Loughlin et al v. Goord
Plaintiff: James Satterfield, Suzanne Loughlin and Harry Rhulen
Defendant: Commissioner Glenn Goord and Glenn Goord
Case Number: 1:2020cv06357
Filed: August 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lewis J Liman
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1446lb
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Lewis J. Liman. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (ad)
September 23, 2020 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (ad)
September 23, 2020 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:19-cv-07767-LJL. Notice of Assignment to follow. (ad)
September 18, 2020 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Glenn Goord with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Suzanne Loughlin, James Satterfield, Harry Rhulen..(McFerrin-Clancy, John)
September 17, 2020 Filing 9 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Suzanne Loughlin, Harry Rhulen, James Satterfield..(McFerrin-Clancy, John)
September 17, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John J.D. McFerrin-Clancy on behalf of Suzanne Loughlin, Harry Rhulen, James Satterfield..(McFerrin-Clancy, John)
September 2, 2020 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #6 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Glenn Goord..(Fleischman, Keith)
September 2, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by Glenn Goord..(Fleischman, Keith)
September 2, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert Clifford Boneberg on behalf of Suzanne Loughlin, Harry Rhulen, James Satterfield..(Boneberg, Robert)
August 13, 2020 Filing 4 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 19-cv-7767. Document filed by Glenn Goord..(Fleischman, Keith)
August 13, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Sullivan. Case Number: E2020-846..Document filed by Glenn Goord. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (State Court Summons), #2 Exhibit B (State Court Complaint), #3 Exhibit C (State Court Affidavit of Service), #4 Exhibit D (State Court Notice of Appearance), #5 Exhibit E (State Court Stipulation)).(Fleischman, Keith)
August 13, 2020 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Lewis J. Liman as possibly related to 19-cv--7767. (jgo)
August 13, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
August 13, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(jgo)
August 13, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Keith Martin Fleischman. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $3,455,000,000; County code Sullivan;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $3,455,000; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (jgo)
August 13, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE RELATED CASE STATEMENT. Notice to Attorney Keith Martin Fleischman, for non compliance with Local Rule 13 of the Division of Business Among Judges. Attorney must electronically file the Related Case Statement. Use the event type Statement of Relatedness found under the event list Other Documents. (jgo)
August 13, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Keith Martin Fleischman to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Notice of Removal,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): pursuant to Rule 13.3, exhibits must be separated and labeled (i.e. Summons and Complaint). Re-file the pleading using the event type Notice of Removal found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo)
August 12, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Fleischman, Keith)
August 12, 2020 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - EXHIBIT ERROR - NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Sullivan. Case Number: E2020-846. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21121215).Document filed by Glenn Goord. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Pre-Removal State Court Filings)).(Fleischman, Keith) Modified on 8/13/2020 (jgo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Loughlin et al v. Goord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Satterfield
Represented By: Robert Clifford Boneberg
Represented By: John J.D. McFerrin-Clancy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suzanne Loughlin
Represented By: Robert Clifford Boneberg
Represented By: John J.D. McFerrin-Clancy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harry Rhulen
Represented By: Robert Clifford Boneberg
Represented By: John J.D. McFerrin-Clancy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner Glenn Goord
Represented By: Keith Martin Fleischman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenn Goord
Represented By: Keith Martin Fleischman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?