Mobley v. Fordham Auto Sales, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Tyeesha Mobley
Defendant: Toyota Motor Credit Corporation, Toyota Lease Trust and Fordham Auto Sales, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv06436
Filed: August 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Katherine Polk Failla
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1667
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO ANSWER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by the undersigned, that the time for Defendant, FORDHAM AUTO SALES, INC., to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Summons and Complaint in the above captioned matter is hereby extended until and including November 2, 2020. There have been no previous requests for an extension of this deadline. Defendant, FORDHAM AUTO SALES, INC., hereby acknowledges and accepts service of the Summons and Complaint and hereby waives any defense based on lack of proper service. Defendant, FORDHAM AUTO SALES, INC.'s undersigned counsel hereby appears on Defendant's behalf. Application GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Fordham Auto Sales, Inc. answer due 11/2/2020.) Motions terminated: #13 CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Stipulation for extension of time to answer. filed by Fordham Auto Sales, Inc.. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 10/7/2020) (rro)
October 6, 2020 Filing 13 CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Stipulation for extension of time to answer. Document filed by Fordham Auto Sales, Inc...(Wiener, Melanie)
September 9, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Isaac M Taubes on behalf of Tyeesha Mobley..(Taubes, Isaac)
August 31, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 11/20/2020 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 618, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Katherine Polk Failla. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 8/31/2020) (rro)
August 19, 2020 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Toyota Lease Trust..(dnh)
August 19, 2020 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Fordham Auto Sales, Inc...(dnh)
August 18, 2020 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Toyota Lease Trust, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Tyeesha Mobley..(Schlanger, Daniel)
August 18, 2020 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Fordham Auto Sales, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Tyeesha Mobley..(Schlanger, Daniel)
August 14, 2020 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Toyota Motor Credit Corporation..(jgo)
August 14, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Daniel Adam Schlanger to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Request for Issuance of Summons, #3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): second party name on the PDF 'To' section must include 'care of c/o' or 'via' (Doc. 3); party of record whom summons is for must be listed first on the PDF 'To' section (Doc. 4). Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
August 14, 2020 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
August 14, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
August 14, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
August 13, 2020 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Toyota Motor Credit Corporation, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Tyeesha Mobley..(Schlanger, Daniel)
August 13, 2020 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Toyota Lease Trust, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Tyeesha Mobley..(Schlanger, Daniel) Modified on 8/14/2020 (jgo).
August 13, 2020 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Fordham Auto Sales, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Tyeesha Mobley..(Schlanger, Daniel) Modified on 8/14/2020 (jgo).
August 13, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Schlanger, Daniel)
August 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Fordham Auto Sales, Inc., Toyota Lease Trust, Toyota Motor Credit Corporation. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21142914)Document filed by Tyeesha Mobley..(Schlanger, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mobley v. Fordham Auto Sales, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyeesha Mobley
Represented By: Daniel Adam Schlanger
Represented By: Isaac M Taubes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor Credit Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Lease Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fordham Auto Sales, Inc.
Represented By: Melanie Irina Wiener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?