Christenson v. Davidson
Plaintiff: Mark C. Christenson
Defendant: David Davidson
Case Number: 1:2020cv06731
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
Presiding Judge: Colleen McMahon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2020 Mailed a copy of #3 Judgment, #2 Order of Dismissal, to Mark C. Christenson at 11313 19th Ave., NE Seattle, WA 98125. (dsh)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER OF DISMISSAL UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1651: On June 20, 2018, Plaintiff was barred from filing any new action in forma pauperis (IFP) without first obtaining from the Court leave to file. See Christenson v. Roe, ECF 1:18-CV-3319, 3 (S.D.N.Y. June 20, 2018). Plaintiff files this new pro se case, but he does not seek leave to proceed IFP nor does he pay the filing fees. The Court assumes for the purpose of this order that he seeks to proceed IFP. Because Plaintiff has not sought leave of the Court to file, this action is dismissed without prejudice for Plaintiff's failure to comply with the June 20, 2018 order. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore IFP status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. Cf. Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962) (holding that an appellant demonstrates good faith when he seeks review of a nonfrivolous issue). (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 8/21/2020) (nb) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CIVIL JUDGMENT: IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that under the June 20, 2018 order in Christenson v. Roe, ECF 1:18-CV-3319, 3 (S.D.N.Y. June 20, 2018), the complaint is dismissed without prejudice. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from the Court's judgment would not be taken in good faith. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court mail a copy of this judgment to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 8/21/2020) (nb) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
August 21, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Colleen McMahon. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(bcu)
August 19, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (rdz)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against David Davidson. Document filed by Mark C. Christenson.(rdz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Christenson v. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark C. Christenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?