Hopson v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Yulonda Hopson
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2020cv06528
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Robert W Lehrburger
Referring Judge: Laura Taylor Swain
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joseph Anthony Pantoja on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security..(Pantoja, Joseph)
August 31, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Commissioner of Social Security served on 8/31/2020, answer due 9/21/2020. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Yulonda Hopson. (Attachments: #1 certified mail receipts).(Buckley, Robert)
August 27, 2020 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Commissioner of Social Security..(jgo)
August 26, 2020 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Commissioner of Social Security, re: #4 Complaint. Document filed by Yulonda Hopson..(Buckley, Robert)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. ENDORSEMENT: Plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is hereby GRANTED. SO ORDERED. Motions terminated: #2 FIRST MOTION for Leave to Proceed Informa Pauperis filed by Yulonda Hopson. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger on 8/26/2020) (mml)
August 25, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Robert Cornelius Buckley to RE-FILE Document No. #7 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Summons not issued pending approval to proceed informa pauperis. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh)
August 24, 2020 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY, re: #4 Complaint. Document filed by Yulonda Hopson..(Buckley, Robert)
August 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SUPPLEMENTING STANDING ORDER IN COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY SOCIAL SECURITY CASE (REPRESENTED PARTIES): The above-referenced social security action has been referred to the undersigned for Report and Recommendation. All motions and applications, including those related to scheduling and all motions to dismiss or for judgment on the pleadings, must be made to Judge Lehrburger and in compliance with this Court's Individual Practices in Civil Cases, available on the Court's website at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-robert-w-lehrburger. 1. Filing the Record: Pursuant to Standing Order No. 16-MC-00171, dated April 20, 2016, Defendant shall file the electronic certified transcript of the administrative record ("Record"), which shall constitute the Defendant's answer, or move against the complaint, no later than 90 days after Defendant is served with process in this action. Thereafter, in order to promote the efficient adjudication of this matter, the parties shall adhere to the following schedule and procedures, as further set forth. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger on 8/24/2020) Copies transmitted this date to all counsel of record. (mml)
August 21, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE: The District Judge has referred this Social Security case to one of the Court's Magistrate Judges for a Report and Recommendation. Magistrate Judges are judges selected by the District Judges to serve for terms of eight years. Magistrate Judges are highly qualified and very experienced. You have an option to agree to having the Magistrate Judge to whom your case has been referred decide your case instead of recommending a decision to the District Judge who would then review the Report and Recommendation and address any objections to it. If you do not consent to having the Magistrate Judge decide your case, then the Magistrate Judge will issue a Report and Recommendation and the District Judge will consider any objections either party has to the Report and Recommendation before a final judgment is entered in your case. (As further set forth in this Notice.).(cf)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF REFERENCE TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Social Security. Referred to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 8/21/2020) (va)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER IN RE MOTIONS FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS IN SOCIAL SECURITY CASES (See 16-MISC-171 Standing Order filed April 28, 2016). ORDERED that in all Social Security cases hereafter filed under 42 U.S.C. 405(g) and 42 U.S.C. 1383(c)(3), the defendant shall within 90 days after service file the certified transcript of administrative proceedings, which shall constitute the defendants' answer, or otherwise move against the complaint... that unless otherwise ordered by the judge to whom the case is assigned, in cases where the plaintiff is represented by counsel, the plaintiff shall file a motion for judgment on the pleadings within 60 days of the date on which the defendant files the certified transcript of the administrative proceedings... that in cases where the plaintiff is appearing pro se, the defendant shall file its motion for judgment on the pleadings within 60 days of the date on which the certified transcript of administrative proceedings have been filed... (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 4/20/2016) (pne)
August 18, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
August 18, 2020 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pne)
August 18, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pne)
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security. Document filed by Yulonda Hopson..(Buckley, Robert)
August 18, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Robert Cornelius Buckley to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the pleading is not correct; caption error; party roles must be Plaintiff v. Defendant, not Petitioner v. Defendant. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the corrected PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. If the deficiency/deficiencies are not corrected within five (5) days per Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131 this case will be administratively closed. Initial Pleading due by 8/24/2020. (pne)
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Buckley, Robert)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 FIRST MOTION for Leave to Proceed Informa Pauperis . Document filed by Yulonda Hopson..(Buckley, Robert)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR -COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security. Document filed by Yulonda Hopson..(Buckley, Robert) Modified on 8/18/2020 (pne).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hopson v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Joseph Anthony Pantoja
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yulonda Hopson
Represented By: Robert Cornelius Buckley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?