Nelson et al v. Morgan Stanley Smith Barney, LLC
Plaintiff: Midori T. Nelson and John C. Nelson
Defendant: Morgan Stanley Smith Barney, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv06538
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Analisa Torres
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332t
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Analisa Torres: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 10/8/2020. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-05914-AT et al.(ap)
October 5, 2020 Filing 19 LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Interim Co-Lead Counsel for Class Plaintiffs dated October 5, 2020 re: Subject Matter Jurisdiction Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1332. Document filed by Richard Grossman, Howard Katz, John C. Nelson, Midori T. Nelson.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-05914-AT et al..(Nussbaum, Linda)
October 1, 2020 Filing 18 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Counsel for All Parties dated October 1, 2020 re: Initial Pretrial Conference. Document filed by Richard Grossman, Howard Katz, John C. Nelson, Midori T. Nelson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-05914-AT et al..(Nussbaum, Linda)
September 29, 2020 Filing 17 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Morgan Stanley Capital Management, LLC, Corporate Parent Morgan Stanley,, Corporate Parent Morgan Stanley Domestic Holdings, Inc.,, Other Affiliate Mitsubishi UFJ Financial Group, Inc., 7-1 Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8330 for Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC, Morgan Stanley Smith Barney, LLC, Morgan Stanley Smith Barney, LLC, Morgan Stanley Smith Barney, LLC, Morgan Stanley Smith Barney, LLC, Morgan Stanley Smith Barney, LLC, Morgan Stanley Smith Barney, LLC, Morgan Stanley Smith Barney, LLC. Document filed by Morgan Stanley Smith Barney, LLC, Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-05914-AT et al..(O'Brien, Jane)
September 29, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Anika Rappleye on behalf of Morgan Stanley Smith Barney, LLC, Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-05914-AT et al..(Rappleye, Anika)
September 29, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Crystal Johnson Geise on behalf of Morgan Stanley Smith Barney, LLC, Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-05914-AT et al..(Geise, Crystal)
September 29, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jane Baek O'Brien on behalf of Morgan Stanley Smith Barney, LLC, Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-05914-AT et al..(O'Brien, Jane)
September 29, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Susanna Michele Buergel on behalf of Morgan Stanley Smith Barney, LLC, Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-05914-AT et al..(Buergel, Susanna)
September 29, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brad Scott Karp on behalf of Morgan Stanley Smith Barney, LLC, Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-05914-AT et al..(Karp, Brad)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER CONSOLIDATING ALL RELATED CASES AND APPOINTING INTERIM CO-LEAD CLASS COUNSEL AND EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE granting (24) Motion to Appoint Counsel in case 1:20-cv-05914-AT; granting (14) Motion to Appoint Counsel in case 1:20-cv-06012-AT; granting (11) Motion to Appoint Counsel in case 1:20-cv-06300-AT; granting (12) Motion to Appoint Counsel in case 1:20-cv-06468-AT; granting (10) Motion to Appoint Counsel in case 1:20-cv-06538-AT; granting (17) Motion to Appoint Counsel in case 1:20-cv-06610-AT; granting (10) Motion to Appoint Counsel in case 1:20-cv-06640-AT; granting (9) Motion to Appoint Counsel in case 1:20-cv-06984-AT. Having reviewed the parties' submissions, the Court hereby ORDERS that all of the above-referenced actions are consolidated, and that Plaintiffs' Joint Motion for Appointment of Jean Martin and Linda Nussbaum As Interim Co-Lead Counsel and the Appointment of An Executive Committee is GRANTED. Interim Co-Lead Counsel Jean Martin and Linda Nussbaum shall be responsible for the overall conduct of the litigation on behalf of the proposed class, including providing supervision of all Plaintiffs' counsel in this litigation. As Interim Co-Lead Counsel for the class, Ms. Martin and Ms. Nussbaum have the authority to: as further set forth herein. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 9/17/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-05914-AT et al. (kv)
September 17, 2020 CONSOLIDATED MEMBER CASE: Create association to 1:20-cv-05914-AT.. (kv)
September 9, 2020 Filing 10 JOINT MOTION to Appoint Counsel for Class Plaintiffs and Executive Committee. Document filed by John C. Nelson, Midori T. Nelson. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Bart D. Cohen, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Nussbaum, Linda)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: The Court intends to consolidate the following actions: 20 Civ. 5914; 20 Civ. 6012; 20 Civ. 6300; 20 Civ. 6468; 20 Civ. 6538; 20 Civ. 6610; 20 Civ. 6640; 20 Civ. 6984. By September 9, 2020, any interested attorneys shall file requests to be appointed Lead Counsel. Opposition to any such application shall be filed by September 14, 2020. SO ORDERED., ( Motions due by 9/9/2020., Responses due by 9/14/2020) (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 9/02/2020) (ama)
September 1, 2020 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint against Morgan Stanley Smith Barney, LLC with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Midori T. Nelson, John C. Nelson. Related document: #1 Complaint..(Nussbaum, Linda)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: It is ORDERED that by September 1, 2020, Plaintiffs shall amend their pleading to allege the citizenship of each constituent person or entity. See Handelsman v. Bedford Vill. Assocs. Ltd. P'ship, 213 F.3d 48, 51-52 (2d Cir. 2000) (citing Cosgrove v. Bartolotta, 150 F.3d 729, 731 (7th Cir. 1998)); Strother v. Harte, 171 F. Supp. 2d 203, 205 (S.D.N.Y. 2001) ("For purposes of diversity jurisdiction, a limited liability company has the citizenship of each of its members."). If Plaintiffs fail to amend by the foregoing date to truthfully allege complete diversity based upon the citizenship of each constituent person or entity of the LLC, then the complaint will be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. SO ORDERED. (Amended Pleadings due by 9/1/2020). (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 8/25/2020) (rjm)
August 19, 2020 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (wb)
August 19, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Analisa Torres. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(wb)
August 19, 2020 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:20-cv-06012-AT. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb)
August 19, 2020 Filing 6 FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from LINDA P. NUSSBAUM dated AUGUST 18, 2020 re: Tillman v. Morgan Stanley Smith Barney, LLC, No. 1:20-cv-05914-AT, Grossman v. Morgan Stanley Smith Barney, LLC, No. 1:20-cv-06012-AT, Behar v. Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC, No. 1:20-cv-06300-AT, Dalton v. Morgan Stanley Smith Barney, LLC, No. 1:20-cv-06468-AT, Nelson v. Morgan Stanley Smith Barney, LLC, No. 1:20-cv-06538-UA. Document filed by John C. Nelson, Midori T. Nelson..(Nussbaum, Linda)
August 18, 2020 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Morgan Stanley Smith Barney, LLC..(pc)
August 18, 2020 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Analisa Torres as possibly related to 20cv6012. (pc)
August 18, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(pc)
August 18, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
August 17, 2020 Filing 4 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 1:20-cv-06012. Document filed by John C. Nelson, Midori T. Nelson..(Nussbaum, Linda)
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Morgan Stanley Smith Barney, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by John C. Nelson, Midori T. Nelson..(Nussbaum, Linda)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Nussbaum, Linda)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Morgan Stanley Smith Barney, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21186175)Document filed by Midori T. Nelson, John C. Nelson..(Nussbaum, Linda)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nelson et al v. Morgan Stanley Smith Barney, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Midori T. Nelson
Represented By: Linda P. Nussbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John C. Nelson
Represented By: Linda P. Nussbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Stanley Smith Barney, LLC
Represented By: Jane Baek O'Brien
Represented By: Susanna Michele Buergel
Represented By: Crystal Johnson Geise
Represented By: Anika Rappleye
Represented By: Brad Scott Karp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?