Trustees for The Mason Tenders District Council Welfare Fund, Pension Fund, Annuity Fund, and Training Program Fund et al v. AMM Construction, Inc.
Petitioner: Robert Bonanza, Trustees for The Mason Tenders District Council Welfare Fund, Pension Fund, Annuity Fund, and Training Program Fund and Anna Gutsin
Respondent: AMM Construction, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv06445
Filed: August 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Analisa Torres
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) AMM Construction, Inc.. Document filed by All Plaintiffs. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Savci, Haluk)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re: #1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration, filed by Anna Gutsin, Robert Bonanza, Trustees for The Mason Tenders District Council Welfare Fund, Pension Fund, Annuity Fund, and Training Program Fund. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that: 1. By September 17, 2020, Petitioner shall file and serve a statement pursuant to Local Civil Rule 56.1 and any additional materials with which they intend to support the petition, including memoranda of law, the arbitration award, supporting documents, and any affidavits or declarations attesting that the exhibits are true and correct copies of what they purport to be; 2. By October 7, 2020, Respondent shall file its opposition; and 3. By October 14, 2020, Petitioner shall file its reply, if any. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that by August 31, 2020, Petitioners shall serve a copy of the petition and this order upon Respondent by personal service- and, if available, by email-on an officer, director, managing or general agent, or cashier or assistant cashier or to any other agent authorized by appointment or by law to receive service, pursuant to N.Y. C.P.L.R. 311, and upon the Secretary of State, pursuant to N.Y. Bus. Corp. Law 306. By September 7, 2020, Petitioners shall file an affidavit of such service. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 8/17/2020) (kv)
August 14, 2020 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to AMM Construction, Inc.. (sj)
August 14, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
August 14, 2020 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
August 14, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
August 13, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to AMM Construction, Inc., re: #1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration,. Document filed by Robert Bonanza, Anna Gutsin, Trustees for The Mason Tenders District Council Welfare Fund, Pension Fund, Annuity Fund, and Training Program Fund..(Savci, Haluk)
August 13, 2020 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Robert Bonanza, Anna Gutsin, Trustees for The Mason Tenders District Council Welfare Fund, Pension Fund, Annuity Fund, and Training Program Fund..(Savci, Haluk)
August 13, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Savci, Haluk)
August 13, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21144234).Document filed by Robert Bonanza, Anna Gutsin, Trustees for The Mason Tenders District Council Welfare Fund, Pension Fund, Annuity Fund, and Training Program Fund..(Savci, Haluk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trustees for The Mason Tenders District Council Welfare Fund, Pension Fund, Annuity Fund, and Training Program Fund et al v. AMM Construction, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Robert Bonanza
Represented By: Haluk Savci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Trustees for The Mason Tenders District Council Welfare Fund, Pension Fund, Annuity Fund, and Training Program Fund
Represented By: Haluk Savci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Anna Gutsin
Represented By: Haluk Savci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: AMM Construction, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?