020 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
August 11, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
August 10, 2020 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Virtu Americas LLC, Virtu Financial Inc...(Cohen, Robin)
August 10, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Cohen, Robin)
August 10, 2020 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Axis Insurance Company, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Virtu Americas LLC, Virtu Financial Inc...(Cohen, Robin)
August 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AXIS Insurance Company. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21087450)Document filed by Virtu Financial Inc., Virtu Americas LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E).(Cohen, Robin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Virtu Financial Inc. et al v. AXIS Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virtu Americas LLC
Represented By: Robin L. Cohen
Represented By: Radu A. Lelutiu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virtu Financial Inc.
Represented By: Robin L. Cohen
Represented By: Radu A. Lelutiu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AXIS Insurance Company
Represented By: Megan A. Shea
Represented By: Eric Shawn Connuck
Represented By: Joseph Gregory Finnerty, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?