Hajdaraj et al v. A & B Restaurant Group LLC et al
Plaintiff: Gent Hajdaraj and Endri Hoxha
Defendant: Benjamin Restaurant Group LLC, Alban Prelvukaj, Abneshe Sinanaj, A & B Restaurant Group LLC doing business as Benjamin Steak House, B and B Restaurant Group LLC doing business as Benjamin Steakhouse III, AP & SS Restaurant Group LLC doing business as The Seafire Grill and SSAP LLC doing business as Benjamin Steak House II
Case Number: 1:2020cv06628
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: George B Daniels
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 1/21/2021 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 11A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge George B. Daniels, as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 8/25/2020) (jwh)
August 21, 2020 Filing 25 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Abneshe Sinanaj..(pc)
August 21, 2020 Filing 24 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to AP & SS Restaurant Group LLC..(pc)
August 21, 2020 Filing 23 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Alban Prelvukaj..(pc)
August 21, 2020 Filing 22 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Benjamin Restaurant Group LLC..(pc)
August 21, 2020 Filing 21 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to B and B Restaurant Group LLC..(pc)
August 21, 2020 Filing 20 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to SSAP LLC..(pc)
August 21, 2020 Filing 19 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to A & B Restaurant Group LLC..(pc)
August 20, 2020 Filing 18 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Abneshe Sinanaj, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Gent Hajdaraj, Endri Hoxha..(Lee, C.K.)
August 20, 2020 Filing 17 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Alban Prelvukaj, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Gent Hajdaraj, Endri Hoxha..(Lee, C.K.)
August 20, 2020 Filing 16 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Benjamin Restaurant Group LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Gent Hajdaraj, Endri Hoxha..(Lee, C.K.)
August 20, 2020 Filing 15 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to AP & SS Restaurant Group LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Gent Hajdaraj, Endri Hoxha..(Lee, C.K.)
August 20, 2020 Filing 14 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to B and B Restaurant Group LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Gent Hajdaraj, Endri Hoxha..(Lee, C.K.)
August 20, 2020 Filing 13 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to SSAP LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Gent Hajdaraj, Endri Hoxha..(Lee, C.K.)
August 20, 2020 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to A & B Restaurant Group LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Gent Hajdaraj, Endri Hoxha..(Lee, C.K.)
August 20, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney C.K. Lee to RE-FILE Document No. #6 Request for Issuance of Summons, #8 Request for Issuance of Summons, #4 Request for Issuance of Summons, #3 Request for Issuance of Summons, #9 Request for Issuance of Summons, #7 Request for Issuance of Summons, #5 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): caption error; name of the last defendant listed in the pleading caption was omitted from the caption on the summons request PDF; if all names do not fit in the space provided, use 'et al' following the name of the first listed defendant. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the corrected summons form PDF. (pne)
August 20, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
August 20, 2020 Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pne)
August 20, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge George B. Daniels. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pne)
August 19, 2020 Filing 11 CONSENT TO SUE UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Endri Hoxha..(Lee, C.K.)
August 19, 2020 Filing 10 CONSENT TO SUE UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Gent Hajdaraj..(Lee, C.K.)
August 19, 2020 Filing 9 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Abneshe Sinanaj, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Gent Hajdaraj, Endri Hoxha..(Lee, C.K.) Modified on 8/20/2020 (pne).
August 19, 2020 Filing 8 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Alban Prelvukaj, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Gent Hajdaraj, Endri Hoxha..(Lee, C.K.) Modified on 8/20/2020 (pne).
August 19, 2020 Filing 7 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Benjamin Restaurant Group LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Gent Hajdaraj, Endri Hoxha..(Lee, C.K.) Modified on 8/20/2020 (pne).
August 19, 2020 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to AP & SS Restaurant Group LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Gent Hajdaraj, Endri Hoxha..(Lee, C.K.) Modified on 8/20/2020 (pne).
August 19, 2020 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to B and B Restaurant Group LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Gent Hajdaraj, Endri Hoxha..(Lee, C.K.) Modified on 8/20/2020 (pne).
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to SSAP LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Gent Hajdaraj, Endri Hoxha..(Lee, C.K.) Modified on 8/20/2020 (pne).
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to A & B Restaurant Group LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Gent Hajdaraj, Endri Hoxha..(Lee, C.K.) Modified on 8/20/2020 (pne).
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Rider).(Lee, C.K.)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against A & B Restaurant Group LLC, AP & SS Restaurant Group LLC, B and B Restaurant Group LLC, Benjamin Restaurant Group LLC, Alban Prelvukaj, SSAP LLC, Abneshe Sinanaj. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21226223)Document filed by Endri Hoxha, Gent Hajdaraj. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Q).(Lee, C.K.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hajdaraj et al v. A & B Restaurant Group LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin Restaurant Group LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alban Prelvukaj
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abneshe Sinanaj
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A & B Restaurant Group LLC doing business as Benjamin Steak House
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B and B Restaurant Group LLC doing business as Benjamin Steakhouse III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AP & SS Restaurant Group LLC doing business as The Seafire Grill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSAP LLC doing business as Benjamin Steak House II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gent Hajdaraj
Represented By: C.K. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Endri Hoxha
Represented By: C.K. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?