Reznik v. Lincoln Life & Annuity Company of New York
Plaintiff: Svetlana Reznik
Defendant: Lincoln Life & Annuity Company of New York
Case Number: 1:2020cv06547
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lewis J Liman
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #11 MOTION for Ann-Martha Andrews to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-22159044. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
October 15, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Ann-Martha Andrews to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-22159044. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Lincoln Life & Annuity Company of New York. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Supplement, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Andrews, Ann-Martha)
October 14, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by Lincoln Life & Annuity Company of New York..(Citron, Evan)
October 14, 2020 Filing 9 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Lincoln National Corporation for Lincoln Life & Annuity Company of New York. Document filed by Lincoln Life & Annuity Company of New York..(Citron, Evan)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer All Defendants (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis J. Liman)(Text Only Order) (Liman, Lewis)
September 11, 2020 Filing 7 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Evan B. Citron dated September 11, 2020. Document filed by Lincoln Life & Annuity Company of New York..(Citron, Evan)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: It is hereby: ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an Initial Pretrial Conference by TELEPHONE on November 12, 2020, at 3:00 p.m. Parties are directed to dial into the Court's teleconference number at 888-251-2909, Access Code 2123101, and follow the necessary prompts. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, by one week prior to conference, the parties jointly submit to the Court a proposed Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order. A template is available at https://www.nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-lewis-j-liman. This document should be filed electronically on ECF, consistent with the Court's Individual Practices in Civil Cases, which are available on the same webpage. Parties should consult the Individual Practices for guidance on the matters to be discussed at the Initial Pretrial Conference and for the Court's rules with respect to communications with Chambers and other procedural matters. Counsel for Plaintiff is ordered to notify Defendant of this Notice. SO ORDERED. ( Initial Conference set for 11/12/2020 at 03:00 PM before Judge Lewis J. Liman.) (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 9/3/20) (yv)
August 18, 2020 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Lincoln Life & Annuity Company of New York..(pc)
August 18, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
August 18, 2020 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
August 18, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lewis J. Liman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
August 18, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #4 MOTION for Audrey Dolmovich to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21189225. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
August 17, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Audrey Dolmovich to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21189225. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Svetlana Reznik. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Audrey Dolmovich, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Dolmovich, Audrey)
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Lincoln Life & Annuity Company of New York, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Svetlana Reznik..(Dolmovich, Audrey)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Dolmovich, Audrey)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lincoln Life & Annuity Company of New York. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21188544)Document filed by Svetlana Reznik..(Dolmovich, Audrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reznik v. Lincoln Life & Annuity Company of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Svetlana Reznik
Represented By: Audrey Dolmovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincoln Life & Annuity Company of New York
Represented By: Evan Benjamin Citron
Represented By: Ann-Martha Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?