Castillo v. JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: Candy Castillo
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. D/B/A Chase Bank and JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. doing business as Chase Bank
Case Number: 1:2020cv06429
Filed: August 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lorna G Schofield
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 pi
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the October 8, 2020, initial pretrial conference is cancelled. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 9/15/2020) (cf)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a United States Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. See 28 U.S.C. 636(c). No additional parties may be joined after or Amended Pleadings may be filed until 11/3/2020. All fact discovery shall be completed no later than 1/29/2021. If you have identified types of experts in question 9(a), all expert discovery shall be completed no later than 3/15/2021. This case is to be tried to a jury. Counsel for the parties have conferred and their present best estimate of the length of trial is 2-3 days. On 4/1/2021 at 11:00 A.M. a pre-motion conference will be held for any anticipated dispositive motions, as further set forth in this Order. Amended Pleadings due by 11/3/2020. Joinder of Parties due by 11/3/2020. Fact Discovery due by 1/29/2021. Expert Discovery due by 3/15/2021. Pre-Motion Conference set for 4/1/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 9/15/2020) (cf)
September 14, 2020 Filing 9 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Lindsay Kalick, Esq. dated September 14, 2020 re: Information Pursuant to 8/26/20 Order [Document 7]. Document filed by JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Proposed Civil Case Management Plan).(Kalick, Lindsay)
September 12, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Judge's Order and Court Rules served on Michael Salomon on September 10, 2020. Service was made by E-Mail (On Consent). Document filed by JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A...(Kalick, Lindsay)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby ORDERED that a conference will be held at October 8, 2020 at 11:00 a.m. The conference will be telephonic. The time of the conference is approximate, but the parties shall be ready to proceed by that time. The Court will call the parties at the number provided in the joint letter (discussed below) once the conference is ready to begin. All pretrial conferences must be attended by the attorney who will serve as principal trial counsel. The parties shall ensure they are all dialed into the conference call by the appointed conference time. Counsel who have noticed an appearance as of the issuance of this order are directed (i) to notify all other parties' attorneys in this action by serving upon each of them a copy of this order and the Court's Individual Rules forthwith, and (ii) to file proof of such notice with the Court. And as set forth herein., ( Telephone Conference set for 10/8/2020 at 11:00 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield.) Initial Conference set for 10/8/2020 at 11:00 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 8/26/2020) (ama)
August 20, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Lawrence Salomon on behalf of Candy Castillo..(Salomon, Michael)
August 17, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Docs #1-4 served on Law Offices of Zamsky & Salomon PC on August 17, 2020. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A...(Kalick, Lindsay)
August 16, 2020 Filing 4 DEMAND for Trial by Jury. Document filed by JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A..(Kalick, Lindsay)
August 14, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
August 14, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Lindsay Jill Kalick. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand none; County code Bronx;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $75,000; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (jgo)
August 14, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
August 14, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Lindsay Jill Kalick. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. D/B/A Chase Bank. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: alias was entered incorrectly. (jgo)
August 14, 2020 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
August 13, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Kalick, Lindsay)
August 13, 2020 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent JP Morgan Chase and for JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. D/B/A Chase Bank. Document filed by JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. D/B/A Chase Bank..(Kalick, Lindsay)
August 13, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Bronx, County of Bronx. Case Number: 29988/2019. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21142333).Document filed by JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. D/B/A Chase Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons-and-Complaint-with-AOS, #2 Exhibit Answer-to-Summons-and-Complaint, #3 Exhibit Demand-for-Bill-of-Particulars--Combined-Demands--..., #4 Exhibit Plaintiff-s-redacted-Verified-Bill-of-Particulars-..., #5 Exhibit email with Demand over $75k, #6 Exhibit Articles-of-Association-JPMC).(Kalick, Lindsay)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Castillo v. JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Candy Castillo
Represented By: Michael Lawrence Salomon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. D/B/A Chase Bank
Represented By: Lindsay Jill Kalick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. doing business as Chase Bank
Represented By: Lindsay Jill Kalick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?