Juarez et al v. Dolly Food Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Helder Martinez, Gerardo Juarez, Jose Martinez Casalez, Damian Valencia, Sabas Hernandez and Guillermo Mendez
Defendant: Rajiv Chowdhury and Dolly Food Corp. doing business as Moonstruck Eatery
Case Number: 1:2020cv06426
Filed: August 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Gregory H Woods
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2020 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,. Rajiv Chowdhury served on 10/1/2020, answer due 10/22/2020. Service was accepted by Rajiv Chowdhury, the defendant therein named. Document filed by Jose Martinez Casalez(on behalf of others similarly situated); Sabas Hernandez(Individually); Guillermo Mendez(Individually); Damian Valencia(Individually); Helder Martinez(Individually); Gerardo Juarez(on behalf of others similarly situated); Sabas Hernandez(on behalf of others similarly situated); Damian Valencia(on behalf of others similarly situated); Guillermo Mendez(on behalf of others similarly situated); Gerardo Juarez(Individually); Helder Martinez(on behalf of others similarly situated); Jose Martinez Casalez(Individually)..(Faillace, Michael)
September 29, 2020 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,. Dolly Food Corp. served on 9/29/2020, answer due 10/20/2020. Service was accepted by Nancy Dougherty, Authorized Agent in the Office of the Secretary of State, of the State of New York. Document filed by Jose Martinez Casalez(on behalf of others similarly situated); Sabas Hernandez(Individually); Guillermo Mendez(Individually); Damian Valencia(Individually); Helder Martinez(Individually); Gerardo Juarez(on behalf of others similarly situated); Sabas Hernandez(on behalf of others similarly situated); Damian Valencia(on behalf of others similarly situated); Guillermo Mendez(on behalf of others similarly situated); Gerardo Juarez(Individually); Helder Martinez(on behalf of others similarly situated); Jose Martinez Casalez(Individually)..(Faillace, Michael)
September 23, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Daniel Alan Tannenbaum on behalf of Jose Martinez Casalez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Jose Martinez Casalez(Individually), Sabas Hernandez(Individually), Sabas Hernandez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Gerardo Juarez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Gerardo Juarez(Individually), Helder Martinez(Individually), Helder Martinez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Guillermo Mendez(Individually), Guillermo Mendez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Damian Valencia(Individually), Damian Valencia(on behalf of others similarly situated)..(Tannenbaum, Daniel)
August 14, 2020 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Rajiv Chowdhury..(pne)
August 14, 2020 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Dolly Food Corp...(pne)
August 14, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
August 14, 2020 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pne)
August 14, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Gregory H. Woods. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pne)
August 13, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Rajiv Chowdhury, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Jose Martinez Casalez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Jose Martinez Casalez(Individually), Sabas Hernandez(Individually), Sabas Hernandez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Gerardo Juarez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Gerardo Juarez(Individually), Helder Martinez(Individually), Helder Martinez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Guillermo Mendez(Individually), Guillermo Mendez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Damian Valencia(Individually), Damian Valencia(on behalf of others similarly situated)..(Faillace, Michael)
August 13, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Dolly Food Corp., re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Jose Martinez Casalez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Jose Martinez Casalez(Individually), Sabas Hernandez(Individually), Sabas Hernandez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Gerardo Juarez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Gerardo Juarez(Individually), Helder Martinez(Individually), Helder Martinez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Guillermo Mendez(Individually), Guillermo Mendez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Damian Valencia(Individually), Damian Valencia(on behalf of others similarly situated)..(Faillace, Michael)
August 13, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Faillace, Michael)
August 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Rajiv Chowdhury, Dolly Food Corp.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21141840)Document filed by Jose Martinez Casalez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Sabas Hernandez(Individually), Guillermo Mendez(Individually), Damian Valencia(Individually), Helder Martinez(Individually), Gerardo Juarez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Sabas Hernandez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Damian Valencia(on behalf of others similarly situated), Guillermo Mendez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Gerardo Juarez(Individually), Helder Martinez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Jose Martinez Casalez(Individually)..(Faillace, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Juarez et al v. Dolly Food Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helder Martinez
Represented By: Michael Antonio Faillace
Represented By: Daniel Alan Tannenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerardo Juarez
Represented By: Michael Antonio Faillace
Represented By: Daniel Alan Tannenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Martinez Casalez
Represented By: Michael Antonio Faillace
Represented By: Daniel Alan Tannenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Damian Valencia
Represented By: Michael Antonio Faillace
Represented By: Daniel Alan Tannenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sabas Hernandez
Represented By: Michael Antonio Faillace
Represented By: Daniel Alan Tannenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guillermo Mendez
Represented By: Michael Antonio Faillace
Represented By: Daniel Alan Tannenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rajiv Chowdhury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dolly Food Corp. doing business as Moonstruck Eatery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?