Mirza et al v. Doe
Plaintiff: Allied Medical and Diagnostic Services, LLC and Dr. Muhammad Mirza
Defendant: John Doe
Case Number: 1:2020cv06329
Filed: August 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lorna G Schofield
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332lb
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby ORDERED that a conference will be held at November 19, 2020 at 11:00 a.m. The conference will be telephonic. The time of the conference is approximate, but the parties shall be ready to proceed by that time. The Court will call the parties at the number provided in the joint letter (discussed below) once the conference is ready to begin. All pretrial conferences must be attended by the attorney who will serve as principal trial counsel. The parties shall ensure they are all dialed into the conference call by the appointed conference time. DATE AND PLACE OF CONFERENCE: November 19, 2020 at 11:00 a.m., to be held telephonically in accordance with the instructions on the first page of this order. And as set forth herein., ( Telephone Conference set for 11/19/2020 at 11:00 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield.) Initial Conference set for 11/19/2020 at 11:00 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 9/24/2020) (ama)
September 14, 2020 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Subpoena to Produce Documents and Order served on Yelp, Inc. on September 3, 2020. Service was accepted by National Registered Agents, Inc c/o Daisy Montenegro. Document filed by Allied Medical and Diagnostic Services, LLC, Muhammad Mirza..(Lin, David)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Affidavit of Service. Application GRANTED. By September 23, 2020, Plaintiffs shall file proof of service of the September 2, 2020, Order (Dkt. 5) and subpoena. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close the docket entry at #6. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 9/10/2020) (jca)
September 9, 2020 Filing 6 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Affidavit of Service addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from David D. Lin dated September 9, 2020. Document filed by Allied Medical and Diagnostic Services, LLC, Muhammad Mirza..(Lin, David)
September 2, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 10/20/2020. Responses due by 10/27/2020 (cf)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #4 Letter Motion for Discovery. It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiffs may serve Yelp with a Rule 45 subpoena seeking only the name and address of Defendant. Plaintiffs may not subpoena Yelp for Defendant's email address, telephone number or any other information. It is further ORDERED that any information disclosed to Plaintiffs in response to the subpoena may be used by Plaintiffs solely for the purpose of obtaining sufficient information to identify andserve Defendant. It is further ORDERED that by September 9, 2020, Plaintiffs shall serve a copy of this Order and the subpoena on Yelp and file an affidavit of service. It is further ORDERED that by October 20, 2020, Yelp shall file any motion for a protective order in lieu of complying with the subpoena. By October 27, 2020, Plaintiffs shall file a response, if any. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close the docket entry at #4. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 9/2/2020) (cf)
August 24, 2020 Filing 4 LETTER MOTION for Discovery addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from David D. Lin dated August 24, 2020. Document filed by Allied Medical and Diagnostic Services, LLC, Muhammad Mirza..(Lin, David)
August 12, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Judge J. Paul Oetken is no longer assigned to the case..(wb)
August 12, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
August 12, 2020 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
August 12, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge J. Paul Oetken. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
August 11, 2020 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Allied Medical and Diagnostic Services, LLC..(Lin, David)
August 11, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Lin, David)
August 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Doe. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21109485)Document filed by Muhammad Mirza, Allied Medical and Diagnostic Services, LLC..(Lin, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mirza et al v. Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allied Medical and Diagnostic Services, LLC
Represented By: David Dong Ann Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dr. Muhammad Mirza
Represented By: David Dong Ann Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?