Feges v. Churchill Capital Corp III et al
Plaintiff: Michael Feges
Defendant: Michael Klein, Jeremy Paul Abson, Mark Klein, Malcolm S. McDermid, Ass. U.S. Attorney Bonnie Jonas, Churchill Capital Corp III, Glenn R. August, Karen G. Mills, Michael Eck and Bonnie Jonas
Case Number: 1:2020cv06627
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Barbara C Moses
Referring Judge: Laura Taylor Swain
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2020 Filing 6 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Order Regarding General Pretrial Management served on Evert J. Christensen, Esq. on 09/28/2020. Service was made by Email. Document filed by Michael Feges..(Acocelli, Richard)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REGARDING GENERAL PRETRIAL MANAGEMENT: The above-referenced action has been referred to Magistrate Judge Barbara Moses for general pretrial management, including scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). If you are aware of any party or attorney who should receive notice in this action,other than those currently listed on the docket sheet, please notify Courtroom Deputy Kevin Snell at (212) 805-0228 immediately. All court conferences and hearings will be conducted by teleconference. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses on 9/25/2020) (cf)
September 23, 2020 ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number #5 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (nb)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 9/23/2020) (rj)
August 27, 2020 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (wb)
August 27, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(wb)
August 27, 2020 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:20-cv-06318-LTS-BCM. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb)
August 20, 2020 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Laura Taylor Swain as possibly related to 20CV6318. (pne)
August 20, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
August 20, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(pne)
August 20, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Richard Adam Acocelli, Jr to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): related case information was omitted. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the corrected PDF. (pne)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 20-cv-06318. Document filed by Michael Feges..(Acocelli, Richard)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR -CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Acocelli, Richard) Modified on 8/20/2020 (pne).
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jeremy Paul Abson, Glenn R. August, Churchill Capital Corp III, Michael Eck, Bonnie Jonas, Mark Klein, Michael Klein, Malcolm S. McDermid, Karen G. Mills. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21225610)Document filed by Michael Feges..(Acocelli, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Feges v. Churchill Capital Corp III et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremy Paul Abson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Malcolm S. McDermid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ass. U.S. Attorney Bonnie Jonas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Churchill Capital Corp III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenn R. August
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen G. Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Eck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bonnie Jonas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Feges
Represented By: Richard Adam Acocelli, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?