Breuninger, et al v. T. Edward Williams, et al
Plaintiff: ITGA, LLC, and RICHARD BREUNINGER
Defendant: T. EDWARD WILLIAMS,, PEYROT AND ASSOCIATES, PC,, JANE DOE WILLIAMS,, T. Edward Williams, Jane Doe Williams and Peyrot and Associates, P.C.
Case Number: 1:2020cv07033
Filed: August 28, 2020
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: John P Cronan
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT: This case has been reassigned to the undersigned. All counsel must familiarize themselves with the Court's Individual Rules, which are available at https://www.nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-john-p-cronan. Counsel for all parties are hereby directed to appear before the undersigned for an Initial Pretrial Conference ("IPTC") in accordance with Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure on November 13, 2020 at 3:00 p.m. In light of the ongoing COVID-19 pandemic, the Court will conduct the IPTC by teleconference. At the scheduled time, counsel for all parties should call (866) 434-5269, access code 9176261. Absent leave of Court obtained by letter-motion filed before the conference, all pretrial conferences must be attended by the attorney who will serve as principal trial counsel. As further set forth in this Order. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 10/13/2020) Initial Conference set for 11/13/2020 at 03:00 PM before Judge John P. Cronan. (ks)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge John Peter Cronan. Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr is no longer assigned to the case..(wb)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Peyrot and Associates, P.C., Jane Doe Williams, T. Edward Williams..(dnh)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Niall Diarmuid O'Murchadha on behalf of Richard Breuninger, ITGA, LLC,..(O'Murchadha, Niall)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Douglas Eric Grover on behalf of Richard Breuninger, ITGA, LLC,..(Grover, Douglas)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Peyrot & Associates, PC; T. Edward Williams; Jane Doe Williams, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Richard Breuninger, ITGA, LLC,..(Eilender, Jeffrey)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Jeffrey M. Eilender. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: RICHARD BREUNINGER, T. EDWARD WILLIAMS, JANE DOE WILLIAMS, PEYROT AND ASSOCIATES, PC,,. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps. (dnh)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Jeffrey M. Eilender. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Citizenship Defendant code 1 (Citizen of This State); Dollar Demand $2,000,000,000; County code New York; Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Citizenship Defendant code has been modified to 4 (Incorporated/Principal Place of Business-This State); the Dollar Demand has been modified to omitted; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (dnh)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(dnh)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (dnh)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Jeffrey M. Eilender to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the request for issuance of summons. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUESTED - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Eilender, Jeffrey) Modified on 8/31/2020 (dnh).
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by RICHARD BREUNINGER, ITGA, LLC,..(Eilender, Jeffrey)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Eilender, Jeffrey)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JANE DOE WILLIAMS,, PEYROT AND ASSOCIATES, PC,, T. EDWARD WILLIAMS,. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21388240)Document filed by RICHARD BREUNINGER, ITGA, LLC,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 14).(Eilender, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Breuninger, et al v. T. Edward Williams, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. EDWARD WILLIAMS,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PEYROT AND ASSOCIATES, PC,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANE DOE WILLIAMS,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Edward Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peyrot and Associates, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ITGA, LLC,
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Eilender
Represented By: Douglas Eric Grover
Represented By: Niall Diarmuid O'Murchadha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD BREUNINGER
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Eilender
Represented By: Douglas Eric Grover
Represented By: Niall Diarmuid O'Murchadha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?