Lerario v. NewYork-Presbyterian/Queens et al
Plaintiff: Dr. Mackenzie Lerario
Defendant: Cornell University, NewYork-Presbyterian/Queens and Dr. Matthew Fink
Case Number: 1:2020cv06295
Filed: August 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: John G Koeltl
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Matthew Fink served on 10/1/2020, answer due 10/22/2020. Service was accepted by Carmen P., Paralegal of the Legal Department. Document filed by Mackenzie Lerario..(Weiss, Jillian)
October 6, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. NewYork-Presbyterian/Queens served on 9/30/2020, answer due 10/21/2020. Service was accepted by Nathalie Ng, Legal Assistant. Document filed by Mackenzie Lerario..(Weiss, Jillian)
October 6, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Cornell University served on 10/1/2020, answer due 10/22/2020. Service was accepted by Carmen P., Paralegal of the Legal Department. Document filed by Mackenzie Lerario..(Weiss, Jillian)
October 5, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John G. Koeltl: Pretrial Conference set for 11/23/2020 at 12:00 PM before Judge John G. Koeltl. Dial-in: 888 363-4749, with access code 8140049. (Fletcher, Donnie)
September 21, 2020 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to NewYork-Presbyterian/Queens..(pne)
September 21, 2020 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Cornell University..(pne)
September 21, 2020 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Matthew Fink..(pne)
September 18, 2020 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to DR. MATTHEW FINK, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Mackenzie Lerario..(Weiss, Jillian)
September 18, 2020 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to CORNELL UNIVERSITY, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Mackenzie Lerario..(Weiss, Jillian)
September 18, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to NEWYORK-PRESBYTERIAN/QUEENS, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Mackenzie Lerario..(Weiss, Jillian)
August 11, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Jillian Todd Weiss. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Albany. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to Westchester. (sj)
August 11, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John G. Koeltl. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
August 11, 2020 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
August 11, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
August 11, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Jillian Todd Weiss to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Defendant as to whom the summons request is for must be listed in the docket entry. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj)
August 10, 2020 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - 'AS TO' - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Mackenzie Lerario. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons 2, #2 Proposed Summons 3).(Weiss, Jillian) Modified on 8/11/2020 (sj).
August 10, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Weiss, Jillian)
August 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cornell University, Matthew Fink, NewYork-Presbyterian/Queens. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21088809)Document filed by Mackenzie Lerario..(Weiss, Jillian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lerario v. NewYork-Presbyterian/Queens et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dr. Mackenzie Lerario
Represented By: Jillian Todd Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cornell University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NewYork-Presbyterian/Queens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Matthew Fink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?