Cruz v. Shiseido Americas Corporation
Plaintiff: Shael Cruz
Defendant: Shiseido Americas Corporation
Case Number: 1:2020cv06444
Filed: August 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Stewart D Aaron
Referring Judge: Paul A Engelmayer
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER SCHEDULING INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: An Initial Pretrial Conference in accordance with Rule 16(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure will be held on Tuesday, December 1, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. In light of recent public health developments, the conference shall be conducted by telephone. At the scheduled time, the parties shall each separately call (888) 278-0296 (or (214) 765-0479) and enter access code 6489745. (Telephonic Initial Conference set for 12/1/2020 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 8/21/2020) (kl)
August 19, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Shiseido Americas Corporation waiver sent on 8/19/2020, answer due 10/19/2020. Document filed by Shael Cruz..(Mizrahi, Joseph)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF REFERENCE TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron. The parties are hereby notified that this Court has written on a legal issue that appears central to this case: the applicability of the ADA to websites. See Del-Orden v. Bonobos, Inc., No. 17 Civ. 2744 (PAE), 2017 WL 6547902 (S.D.N.Y. Dec. 20, 2017). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 8/14/2020) (ama)
August 14, 2020 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Shiseido Americas Corporation. (sj)
August 14, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
August 14, 2020 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
August 14, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
August 13, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Shiseido Americas Corporation, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Shael Cruz..(Mizrahi, Joseph)
August 13, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Mizrahi, Joseph)
August 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Shiseido Americas Corporation. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21144163)Document filed by Shael Cruz..(Mizrahi, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cruz v. Shiseido Americas Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shiseido Americas Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shael Cruz
Represented By: Joseph H Mizrahi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?