Salvatore LaMonica et al. v. Lynn Tilton et al
Plaintiff: Shameeka Ien and Salvatore LaMonica
Defendant: Patriarch Partners VIII, LLC, Patriarch Partners Management Group, LLC, Transcendence Transit, Inc., Patriarch Partners XIV, LLC, Patriarch Partners III, LLC, Patriarch Partners, LLC, Transcendence Transit II, Inc., Ark II CLO 2001-1, Limited, ARK Investment Partners II, L.P., Patriarch Partners II, LLC, LD Investments, LLC, Patriarch Partners Agency Services, LLC, Patriarch Partners XV, LLC and Lynn Tilton
In Re: TransCare Corporation
Case Number: 1:2020cv06523
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lewis A Kaplan
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Joint Record Designation (Objection). Document filed by Lynn Tilton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D).(Mervis, Michael)
September 9, 2020 Filing 7 RESPONSE re: #3 Objection (non-motion) . Document filed by Salvatore LaMonica. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1).(Samet, Avery)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #4 Letter Motion for Conference. Granted to the extent that the Trustee may filea response to the objections No. 20-cv-6523 of up to 99 pages. Denied in all other respects. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 8/22/2020) (jca)
August 24, 2020 Filing 5 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Michael T. Mervis, Esq. dated 8/24/2020 re: #4 LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Avery Samet dated 8/21/2020. . Document filed by Lynn Tilton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A.).(Mervis, Michael)
August 21, 2020 Filing 4 LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Avery Samet dated 8/21/2020. Document filed by Salvatore LaMonica..(Samet, Avery)
August 18, 2020 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (wb)
August 18, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(wb)
August 18, 2020 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:20-cv-06274-LAK. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb)
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 Objection re: #1 Bankruptcy Court Proposed Findings of Fact. Document filed by Lynn Tilton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(bkar)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 20-cv-6274. (bkar)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 BANKRUPTCY COURT PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW TO THE DISTRICT COURT By Judge Stuart M. Bernstein Re: Opinion dated August 6, 2020. Bankruptcy Court Case Numbers: 18-1021A, 16-B-10407 (SMB).(bkar)
August 17, 2020 BANKRUPTCY WITHDRAWAL CASE REFERRED BY COURT TO Judge Lewis A. Kaplan as possibly related to 20-cv-6274. (bkar)
August 17, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (bkar)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Salvatore LaMonica et al. v. Lynn Tilton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patriarch Partners VIII, LLC
Represented By: Nicole A. Eichberger
Represented By: Timothy Quaid Karcher
Represented By: Michael T. Mervis
Represented By: Alex D. Silagi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patriarch Partners Management Group, LLC
Represented By: Nicole A. Eichberger
Represented By: Timothy Quaid Karcher
Represented By: Michael T. Mervis
Represented By: Alex D. Silagi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transcendence Transit, Inc.
Represented By: Nicole A. Eichberger
Represented By: Timothy Quaid Karcher
Represented By: Michael T. Mervis
Represented By: Alex D. Silagi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patriarch Partners XIV, LLC
Represented By: Nicole A. Eichberger
Represented By: Timothy Quaid Karcher
Represented By: Michael T. Mervis
Represented By: Alex D. Silagi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patriarch Partners III, LLC
Represented By: Nicole A. Eichberger
Represented By: Timothy Quaid Karcher
Represented By: Michael T. Mervis
Represented By: Alex D. Silagi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patriarch Partners, LLC
Represented By: Nicole A. Eichberger
Represented By: Timothy Quaid Karcher
Represented By: Michael T. Mervis
Represented By: Alex D. Silagi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transcendence Transit II, Inc.
Represented By: Nicole A. Eichberger
Represented By: Timothy Quaid Karcher
Represented By: Michael T. Mervis
Represented By: Alex D. Silagi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ark II CLO 2001-1, Limited
Represented By: Nicole A. Eichberger
Represented By: Timothy Quaid Karcher
Represented By: Michael T. Mervis
Represented By: Alex D. Silagi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARK Investment Partners II, L.P.
Represented By: Nicole A. Eichberger
Represented By: Timothy Quaid Karcher
Represented By: Michael T. Mervis
Represented By: Alex D. Silagi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patriarch Partners II, LLC
Represented By: Nicole A. Eichberger
Represented By: Timothy Quaid Karcher
Represented By: Michael T. Mervis
Represented By: Alex D. Silagi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LD Investments, LLC
Represented By: Nicole A. Eichberger
Represented By: Timothy Quaid Karcher
Represented By: Michael T. Mervis
Represented By: Alex D. Silagi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patriarch Partners Agency Services, LLC
Represented By: Nicole A. Eichberger
Represented By: Timothy Quaid Karcher
Represented By: Michael T. Mervis
Represented By: Alex D. Silagi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patriarch Partners XV, LLC
Represented By: Nicole A. Eichberger
Represented By: Timothy Quaid Karcher
Represented By: Michael T. Mervis
Represented By: Alex D. Silagi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn Tilton
Represented By: Nicole A. Eichberger
Represented By: Timothy Quaid Karcher
Represented By: Michael T. Mervis
Represented By: Alex D. Silagi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: TransCare Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shameeka Ien
Represented By: Jack A. Raisner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Salvatore LaMonica
Represented By: Holly Ruth Holecek
Represented By: Jaime Burton Leggett
Represented By: Steven Gary Storch
Represented By: Avery Daniel Samet
Represented By: Bijan Amini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?