Tennenbaum Living Trust et al v. TGLT S.A. et al
Plaintiff: Merkin Family Foundation and Tennenbaum Living Trust
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon and TGLT S.A.
Case Number: 1:2020cv06938
Filed: August 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: John P Cronan
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 LETTER MOTION for Conference re: #1 Complaint, Request for Pre-Motion Conference and Leave to File a Motion to Dismiss the Complaint addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Lawrence Portnoy dated October 21, 2020. Document filed by TGLT S.A...(Portnoy, Lawrence)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION EXTENDING DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANT TGLT S.A. TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO COMPLAINT. Defendant was properly served with the Complaint pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Defendant's deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended through and including October 21, 2020. So ordered this 13 day of October, 2020. TGLT S.A. answer due 10/21/2020. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 10/13/2020) (rjm)
October 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Merkin Family Foundation, Tennenbaum Living Trust..(Pfister, Robert)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT: This case has been reassigned to the undersigned. Unless and until the Court orders otherwise, all prior orders, dates, and deadlines shall remain in effect notwithstanding the case's reassignment. The conference scheduled for November 5, 2020 at 10:30 a.m. shall take place as scheduled. In light of the ongoing COVID-19 pandemic, the Court will conduct the conference by teleconference. At the scheduled time, counsel for all parties should call (866) 434-5269, access code 9176261, and as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 10/9/2020) (jwh)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge John Peter Cronan. Judge Lorna G. Schofield is no longer assigned to the case. (laq)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Thomas E. Patterson to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lorna G. Schofield)(Text Only Order) (jcs)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate IRSA Propiedades Comerciales S.A. for TGLT S.A.. Document filed by TGLT S.A...(Portnoy, Lawrence)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Cristina M Rincon on behalf of TGLT S.A...(Rincon, Cristina)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lawrence Jay Portnoy on behalf of TGLT S.A...(Portnoy, Lawrence)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Order Setting Status Conference and Judge Lorna G. Schofield's Individual Rules and Procedures for Civil Cases served on Lawrence Portnoy on 9/23/2020. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Merkin Family Foundation, Tennenbaum Living Trust..(Pfister, Robert)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: To be held telephonically in accordance with the instructions on the first page of this order. (And as further set forth herein.) Initial Conference set for 11/5/2020 at 10:30 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 9/23/2020) (jca)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION for Thomas E. Patterson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21663535. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Merkin Family Foundation, Tennenbaum Living Trust..(Patterson, Thomas)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #12 MOTION for Thomas E. Patterson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21663535. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION : Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), the Complaint is dismissed without prejudice as to the Trustee. The Trustee takes no position on the merits of the Action. The Trustee agrees to be bound by any judgment in the Action determining the rights of the remaining Parties to the Action, to the extent as if the Trustee remained a party to the Action. The Trustee's deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint shall be tolled pending the Court's consideration of this Stipulation. So Ordered., (The Bank of New York Mellon terminated.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 9/14/20) (yv) Modified on 10/21/2020 (yv).
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Merkin Family Foundation, Tennenbaum Living Trust..(Pfister, Robert)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. The Bank of New York Mellon served on 8/28/2020, answer due 9/18/2020. Service was accepted by B. Marha, Authorized Employee. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Tennenbaum Living Trust; Merkin Family Foundation..(Pfister, Robert)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. TGLT S.A. served on 8/31/2020, answer due 9/21/2020. Service was accepted by Tais L.. Document filed by Tennenbaum Living Trust; Merkin Family Foundation..(Pfister, Robert)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to The Bank of New York Mellon..(jgo)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to TGLT S.A...(jgo)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Robert Jerrod Pfister. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $900,000; County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to none; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (jgo)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The Bank of New York Mellon, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Merkin Family Foundation, Tennenbaum Living Trust..(Pfister, Robert)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to TGLT S.A., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Merkin Family Foundation, Tennenbaum Living Trust..(Pfister, Robert)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Merkin Family Foundation, Tennenbaum Living Trust..(Pfister, Robert)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Pfister, Robert)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against TGLT S.A., The Bank of New York Mellon. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21361689)Document filed by Tennenbaum Living Trust, Merkin Family Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E).(Pfister, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tennenbaum Living Trust et al v. TGLT S.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TGLT S.A.
Represented By: Lawrence Jay Portnoy
Represented By: Cristina M Rincon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Merkin Family Foundation
Represented By: Robert Jerrod Pfister
Represented By: Thomas E. Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tennenbaum Living Trust
Represented By: Robert Jerrod Pfister
Represented By: Thomas E. Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?