American Empire Surplus Lines Insurance Company v. Solubon Ltd
Plaintiff: American Empire Surplus Lines Insurance Company
Defendant: Solubon Ltd
Case Number: 1:2020cv06629
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul G Gardephe
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2020 Filing 11 CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT as to Solubon Ltd.(km)
October 9, 2020 Filing 10 AFFIRMATION of Maureen E. O'Connor in Support re: #9 Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default,. Document filed by American Empire Surplus Lines Insurance Company..(O'Connor, Maureen)
October 9, 2020 Filing 9 PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT. Document filed by American Empire Surplus Lines Insurance Company..(O'Connor, Maureen) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers).
October 9, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT: Notice to Attorney Maureen O'Connor. RE-FILE Document No. #8 Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the clerk's certificate needs to be filed as a separate entry (filed under proposed orders, proposed clerk's certificate of default). The affirmation in support also needs to be filed separately (filed under other answers, affirmation in support of a non-motion). (km)
October 9, 2020 Filing 8 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT. Document filed by American Empire Surplus Lines Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Default - Proposed).(O'Connor, Maureen) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). Modified on 10/9/2020 (km).
September 11, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Solubon Ltd served on 9/2/2020, answer due 9/23/2020. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky, Authorized Agent, NY Secretary of State. Document filed by American Empire Surplus Lines Insurance Company..(O'Connor, Maureen)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Per the SDNY COVID-19 COURTHOUSE ENTRY PROGRAM, anyone who appears at any SDNY courthouse must complete a questionnaire and have their temperature taken. Please see the instructions, attached below. Completing the questionnaire ahead of time will save time and effort upon entry. Only those individuals who meet the entry requirements established by the questionnaire will be permitted entry. Please contact chambers if you do not meet the requirements. (And as further set forth herein.) SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 12/17/2020 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 705, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 8/20/2020) (jca)
August 20, 2020 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Solubon Ltd..(pne)
August 20, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
August 20, 2020 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pne)
August 20, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pne)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Great American Insurance Group for American Empire Surplus Lines Insurance Company. Document filed by American Empire Surplus Lines Insurance Company..(O'Connor, Maureen)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(O'Connor, Maureen)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to SOLUBON LTD., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by American Empire Surplus Lines Insurance Company..(O'Connor, Maureen)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Solubon Ltd. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21226423)Document filed by American Empire Surplus Lines Insurance Company..(O'Connor, Maureen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Empire Surplus Lines Insurance Company v. Solubon Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Empire Surplus Lines Insurance Company
Represented By: Maureen Elizabeth O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Solubon Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?