Campus Book Company, Inc. et al v. McGraw-Hill Global Education Holdings, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Renttext.com, Inc., CBSKY, Inc., CBSNM, Inc., BJJ Corporation and Campus Book Company, Inc.
Defendant: Barnes & Noble College Booksellers L.L.C., McGraw-Hill Global Education Holdings LLC, Follett Higher Education Group, Inc., Barnes & Noble Education, Inc., Pearson Education Inc., Cengage Learning Inc. and Educational Publishers Enforcement Group
Case Number: 1:2020cv06339
Filed: August 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Denise L Cote
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2020 Filing 66 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Craig S. Davis to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number NYSDC-21942575. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Kiyana Miller. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Craig S. Davis in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit Minnesota Supreme Court Certificate of Good Standing)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02946-DLC et al..(Davis, Craig) Modified on 10/2/2020 (wb).
October 1, 2020 Filing 65 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Jessica N. Servais to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number NYSDC-21942520. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Kiyana Miller. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Jessica N. Servais in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit Minnesota Supreme Court Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit Wisconsin Supreme Court Certificate of Good Standing)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02946-DLC et al..(Servais, Jessica) Modified on 10/2/2020 (wb).
October 1, 2020 Filing 64 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Heidi M. Silton to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number NYSDC-21941873. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Kiyana Miller. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Heidi M. Silton in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit Minnesota Supreme Court Certificate of Good Standing)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02946-DLC et al..(Silton, Heidi) Modified on 10/2/2020 (wb).
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting #60 Motion for Laura Kirstine Rogers to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Denise L. Cote)(Text Only Order) (gr)
September 21, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #62 MOTION for Christine R. Couvillon to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of Virginia;. Re-file the motion as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (bcu)
September 18, 2020 Filing 62 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Christine R. Couvillon to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by BJJ Corporation, CBSKY, Inc., CBSNM, Inc., Campus Book Company, Inc., Renttext.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit in Support, #2 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order for Admission).(Couvillon, Christine) Modified on 9/21/2020 (bcu).
September 16, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #61 MOTION for Christine R. Couvillon to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21687331. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from SUPREME COURT OF TEXAS - 512-463-1312. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order. (aea)
September 16, 2020 Filing 61 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Christine R. Couvillon to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21687331. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by BJJ Corporation, CBSKY, Inc., CBSNM, Inc., Campus Book Company, Inc., Renttext.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit in Support, #2 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order for Admission).(Couvillon, Christine) Modified on 9/16/2020 (aea).
September 10, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #60 MOTION for Laura Kirstine Rogers to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21588380. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
September 10, 2020 Filing 60 MOTION for Laura Kirstine Rogers to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21588380. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by BJJ Corporation, CBSKY, Inc., CBSNM, Inc., Campus Book Company, Inc., Renttext.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit In Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Rogers, L)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED as follows: Radice Law Firm, PC and Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP shall serve as Co-Lead Counsel for the Student Purchaser Plaintiffs. Steckler Gresham Cochran PLLC and Thompson Coburn LLP shall serve as Co-Lead Counsel for the Independent Collegiate Retailer Plaintiffs. The Student Purchaser Plaintiffs and Independent Collegiate Retailer Plaintiffs shall each file their consolidated amended complaints for their respective actions and any actions consolidated with their respective actions on or before October 16, 2020. Defendants shall file an answer to the consolidated amended complaints or a motion to dismiss the consolidated amended complaints by December 4. If a motion to dismiss either of the two consolidated amended complaints is filed, the Student Purchaser Plaintiffs and Independent Collegiate Retailer Plaintiffs shall file a letter by December 11, 2020 indicating a desire to further amend their complaints in response to the motion. Any second consolidated amended complaints must be filed by December 18. If the Student Purchaser Plaintiffs and Independent Collegiate Retailer Plaintiffs elect to further amend, any Defendant shall file its motion to dismiss on or before January 22, 2021. The plaintiffs shall file their oppositions to the motions by February 19. Defendants shall file their replies on or before March 5. (And as further set forth herein.) (Amended Pleadings due by 12/18/2020., Motions due by 1/22/2021., Responses due by 2/19/2021, Replies due by 3/5/2021.) (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 9/8/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02946-DLC et al. (jca)
September 3, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Denise L. Cote: Telephone Conference to address applications for appointment as lead counsel in this matter held on 9/3/2020. (Court Reporter Jennifer Thun) Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02946-DLC et al.(gr)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER: On August 12, 2020, this Court issued an Order scheduling atelephone conference for September 3. On August 24, this Court ordered that the September 3 conference shall address the applications for appointment as lead counsel and set a schedule for consolidated class actions. It is herebyORDERED that counsel for the plaintiffs shall consult with each other and submit an appearance sheet that lists the names and phone numbers of each attorney who will make an appearance at the conference by Wednesday, September 2 at 5:00 p.m. The appearance sheet may be submitted to this Courts Chambers via email at cotenysdchambers@nysd.uscourts.gov. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 9/1/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02946-DLC et al. (gr)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER: On August 28, 2020, Martha Barabas, one of the Student Plaintiffs in this case, moved for the appointment of the Radice Law Firm, PC and Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP as interim co-lead counsel. In support of the motion, Barabas submitted a declaration by John D. Radice (Declaration) and requested that it be filed under seal. The Court having reviewed the Declaration, it is hereby ORDERED that the plaintiff shall file the Declaration with only the third paragraph redacted. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 8/31/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02946-DLC et al. (gr)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER in case 1:20-cv-03162-DLC; granting (10) Motion for Nicole Williams. to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:20-md-02946-DLC. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Denise L. Cote)(Text Only Order) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02946-DLC et al. (gr)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER: This action, Cabral v. Cengage Learning, Inc., et al, 20cv3660, is related to the MDL which has been assigned to this Court. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that applications for appointment as lead counsel in the Student Plaintiffs class actions shall be made by noon on Friday, August 28, 2020.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that applications for appointment as lead counsel in the Retailer Plaintiffs class actions shall be made by noon on Friday, August 28, 2020. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that any objection to those applications shall be filed by Tuesday, September 1, 2020. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the September 3 conference will address the applications for appointment as lead counsel and seta schedule for consolidated class actions. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 8/26/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02946-DLC et al. (gr)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER: These MDL actions having been assigned to this Court, and having reviewed the parties August 21, 2020 submissions, it is hereby ORDERED that applications for appointment as lead counsel in the Student Plaintiffs class actions shall be made by noon on Friday, August 28, 2020. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that applications for appointment as lead counsel in the Retailer Plaintiffs class actions shall be made by noon on Friday, August 28, 2020. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that any objection to those applications shall be filed by Tuesday, September 1, 2020. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the September 3 conference willaddress the applications for appointment as lead counsel and set a schedule for consolidated class actions. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 8/24/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02946-DLC et al. (gr)
August 12, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE - TRANSFER CASE: This case is assigned to: Judge Denise L. Cote. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions. (sjo)
August 12, 2020 NOTE TO OUT OF STATE ATTORNEYS: Please visit the Court's website at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/ for information regarding admission to the S.D.N.Y. Bar and the CM/ECF Rules & Filing Instructions. (sjo)
August 12, 2020 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sjo)
August 12, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (sjo)
August 12, 2020 CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:20-md-02946-DLC. (sjo)
August 12, 2020 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:20-md-02946-DLC. (sjo)
August 12, 2020 Filing 53 MDL TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of Delaware; Case Number: 1:20-cv-00102. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received. (sjo)
August 11, 2020 Case electronically transferred to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. (dlw) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/12/2020.]
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 TRANSFER ORDER - This case is hereby transferred to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell, Chair, Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, on 8/11/2020 and certified by the Clerk of the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York on 8/11/2020. (dlw) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/12/2020.]
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORAL ORDER: Having reviewed the parties' joint status report (D.I. #50 ), the Court finds good cause not to issue a scheduling order at this time. The parties shall submit a joint status report on or before the earlier of (i) August 31, 2020 or (ii) one week after the Joint Panel on Multidistrict Litigation issues a decision on the pending motions to consolidate. In addition to any other matters they wish to address, the parties shall set forth their respective positions on the propriety of issuing a scheduling order at that time. ORDERED by Judge Jennifer L. Hall on 7/28/2020. (ceg) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/12/2020.]
July 20, 2020 Filing 50 Joint STATUS REPORT by BJJ Corporation, CBSKY, Inc., CBSNM, Inc., Campus Book Company, Inc., Renttext.com, Inc.. (Bilson, David) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/12/2020.]
July 20, 2020 Filing 49 REQUEST for Oral Argument by Cengage Learning, Inc., McGraw-Hill Global Education Holdings, LLC, Pearson Education, Inc. re #31 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . (Shen, Zi-Xiang) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/12/2020.]
July 20, 2020 Filing 48 REQUEST for Oral Argument by Barnes & Noble College Booksellers, LLC, Barnes & Noble Education, Inc., Cengage Learning, Inc., Follett Higher Education Group, Inc., McGraw-Hill Global Education Holdings, LLC, Pearson Education, Inc. re #34 Joint MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . (Shen, Zi-Xiang) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/12/2020.]
July 20, 2020 Filing 47 REQUEST for Oral Argument by BJJ Corporation, CBSKY, Inc., CBSNM, Inc., Campus Book Company, Inc., Renttext.com, Inc. re #34 Joint MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , #31 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . (Bilson, David) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/12/2020.]
July 13, 2020 Filing 46 REPLY BRIEF re #34 Joint MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Reply Brief In Support Of Motion To Dismiss filed by Cengage Learning, Inc., McGraw-Hill Global Education Holdings, LLC, Pearson Education, Inc.. (Lafferty, William) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/12/2020.]
July 13, 2020 Filing 45 REPLY BRIEF re #31 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Cengage Learning, Inc., McGraw-Hill Global Education Holdings, LLC, Pearson Education, Inc.. (Shen, Zi-Xiang) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/12/2020.]
June 26, 2020 Filing 44 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #34 Joint MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by BJJ Corporation, CBSKY, Inc., CBSNM, Inc., Campus Book Company, Inc., Renttext.com, Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 7/6/2020. (Phillips, John) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/12/2020.]
June 26, 2020 Filing 43 DECLARATION re #42 Answering Brief in Opposition, by BJJ Corporation, CBSKY, Inc., CBSNM, Inc., Campus Book Company, Inc., Renttext.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-D)(Phillips, John) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/12/2020.]
June 26, 2020 Filing 42 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #31 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by BJJ Corporation, CBSKY, Inc., CBSNM, Inc., Campus Book Company, Inc., Renttext.com, Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 7/6/2020. (Phillips, John) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/12/2020.]
June 4, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Jasmine S. Wynton for BJJ Corporation, for CBSKY, Inc., for CBSNM, Inc., for Campus Book Company, Inc., for Renttext.com, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/12/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, #41 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jasmine S. Wynton filed by Renttext.com, Inc., CBSKY, Inc., Campus Book Company, Inc., CBSNM, Inc., BJJ Corporation. ORDERED by Judge Jennifer L. Hall on 5/29/2020. (ceg) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/12/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 41 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jasmine S. Wynton - filed by BJJ Corporation, CBSKY, Inc., CBSNM, Inc., Campus Book Company, Inc., Renttext.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Jasmine S. Wynton)Motions referred to Jennifer L. Hall.(Bilson, David) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/12/2020.]
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORAL ORDER: Having reviewed the parties' recent letters (D.I. #38 , #39 ), the Court finds good cause not to issue a scheduling order at this time, particularly in view of the pending, and potentially dispositive, motions to dismiss this antitrust action. The parties agreed to a briefing schedule under which briefing on the pending motions to dismiss will not be complete until July 13, 2020. The parties shall submit a joint status report on or before July 20, 2020. In addition to any other matters they wish to address, the parties shall set forth their respective positions on the propriety of issuing a scheduling order at that time. ORDERED by Judge Jennifer L. Hall on 5/18/2020. (ceg) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/12/2020.]
May 7, 2020 Filing 39 Letter to Judges Maryellen Noreika and Jennifer L. Hall from William M. Lafferty regarding Motion before the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation - re #38 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Tab 1, #2 Exhibit Tab 2)(Lafferty, William) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/12/2020.]
May 7, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Christine R. Couvillon for BJJ Corporation, CBSKY, Inc., CBSNM, Inc., Campus Book Company, Inc., Renttext.com, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (kmd) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/12/2020.]
April 30, 2020 Filing 38 Letter to The Honorable Jennifer L. Hall from John C. Phillips, Jr. regarding Joint Letter in Response to the Court's April 27, 2020 Oral Order - re 36 Order,. (Phillips, John) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/12/2020.]
April 28, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Michael Dockterman for Pearson Education, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (kmd) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/12/2020.]
April 28, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorneys William F. Cavanaugh, Saul B. Shapiro, Amy N. Vegari for McGraw-Hill Global Education Holdings, LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (kmd) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/12/2020.]
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, #37 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Christine R. Couvillon filed by Renttext.com, Inc., CBSKY, Inc., Campus Book Company, Inc., CBSNM, Inc., BJJ Corporation. ORDERED by Judge Jennifer L. Hall on 4/28/2020. (ceg) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/12/2020.]
April 27, 2020 Filing 37 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Christine R. Couvillon - filed by BJJ Corporation, CBSKY, Inc., CBSNM, Inc., Campus Book Company, Inc., Renttext.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Christine R. Couvillon)Motions referred to Jennifer L. Hall.(Bilson, David) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/12/2020.]
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT, on or before April 30, 2020, the parties shall file a joint letter advising the Court as to whether it would be appropriate to enter a scheduling order at this time or whether there is good cause not to do so. ORDERED by Judge Jennifer L. Hall on 4/27/2020. (ceg) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/12/2020.]
April 27, 2020 ***Set Briefing Schedule re #31 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim & #34 Joint Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim: Answering Brief due 6/26/2020, Reply Brief due 7/13/2020 per Stipulation at D.I. 16. (ceg) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/12/2020.]
April 24, 2020 Filing 35 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #34 Joint MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Barnes & Noble College Booksellers, LLC, Barnes & Noble Education, Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 5/8/2020. (Keller, Karen) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/12/2020.]
April 24, 2020 Filing 34 Joint MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by Barnes & Noble College Booksellers, LLC, Barnes & Noble Education, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Keller, Karen) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/12/2020.]
April 24, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Matt D. Basil for Follett Higher Education Group, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/12/2020.]
April 24, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Craig C. Martin for Follett Higher Education Group, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/12/2020.]
April 24, 2020 Filing 33 DECLARATION re #32 Opening Brief in Support, of Suzanne L. Telsey by Cengage Learning, Inc., McGraw-Hill Global Education Holdings, LLC, Pearson Education, Inc.. (Shen, Zi-Xiang) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/12/2020.]
April 24, 2020 Filing 32 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #31 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Against Educational Publishers Enforcement Group Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6), Or, In The Alternative, Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(2) filed by Cengage Learning, Inc., McGraw-Hill Global Education Holdings, LLC, Pearson Education, Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 5/8/2020. (Shen, Zi-Xiang) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/12/2020.]
April 24, 2020 Filing 31 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by Cengage Learning, Inc., McGraw-Hill Global Education Holdings, LLC, Pearson Education, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shen, Zi-Xiang) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/12/2020.]
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, #29 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Craig C. Martin and Matt D. Basil filed by Follett Higher Education Group, Inc. ORDERED by Judge Jennifer L. Hall on 4/24/2020. (ceg) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/12/2020.]
April 24, 2020 Filing 30 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Follett Corporation for Follett Higher Education Group, Inc. filed by Follett Higher Education Group, Inc.. (Ross, David) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/12/2020.]
April 23, 2020 Filing 29 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Craig C. Martin and Matt D. Basil - filed by Follett Higher Education Group, Inc.. Motions referred to Jennifer L. Hall.(Ross, David) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/12/2020.]
April 23, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by David Evan Ross on behalf of Follett Higher Education Group, Inc. (Ross, David) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/12/2020.]
April 22, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Jennifer Quinn-Barabanov for Pearson Education, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (sam) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/12/2020.]
April 22, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Richard Snyder, Andrew J. Ewalt, and Eric Mahr for Cengage Learning, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (sam) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/12/2020.]
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, #27 Stipulation Governing Page Limits for Briefing Related to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss. ORDERED by Judge Jennifer L. Hall on 4/17/2020. (ceg) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/12/2020.]
April 14, 2020 Filing 27 STIPULATION Governing Page Limits for Briefing Related to Defendants Motions to Dismiss re #16 Stipulation by Cengage Learning, Inc., McGraw-Hill Global Education Holdings, LLC, Pearson Education, Inc.. (Shen, Zi-Xiang) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/12/2020.]
April 3, 2020 Filing 26 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Pearson plc for Pearson Education, Inc. filed by Pearson Education, Inc.. (Shen, Zi-Xiang) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/12/2020.]
March 9, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Mackenzie S. Wallace as co-counsel. Reason for request: no longer with Thompson & Knight LLP. (Bilson, David) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/12/2020.]
March 9, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of [Notice of Change of Law Firm] by BJJ Corporation, CBSKY, Inc., CBSNM, Inc., Campus Book Company, Inc., Renttext.com, Inc. (Bilson, David) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/12/2020.]
March 4, 2020 Filing 23 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent McGraw-Hill Global Education Intermediate Holdings, LLC for McGraw-Hill Global Education Holdings, LLC filed by McGraw-Hill Global Education Holdings, LLC. (Shen, Zi-Xiang) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/12/2020.]
March 3, 2020 Filing 22 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Other Affiliate BlackRock Inc. for Barnes & Noble Education, Inc.; Other Affiliate Barnes & Noble Education, Inc. for Barnes & Noble College Booksellers, LLC filed by Barnes & Noble College Booksellers, LLC, Barnes & Noble Education, Inc.. (Fry, David) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/12/2020.]
February 27, 2020 Filing 21 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Cengage Learning Holdings II, Inc., Corporate Parent Cengage Learning Holdco, Inc. for Cengage Learning, Inc. filed by Cengage Learning, Inc.. (Shen, Zi-Xiang) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/12/2020.]
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, #16 Stipulation and Order to Establish Schedule to Respond to Complaint. The deadline for the Non-EPEG Defendants to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint is April 24, 2020; Plaintiffs' answering brief in opposition to any motions to dismiss is due June 26, 2020; and Defendant's reply brief in support of its motion to dismiss is due July 13, 2020 (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Barnes & Noble College Booksellers, LLC answer due 4/24/2020; Barnes & Noble Education, Inc. answer due 4/24/2020; Cengage Learning, Inc. answer due 4/24/2020; Follett Higher Education Group, Inc. answer due 4/24/2020; McGraw-Hill Global Education Holdings, LLC answer due 4/24/2020; Pearson Education, Inc. answer due 4/24/2020). ORDERED by Judge Jennifer L. Hall on 2/26/2020. (ceg) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/12/2020.]
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #20 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney William F. Cavanaugh, Jr., Saul B. Shapiro, and Amy N. Vegari filed by McGraw-Hill Global Education Holdings, LLC. ORDERED by Judge Jennifer L. Hall on 2/25/2020. (ceg) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/12/2020.]
February 25, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney William F. Cavanaugh, Jr., Saul B. Shapiro, and Amy N. Vegari - filed by McGraw-Hill Global Education Holdings, LLC. Motions referred to Jennifer L. Hall.(Shen, Zi-Xiang) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/12/2020.]
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #18 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Andrew J. Ewalt, Richard Snyder, Eric Mahr and Lauren Kaplin of Freshfields Bruckhaus Deringer US LLP filed by Cengage Learning, Inc. ORDERED by Judge Jennifer L. Hall on 2/25/2020. (ceg) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/12/2020.]
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #17 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael Dockterman and Jennifer Quinn-Barabanov of Steptoe & Johnson LLP filed by Pearson Education, Inc. ORDERED by Judge Jennifer L. Hall on 2/25/2020. (ceg) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/12/2020.]
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORAL ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Hall - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Hall to hear and resolve all pre-trial matters up to and including expert discovery matters (but not including summary judgment motions, Daubert motions, pre-trial motions in limine or the pre-trial conference), subject to 28 U.S.C. 636(b) and any further Order of the Court. All subsequent filings in this action shall be captioned as follows: Civil Action No. 20-102-MN-JLH. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 2/25/2020.(dlw) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/12/2020.]
February 24, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Andrew J. Ewalt, Richard Snyder, Eric Mahr and Lauren Kaplin of Freshfields Bruckhaus Deringer US LLP - filed by Cengage Learning, Inc.. (Shen, Zi-Xiang) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/12/2020.]
February 24, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael Dockterman and Jennifer Quinn-Barabanov of Steptoe & Johnson LLP - filed by Pearson Education, Inc.. (Shen, Zi-Xiang) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/12/2020.]
February 24, 2020 Filing 16 STIPULATION [Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Establish Schedule to Respond to Complaint] by BJJ Corporation, CBSKY, Inc., CBSNM, Inc., Campus Book Company, Inc., Renttext.com, Inc.. (Bilson, David) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/12/2020.]
February 19, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorneys Lee R. Crain, Rachel S. Brass, Adam J. Di Vincenzo for Barnes & Noble College Booksellers, LLC and Barnes & Noble Education, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (kmd) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/12/2020.]
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #15 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Lee R. Crain, Rachel S. Brass, and Adam J. Di Vincenzo filed by Barnes & Noble College Booksellers, LLC, Barnes & Noble Education, Inc. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 2/19/2020. (dlw) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/12/2020.]
February 19, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Lee R. Crain, Rachel S. Brass, and Adam J. Di Vincenzo - filed by Barnes & Noble College Booksellers, LLC, Barnes & Noble Education, Inc.. (Keller, Karen) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/12/2020.]
February 6, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CBSKY, Inc., BJJ Corporation, Campus Book Company, Inc., CBSNM, Inc., Renttext.com, Inc.. Educational Publishers Enforcement Group served on 2/5/2020, answer due 2/26/2020. (Bilson, David) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/12/2020.]
February 6, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CBSKY, Inc., BJJ Corporation, Campus Book Company, Inc., CBSNM, Inc., Renttext.com, Inc.. Follett Higher Education Group, Inc. served on 2/5/2020, answer due 2/26/2020. (Bilson, David) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/12/2020.]
February 6, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CBSKY, Inc., BJJ Corporation, Campus Book Company, Inc., CBSNM, Inc., Renttext.com, Inc.. Pearson Education, Inc. served on 2/5/2020, answer due 2/26/2020. (Bilson, David) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/12/2020.]
February 6, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CBSKY, Inc., BJJ Corporation, Campus Book Company, Inc., CBSNM, Inc., Renttext.com, Inc.. Cengage Learning, Inc. served on 2/5/2020, answer due 2/26/2020. (Bilson, David) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/12/2020.]
February 6, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CBSKY, Inc., BJJ Corporation, Campus Book Company, Inc., CBSNM, Inc., Renttext.com, Inc.. McGraw-Hill Global Education Holdings, LLC served on 2/5/2020, answer due 2/26/2020. (Bilson, David) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/12/2020.]
February 4, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney L. Kirstine Rogers for BJJ Corporation, CBSKY, Inc., CBSNM, Inc., Campus Book Company, Inc., Renttext.com, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (kmd) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/12/2020.]
February 4, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Bruce W. Steckler,Stuart Cochran,R. Dean Gresham for BJJ Corporation, CBSKY, Inc., CBSNM, Inc., Campus Book Company, Inc., Renttext.com, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (lak) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/12/2020.]
February 3, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Nicole Williams for Campus Book Company, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d), Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (sam) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/12/2020.]
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Bruce W. Steckler, R. Dean Gresham, Stuart Cochran and L. Kirstine Rogers, #8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Nicole Williams and Mackenzie S. Wallace filed by Renttext.com, Inc., CBSKY, Inc., Campus Book Company, Inc., CBSNM, Inc., BJJ Corporation. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 1/30/2020. (dlw) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/12/2020.]
January 29, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/12/2020.]
January 27, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Bruce W. Steckler, R. Dean Gresham, Stuart Cochran and L. Kirstine Rogers - filed by BJJ Corporation, CBSKY, Inc., CBSNM, Inc., Campus Book Company, Inc., Renttext.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Steckler Pro Hac Certification, #2 Gresham Pro Hac Certification, #3 Cochran Pro Hac Certification, #4 Rogers Pro Hac Certification)(Bilson, David) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/12/2020.]
January 23, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Nicole Williams and Mackenzie S. Wallace - filed by BJJ Corporation, CBSKY, Inc., CBSNM, Inc., Campus Book Company, Inc., Renttext.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Williams Pro Hac Certification, #2 Mackenzie Pro Hac Certification)(Bilson, David) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/12/2020.]
January 22, 2020 No Summons Issued. (kmd) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/12/2020.]
January 22, 2020 Filing 7 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Renttext.com, Inc. (kmd) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/12/2020.]
January 22, 2020 Filing 6 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by CBSNM, Inc. (kmd) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/12/2020.]
January 22, 2020 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by CBSKY, Inc. (kmd) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/12/2020.]
January 22, 2020 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by BJJ Corporation. (kmd) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/12/2020.]
January 22, 2020 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Campus Book Company, Inc. (kmd) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/12/2020.]
January 22, 2020 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (kmd) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/12/2020.]
January 22, 2020 Filing 1 Class Action COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Barnes & Noble College Booksellers, LLC, Barnes & Noble Education, Inc., Cengage Learning, Inc., Educational Publishers Enforcement Group, Follett Higher Education Group, Inc., McGraw-Hill Global Education Holdings, LLC, Pearson Education, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2832528.) - filed by CBSKY, Inc., BJJ Corporation, Campus Book Company, Inc., CBSNM, Inc., Renttext.com, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmd) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/12/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Campus Book Company, Inc. et al v. McGraw-Hill Global Education Holdings, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barnes & Noble College Booksellers L.L.C.
Represented By: David M. Fry
Represented By: Karen Elizabeth Keller
Represented By: Adam J. Di Vincenzo
Represented By: Lee R. Crain
Represented By: Rachel S. Brass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McGraw-Hill Global Education Holdings LLC
Represented By: William F. Cavanaugh
Represented By: Amy N. Vegari
Represented By: Zi-Xiang Shen
Represented By: Saul B. Shapiro
Represented By: Saul Benjamin Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Follett Higher Education Group, Inc.
Represented By: Matt D. Basil
Represented By: David Evan Ross
Represented By: Craig C. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barnes & Noble Education, Inc.
Represented By: David M. Fry
Represented By: Karen Elizabeth Keller
Represented By: Adam J. Di Vincenzo
Represented By: Lee R. Crain
Represented By: Rachel S. Brass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pearson Education Inc.
Represented By: Zi-Xiang Shen
Represented By: Michael Dockterman
Represented By: Jennifer Quinn-Barabanov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cengage Learning Inc.
Represented By: Eric Mahr
Represented By: Zi-Xiang Shen
Represented By: Andrew J. Ewalt
Represented By: Richard Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Educational Publishers Enforcement Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renttext.com, Inc.
Represented By: R. Dean Gresham
Represented By: Christine R. Couvillon
Represented By: Stuart Cochran
Represented By: David A. Bilson
Represented By: L. Kirstine Rogers
Represented By: Jasmine S. Wynton
Represented By: John C. Phillips, Jr.
Represented By: Bruce W. Steckler
Represented By: L Kirstine Rogers
Represented By: Christine Couvillon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CBSKY, Inc.
Represented By: R. Dean Gresham
Represented By: Christine R. Couvillon
Represented By: Stuart Cochran
Represented By: David A. Bilson
Represented By: L. Kirstine Rogers
Represented By: Jasmine S. Wynton
Represented By: John C. Phillips, Jr.
Represented By: Bruce W. Steckler
Represented By: L Kirstine Rogers
Represented By: Christine Couvillon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CBSNM, Inc.
Represented By: R. Dean Gresham
Represented By: Christine R. Couvillon
Represented By: Stuart Cochran
Represented By: David A. Bilson
Represented By: L. Kirstine Rogers
Represented By: Jasmine S. Wynton
Represented By: John C. Phillips, Jr.
Represented By: Bruce W. Steckler
Represented By: L Kirstine Rogers
Represented By: Christine Couvillon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BJJ Corporation
Represented By: R. Dean Gresham
Represented By: Christine R. Couvillon
Represented By: Stuart Cochran
Represented By: David A. Bilson
Represented By: L. Kirstine Rogers
Represented By: Jasmine S. Wynton
Represented By: John C. Phillips, Jr.
Represented By: Bruce W. Steckler
Represented By: L Kirstine Rogers
Represented By: Christine Couvillon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Campus Book Company, Inc.
Represented By: R. Dean Gresham
Represented By: Christine R. Couvillon
Represented By: Stuart Cochran
Represented By: David A. Bilson
Represented By: L. Kirstine Rogers
Represented By: Jasmine S. Wynton
Represented By: John C. Phillips, Jr.
Represented By: Bruce W. Steckler
Represented By: Nicole Williams
Represented By: L Kirstine Rogers
Represented By: Christine Couvillon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?