Henderson v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Matthew Henderson
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv06646
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Alvin K Hellerstein
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 10/15/20) (yv)
October 14, 2020 Filing 6 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Randi F. Knepper, Esq. dated October 14, 2020. Document filed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company..(Knepper, Randi)
September 29, 2020 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company served on 9/28/2020, answer due 10/19/2020. Service was accepted by Gina Martinez, Authorized Agent. Document filed by Matthew Henderson..(Hack, Michail)
August 20, 2020 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Metropolitan Life Insurance Company..(dnh)
August 20, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
August 20, 2020 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (dnh)
August 20, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(dnh)
August 20, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Michail Zolotoff Hack. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (dnh)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Hack, Michail)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Matthew Henderson..(Hack, Michail)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number BNYSDC-21232118)Document filed by Matthew Henderson..(Hack, Michail)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henderson v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Henderson
Represented By: Michail Zolotoff Hack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Randi Faith Knepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?