Kolton et al v. Bedasse
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Kolton and Corlex Capital, LLC
Defendant: Jason Bedasse
Case Number: 1:2020cv06623
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Edgardo Ramos
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 9/16/20 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days....(McGuirk, Kelly)
October 13, 2020 Filing 25 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 9/16/2020 before Judge Edgardo Ramos. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Martha Martin, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/3/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/13/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/11/2021..(McGuirk, Kelly)
October 1, 2020 Filing 24 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Jason Bedasse served on 9/22/2020, answer due 10/13/2020. Service was accepted by John Marchel. Document filed by Jeffrey Kolton; Jeffrey Kolton..(Krakowsky, Josh)
September 30, 2020 Filing 23 DECLARATION of Sidney Liebesman in Support re: #21 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue or Failure to State a Claim, or in the alternative, to Transfer Venue or Compel Arbitration.. Document filed by Jason Bedasse. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Jason Bedasse, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of David Walker, #3 Exhibit C - Affidavit of Leron Rogers).(Liebesman, Sidney)
September 30, 2020 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #21 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue or Failure to State a Claim, or in the alternative, to Transfer Venue or Compel Arbitration. . Document filed by Jason Bedasse..(Liebesman, Sidney)
September 30, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ., MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue or Failure to State a Claim, or in the alternative, to Transfer Venue or Compel Arbitration. Document filed by Jason Bedasse..(Liebesman, Sidney)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned counsel, pursuant to Local Rule 1.4, that Fox Rothschild LLP shall be substituted in the place and stead of Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP as counsel of record for defendant Jason Bedasse in the above-captioned matter. Attorney Sidney Stephen Liebesman for Jason Bedasse added. Attorney Brian Pete terminated. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 9/17/2020) (mro)
September 17, 2020 Filing 19 PROPOSED ORDER FOR SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY. Document filed by Jason Bedasse..(Pete, Brian)
September 16, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 9/30/2020. Responses due by 10/14/2020 Replies due by 10/21/2020. (jar)
September 16, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edgardo Ramos: Pre-Motion Conference held on 9/16/2020. Plaintiff's and Defendant's counsel appeared by telephone. Defendant is granted leave to file his motion with the following briefing schedule: moving papers due September 30, 2020; opposition due October 14, 2020; and reply due October 21, 2020. (jar)
September 15, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alexandra Lipschultz Sobol on behalf of Jason Bedasse..(Sobol, Alexandra)
September 15, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John Aubrey Wait on behalf of Jason Bedasse..(Wait, John)
September 15, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sidney Stephen Liebesman on behalf of Jason Bedasse..(Liebesman, Sidney)
September 15, 2020 Filing 15 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Brian Pete dated September 15, 2020 re: #12 LETTER MOTION for Oral Argument addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Josh Krakowsky dated 9/14/20. . Document filed by Jason Bedasse. (Attachments: #1 Defendant's Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Plaintiff's Application for a Temporary Restraining Order and a Preliminary Injunction, #2 Exhibit A - Jason Bedasse Affidavit, #3 Exhibit B - David M. Walker, Esq. Affidavit, #4 Exhibit C - Tamala Fowler Affidavit, #5 Exhibit D - Greg Ward Affidavit).(Pete, Brian)
September 15, 2020 Filing 14 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #13 Letter filed by Jason Bedasse. ENDORSEMENT: The application is granted. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 9/15/2020) (mro)
September 15, 2020 Filing 13 LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Brian Pete dated September 15, 2020 re: Request for Lead Counsel for Defendant to Appear at Pre-Motion Conference. Document filed by Jason Bedasse..(Pete, Brian)
September 14, 2020 Filing 12 LETTER MOTION for Oral Argument addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Josh Krakowsky dated 9/14/20. Document filed by Jeffrey Kolton, Jeffrey Kolton. Return Date set for 9/16/2020 at 10:30 AM..(Krakowsky, Josh)
September 1, 2020 Set/Reset Hearings: Telephone Conference set for 9/16/2020 at 10:30 AM before Judge Edgardo Ramos. (rro)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. The September 2 conference is adjourned to September 16, 2020 at 10:30 AM. At the time of the conference, the parties should call the Court using the following dial-in information: (877)411-9748; Access Code (3029857#). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 9/1/2020) (rro) Modified on 9/3/2020 (rro).
September 1, 2020 Filing 10 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Josh Krakowsky dated 9/1/20. Document filed by Jeffrey Kolton, Jeffrey Kolton. Return Date set for 9/2/2020 at 11:00 AM..(Krakowsky, Josh)
August 31, 2020 Filing 9 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Joshua Krakowsky re: #7 LETTER MOTION for Conference /Pre-Motion Conference addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Brian Pete dated August 20, 2020. . Document filed by Jeffrey Kolton, Jeffrey Kolton..(Krakowsky, Josh)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Letter Motion for Conference. A conference will be held in this matter on September 2, 2020 at 11:00 AM. At the time of the conference, please call the Court using the following dial-in information: (877) 411-9748; Access Code (3029857). Plaintiff is directed to respond to this letter by August 28, 2020. SO ORDERED. (Telephone Conference set for 9/2/2020 at 11:00 AM before Judge Edgardo Ramos.) (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 8/20/2020) (rro)
August 20, 2020 Filing 7 LETTER MOTION for Conference /Pre-Motion Conference addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Brian Pete dated August 20, 2020. Document filed by Jason Bedasse..(Pete, Brian)
August 20, 2020 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WITH EMERGENCY RELIEF. Document No. #6 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief, was reviewed and approved as to form. (dt)
August 20, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
August 20, 2020 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
August 20, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Edgardo Ramos. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
August 20, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Brian Pete. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Jeffrey Kolton; Corlex Capital, LLC. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered incorrectly; party text was omitted;. (jgo)
August 20, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Brian Pete. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (jgo)
August 20, 2020 Filing 6 PROPOSED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WITH EMERGENCY RELIEF. Document filed by Corlex Capital, LLC, Jeffrey Kolton. Related Document Number: #1 ..(Krakowsky, Josh) Proposed Order to Show Cause to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
August 20, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Larry Hutcher on behalf of Jeffrey Kolton..(Hutcher, Larry)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Corlex Capital, LLC..(Krakowsky, Josh)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Josh Krakowsky on behalf of Corlex Capital, LLC, Jeffrey Kolton..(Krakowsky, Josh)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Pete, Brian)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 653704/2020. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21225135).Document filed by Jason Bedasse. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Proposed Order to Show Cause for TRO Filed in State Court, #3 Affidavit of Jeffrey Kolton in support of Order to Show Cause, #4 Exhibit A to Kolton Affidavit in support of Order to Show Cause, #5 Exhibit B to Kolton Affidavit in support of Order to Show Cause, #6 Exhibit C to Kolton Affidavit in support of Order to Show Cause, #7 Exhibit D to Kolton Affidavit in support of Order to Show Cause, #8 Exhibit E to Kolton Affidavit in support of Order to Show Cause, #9 Exhibit F to Kolton Affidavit in support of Order to Show Cause, #10 Exhibit G to Kolton Affidavit in support of Order to Show Cause, #11 Exhibit H to Kolton Affidavit in support of Order to Show Cause, #12 Exhibit I to Kolton Affidavit in support of Order to Show Cause, #13 Emergency Affirmation of Josh Krakowsky, #14 Exhibit A to Emergency Affirmation, #15 Memorandum of Law in support of Order to Show Cause, #16 RJI Filed in State Court, #17 RJI Addendum, #18 State Court Document List).(Pete, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kolton et al v. Bedasse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Kolton
Represented By: Josh Krakowsky
Represented By: Larry Hutcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corlex Capital, LLC
Represented By: Josh Krakowsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Bedasse
Represented By: Brian Pete
Represented By: Alexandra Lipschultz Sobol
Represented By: John Aubrey Wait
Represented By: Sidney Stephen Liebesman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?