The Dow Chemical Company v. Olin Corporation et al
Petitioner: The Dow Chemical Company
Respondent: Olin Corporation and Blue Cube Operations LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv06608
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Sidney H Stein
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 09:1
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2020 Filing 12 CLERK'S JUDGMENT re: #11 Order. in favor of The Dow Chemical Company against Blue Cube Operations LLC, Olin Corporation. It is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED: That for the reasons stated in the Court's Order dated July 28, 2020, that the petition to confirm the arbitration award dated March 11, 2020 is granted. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 08/28/2020) (Attachments: #1 No) (dt)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER. Petitioner The Dow Chemical Company requests entry and confirmation of a final arbitration award pursuant to Section 9 of the Federal Arbitration Act, 9 U.S.C. 9. Respondents Olin Corporation and Blue Cube Operations LLC do not object to the confirmation of the final award. (See Agreed Pet., ECF No. 1, at 6.) This Court having reviewed the petition and accompanying documents, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the petition to confirm the arbitration award dated March 11, 2020 is GRANTED. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 8/28/2020) (rjm). Transmission to Orders and Judgments Clerk for processing.
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that petitioner's motion to seal Exhibits A and B to the Declaration of Nathan P. Eimer (ECF No. 5) is GRANTED. So ordered. Granting #4 Motion to Seal. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 8/28/2020) (rjm)
August 26, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Blue Cube Operations LLC waiver sent on 8/21/2020, answer due 10/20/2020. Document filed by The Dow Chemical Company..(Eimer, Nathan)
August 26, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Olin Corporation waiver sent on 8/21/2020, answer due 10/20/2020. Document filed by The Dow Chemical Company..(Eimer, Nathan)
August 20, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
August 20, 2020 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
August 20, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Sidney H. Stein. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
August 20, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Nathan Philip Eimer. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (sj)
August 20, 2020 Civil Case Opening Fee Payment: for #1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration. Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21246098..(Eimer, Nathan)
August 20, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO PAY THE FILING FEE. Notice to Attorney Nathan Philip Eimer. Civil Case Opening Fee of $400 Due: for #1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration. The filing fee due was not paid; either in whole or in part. If the filing fee is not paid within five (5) days, per Amended Standing Order 15-mc-131, this case will be administratively closed. Filing Fee due by 8/25/2020..(pc)
August 19, 2020 Civil Case Opening Fee Payment: for #1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration. Filing fee $ 5.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21230625..(Eimer, Nathan)
August 19, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO PAY THE FILING FEE. Notice to Attorney Nathan Philip Eimer. Civil Case Opening Fee of $400 Due: for #1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration. The filing fee due was not paid; either in whole or in part. If the filing fee is not paid within five (5) days, per Amended Standing Order 15-mc-131, this case will be administratively closed. Filing Fee due by 8/24/2020.(sj)
August 18, 2020 Filing 7 ***SELECTED PARTIES***DECLARATION of Nathan P. Eimer re: #1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration . Document filed by The Dow Chemical Company, Blue Cube Operations LLC, Olin Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #4 .(Eimer, Nathan)
August 18, 2020 Filing 6 DECLARATION of Nathan P. Eimer re: #1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration . Document filed by The Dow Chemical Company..(Eimer, Nathan)
August 18, 2020 Filing 5 DECLARATION of Nathan P. Eimer in Support re: #4 MOTION to Seal Exhibits to Petition to Confirm Arbitral Award.. Document filed by The Dow Chemical Company..(Eimer, Nathan)
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Seal Exhibits to Petition to Confirm Arbitral Award. Document filed by The Dow Chemical Company..(Eimer, Nathan)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Dow Inc. for The Dow Chemical Company. Document filed by The Dow Chemical Company..(Eimer, Nathan)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Eimer, Nathan)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD ARBITRATION..Document filed by The Dow Chemical Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order).(Eimer, Nathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Dow Chemical Company v. Olin Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: The Dow Chemical Company
Represented By: Nathan Philip Eimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Olin Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Blue Cube Operations LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?