Shapnik v. The Hebrew Home for the Aged at Riverdale et al
Plaintiff: BELLA SHAPNIK, as proposed Administratix and Administrator and Prosequendum of the ESTATE ROSA SHAPNIK, deceased, and BELLA SHAPNIK, Individually, YAKOV SHAPNIK, Individually and Bella Shapnik
Defendant: CLARITA GADINGAN, RN, NURSE NOE 1-10, FARRAH REYES, ABC CORPRATIONS 1-10, ROSE-MAGUY CHERVIL, RN, RIVERSPRING HEALTH, MALICA SUTHERLAND, MARIAMMA MATTHEW, LPN, DOCTOR DOE 1-10 (SAID JOHN DOES 1-10, NURSE NOE 1-10, LPN LOE 1-10, AIDES DOE 1-10, DOCTOR DOE 1-10 AND ABC CORPORATIONS 1-10 being ficticious persons and/or business entities, YELENA PERTSOVSKY, M.D., ESTHER JACOB, RN, ROSEMARIE ROBINSON, RN, SIDIKAT BISHI, RN, REBECCA MAGBAG, M.D., LPN LOE 1-10, DAVINDER SINGH, RN, JANNAT ABDALLAH, LPN, DIYA DETTY VARGHESE, M.D., JOSEPH DAHOMIN, LPN, PAULA URMAN, RN, ELSA MENGISTU, JOY LYARE, LPN, TANIA TANIA HARVEY, LPN, MARSHALEE GRAHAM, MARIA WURPEL, M.D., THRESIAMMA ALEX, LPN, KENISHA ROSE, LPN, ERNEST HODO, LPN, THE HEBREW HOME FOR THE AGED AT RIVERDALE, HOWARD ROSAS, M.D., RIVERSPRING HEALTH HOLDING CORP., JOHN DOES 1-10, RIVERSPRING HEALTH SENIOR LIVING, INC., EMMANUEL TETTEH, RN, ABC CORPORATIONS 1-10, ADEBISI ABIKOYE, LPN, JHEANELL WILLIAMS, EDWARD SACKIE, LPN, DANIEL SUSSMAN, M.D., THE HEBREW HOME AT RIVERDALE BY RIVERSPRING HEALTH, KENISHA ROSE, LPN,, RN Paula Urman, LPN Joy Lyare, ROSE-MAGUY CHERVIL, RN,, EDWARD SACKIE, LPN,, M.D. Daniel Sussman, M.D. Howard Rosas, RIVERSPRING HEALTH HOLDING CORP.,, ADEBISI ABIKOYE, LPN,, LPN Jannat Abdallah, FARRAH R EYES, LPN Adebisi Abikoye, ERNEST HODO, LPN,, THE HEBREW HOME FOR THE AGED AT RIVERDALE,, LPN Ernest Hodo, RIVERSPRING HEALTH,, RN Rosemarie Robinson, M.D. Yelena Pertsovsky, ROSEMARIE ROBINSON, RN,, RN Emmanuel Tetteh, DAVINDER SINGH, RN,, THRESIAMMA LAEX, LPN,, M.D Rebecca Magbag, SIDIKAT BISHI, RN,, MD Diya Detty Varghese, RIVERSPRING HEALTH SENIOR LIVING, INC.,, LPN Thresiamma Alex, THE HEBREW HOME AT RIVERDALE BY RIVERSPRING HEALTH,, ESTHER JACOB, RN,, RN Clarita Gadingan, RN Davinder Singh, LPN Kenish Rose, MD Maria Wurpel, RN Rose-Maguy Chervil, RN Sidikat Bishi, RN Esther Jacobs, LPN Edward Sackie, LPN Mariamma Matthew, TANIA HARVEY, LPN and Tania Harvey
Case Number: 1:2020cv06774
Filed: August 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lewis J Liman
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 mm
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2020 Filing 11 FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Paige R. Butler dated 10/13/20 re: shapnik v. Hebrew. Document filed by Bella Shapnik..(Arnold, Rosemarie)
October 6, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lewis J. Liman: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 10/6/2020 by Telephone Conference. Paige Butler present by telephone for Plaintiffs. Lori Semlies and Katherine McCrink present by telephone for Defendants. (mf)
October 5, 2020 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #8 MOTION for Summary Judgment . . Document filed by Adebisi Abikoye, Thresiamma Alex, SIDIKAT BISHI, RN,, ROSE-MAGUY CHERVIL, RN,, FARRAH R EYES, MARSHALEE GRAHAM, Tania Harvey, Ernest Hodo, ESTHER JACOB, RN,, Mariamma Matthew, ROSEMARIE ROBINSON, RN,, KENISHA ROSE, LPN,, Riverspring Health, Riverspring Health Holding Corp., Riverspring Health Senior Living, Inc., EDWARD SACKIE, LPN,, DAVINDER SINGH, RN,, The Hebrew Home For the Aged at Riverdale, The Hebrew Home at Riverdale by Riverspring Health..(Semlies, Lori)
October 5, 2020 Filing 9 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Adebisi Abikoye, Thresiamma Alex, SIDIKAT BISHI, RN,, ROSE-MAGUY CHERVIL, RN,, FARRAH R EYES, MARSHALEE GRAHAM, TANIA HARVEY, LPN, Ernest Hodo, ESTHER JACOB, RN,, Esther Jacobs, Mariamma Matthew, ROSEMARIE ROBINSON, RN,, KENISHA ROSE, LPN,, Riverspring Health, Riverspring Health Holding Corp., Riverspring Health Senior Living, Inc., EDWARD SACKIE, LPN,, DAVINDER SINGH, RN,, THE HEBREW HOME AT RIVERDALE BY RIVERSPRING HEALTH,, THE HEBREW HOME FOR THE AGED AT RIVERDALE,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint (for Rule 56 motion), #2 Exhibit Hebrew Home EMAR 2020, #3 Exhibit Dr. Palace Affirmation (Rule 56 motion), #4 Exhibit Affidavit of Luz Liebeskind (Rule 56 motion), #5 Exhibit New York State Department of Health (Rule 56 motion), #6 Exhibit Lexis Citations (Rule 56 motion)).(Semlies, Lori)
October 5, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Document filed by Adebisi Abikoye, Thresiamma Alex, SIDIKAT BISHI, RN,, ROSE-MAGUY CHERVIL, RN,, FARRAH R EYES, MARSHALEE GRAHAM, TANIA HARVEY, LPN, Ernest Hodo, Esther Jacobs, Mariamma Matthew, ROSEMARIE ROBINSON, RN,, KENISHA ROSE, LPN,, Riverspring Health, Riverspring Health Holding Corp., Riverspring Health Senior Living, Inc., EDWARD SACKIE, LPN,, DAVINDER SINGH, RN,, THE HEBREW HOME AT RIVERDALE BY RIVERSPRING HEALTH,, THE HEBREW HOME FOR THE AGED AT RIVERDALE,..(Semlies, Lori)
September 1, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Katherine Laura McCrink on behalf of ADEBISI ABIKOYE, LPN,, SIDIKAT BISHI, RN,, ROSE-MAGUY CHERVIL, RN,, FARRAH R EYES, MARSHALEE GRAHAM, TANIA HARVEY, LPN, ERNEST HODO, LPN,, ESTHER JACOB, RN,, THRESIAMMA LAEX, LPN,, RIVERSPRING HEALTH HOLDING CORP.,, RIVERSPRING HEALTH SENIOR LIVING, INC.,, RIVERSPRING HEALTH,, ROSEMARIE ROBINSON, RN,, KENISHA ROSE, LPN,, EDWARD SACKIE, LPN,, DAVINDER SINGH, RN,, THE HEBREW HOME AT RIVERDALE BY RIVERSPRING HEALTH,, THE HEBREW HOME FOR THE AGED AT RIVERDALE,..(McCrink, Katherine)
August 28, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Rosemarie Elizabeth Arnold on behalf of Bella Shapnik..(Arnold, Rosemarie)
August 26, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by THE HEBREW HOME FOR THE AGED AT RIVERDALE,, THE HEBREW HOME AT RIVERDALE BY RIVERSPRING HEALTH,, RIVERSPRING HEALTH,, RIVERSPRING HEALTH SENIOR LIVING, INC.,, RIVERSPRING HEALTH HOLDING CORP.,, KENISHA ROSE, LPN,, ERNEST HODO, LPN,, ADEBISI ABIKOYE, LPN,, THRESIAMMA LAEX, LPN,, TANIA HARVEY, LPN, EDWARD SACKIE, LPN,, ESTHER JACOB, RN,, ROSEMARIE ROBINSON, RN,, DAVINDER SINGH, RN,, ROSE-MAGUY CHERVIL, RN,, SIDIKAT BISHI, RN,, FARRAH R EYES, MARSHALEE GRAHAM..(Semlies, Lori)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: It is hereby: ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an Initial Pretrial Conference by TELEPHONE on October 6, 2020, at 3:00 p.m. Parties are directed to dial into the Courts teleconference number at 888-251-2909, Access Code 2123101, and follow the necessary prompts. Initial Conference set for 10/6/2020 at 03:00 PM before Judge Lewis J. Liman. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 8/25/2020) (va)
August 24, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lewis J. Liman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
August 24, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
August 24, 2020 Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
August 24, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Lori Semlies. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Plaintiff and all Defendants. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps and the title of the parties was not entered correctly. The Clerk's Office entered the titles of the parties in the correct field. (gp)
August 21, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Semlies, Lori)
August 21, 2020 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by RIVERSPRING HEALTH, RIVERSPRING HEALTH HOLDING CORP., RIVERSPRING HEALTH SENIOR LIVING, INC., THE HEBREW HOME AT RIVERDALE BY RIVERSPRING HEALTH, THE HEBREW HOME FOR THE AGED AT RIVERDALE..(Semlies, Lori)
August 21, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Bronx. Case Number: 26628/2020. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21276814).Document filed by SIDIKAT BISHI, RN, DAVINDER SINGH, RN, FARRAH REYES, ESTHER JACOB, RN, MARSHALEE GRAHAM. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons & Complaint and Certificate of Merit, #2 Exhibit DocumentList).(Semlies, Lori)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shapnik v. The Hebrew Home for the Aged at Riverdale et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLARITA GADINGAN, RN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NURSE NOE 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FARRAH REYES
Represented By: Lori Rosen Semlies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CORPRATIONS 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROSE-MAGUY CHERVIL, RN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RIVERSPRING HEALTH
Represented By: Lori Rosen Semlies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MALICA SUTHERLAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARIAMMA MATTHEW, LPN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOCTOR DOE 1-10 (SAID JOHN DOES 1-10, NURSE NOE 1-10, LPN LOE 1-10, AIDES DOE 1-10, DOCTOR DOE 1-10 AND ABC CORPORATIONS 1-10 being ficticious persons and/or business entities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YELENA PERTSOVSKY, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ESTHER JACOB, RN
Represented By: Lori Rosen Semlies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROSEMARIE ROBINSON, RN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SIDIKAT BISHI, RN
Represented By: Lori Rosen Semlies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REBECCA MAGBAG, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LPN LOE 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVINDER SINGH, RN
Represented By: Lori Rosen Semlies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANNAT ABDALLAH, LPN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DIYA DETTY VARGHESE, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSEPH DAHOMIN, LPN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAULA URMAN, RN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELSA MENGISTU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOY LYARE, LPN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TANIA TANIA HARVEY, LPN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARSHALEE GRAHAM
Represented By: Lori Rosen Semlies
Represented By: Katherine Laura McCrink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARIA WURPEL, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THRESIAMMA ALEX, LPN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KENISHA ROSE, LPN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERNEST HODO, LPN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE HEBREW HOME FOR THE AGED AT RIVERDALE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOWARD ROSAS, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RIVERSPRING HEALTH HOLDING CORP.
Represented By: Lori Rosen Semlies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RIVERSPRING HEALTH SENIOR LIVING, INC.
Represented By: Lori Rosen Semlies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EMMANUEL TETTEH, RN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CORPORATIONS 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADEBISI ABIKOYE, LPN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JHEANELL WILLIAMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EDWARD SACKIE, LPN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANIEL SUSSMAN, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE HEBREW HOME AT RIVERDALE BY RIVERSPRING HEALTH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KENISHA ROSE, LPN,
Represented By: Lori Rosen Semlies
Represented By: Katherine Laura McCrink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RN Paula Urman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LPN Joy Lyare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROSE-MAGUY CHERVIL, RN,
Represented By: Lori Rosen Semlies
Represented By: Katherine Laura McCrink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EDWARD SACKIE, LPN,
Represented By: Lori Rosen Semlies
Represented By: Katherine Laura McCrink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.D. Daniel Sussman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.D. Howard Rosas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RIVERSPRING HEALTH HOLDING CORP.,
Represented By: Lori Rosen Semlies
Represented By: Katherine Laura McCrink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADEBISI ABIKOYE, LPN,
Represented By: Lori Rosen Semlies
Represented By: Katherine Laura McCrink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LPN Jannat Abdallah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FARRAH R EYES
Represented By: Lori Rosen Semlies
Represented By: Katherine Laura McCrink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LPN Adebisi Abikoye
Represented By: Lori Rosen Semlies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERNEST HODO, LPN,
Represented By: Lori Rosen Semlies
Represented By: Katherine Laura McCrink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE HEBREW HOME FOR THE AGED AT RIVERDALE,
Represented By: Lori Rosen Semlies
Represented By: Katherine Laura McCrink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LPN Ernest Hodo
Represented By: Lori Rosen Semlies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RIVERSPRING HEALTH,
Represented By: Lori Rosen Semlies
Represented By: Katherine Laura McCrink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RN Rosemarie Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.D. Yelena Pertsovsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROSEMARIE ROBINSON, RN,
Represented By: Lori Rosen Semlies
Represented By: Katherine Laura McCrink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RN Emmanuel Tetteh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVINDER SINGH, RN,
Represented By: Lori Rosen Semlies
Represented By: Katherine Laura McCrink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THRESIAMMA LAEX, LPN,
Represented By: Lori Rosen Semlies
Represented By: Katherine Laura McCrink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.D Rebecca Magbag
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SIDIKAT BISHI, RN,
Represented By: Lori Rosen Semlies
Represented By: Katherine Laura McCrink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MD Diya Detty Varghese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RIVERSPRING HEALTH SENIOR LIVING, INC.,
Represented By: Lori Rosen Semlies
Represented By: Katherine Laura McCrink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LPN Thresiamma Alex
Represented By: Lori Rosen Semlies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE HEBREW HOME AT RIVERDALE BY RIVERSPRING HEALTH,
Represented By: Lori Rosen Semlies
Represented By: Katherine Laura McCrink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ESTHER JACOB, RN,
Represented By: Lori Rosen Semlies
Represented By: Katherine Laura McCrink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RN Clarita Gadingan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RN Davinder Singh
Represented By: Lori Rosen Semlies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LPN Kenish Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MD Maria Wurpel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RN Rose-Maguy Chervil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RN Sidikat Bishi
Represented By: Lori Rosen Semlies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RN Esther Jacobs
Represented By: Lori Rosen Semlies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LPN Edward Sackie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LPN Mariamma Matthew
Represented By: Lori Rosen Semlies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TANIA HARVEY, LPN
Represented By: Lori Rosen Semlies
Represented By: Katherine Laura McCrink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tania Harvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BELLA SHAPNIK, as proposed Administratix and Administrator and Prosequendum of the ESTATE ROSA SHAPNIK, deceased, and BELLA SHAPNIK, Individually, YAKOV SHAPNIK, Individually
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bella Shapnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?