Lopez v. Barnes & Noble College Booksellers, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Julio Lopez
Defendant: McGraw Hill LLC, Barnes & Noble College Booksellers L.L.C., Barnes & Noble Education, Inc., Pearson Education Inc., Cengage Learning Inc. and Follett Higher Education Group
Case Number: 1:2020cv06842
Filed: August 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Denise L Cote
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:15
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: These actions having been transferred to this Court as part of the In Re: Inclusive Access Course Materials Antitrust Litigation, 20md2946 MDL, it is hereby ORDERED that applications for appointment as lead counsel in the Student Plaintiffs class actions shall be made by noon on Friday, August 28, 2020. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that applications for appointment as lead counsel in the Retailer Plaintiffs class actions shall be made by noon on Friday, August 28, 2020. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that any objection to those applications shall be filed by Tuesday, September 1, 2020. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the September 3 conference will address the applications for appointment as lead counsel and set a schedule for consolidated class actions. (Motions due by 8/28/2020. Responses due by 9/1/2020) (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 8/25/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02946-DLC et al. (jwh)
August 25, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE - TRANSFER CASE: This case is assigned to: Judge Denise L. Cote. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions. (sjo)
August 25, 2020 NOTE TO OUT OF STATE ATTORNEYS: Please visit the Court's website at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/ for information regarding admission to the S.D.N.Y. Bar and the CM/ECF Rules & Filing Instructions. (sjo)
August 25, 2020 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sjo)
August 25, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (sjo)
August 25, 2020 CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:20-md-02946-DLC. (sjo)
August 25, 2020 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:20-md-02946-DLC. (sjo)
August 25, 2020 Filing 7 MDL TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of New Jersey; Case Number: 3:20-cv-06152. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received. (sjo)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order of MDL Panel (CTO-1) transferring case to the USDC for the SDNY. (dm ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/25/2020.]
May 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that Defendants' motion for a Stay is Granted. All actions, proceedings, motions, or any other process in any of the New Inclusive Access Cases is stayed pending a decision of the JPML and further Order of this Court. Signed by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 05/26/2020. (jmh) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/25/2020.]
May 22, 2020 Filing 4 Letter from Stephanie D. Edelson, Esq.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Edelson, Stephanie) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/25/2020.]
May 22, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie D. Edelson on behalf of CENGAGE LEARNING, INC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Edelson, Stephanie) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/25/2020.]
May 20, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to BARNES & NOBLE COLLEGE BOOKSELLERS, LLC, BARNES & NOBLE EDUCATION, INC., CENGAGE LEARNING, INC., FOLLETT HIGHER EDUCATION GROUP, MCGRAW HILL LLC, PEARSON EDUCATION, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (abr) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/25/2020.]
May 20, 2020 Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni added. (abr) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/25/2020.]
May 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BARNES & NOBLE COLLEGE BOOKSELLERS, LLC, BARNES & NOBLE EDUCATION, INC., CENGAGE LEARNING, INC., FOLLETT HIGHER EDUCATION GROUP, MCGRAW HILL LLC, PEARSON EDUCATION, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-10837767) with JURY DEMAND, filed by JULIO LOPEZ. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SHAH, JAMES) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/25/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lopez v. Barnes & Noble College Booksellers, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McGraw Hill LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barnes & Noble College Booksellers L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barnes & Noble Education, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pearson Education Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cengage Learning Inc.
Represented By: Stephanie D. Edelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Follett Higher Education Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julio Lopez
Represented By: James C. Shah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?