Solomon v. New Jersey Transit Rail Operations, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Roger Solomon
Defendant: Interstate Hotels Consulting Group, Inc., Hotel Pennsylvania Management Company, Inc. and New Jersey Transit Rail Operations, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv06344
Filed: August 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Sarah L Cave
Referring Judge: Paul G Gardephe
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332pi
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Accordingly, Plaintiff is hereby ordered to show cause why this case should not be dismissed under Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure or Rule 41(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure for failure to prosecute. Such showing shall be made by affidavit or declaration filed on or before October 23, 2020. Plaintiff is warned that failure to comply with this Order may in itself result in dismissal of this action. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave on 10/9/2020) (jwh)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #13 Motion for Lawrence A. Katz to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Motion of Lawrence A. Katz, Esquire, for admission to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned action is granted. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. If this action is assigned to the Electronic Filing (ECF) system, counsel shall immediately apply for an ECF user name and password. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close the Motion at ECF No. 13. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave on 10/9/20) (yv)
October 8, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #13 MOTION for LAWRENCE ALAN KATZ to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-22038139. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
October 8, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for LAWRENCE ALAN KATZ to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-22038139. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Roger Solomon..(Katz, Lawrence)
September 29, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #12 MOTION for LAWRENCE ALAN KATZ to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21893278. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): expired Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of Pennsylvania;. Re-file the motion as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (bcu)
September 29, 2020 Filing 12 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for LAWRENCE ALAN KATZ to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21893278. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Roger Solomon..(Myers, Robert) Modified on 9/29/2020 (bcu).
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER FOR PROPER SERVICE, Because mailing the summons and complaint by certified mail does not constitute proper service under Federal or New York rules, Plaintiff is ORDERED to properly effect service and file proof of service on the docket by October 8, 2020. SO ORDERED. ( Service due by 10/8/2020.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave on 9/24/20) (yv)
September 23, 2020 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. New Jersey Transit Rail Operations, Inc. served on 8/24/2020, answer due 9/14/2020. Service was accepted by E. Reanes. Service was made by Mail Box. Document filed by Roger Solomon..(Myers, Robert)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #8 Motion for Robert E. Myers to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close the Motion at ECF No. 10. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave on 9/23/2020) (ks)
September 22, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #8 MOTION for ROBERT EARL MYERS to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21777232. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
September 22, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for ROBERT EARL MYERS to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21777232. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Roger Solomon..(Myers, Robert)
September 3, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #7 MOTION for LAWRENCE ALAN KATZ to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21478397. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #6 MOTION for ROBERT EARL MYERS to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21478072. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of New Jersey;. Re-file the motion as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (bcu)
September 3, 2020 Filing 7 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for LAWRENCE ALAN KATZ to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21478397. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Roger Solomon..(Myers, Robert) Modified on 9/3/2020 (bcu).
September 3, 2020 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for ROBERT EARL MYERS to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21478072. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Roger Solomon..(Myers, Robert) Modified on 9/3/2020 (bcu).
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 8/13/2020) (jca)
August 13, 2020 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Hotel Pennsylvania Management Company, Inc., Interstate Hotels Consulting Group, Inc., New Jersey Transit Rail Operations, Inc...(pc)
August 13, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
August 13, 2020 Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
August 13, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
August 13, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney David Jaroslawicz. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Citizenship Defendant code 4 (Incorporated/Principal Place of Business-This State); Dollar Demand $150,000,000;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Citizenship Defendant code has been modified to 5 (Incorporated/Principal Place of Business-Other State); the Dollar Demand has been modified to blank;. (pc)
August 12, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to NEW JERSEY TRANSIT RAIL OPERATIONS, INC., HOTEL PENNSYLVANIA MANAGEMENT COMPANY, INC., INTERSTATE HOTELS CONSULTING GROUP, INC., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Roger Solomon..(Jaroslawicz, David)
August 12, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Jaroslawicz, David)
August 12, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Hotel Pennsylvania Management Company, Inc., Interstate Hotels Consulting Group, Inc., New Jersey Transit Rail Operations, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21119071)Document filed by Roger Solomon..(Jaroslawicz, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Solomon v. New Jersey Transit Rail Operations, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Interstate Hotels Consulting Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hotel Pennsylvania Management Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Jersey Transit Rail Operations, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger Solomon
Represented By: David Jaroslawicz
Represented By: Robert E. Myers
Represented By: Lawrence A Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?