Doe v. City of New York et al.
Plaintiff: John Doe
Defendant: New York City Health And Hospitals Corporation and City Of New York
Case Number: 1:2020cv06393
Filed: August 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Alison J Nathan
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. New York City Health And Hospitals Corporation served on 9/16/2020, answer due 11/2/2020. Document filed by John Doe..(Kelner, Joshua)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. SO ORDERED. New York City Health And Hospitals Corporation answer due 11/2/2020. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 9/16/2020) (nb)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complain addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Candace E. Chun dated September 15, 2020. Document filed by City Of New York..(Chun, Candace)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Candace Eiko Chun on behalf of City Of New York..(Chun, Candace)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court on Friday, November 20,2020 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 906 of the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York, Thurgood Marshall U.S. Courthouse at 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that included with the Proposed Civil Case Management Plan, the parties jointly submit a letter, not to exceed five (5) pages, providing the following information in separate paragraphs as further set forth in this Order. Counsel who have noticed an appearance as of the issuance of this order are directed to notify all other parties' attorneys in this action by serving upon each of them a copy of this order and the Court's Individual Rules (available at the Court's website, http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judge/Nathan) forthwith. If unaware of the identity of counsel for any of the parties, counsel receiving this order must forthwith send a copy of this order and Individual Rules to that party personally. ( Initial Conference set for 11/20/2020 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 906, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alison J. Nathan.) (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 8/28/20) (yv)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. City Of New York served on 8/27/2020, answer due 9/17/2020. Service was accepted by Inez Contreras (designated representative). Document filed by John Doe..(Kelner, Joshua)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to New York City Health And Hospitals Corporation..(jgo)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to City Of New York..(jgo)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (pc)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Joshua Douglas Kelner. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: CITY OF NEW YORK, New York City Health And Hospitals Corporation, John Doe. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; party role was entered incorrectly;. (pc)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alison J. Nathan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Joshua Douglas Kelner. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Nature of Suit code 440 (Civil Rights: Other); Dollar Demand $20,000,000,000; County code Bronx;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Nature of Suit code has been modified to 550 (Prisoner: Civil Rights); the Dollar Demand has been modified to $9,999,000; the County code has been modified to New York;. (pc)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to New York City Health and Hospitals Corporation, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by New York City Health And Hospitals Corporation..(Kelner, Joshua)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to City of New York, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by John Doe..(Kelner, Joshua)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Kelner, Joshua)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CITY OF NEW YORK, New York City Health And Hospitals Corporation. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21136017)Document filed by John Doe..(Kelner, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. City of New York et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe
Represented By: Joshua Douglas Kelner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York City Health And Hospitals Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Of New York
Represented By: Candace Eiko Chun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?