Murray v. National General Holdings Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Rosemary Murray
Defendant: Barry Zyskind, Patrick Fallon, Barry Karfunkel, National General Holdings Corp., Jay Nichols, Barbara Paris, Donald DeCarlo, John Marshaleck and Robert Karfunkel
Consolidated Plaintiff: Elaine Wang
Case Number: 1:2020cv06549
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jesse M Furman
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL: Notice is hereby given that pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, consolidated plaintiff Elaine Wang ("Consolidated Plaintiff") hereby voluntarily dismisses her individual claims in the above-captioned consolidated action (the "Consolidated Action") with prejudice. Because this notice of dismissal is being filed with the Court before service by Defendants of either an answer or a motion for summary judgment, Consolidated Plaintiff's dismissal of the Consolidated Action is effective upon filing of this notice. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate Elaine Wang as a party in this case. Plaintiffs shall promptly serve a copy of this Order on each Defendant and promptly file proof of such service. SO ORDERED. Elaine Wang terminated. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 9/23/2020) (mml)
September 23, 2020 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. #10 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal was reviewed and referred to Judge Jesse M. Furman for approval for the following reason(s): the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal and it did not dismiss all of the parties or the action in its entirety. (km)
September 23, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, against the defendant(s) Donald DeCarlo, Patrick Fallon, Barry Karfunkel, Robert Karfunkel, John Marshaleck, National General Holdings Corp., Jay Nichols, Barbara Paris, Barry Zyskind. Document filed by Elaine Wang. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Melwani, Gloria)
September 11, 2020 Filing 9 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Copy of Judge Furman's Order Dkt #8 Re Consolidation served on Andrew Gordon, Esq. on 9/11/2020. Service was made by Email. Document filed by Rosemary Murray..(Acocelli, Richard)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: In light of that, and because the actions involve common questions of law and fact, it is hereby ORDERED that, pursuant to Rule 42(a)(2) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the two cases are consolidated under the case number 20-CV-6549 (JMF). The Clerk of Court is directed to consolidate 20-CV-6549 (JMF) and 20-CV-6867 (JMF) under case number 20-CV-6549 (JMF), and to close 20-CV-6867 (JMF). All future filings should be in 20-CV-6549 (JMF) alone. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall promptly serve a copy of this Order on each Defendant and promptly file proof of such service. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 9/10/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-06549-JMF, 1:20-cv-06867-JMF (jwh)
September 11, 2020 Filing 7 LETTER addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Richard A. Acocelli dated 9/10/2020 re: In Response to the Court's August 28, 2020 Order. Document filed by Rosemary Murray..(Acocelli, Richard)
August 28, 2020 Filing 6 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of August 28, 2020 Order served on Andrew Gordon, Esq. on 08/28/2020. Service was made by Email. Document filed by Rosemary Murray..(Acocelli, Richard)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties in each case are directed to file letters no later than September 11, 2020, not to exceed three pages each, indicating their views on whether the cases should be consolidated. If the parties do not file letters opposing consolidation, the Court may consolidate the two cases without further notice to the parties. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall promptly serve a copy of this Order on each Defendant and promptly file proof of such service. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 8/28/2020) (kv)
August 21, 2020 Filing 4 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Notice of Initial Pretrial Conference served on Andrew Gordon, Esq. on 08/21/20. Service was made by Email. Document filed by Rosemary Murray..(Acocelli, Richard)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 11/19/2020 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 1105, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jesse M. Furman. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 8/18/2020) (cf)
August 18, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
August 18, 2020 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
August 18, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jesse M. Furman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Acocelli, Richard)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Donald DeCarlo, Patrick Fallon, Barry Karfunkel, Robert Karfunkel, John Marshaleck, National General Holdings Corp., Jay Nichols, Barbara Paris, Barry Zyskind. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21189699)Document filed by Rosemary Murray..(Acocelli, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Murray v. National General Holdings Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barry Zyskind
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Fallon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barry Karfunkel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National General Holdings Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara Paris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald DeCarlo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Marshaleck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Karfunkel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosemary Murray
Represented By: Richard Adam Acocelli, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Elaine Wang
Represented By: Gloria Kui Melwani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?