An v. GTV Media Group Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Ruizheng An
Defendant: Wengui Guo, Saraca Media Group, Inc. and GTV Media Group Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv06555
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Mary Kay Vyskocil
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 28:1331sv
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2020 Set/Reset Hearings: Pre-Motion Conference set for 10/29/2020 at 12:30 PM before Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil. (mro)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 SCHEDULING ORDER: This case has been assigned to my docket. The Court is in receipt of: (1) letters from Defendant Wengui Guo and Plaintiff regarding the contemplated motion of Defendant Wengui Guo to dismiss the complaint [ECF #19, 20]; (2) an answer to the complaint from Defendant Saraca Media Group, Inc. [ECF #27]; and (3) an answer and counterclaim from Defendant GTV Media Group Inc. [ECF #26]. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall appear for an Initial Pretrial Conference and a Pre-Motion Conference on October 29, 2020 at 12:30 PM. The conference shall be held by telephone. The conference can be accessed by calling the Court's teleconference line at 888-278-0296 at the scheduled time. When prompted, enter Access Code 5195844. The Court will join once all of the parties are on the line. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint letter and Proposed Case Management Plan, as described in the Court's Individual Rules of Practice in Civil Cases, by October 22, 2020; as further set forth herein. Initial Conference set for 10/29/2020 at 12:30 PM before Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil. (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 10/7/2020) (mro)
October 5, 2020 Filing 27 ANSWER to #4 Complaint. Document filed by Saraca Media Group, Inc...(Udell, Jeffrey)
October 5, 2020 Filing 26 ANSWER to #4 Complaint., COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs. Document filed by GTV Media Group Inc...(Udell, Jeffrey)
October 5, 2020 Filing 25 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Saraca Media Group, Inc...(Udell, Jeffrey)
October 5, 2020 Filing 24 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Saraca Media Group Inc. for GTV Media Group Inc.. Document filed by GTV Media Group Inc...(Udell, Jeffrey)
October 5, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeffrey Adam Udell on behalf of GTV Media Group Inc., Saraca Media Group, Inc...(Udell, Jeffrey)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION, IT IS NOW HEREBY STIPULATED and agreed by and between Plaintiff, on the one hand, and Saraca and GTV, on the other, that the date by which Saraca and GTV must answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint shall be extended until October 5, 2020. No further extensions of time to answer will be granted. SO ORDERED. GTV Media Group Inc. answer due 10/5/2020; Saraca Media Group, Inc. answer due 10/5/2020. (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 9/23/2020) (kv)
September 21, 2020 Filing 21 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by GTV Media Group Inc., Saraca Media Group, Inc...(Walden, Jim)
September 18, 2020 Filing 20 LETTER MOTION for Conference re: #19 LETTER MOTION for Conference (pre-motion for permission to file motion to dismiss) addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Jeffrey Gavenman dated September 15, 2020. addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Ruizheng An dated September 18, 2020. Document filed by Ruizheng An..(Ni, Angus)
September 15, 2020 Filing 19 LETTER MOTION for Conference (pre-motion for permission to file motion to dismiss) addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Jeffrey Gavenman dated September 15, 2020. Document filed by Wengui Guo..(Gavenman, Jeffrey)
September 15, 2020 Filing 18 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Wengui Guo..(Gavenman, Jeffrey)
September 15, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeffrey Samuel Gavenman on behalf of Wengui Guo..(Gavenman, Jeffrey)
September 14, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jim Walden on behalf of GTV Media Group Inc., Saraca Media Group, Inc...(Walden, Jim)
September 8, 2020 Filing 15 STIPULATION: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED by and between Plaintiff, on the one hand, and Saraca and GTV, on the other, that Saraca and GTV shall have an extension of two weeks to and including September 24, 2020, to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. GTV Media Group Inc. answer due 9/24/2020; Saraca Media Group, Inc. answer due 9/24/2020. (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 9/8/2020) (mro)
September 8, 2020 Filing 14 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Ruizheng An..(Ni, Angus)
August 27, 2020 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Saraca Media Group, Inc. served on 8/20/2020, answer due 9/10/2020. Service was accepted by Curt Sweltz, Registered Agent. Document filed by Ruizheng An..(Ni, Angus)
August 27, 2020 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. GTV Media Group Inc. served on 8/20/2020, answer due 9/10/2020. Service was accepted by Curt Sweltz, Registered Agent. Document filed by Ruizheng An..(Ni, Angus)
August 27, 2020 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Wengui Guo served on 8/25/2020, answer due 9/15/2020. Service was accepted by Jose Cabrera, Security. Document filed by Ruizheng An..(Ni, Angus)
August 19, 2020 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Wengui Guo..(dnh)
August 19, 2020 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Saraca Media Group, Inc...(dnh)
August 19, 2020 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to GTV Media Group Inc...(dnh)
August 18, 2020 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Wengui Guo, re: #4 Complaint. Document filed by Ruizheng An..(Ni, Angus)
August 18, 2020 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Saraca Media Group, Inc., re: #4 Complaint. Document filed by Ruizheng An..(Ni, Angus)
August 18, 2020 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to GTV Media Group, Inc., re: #4 Complaint. Document filed by Ruizheng An..(Ni, Angus)
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against GTV Media Group Inc., Wengui Guo, Saraca Media Group, Inc.. Document filed by Ruizheng An..(Ni, Angus)
August 18, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Angus Ni to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; Each summons request must be filed as a separate event OR multiple parties may be listed on one summons by attaching a rider. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh)
August 18, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
August 18, 2020 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (dnh)
August 18, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(dnh)
August 18, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Angus Ni. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (dnh)
August 18, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Angus Ni. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Angus Ni. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (dnh)
August 18, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Angus Ni to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the All Defendant radio button was selected; all of the parties must be individually listed in the as to docket entry text. Hold the 'Ctrl' button to select multiple parties. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (dnh)
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to GTV Media Group Inc.; Saraca Media Group Inc.; Wengui Guo, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Ruizheng An. (Attachments: #1 summons, #2 summons).(Ni, Angus) Modified on 8/18/2020 (dnh).
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Ni, Angus)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR -COMPLAINT against All Defendants. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21191880)Document filed by Ruizheng An..(Ni, Angus) Modified on 8/18/2020 (dnh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: An v. GTV Media Group Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wengui Guo
Represented By: Jeffrey Samuel Gavenman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saraca Media Group, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Adam Udell
Represented By: Jim Walden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GTV Media Group Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Adam Udell
Represented By: Jim Walden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruizheng An
Represented By: Angus Ni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?