Acklin et al v. Eichner et al
Plaintiff: Jatinder K Aggarwal, John A Taylor, Susan O'Neill, Thomas Reddy, Nicholas P Bigotti, Gary J Paccagnini, Curtis Kautzer, Linda M Hooks, Carolyn Allen, Carmelo Alu, Carolyn B Press, Rollin P Collins, Deborah Carbo, Paul A Jordan, David Wichers, David W Foote, Paul Price, Janet H Hebert, Neil J Grossman, Paul deWitt, Nikki Mcnicol, Daniel J Franklin, Nikolas Kontomanolis, Suzanne L O'Malley, Rebecca Fitzmaurice, Susan H Dillon, Walter J Weir, Patrick O'Hara, John Mikesh, Lois A Biello, Stanley Silverman, Dennis O'Malley, Anne K Woodson, Mary Ann Kichline, James R Moore III, Robert D Schrock, Jr., Richard S Dillon, Gene Silverman, Marilyn Roll, John D Houle, Charles McMonigle, Christopher Volpe, Karl Hess, Roger S Lichtman, Ulla P Jordan, David S Purvis, Scott Adler, Athol L Wallace, Michelle N Cabay, Thomas S Woodson, Janine Getek, Audrey Kaufman, Suzanne C Mann, Pauline Kontomanolis, Michael D Hebert, Dana C Drew, Cheryl D Marsh, Anne P Iverson, Charles R Acklin, Mary Anne Satt, Neil D Young, Deborah L Monlux, Charles Robertson, Kathleen L Weber, Sylwia Karwowska, Sally Grunewald, Michelle R Hughes, Wade Chilcoat, Robert A Biello, Robin Magliato, Margaret A Grimm, Irene I Young, Alexander K Peyer, Robert Rodriguez, Alexandra Feng, Robert C Miller, Brian P McCue, Deborah Lee Peters, Bennett L Errol, Karen Schembre, Sidney T Feldman, David R Press, James Senn, Patricia V Kaplan, Robert D Marth, Laurene Weaver, George Castellano, Carol A Dahir, Lynne Ditchburn, Lauren Gibaldi, Robert D Gofonia, Thomas R Getreuer, Richard Zierdt, Eileen Price, Kenneth A Pignatello, Carol Miller, Jerome D Kaplan, William Shain, Linda Alu, George M Worton, Kathleen Peyer, Priscilla J Neumann, Myriam C Strauss, Joseph M Carbo, William Calamoneri, Ronald J Rookey, Mark D Hughes, Melissa Jessup, Marilyn Kautzer, Benjamin H Ticknor, Andrea V Franklin, Cynthia L Mapes, Elizabeth Conwell, Antoinette Castellano, Laura C Warnock, Henry T Satt, Patricia Chen Feng, Sharon Van de Grift, Marriann T Gofonia, Dale R Kichline, Jr., Michelle Coreno, Aretta B Muir, Gail E Jordan, Charles S Roll, Nancy A Ferrara, Penny Kress Zimmerman, Joan H Orr, John S Kuhlthau, Linda Gagne, Pamela P Gethard, Antonella Trisolino, Albert M Clark, Nancy A Johnson, Burt Danovitz, Michael Worsham, Edward S Schwartz, Raymond Dayan, Joseph A Magliato, Jean McEwen Rodby, Susan Pierson-O'Hara, Gregory P Johnson, Joseph D Mapes, Thomas C Warnock, Judith Cooper, Susan A Clark, Arla Bowers, Kathy McMonigle, Carolyn Schrock, Judith Grossman, Larry Lasker, Mark Stevens, Carol C Kuhlthau, Marcy D Rookey, Bernadette Pignatello, Jill A Wallace, Robert A Staehle, Karen L Paccagnini, Maribel Acutanza, Freda Feldman, Tracey Stevens, Richard J Marriott, Michael J Zimmerman, Joseph K Ferrara, Shirley Marriott, Katherine A Hayden, Lucille M McCue, Bonny K Collins, Larry A Bowers, Camille Kurtz, Karen M Taylor, Carmen Y Polanco, Arlo Young, Susan Senn, Linda Strohmeyer, Craig R Rodby, Joseph Coreno, Philip D Acutanza, Susan Kaplan, Charles J Neumann, Paul Nisselle, Gina C Chung, Thomas R Lally, Mark Grunewald, Andreas Weber, John E Ditchburn, Rachelle Adler, Joan A Beutler, Brigitte Tutschka, Linda Golay, Patricia H Dayan, Rosanne E Worton, Jose M Polanco, Laurel M Clark, Susan Weir, Gerald N Goldman, Janet K Marth, Robert R Burg, Diane K Schwartz, Sunil Aggarwal, Christine Lally, James D Muir, Shapiro K Elaine, Kurt Grimm, Richard Weiss, Donna C Getreuer, David R Mann and Lucille Graessle
Defendant: New York Urban Ownership Management LLC, Ian Bruce Eichner, O. Park Central LLC, Park Central Management LLC, Scott L Lager, Leslie Eichner, T. Park Central LLC, BlueGreen Vacations Unlimited Inc., Stuart Eichner and Manhattan Club Marketing Group LLC
Alternative Dispute Resolution (Adr) Provider: Rodney M Bickford
Case Number: 1:2020cv07042
Filed: August 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1964
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER with respect to #77 Letter Motion to Seal. In accordance with Rule 4(A)(ii) of the Court's Individual Rules of Practice in Civil Cases, the Eichner Defendants are directed to submit a letter explaining the need to redact information other than price terms by October 29, 2020. The Eichner Defendants are further directed to file (a) a public copy with proposed redactions, and (b) a sealed copy of the unredacted document with the redactions highlighted. The Court expects that it will rule on the motion to seal in conjunction with or shortly after its decision on Bluegreen's motion to dismiss. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 10/27/2020) (mro)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER denying without prejudice #70 Motion for David T. Coulter to Appear Pro Hac Vice. On October 22, 2020, Joseph P. Facciponti moved for an order allowing the admission pro hac vice of David T. Coulter. Dkt. No. 70. That application failed to comply with Rule 1.3(c) of the Local Rules of the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. Pursuant to Local Rule 1.3(c), applicants seeking admission pro hac vice must themselves file a motion for admission and submit an affidavit that speaks to each of four enumerated categories of information. Here, Mr. Facciponti filed the motion and affidavit on Mr. Coulter's behalf. Moreover, Mr. Facciponti's affidavit does not state, as required by Rule 1.3(c), whether Mr. Coulter has "ever been convicted of a felony" or "has ever been censured, suspended, disbarred or denied admission or readmission by any court." Accordingly, Mr. Facciponti's motion for admission of Mr. Coulter pro hac vice is DENIED without prejudice. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion pending at Dkt. No. 70. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 10/27/2020) (mro)
October 26, 2020 Filing 78 ***EX-PARTE***REDACTION to #77 LETTER MOTION to Seal addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Grace Mead dated October 26, 2020. by BlueGreen Vacations Unlimited Inc.Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #77 .(Mead, Grace)
October 26, 2020 Filing 77 LETTER MOTION to Seal addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Grace Mead dated October 26, 2020. Document filed by BlueGreen Vacations Unlimited Inc...(Mead, Grace)
October 23, 2020 Filing 76 ***EX-PARTE***REDACTION by BlueGreen Vacations Unlimited Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Highlighted_Asset Purchase Agreement)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #75 .(Mead, Grace)
October 22, 2020 Filing 75 LETTER MOTION to Seal addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Grace Mead dated October 22, 2020. Document filed by BlueGreen Vacations Unlimited Inc...(Mead, Grace)
October 22, 2020 Filing 74 ***EX-PARTE***DECLARATION of Terry Dodd in Support re: #71 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint.. Document filed by BlueGreen Vacations Unlimited Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Highlighted_Asset Purchase Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Ltr. to Jean-Marc Zimmerman)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #71 .(Mead, Grace)
October 22, 2020 Filing 73 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #71 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint. . Document filed by BlueGreen Vacations Unlimited Inc...(Mead, Grace)
October 22, 2020 Filing 72 DECLARATION of Terry Dodd in Support re: #71 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint.. Document filed by BlueGreen Vacations Unlimited Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Redacted_Asset Purchase Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Redacted_Ltr. to Jean-Marc Zimmerman).(Mead, Grace)
October 22, 2020 Filing 71 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint. Document filed by BlueGreen Vacations Unlimited Inc...(Mead, Grace)
October 22, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #70 MOTION for DAVID T. COULTER to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
October 22, 2020 Filing 70 MOTION for DAVID T. COULTER to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by BlueGreen Vacations Unlimited Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Facciponti Declaration in Support of Motion, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing Supreme Court of Florida, #3 Exhibit Proposed Order for Admission of David Coulter Pro Hac Vice).(Facciponti, Joseph)
October 20, 2020 Filing 69 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 10/15/20 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days....(McGuirk, Kelly)
October 20, 2020 Filing 68 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 10/15/2020 before Judge Gregory H. Woods. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Samuel Mauro, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/10/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/20/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/18/2021..(McGuirk, Kelly)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER: On October 15, 2020, the Court held a conference regarding Defendants' requests for leave to file motions to dismiss. Dkt. Nos. 59 and 62. The deadline for Defendant Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited Inc. ("Bluegreen Vacations") to file and serve its motion to dismiss is October 22, 2020. Plaintiffs' opposition is due within twenty-one days after service of Bluegreen Vacations' motion; Bluegreen Vacations' reply, if any, is due within seven days after service of Plaintiffs' opposition. The deadline for the Manhattan Club Defendants to file and serve their motion to dismiss is December 17, 2020. Plaintiffs' opposition is due within twenty-eight days after service of the Manhattan Club Defendants' motion; the Manhattan Club Defendants' reply, if any, is due within fourteen days after service of Plaintiffs' opposition. For the reasons stated on the record, discovery is stayed pending the motions to dismiss. The initial pretrial conference scheduled for December 30, 2020 is adjourned sine die. ( Motions due by 12/17/2020.) (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 10/15/2020) (mro)
October 15, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gregory H. Woods: Telephone Conference held on 10/15/2020. (Court Reporter Samuel Mauro) (wv)
October 14, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #66 MOTION for DAVID T. COULTER to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of Florida;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (wb)
October 14, 2020 Filing 66 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - FILER ERROR - MOTION for DAVID T. COULTER to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by BlueGreen Vacations Unlimited Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Facciponti Declaration in Support of Motion, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing with Court Stamp, #3 Exhibit Proposed Order for Admission).(Facciponti, Joseph) Modified on 10/14/2020 (wb).
October 13, 2020 Filing 65 LETTER addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Jean Marc Zimmerman dated 10-13-2020 re: Responding to Letter From the Eichner Defendants dated 10-9-2020 (Dkt. 62). Document filed by Charles R Acklin, Maribel Acutanza, Philip D Acutanza, Rachelle Adler, Scott Adler, Jatinder K Aggarwal, Sunil Aggarwal, Carolyn Allen, Carmelo Alu, Linda Alu, Joan A Beutler, Rodney M Bickford, Lois A Biello, Robert A Biello, Nicholas P Bigotti, Arla Bowers, Larry A Bowers, Robert R Burg, Michelle N Cabay, William Calamoneri, Deborah Carbo, Joseph M Carbo, Antoinette Castellano, George Castellano, Patricia Chen Feng, Wade Chilcoat, Gina C Chung, Albert M Clark, Laurel M Clark, Susan A Clark, Bonny K Collins, Rollin P Collins, Elizabeth Conwell, Judith Cooper, Joseph Coreno, Michelle Coreno, Carol A Dahir, Burt Danovitz, Patricia H Dayan, Raymond Dayan, Richard S Dillon, Susan H Dillon, John E Ditchburn, Lynne Ditchburn, Dana C Drew, Shapiro K Elaine, Bennett L Errol, Freda Feldman, Sidney T Feldman, Alexandra Feng, Joseph K Ferrara, Nancy A Ferrara, Rebecca Fitzmaurice, David W Foote, Andrea V Franklin, Daniel J Franklin, Linda Gagne, Janine Getek, Pamela P Gethard, Donna C Getreuer, Thomas R Getreuer, Lauren Gibaldi, Marriann T Gofonia, Robert D Gofonia, Linda Golay, Gerald N Goldman, Lucille Graessle, Kurt Grimm, Margaret A Grimm, Judith Grossman, Neil J Grossman, Mark Grunewald, Sally Grunewald, Katherine A Hayden, Janet H Hebert, Michael D Hebert, Karl Hess, Linda M Hooks, John D Houle, Mark D Hughes, Michelle R Hughes, Anne P Iverson, Melissa Jessup, Gregory P Johnson, Nancy A Johnson, Gail E Jordan, Paul A Jordan, Ulla P Jordan, Jerome D Kaplan, Patricia V Kaplan, Susan Kaplan, Sylwia Karwowska, Audrey Kaufman, Curtis Kautzer, Marilyn Kautzer, Mary Ann Kichline, Dale R Kichline, Jr., Nikolas Kontomanolis, Pauline Kontomanolis, Penny Kress Zimmerman, Carol C Kuhlthau, John S Kuhlthau, Camille Kurtz, Christine Lally, Thomas R Lally, Larry Lasker, Roger S Lichtman, Joseph A Magliato, Robin Magliato, David R Mann, Suzanne C Mann, Cynthia L Mapes, Joseph D Mapes, Richard J Marriott, Shirley Marriott, Cheryl D Marsh, Janet K Marth, Robert D Marth, Brian P McCue, Lucille M McCue, Jean McEwen Rodby, Charles McMonigle, Kathy McMonigle, Nikki Mcnicol, John Mikesh, Carol Miller, Robert C Miller, Deborah L Monlux, James R Moore III, Aretta B Muir, James D Muir, Charles J Neumann, Priscilla J Neumann, Paul Nisselle, Patrick O'Hara, Dennis O'Malley, Suzanne L O'Malley, Susan O'Neill, Joan H Orr, Gary J Paccagnini, Karen L Paccagnini, Deborah Lee Peters, Alexander K Peyer, Kathleen Peyer, Susan Pierson-O'Hara, Bernadette Pignatello, Kenneth A Pignatello, Carmen Y Polanco, Jose M Polanco, Carolyn B Press, David R Press, Eileen Price, Paul Price, David S Purvis, Thomas Reddy, Charles Robertson, Craig R Rodby, Robert Rodriguez, Charles S Roll, Marilyn Roll, Marcy D Rookey, Ronald J Rookey, Henry T Satt, Mary Anne Satt, Karen Schembre, Carolyn Schrock, Robert D Schrock, Jr., Diane K Schwartz, Edward S Schwartz, James Senn, Susan Senn, William Shain, Gene Silverman, Stanley Silverman, Robert A Staehle, Mark Stevens, Tracey Stevens, Myriam C Strauss, Linda Strohmeyer, John A Taylor, Karen M Taylor, Benjamin H Ticknor, Antonella Trisolino, Brigitte Tutschka, Sharon Van de Grift, Christopher Volpe, Athol L Wallace, Jill A Wallace, Laura C Warnock, Thomas C Warnock, Laurene Weaver, Andreas Weber, Kathleen L Weber, Susan Weir, Walter J Weir, Richard Weiss, David Wichers, Anne K Woodson, Thomas S Woodson, Michael Worsham, George M Worton, Rosanne E Worton, Arlo Young, Irene I Young, Neil D Young, Richard Zierdt, Michael J Zimmerman, Paul deWitt..(Zimmerman, Jean-Marc)
October 13, 2020 Filing 64 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #62 Letter,, filed by New York Urban Ownership Management LLC, Ian Bruce Eichner, Park Central Management LLC, Leslie H. Eichner, O. Park Central LLC, Manhattan Club Marketing Group LLC, Stuart P. Eichner, Scott L Lager, T. Park Central LLC. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. The Court will take up the Manhattan Club Defendants' proposed motion at the conference scheduled for October 15, 2020 at 11:00 a.m. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 10/11/2020) (mro)
October 12, 2020 Filing 63 LETTER addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Jean Marc Zimmerman dated 10-12-2020 re: Responding to Letter From BlueGreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc. dated 10-6-2020 (Dkt. 59). Document filed by Charles R Acklin, Maribel Acutanza, Philip D Acutanza, Rachelle Adler, Scott Adler, Jatinder K Aggarwal, Sunil Aggarwal, Carolyn Allen, Carmelo Alu, Linda Alu, Joan A Beutler, Rodney M Bickford, Lois A Biello, Robert A Biello, Nicholas P Bigotti, Arla Bowers, Larry A Bowers, Robert R Burg, Michelle N Cabay, William Calamoneri, Deborah Carbo, Joseph M Carbo, Antoinette Castellano, George Castellano, Patricia Chen Feng, Wade Chilcoat, Gina C Chung, Albert M Clark, Laurel M Clark, Susan A Clark, Bonny K Collins, Rollin P Collins, Elizabeth Conwell, Judith Cooper, Joseph Coreno, Michelle Coreno, Carol A Dahir, Burt Danovitz, Patricia H Dayan, Raymond Dayan, Richard S Dillon, Susan H Dillon, John E Ditchburn, Lynne Ditchburn, Dana C Drew, Shapiro K Elaine, Bennett L Errol, Freda Feldman, Sidney T Feldman, Alexandra Feng, Joseph K Ferrara, Nancy A Ferrara, Rebecca Fitzmaurice, David W Foote, Andrea V Franklin, Daniel J Franklin, Linda Gagne, Janine Getek, Pamela P Gethard, Donna C Getreuer, Thomas R Getreuer, Lauren Gibaldi, Marriann T Gofonia, Robert D Gofonia, Linda Golay, Gerald N Goldman, Lucille Graessle, Kurt Grimm, Margaret A Grimm, Judith Grossman, Neil J Grossman, Mark Grunewald, Sally Grunewald, Katherine A Hayden, Janet H Hebert, Michael D Hebert, Karl Hess, Linda M Hooks, John D Houle, Mark D Hughes, Michelle R Hughes, Anne P Iverson, Melissa Jessup, Gregory P Johnson, Nancy A Johnson, Gail E Jordan, Paul A Jordan, Ulla P Jordan, Jerome D Kaplan, Patricia V Kaplan, Susan Kaplan, Sylwia Karwowska, Audrey Kaufman, Curtis Kautzer, Marilyn Kautzer, Mary Ann Kichline, Dale R Kichline, Jr., Nikolas Kontomanolis, Pauline Kontomanolis, Penny Kress Zimmerman, Carol C Kuhlthau, John S Kuhlthau, Camille Kurtz, Christine Lally, Thomas R Lally, Larry Lasker, Roger S Lichtman, Joseph A Magliato, Robin Magliato, David R Mann, Suzanne C Mann, Cynthia L Mapes, Joseph D Mapes, Richard J Marriott, Shirley Marriott, Cheryl D Marsh, Janet K Marth, Robert D Marth, Brian P McCue, Lucille M McCue, Jean McEwen Rodby, Charles McMonigle, Kathy McMonigle, Nikki Mcnicol, John Mikesh, Carol Miller, Robert C Miller, Deborah L Monlux, James R Moore III, Aretta B Muir, James D Muir, Charles J Neumann, Priscilla J Neumann, Paul Nisselle, Patrick O'Hara, Dennis O'Malley, Suzanne L O'Malley, Susan O'Neill, Joan H Orr, Gary J Paccagnini, Karen L Paccagnini, Deborah Lee Peters, Alexander K Peyer, Kathleen Peyer, Susan Pierson-O'Hara, Bernadette Pignatello, Kenneth A Pignatello, Carmen Y Polanco, Jose M Polanco, Carolyn B Press, David R Press, Eileen Price, Paul Price, David S Purvis, Thomas Reddy, Charles Robertson, Craig R Rodby, Robert Rodriguez, Charles S Roll, Marilyn Roll, Marcy D Rookey, Ronald J Rookey, Henry T Satt, Mary Anne Satt, Karen Schembre, Carolyn Schrock, Robert D Schrock, Jr., Diane K Schwartz, Edward S Schwartz, James Senn, Susan Senn, William Shain, Gene Silverman, Stanley Silverman, Robert A Staehle, Mark Stevens, Tracey Stevens, Myriam C Strauss, Linda Strohmeyer, John A Taylor, Karen M Taylor, Benjamin H Ticknor, Antonella Trisolino, Brigitte Tutschka, Sharon Van de Grift, Christopher Volpe, Athol L Wallace, Jill A Wallace, Laura C Warnock, Thomas C Warnock, Laurene Weaver, Andreas Weber, Kathleen L Weber, Susan Weir, Walter J Weir, Richard Weiss, David Wichers, Anne K Woodson, Thomas S Woodson, Michael Worsham, George M Worton, Rosanne E Worton, Arlo Young, Irene I Young, Neil D Young, Richard Zierdt, Michael J Zimmerman, Paul deWitt..(Zimmerman, Jean-Marc)
October 9, 2020 Filing 62 LETTER addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Jennifer S. Recine dated October 9, 2020 re: request that the Court consider The Manhattan Club Defendants anticipated Motion to Dismiss at the Pre-Motion Conference scheduled for October 15, 2020. Document filed by Ian Bruce Eichner, Stuart P. Eichner, Leslie H. Eichner, Scott L Lager, Manhattan Club Marketing Group LLC, New York Urban Ownership Management LLC, O. Park Central LLC, Park Central Management LLC, T. Park Central LLC..(Recine, Jennifer)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER granting #59 Letter Motion for Conference. Application granted. The Court will hold a pre-motion conference on October 15, 2020 at 11:00 a.m. The parties are directed to use the conference call dial-in information and access code noted in the Court's Emergency Rules in Light of COVID-19 available on the Court's website, and are specifically directed to comply with Emergency Rule 2(C). Telephone Conference set for 10/15/2020 at 11:00 AM before Judge Gregory H. Woods. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 10/7/2020) (mro)
October 7, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Ian Bruce Eichner answer due 12/17/2020; Stuart P. Eichner answer due 12/17/2020; Leslie H. Eichner answer due 12/17/2020. (ama)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER: granting #56 Letter Motion for Conference. Application granted. The deadline for the Eichner Defendants to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to December 17, 2020. The initial pretrial conference scheduled for November 6, 2020 is extended to December 30, 2020 at 2:00 p.m. The joint letter described in the Court's September 5, 2020 order, Dkt. No. 38, is due no later than December 23, 2020. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 12/30/2020 at 02:00 PM before Judge Gregory H. Woods. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 10/07/2020) (ama) Modified on 10/7/2020 (ama).
October 6, 2020 Filing 59 LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Grace Mead dated October 6, 2020. Document filed by BlueGreen Vacations Unlimited Inc...(Mead, Grace)
October 6, 2020 Filing 58 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Corporate Parent Bluegreen Vacations Holding Corporation for BlueGreen Vacations Unlimited Inc.. Document filed by BlueGreen Vacations Unlimited Inc...(Mead, Grace)
October 6, 2020 Filing 57 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Ian Bruce Eichner, Stuart P. Eichner, Leslie H. Eichner, Scott L Lager, Manhattan Club Marketing Group LLC, New York Urban Ownership Management LLC, O. Park Central LLC, Park Central Management LLC, T. Park Central LLC..(Recine, Jennifer)
October 6, 2020 Filing 56 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #17 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, and in light of this requested extension, plaintiffs and the Eichner Defendants also jointly request that the Initial Pretrial Conference be adjourned from November 6, 2020 until after the Eichner Defendants respond to the Complaint addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Jennifer S. Recine dated October 6, 2020. Document filed by Ian Bruce Eichner, Stuart P. Eichner, Leslie H. Eichner, Scott L Lager, Manhattan Club Marketing Group LLC, New York Urban Ownership Management LLC, O. Park Central LLC, Park Central Management LLC, T. Park Central LLC..(Recine, Jennifer)
October 6, 2020 Filing 55 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jennifer Susan Recine on behalf of Ian Bruce Eichner, Stuart P. Eichner, Leslie H. Eichner, Scott L Lager, Manhattan Club Marketing Group LLC, New York Urban Ownership Management LLC, O. Park Central LLC, Park Central Management LLC, T. Park Central LLC..(Recine, Jennifer)
October 6, 2020 Filing 54 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeffrey Ephraim Glatt on behalf of Ian Bruce Eichner, Stuart P. Eichner, Leslie H. Eichner, Scott L Lager, Manhattan Club Marketing Group LLC, New York Urban Ownership Management LLC, O. Park Central LLC, Park Central Management LLC, T. Park Central LLC..(Glatt, Jeffrey)
October 6, 2020 Filing 53 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew Rogers Kurland on behalf of Ian Bruce Eichner, Stuart P. Eichner, Leslie H. Eichner, Scott L Lager, Manhattan Club Marketing Group LLC, New York Urban Ownership Management LLC, O. Park Central LLC, Park Central Management LLC, T. Park Central LLC..(Kurland, Andrew)
October 6, 2020 Filing 52 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Grace Lee Mead on behalf of BlueGreen Vacations Unlimited Inc...(Mead, Grace)
October 6, 2020 Filing 51 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gaurav K Talwar on behalf of BlueGreen Vacations Unlimited Inc...(Talwar, Gaurav)
October 6, 2020 Filing 50 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joseph Paul Facciponti on behalf of BlueGreen Vacations Unlimited Inc...(Facciponti, Joseph)
September 9, 2020 Filing 49 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Stuart P. Eichner..(dnh)
September 9, 2020 Filing 48 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Leslie H. Eichner..(dnh)
September 9, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Jean-Marc Zimmerman. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Leslie Eichner; Stuart Eichner. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error. (dnh)
September 8, 2020 Filing 47 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Stuart P. Eichner, re: #17 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Charles R Acklin, Maribel Acutanza, Philip D Acutanza, Rachelle Adler, Scott Adler, Jatinder K Aggarwal, Sunil Aggarwal, Carolyn Allen, Carmelo Alu, Linda Alu, Joan A Beutler, Rodney M Bickford, Lois A Biello, Robert A Biello, Nicholas P Bigotti, Arla Bowers, Larry A Bowers, Robert R Burg, Michelle N Cabay, William Calamoneri, Deborah Carbo, Joseph M Carbo, Antoinette Castellano, George Castellano, Patricia Chen Feng, Wade Chilcoat, Gina C Chung, Albert M Clark, Laurel M Clark, Susan A Clark, Bonny K Collins, Rollin P Collins, Elizabeth Conwell, Judith Cooper, Joseph Coreno, Michelle Coreno, Carol A Dahir, Burt Danovitz, Patricia H Dayan, Raymond Dayan, Richard S Dillon, Susan H Dillon, John E Ditchburn, Lynne Ditchburn, Dana C Drew, Shapiro K Elaine, Bennett L Errol, Freda Feldman, Sidney T Feldman, Alexandra Feng, Joseph K Ferrara, Nancy A Ferrara, Rebecca Fitzmaurice, David W Foote, Andrea V Franklin, Daniel J Franklin, Linda Gagne, Janine Getek, Pamela P Gethard, Donna C Getreuer, Thomas R Getreuer, Lauren Gibaldi, Marriann T Gofonia, Robert D Gofonia, Linda Golay, Gerald N Goldman, Lucille Graessle, Kurt Grimm, Margaret A Grimm, Judith Grossman, Neil J Grossman, Mark Grunewald, Sally Grunewald, Katherine A Hayden, Janet H Hebert, Michael D Hebert, Karl Hess, Linda M Hooks, John D Houle, Mark D Hughes, Michelle R Hughes, Anne P Iverson, Melissa Jessup, Gregory P Johnson, Nancy A Johnson, Gail E Jordan, Paul A Jordan, Ulla P Jordan, Jerome D Kaplan, Patricia V Kaplan, Susan Kaplan, Sylwia Karwowska, Audrey Kaufman, Curtis Kautzer, Marilyn Kautzer, Mary Ann Kichline, Dale R Kichline, Jr., Nikolas Kontomanolis, Pauline Kontomanolis, Penny Kress Zimmerman, Carol C Kuhlthau, John S Kuhlthau, Camille Kurtz, Christine Lally, Thomas R Lally, Larry Lasker, Roger S Lichtman, Joseph A Magliato, Robin Magliato, David R Mann, Suzanne C Mann, Cynthia L Mapes, Joseph D Mapes, Richard J Marriott, Shirley Marriott, Cheryl D Marsh, Janet K Marth, Robert D Marth, Brian P McCue, Lucille M McCue, Jean McEwen Rodby, Charles McMonigle, Kathy McMonigle, Nikki Mcnicol, John Mikesh, Carol Miller, Robert C Miller, Deborah L Monlux, James R Moore III, Aretta B Muir, James D Muir, Charles J Neumann, Priscilla J Neumann, Paul Nisselle, Patrick O'Hara, Dennis O'Malley, Suzanne L O'Malley, Susan O'Neill, Joan H Orr, Gary J Paccagnini, Karen L Paccagnini, Deborah Lee Peters, Alexander K Peyer, Kathleen Peyer, Susan Pierson-O'Hara, Bernadette Pignatello, Kenneth A Pignatello, Carmen Y Polanco, Jose M Polanco, Carolyn B Press, David R Press, Eileen Price, Paul Price, David S Purvis, Thomas Reddy, Charles Robertson, Craig R Rodby, Robert Rodriguez, Charles S Roll, Marilyn Roll, Marcy D Rookey, Ronald J Rookey, Henry T Satt, Mary Anne Satt, Karen Schembre, Carolyn Schrock, Robert D Schrock, Jr., Diane K Schwartz, Edward S Schwartz, James Senn, Susan Senn, William Shain, Gene Silverman, Stanley Silverman, Robert A Staehle, Mark Stevens, Tracey Stevens, Myriam C Strauss, Linda Strohmeyer, John A Taylor, Karen M Taylor, Benjamin H Ticknor, Antonella Trisolino, Brigitte Tutschka, Sharon Van de Grift, Christopher Volpe, Athol L Wallace, Jill A Wallace, Laura C Warnock, Thomas C Warnock, Laurene Weaver, Andreas Weber, Kathleen L Weber, Susan Weir, Walter J Weir, Richard Weiss, David Wichers, Anne K Woodson, Thomas S Woodson, Michael Worsham, George M Worton, Rosanne E Worton, Arlo Young, Irene I Young, Neil D Young, Richard Zierdt, Michael J Zimmerman, Paul deWitt..(Zimmerman, Jean-Marc)
September 8, 2020 Filing 46 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Leslie H. Eichner, re: #17 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Charles R Acklin, Maribel Acutanza, Philip D Acutanza, Rachelle Adler, Scott Adler, Jatinder K Aggarwal, Sunil Aggarwal, Carolyn Allen, Carmelo Alu, Linda Alu, Joan A Beutler, Rodney M Bickford, Lois A Biello, Robert A Biello, Nicholas P Bigotti, Arla Bowers, Larry A Bowers, Robert R Burg, Michelle N Cabay, William Calamoneri, Deborah Carbo, Joseph M Carbo, Antoinette Castellano, George Castellano, Patricia Chen Feng, Wade Chilcoat, Gina C Chung, Albert M Clark, Laurel M Clark, Susan A Clark, Bonny K Collins, Rollin P Collins, Elizabeth Conwell, Judith Cooper, Joseph Coreno, Michelle Coreno, Carol A Dahir, Burt Danovitz, Patricia H Dayan, Raymond Dayan, Richard S Dillon, Susan H Dillon, John E Ditchburn, Lynne Ditchburn, Dana C Drew, Shapiro K Elaine, Bennett L Errol, Freda Feldman, Sidney T Feldman, Alexandra Feng, Joseph K Ferrara, Nancy A Ferrara, Rebecca Fitzmaurice, David W Foote, Andrea V Franklin, Daniel J Franklin, Linda Gagne, Janine Getek, Pamela P Gethard, Donna C Getreuer, Thomas R Getreuer, Lauren Gibaldi, Marriann T Gofonia, Robert D Gofonia, Linda Golay, Gerald N Goldman, Lucille Graessle, Kurt Grimm, Margaret A Grimm, Judith Grossman, Neil J Grossman, Mark Grunewald, Sally Grunewald, Katherine A Hayden, Janet H Hebert, Michael D Hebert, Karl Hess, Linda M Hooks, John D Houle, Mark D Hughes, Michelle R Hughes, Anne P Iverson, Melissa Jessup, Gregory P Johnson, Nancy A Johnson, Gail E Jordan, Paul A Jordan, Ulla P Jordan, Jerome D Kaplan, Patricia V Kaplan, Susan Kaplan, Sylwia Karwowska, Audrey Kaufman, Curtis Kautzer, Marilyn Kautzer, Mary Ann Kichline, Dale R Kichline, Jr., Nikolas Kontomanolis, Pauline Kontomanolis, Penny Kress Zimmerman, Carol C Kuhlthau, John S Kuhlthau, Camille Kurtz, Christine Lally, Thomas R Lally, Larry Lasker, Roger S Lichtman, Joseph A Magliato, Robin Magliato, David R Mann, Suzanne C Mann, Cynthia L Mapes, Joseph D Mapes, Richard J Marriott, Shirley Marriott, Cheryl D Marsh, Janet K Marth, Robert D Marth, Brian P McCue, Lucille M McCue, Jean McEwen Rodby, Charles McMonigle, Kathy McMonigle, Nikki Mcnicol, John Mikesh, Carol Miller, Robert C Miller, Deborah L Monlux, James R Moore III, Aretta B Muir, James D Muir, Charles J Neumann, Priscilla J Neumann, Paul Nisselle, Patrick O'Hara, Dennis O'Malley, Suzanne L O'Malley, Susan O'Neill, Joan H Orr, Gary J Paccagnini, Karen L Paccagnini, Deborah Lee Peters, Alexander K Peyer, Kathleen Peyer, Susan Pierson-O'Hara, Bernadette Pignatello, Kenneth A Pignatello, Carmen Y Polanco, Jose M Polanco, Carolyn B Press, David R Press, Eileen Price, Paul Price, David S Purvis, Thomas Reddy, Charles Robertson, Craig R Rodby, Robert Rodriguez, Charles S Roll, Marilyn Roll, Marcy D Rookey, Ronald J Rookey, Henry T Satt, Mary Anne Satt, Karen Schembre, Carolyn Schrock, Robert D Schrock, Jr., Diane K Schwartz, Edward S Schwartz, James Senn, Susan Senn, William Shain, Gene Silverman, Stanley Silverman, Robert A Staehle, Mark Stevens, Tracey Stevens, Myriam C Strauss, Linda Strohmeyer, John A Taylor, Karen M Taylor, Benjamin H Ticknor, Antonella Trisolino, Brigitte Tutschka, Sharon Van de Grift, Christopher Volpe, Athol L Wallace, Jill A Wallace, Laura C Warnock, Thomas C Warnock, Laurene Weaver, Andreas Weber, Kathleen L Weber, Susan Weir, Walter J Weir, Richard Weiss, David Wichers, Anne K Woodson, Thomas S Woodson, Michael Worsham, George M Worton, Rosanne E Worton, Arlo Young, Irene I Young, Neil D Young, Richard Zierdt, Michael J Zimmerman, Paul deWitt..(Zimmerman, Jean-Marc)
September 8, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Jean-Marc Zimmerman to RE-FILE Document No. #30 Request for Issuance of Summons, #31 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; the party name must appear in the docket entry text and on the summons PDF exactly as they appear in the pleading caption. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh)
September 8, 2020 Filing 45 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to New York Urban Ownership Management LLC..(dnh)
September 8, 2020 Filing 44 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Manhattan Club Marketing Group LLC..(dnh)
September 8, 2020 Filing 43 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Scott L Lager..(dnh)
September 8, 2020 Filing 42 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Park Central Management LLC..(dnh)
September 8, 2020 Filing 41 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to O. Park Central LLC..(dnh)
September 8, 2020 Filing 40 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to T. Park Central LLC..(dnh)
September 8, 2020 ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number #40 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED. The document was incorrectly filed in this case; party name contained a typographical error. (dnh)
September 8, 2020 Filing 39 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ian Bruce Eichner..(dnh)
September 8, 2020 Filing 38 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 11/6/2020 at 04:30 PM before Judge Gregory H. Woods. The conference will be conducted by telephone. The parties are directed to the Court's Emergency Rules in Light of COVID-19, which are available on the Court's website, for the dial-in number and other relevant instructions. The parties are specifically directed to comply with Rule 2(C) of the Court's Emergency Rules. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 9/5/2020) (mro)
September 4, 2020 Filing 37 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to New York Urban Ownership Management, LLC, re: #17 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Charles R Acklin, Maribel Acutanza, Philip D Acutanza, Rachelle Adler, Scott Adler, Jatinder K Aggarwal, Sunil Aggarwal, Carolyn Allen, Carmelo Alu, Linda Alu, Joan A Beutler, Rodney M Bickford, Lois A Biello, Robert A Biello, Nicholas P Bigotti, Arla Bowers, Larry A Bowers, Robert R Burg, Michelle N Cabay, William Calamoneri, Deborah Carbo, Joseph M Carbo, Antoinette Castellano, George Castellano, Patricia Chen Feng, Wade Chilcoat, Gina C Chung, Albert M Clark, Laurel M Clark, Susan A Clark, Bonny K Collins, Rollin P Collins, Elizabeth Conwell, Judith Cooper, Joseph Coreno, Michelle Coreno, Carol A Dahir, Burt Danovitz, Patricia H Dayan, Raymond Dayan, Richard S Dillon, Susan H Dillon, John E Ditchburn, Lynne Ditchburn, Dana C Drew, Shapiro K Elaine, Bennett L Errol, Freda Feldman, Sidney T Feldman, Alexandra Feng, Joseph K Ferrara, Nancy A Ferrara, Rebecca Fitzmaurice, David W Foote, Andrea V Franklin, Daniel J Franklin, Linda Gagne, Janine Getek, Pamela P Gethard, Donna C Getreuer, Thomas R Getreuer, Lauren Gibaldi, Marriann T Gofonia, Robert D Gofonia, Linda Golay, Gerald N Goldman, Lucille Graessle, Kurt Grimm, Margaret A Grimm, Judith Grossman, Neil J Grossman, Mark Grunewald, Sally Grunewald, Katherine A Hayden, Janet H Hebert, Michael D Hebert, Karl Hess, Linda M Hooks, John D Houle, Mark D Hughes, Michelle R Hughes, Anne P Iverson, Melissa Jessup, Gregory P Johnson, Nancy A Johnson, Gail E Jordan, Paul A Jordan, Ulla P Jordan, Jerome D Kaplan, Patricia V Kaplan, Susan Kaplan, Sylwia Karwowska, Audrey Kaufman, Curtis Kautzer, Marilyn Kautzer, Mary Ann Kichline, Dale R Kichline, Jr., Nikolas Kontomanolis, Pauline Kontomanolis, Penny Kress Zimmerman, Carol C Kuhlthau, John S Kuhlthau, Camille Kurtz, Christine Lally, Thomas R Lally, Larry Lasker, Roger S Lichtman, Joseph A Magliato, Robin Magliato, David R Mann, Suzanne C Mann, Cynthia L Mapes, Joseph D Mapes, Richard J Marriott, Shirley Marriott, Cheryl D Marsh, Janet K Marth, Robert D Marth, Brian P McCue, Lucille M McCue, Jean McEwen Rodby, Charles McMonigle, Kathy McMonigle, Nikki Mcnicol, John Mikesh, Carol Miller, Robert C Miller, Deborah L Monlux, James R Moore III, Aretta B Muir, James D Muir, Charles J Neumann, Priscilla J Neumann, Paul Nisselle, Patrick O'Hara, Dennis O'Malley, Suzanne L O'Malley, Susan O'Neill, Joan H Orr, Gary J Paccagnini, Karen L Paccagnini, Deborah Lee Peters, Alexander K Peyer, Kathleen Peyer, Susan Pierson-O'Hara, Bernadette Pignatello, Kenneth A Pignatello, Carmen Y Polanco, Jose M Polanco, Carolyn B Press, David R Press, Eileen Price, Paul Price, David S Purvis, Thomas Reddy, Charles Robertson, Craig R Rodby, Robert Rodriguez, Charles S Roll, Marilyn Roll, Marcy D Rookey, Ronald J Rookey, Henry T Satt, Mary Anne Satt, Karen Schembre, Carolyn Schrock, Robert D Schrock, Jr., Diane K Schwartz, Edward S Schwartz, James Senn, Susan Senn, William Shain, Gene Silverman, Stanley Silverman, Robert A Staehle, Mark Stevens, Tracey Stevens, Myriam C Strauss, Linda Strohmeyer, John A Taylor, Karen M Taylor, Benjamin H Ticknor, Antonella Trisolino, Brigitte Tutschka, Sharon Van de Grift, Christopher Volpe, Athol L Wallace, Jill A Wallace, Laura C Warnock, Thomas C Warnock, Laurene Weaver, Andreas Weber, Kathleen L Weber, Susan Weir, Walter J Weir, Richard Weiss, David Wichers, Anne K Woodson, Thomas S Woodson, Michael Worsham, George M Worton, Rosanne E Worton, Arlo Young, Irene I Young, Neil D Young, Richard Zierdt, Michael J Zimmerman, Paul deWitt..(Zimmerman, Jean-Marc)
September 4, 2020 Filing 36 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Manhattan Club Marketing Group LLC, re: #17 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Charles R Acklin, Maribel Acutanza, Philip D Acutanza, Rachelle Adler, Scott Adler, Jatinder K Aggarwal, Sunil Aggarwal, Carolyn Allen, Carmelo Alu, Linda Alu, Joan A Beutler, Rodney M Bickford, Lois A Biello, Robert A Biello, Nicholas P Bigotti, Arla Bowers, Larry A Bowers, Robert R Burg, Michelle N Cabay, William Calamoneri, Deborah Carbo, Joseph M Carbo, Antoinette Castellano, George Castellano, Patricia Chen Feng, Wade Chilcoat, Gina C Chung, Albert M Clark, Laurel M Clark, Susan A Clark, Bonny K Collins, Rollin P Collins, Elizabeth Conwell, Judith Cooper, Joseph Coreno, Michelle Coreno, Carol A Dahir, Burt Danovitz, Patricia H Dayan, Raymond Dayan, Richard S Dillon, Susan H Dillon, John E Ditchburn, Lynne Ditchburn, Dana C Drew, Shapiro K Elaine, Bennett L Errol, Freda Feldman, Sidney T Feldman, Alexandra Feng, Joseph K Ferrara, Nancy A Ferrara, Rebecca Fitzmaurice, David W Foote, Andrea V Franklin, Daniel J Franklin, Linda Gagne, Janine Getek, Pamela P Gethard, Donna C Getreuer, Thomas R Getreuer, Lauren Gibaldi, Marriann T Gofonia, Robert D Gofonia, Linda Golay, Gerald N Goldman, Lucille Graessle, Kurt Grimm, Margaret A Grimm, Judith Grossman, Neil J Grossman, Mark Grunewald, Sally Grunewald, Katherine A Hayden, Janet H Hebert, Michael D Hebert, Karl Hess, Linda M Hooks, John D Houle, Mark D Hughes, Michelle R Hughes, Anne P Iverson, Melissa Jessup, Gregory P Johnson, Nancy A Johnson, Gail E Jordan, Paul A Jordan, Ulla P Jordan, Jerome D Kaplan, Patricia V Kaplan, Susan Kaplan, Sylwia Karwowska, Audrey Kaufman, Curtis Kautzer, Marilyn Kautzer, Mary Ann Kichline, Dale R Kichline, Jr., Nikolas Kontomanolis, Pauline Kontomanolis, Penny Kress Zimmerman, Carol C Kuhlthau, John S Kuhlthau, Camille Kurtz, Christine Lally, Thomas R Lally, Larry Lasker, Roger S Lichtman, Joseph A Magliato, Robin Magliato, David R Mann, Suzanne C Mann, Cynthia L Mapes, Joseph D Mapes, Richard J Marriott, Shirley Marriott, Cheryl D Marsh, Janet K Marth, Robert D Marth, Brian P McCue, Lucille M McCue, Jean McEwen Rodby, Charles McMonigle, Kathy McMonigle, Nikki Mcnicol, John Mikesh, Carol Miller, Robert C Miller, Deborah L Monlux, James R Moore III, Aretta B Muir, James D Muir, Charles J Neumann, Priscilla J Neumann, Paul Nisselle, Patrick O'Hara, Dennis O'Malley, Suzanne L O'Malley, Susan O'Neill, Joan H Orr, Gary J Paccagnini, Karen L Paccagnini, Deborah Lee Peters, Alexander K Peyer, Kathleen Peyer, Susan Pierson-O'Hara, Bernadette Pignatello, Kenneth A Pignatello, Carmen Y Polanco, Jose M Polanco, Carolyn B Press, David R Press, Eileen Price, Paul Price, David S Purvis, Thomas Reddy, Charles Robertson, Craig R Rodby, Robert Rodriguez, Charles S Roll, Marilyn Roll, Marcy D Rookey, Ronald J Rookey, Henry T Satt, Mary Anne Satt, Karen Schembre, Carolyn Schrock, Robert D Schrock, Jr., Diane K Schwartz, Edward S Schwartz, James Senn, Susan Senn, William Shain, Gene Silverman, Stanley Silverman, Robert A Staehle, Mark Stevens, Tracey Stevens, Myriam C Strauss, Linda Strohmeyer, John A Taylor, Karen M Taylor, Benjamin H Ticknor, Antonella Trisolino, Brigitte Tutschka, Sharon Van de Grift, Christopher Volpe, Athol L Wallace, Jill A Wallace, Laura C Warnock, Thomas C Warnock, Laurene Weaver, Andreas Weber, Kathleen L Weber, Susan Weir, Walter J Weir, Richard Weiss, David Wichers, Anne K Woodson, Thomas S Woodson, Michael Worsham, George M Worton, Rosanne E Worton, Arlo Young, Irene I Young, Neil D Young, Richard Zierdt, Michael J Zimmerman, Paul deWitt..(Zimmerman, Jean-Marc)
September 4, 2020 Filing 35 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Scott L. Lager, re: #17 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Charles R Acklin, Maribel Acutanza, Philip D Acutanza, Rachelle Adler, Scott Adler, Jatinder K Aggarwal, Sunil Aggarwal, Carolyn Allen, Carmelo Alu, Linda Alu, Joan A Beutler, Rodney M Bickford, Lois A Biello, Robert A Biello, Nicholas P Bigotti, Arla Bowers, Larry A Bowers, Robert R Burg, Michelle N Cabay, William Calamoneri, Deborah Carbo, Joseph M Carbo, Antoinette Castellano, George Castellano, Patricia Chen Feng, Wade Chilcoat, Gina C Chung, Albert M Clark, Laurel M Clark, Susan A Clark, Bonny K Collins, Rollin P Collins, Elizabeth Conwell, Judith Cooper, Joseph Coreno, Michelle Coreno, Carol A Dahir, Burt Danovitz, Patricia H Dayan, Raymond Dayan, Richard S Dillon, Susan H Dillon, John E Ditchburn, Lynne Ditchburn, Dana C Drew, Shapiro K Elaine, Bennett L Errol, Freda Feldman, Sidney T Feldman, Alexandra Feng, Joseph K Ferrara, Nancy A Ferrara, Rebecca Fitzmaurice, David W Foote, Andrea V Franklin, Daniel J Franklin, Linda Gagne, Janine Getek, Pamela P Gethard, Donna C Getreuer, Thomas R Getreuer, Lauren Gibaldi, Marriann T Gofonia, Robert D Gofonia, Linda Golay, Gerald N Goldman, Lucille Graessle, Kurt Grimm, Margaret A Grimm, Judith Grossman, Neil J Grossman, Mark Grunewald, Sally Grunewald, Katherine A Hayden, Janet H Hebert, Michael D Hebert, Karl Hess, Linda M Hooks, John D Houle, Mark D Hughes, Michelle R Hughes, Anne P Iverson, Melissa Jessup, Gregory P Johnson, Nancy A Johnson, Gail E Jordan, Paul A Jordan, Ulla P Jordan, Jerome D Kaplan, Patricia V Kaplan, Susan Kaplan, Sylwia Karwowska, Audrey Kaufman, Curtis Kautzer, Marilyn Kautzer, Mary Ann Kichline, Dale R Kichline, Jr., Nikolas Kontomanolis, Pauline Kontomanolis, Penny Kress Zimmerman, Carol C Kuhlthau, John S Kuhlthau, Camille Kurtz, Christine Lally, Thomas R Lally, Larry Lasker, Roger S Lichtman, Joseph A Magliato, Robin Magliato, David R Mann, Suzanne C Mann, Cynthia L Mapes, Joseph D Mapes, Richard J Marriott, Shirley Marriott, Cheryl D Marsh, Janet K Marth, Robert D Marth, Brian P McCue, Lucille M McCue, Jean McEwen Rodby, Charles McMonigle, Kathy McMonigle, Nikki Mcnicol, John Mikesh, Carol Miller, Robert C Miller, Deborah L Monlux, James R Moore III, Aretta B Muir, James D Muir, Charles J Neumann, Priscilla J Neumann, Paul Nisselle, Patrick O'Hara, Dennis O'Malley, Suzanne L O'Malley, Susan O'Neill, Joan H Orr, Gary J Paccagnini, Karen L Paccagnini, Deborah Lee Peters, Alexander K Peyer, Kathleen Peyer, Susan Pierson-O'Hara, Bernadette Pignatello, Kenneth A Pignatello, Carmen Y Polanco, Jose M Polanco, Carolyn B Press, David R Press, Eileen Price, Paul Price, David S Purvis, Thomas Reddy, Charles Robertson, Craig R Rodby, Robert Rodriguez, Charles S Roll, Marilyn Roll, Marcy D Rookey, Ronald J Rookey, Henry T Satt, Mary Anne Satt, Karen Schembre, Carolyn Schrock, Robert D Schrock, Jr., Diane K Schwartz, Edward S Schwartz, James Senn, Susan Senn, William Shain, Gene Silverman, Stanley Silverman, Robert A Staehle, Mark Stevens, Tracey Stevens, Myriam C Strauss, Linda Strohmeyer, John A Taylor, Karen M Taylor, Benjamin H Ticknor, Antonella Trisolino, Brigitte Tutschka, Sharon Van de Grift, Christopher Volpe, Athol L Wallace, Jill A Wallace, Laura C Warnock, Thomas C Warnock, Laurene Weaver, Andreas Weber, Kathleen L Weber, Susan Weir, Walter J Weir, Richard Weiss, David Wichers, Anne K Woodson, Thomas S Woodson, Michael Worsham, George M Worton, Rosanne E Worton, Arlo Young, Irene I Young, Neil D Young, Richard Zierdt, Michael J Zimmerman, Paul deWitt..(Zimmerman, Jean-Marc)
September 4, 2020 Filing 34 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Park Central Management LLC, re: #17 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Charles R Acklin, Maribel Acutanza, Philip D Acutanza, Rachelle Adler, Scott Adler, Jatinder K Aggarwal, Sunil Aggarwal, Carolyn Allen, Carmelo Alu, Linda Alu, Joan A Beutler, Rodney M Bickford, Lois A Biello, Robert A Biello, Nicholas P Bigotti, Arla Bowers, Larry A Bowers, Robert R Burg, Michelle N Cabay, William Calamoneri, Deborah Carbo, Joseph M Carbo, Antoinette Castellano, George Castellano, Patricia Chen Feng, Wade Chilcoat, Gina C Chung, Albert M Clark, Laurel M Clark, Susan A Clark, Bonny K Collins, Rollin P Collins, Elizabeth Conwell, Judith Cooper, Joseph Coreno, Michelle Coreno, Carol A Dahir, Burt Danovitz, Patricia H Dayan, Raymond Dayan, Richard S Dillon, Susan H Dillon, John E Ditchburn, Lynne Ditchburn, Dana C Drew, Shapiro K Elaine, Bennett L Errol, Freda Feldman, Sidney T Feldman, Alexandra Feng, Joseph K Ferrara, Nancy A Ferrara, Rebecca Fitzmaurice, David W Foote, Andrea V Franklin, Daniel J Franklin, Linda Gagne, Janine Getek, Pamela P Gethard, Donna C Getreuer, Thomas R Getreuer, Lauren Gibaldi, Marriann T Gofonia, Robert D Gofonia, Linda Golay, Gerald N Goldman, Lucille Graessle, Kurt Grimm, Margaret A Grimm, Judith Grossman, Neil J Grossman, Mark Grunewald, Sally Grunewald, Katherine A Hayden, Janet H Hebert, Michael D Hebert, Karl Hess, Linda M Hooks, John D Houle, Mark D Hughes, Michelle R Hughes, Anne P Iverson, Melissa Jessup, Gregory P Johnson, Nancy A Johnson, Gail E Jordan, Paul A Jordan, Ulla P Jordan, Jerome D Kaplan, Patricia V Kaplan, Susan Kaplan, Sylwia Karwowska, Audrey Kaufman, Curtis Kautzer, Marilyn Kautzer, Mary Ann Kichline, Dale R Kichline, Jr., Nikolas Kontomanolis, Pauline Kontomanolis, Penny Kress Zimmerman, Carol C Kuhlthau, John S Kuhlthau, Camille Kurtz, Christine Lally, Thomas R Lally, Larry Lasker, Roger S Lichtman, Joseph A Magliato, Robin Magliato, David R Mann, Suzanne C Mann, Cynthia L Mapes, Joseph D Mapes, Richard J Marriott, Shirley Marriott, Cheryl D Marsh, Janet K Marth, Robert D Marth, Brian P McCue, Lucille M McCue, Jean McEwen Rodby, Charles McMonigle, Kathy McMonigle, Nikki Mcnicol, John Mikesh, Carol Miller, Robert C Miller, Deborah L Monlux, James R Moore III, Aretta B Muir, James D Muir, Charles J Neumann, Priscilla J Neumann, Paul Nisselle, Patrick O'Hara, Dennis O'Malley, Suzanne L O'Malley, Susan O'Neill, Joan H Orr, Gary J Paccagnini, Karen L Paccagnini, Deborah Lee Peters, Alexander K Peyer, Kathleen Peyer, Susan Pierson-O'Hara, Bernadette Pignatello, Kenneth A Pignatello, Carmen Y Polanco, Jose M Polanco, Carolyn B Press, David R Press, Eileen Price, Paul Price, David S Purvis, Thomas Reddy, Charles Robertson, Craig R Rodby, Robert Rodriguez, Charles S Roll, Marilyn Roll, Marcy D Rookey, Ronald J Rookey, Henry T Satt, Mary Anne Satt, Karen Schembre, Carolyn Schrock, Robert D Schrock, Jr., Diane K Schwartz, Edward S Schwartz, James Senn, Susan Senn, William Shain, Gene Silverman, Stanley Silverman, Robert A Staehle, Mark Stevens, Tracey Stevens, Myriam C Strauss, Linda Strohmeyer, John A Taylor, Karen M Taylor, Benjamin H Ticknor, Antonella Trisolino, Brigitte Tutschka, Sharon Van de Grift, Christopher Volpe, Athol L Wallace, Jill A Wallace, Laura C Warnock, Thomas C Warnock, Laurene Weaver, Andreas Weber, Kathleen L Weber, Susan Weir, Walter J Weir, Richard Weiss, David Wichers, Anne K Woodson, Thomas S Woodson, Michael Worsham, George M Worton, Rosanne E Worton, Arlo Young, Irene I Young, Neil D Young, Richard Zierdt, Michael J Zimmerman, Paul deWitt..(Zimmerman, Jean-Marc)
September 4, 2020 Filing 33 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to O. Park Central LLC, re: #17 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Charles R Acklin, Maribel Acutanza, Philip D Acutanza, Rachelle Adler, Scott Adler, Jatinder K Aggarwal, Sunil Aggarwal, Carolyn Allen, Carmelo Alu, Linda Alu, Joan A Beutler, Rodney M Bickford, Lois A Biello, Robert A Biello, Nicholas P Bigotti, Arla Bowers, Larry A Bowers, Robert R Burg, Michelle N Cabay, William Calamoneri, Deborah Carbo, Joseph M Carbo, Antoinette Castellano, George Castellano, Patricia Chen Feng, Wade Chilcoat, Gina C Chung, Albert M Clark, Laurel M Clark, Susan A Clark, Bonny K Collins, Rollin P Collins, Elizabeth Conwell, Judith Cooper, Joseph Coreno, Michelle Coreno, Carol A Dahir, Burt Danovitz, Patricia H Dayan, Raymond Dayan, Richard S Dillon, Susan H Dillon, John E Ditchburn, Lynne Ditchburn, Dana C Drew, Shapiro K Elaine, Bennett L Errol, Freda Feldman, Sidney T Feldman, Alexandra Feng, Joseph K Ferrara, Nancy A Ferrara, Rebecca Fitzmaurice, David W Foote, Andrea V Franklin, Daniel J Franklin, Linda Gagne, Janine Getek, Pamela P Gethard, Donna C Getreuer, Thomas R Getreuer, Lauren Gibaldi, Marriann T Gofonia, Robert D Gofonia, Linda Golay, Gerald N Goldman, Lucille Graessle, Kurt Grimm, Margaret A Grimm, Judith Grossman, Neil J Grossman, Mark Grunewald, Sally Grunewald, Katherine A Hayden, Janet H Hebert, Michael D Hebert, Karl Hess, Linda M Hooks, John D Houle, Mark D Hughes, Michelle R Hughes, Anne P Iverson, Melissa Jessup, Gregory P Johnson, Nancy A Johnson, Gail E Jordan, Paul A Jordan, Ulla P Jordan, Jerome D Kaplan, Patricia V Kaplan, Susan Kaplan, Sylwia Karwowska, Audrey Kaufman, Curtis Kautzer, Marilyn Kautzer, Mary Ann Kichline, Dale R Kichline, Jr., Nikolas Kontomanolis, Pauline Kontomanolis, Penny Kress Zimmerman, Carol C Kuhlthau, John S Kuhlthau, Camille Kurtz, Christine Lally, Thomas R Lally, Larry Lasker, Roger S Lichtman, Joseph A Magliato, Robin Magliato, David R Mann, Suzanne C Mann, Cynthia L Mapes, Joseph D Mapes, Richard J Marriott, Shirley Marriott, Cheryl D Marsh, Janet K Marth, Robert D Marth, Brian P McCue, Lucille M McCue, Jean McEwen Rodby, Charles McMonigle, Kathy McMonigle, Nikki Mcnicol, John Mikesh, Carol Miller, Robert C Miller, Deborah L Monlux, James R Moore III, Aretta B Muir, James D Muir, Charles J Neumann, Priscilla J Neumann, Paul Nisselle, Patrick O'Hara, Dennis O'Malley, Suzanne L O'Malley, Susan O'Neill, Joan H Orr, Gary J Paccagnini, Karen L Paccagnini, Deborah Lee Peters, Alexander K Peyer, Kathleen Peyer, Susan Pierson-O'Hara, Bernadette Pignatello, Kenneth A Pignatello, Carmen Y Polanco, Jose M Polanco, Carolyn B Press, David R Press, Eileen Price, Paul Price, David S Purvis, Thomas Reddy, Charles Robertson, Craig R Rodby, Robert Rodriguez, Charles S Roll, Marilyn Roll, Marcy D Rookey, Ronald J Rookey, Henry T Satt, Mary Anne Satt, Karen Schembre, Carolyn Schrock, Robert D Schrock, Jr., Diane K Schwartz, Edward S Schwartz, James Senn, Susan Senn, William Shain, Gene Silverman, Stanley Silverman, Robert A Staehle, Mark Stevens, Tracey Stevens, Myriam C Strauss, Linda Strohmeyer, John A Taylor, Karen M Taylor, Benjamin H Ticknor, Antonella Trisolino, Brigitte Tutschka, Sharon Van de Grift, Christopher Volpe, Athol L Wallace, Jill A Wallace, Laura C Warnock, Thomas C Warnock, Laurene Weaver, Andreas Weber, Kathleen L Weber, Susan Weir, Walter J Weir, Richard Weiss, David Wichers, Anne K Woodson, Thomas S Woodson, Michael Worsham, George M Worton, Rosanne E Worton, Arlo Young, Irene I Young, Neil D Young, Richard Zierdt, Michael J Zimmerman, Paul deWitt..(Zimmerman, Jean-Marc)
September 4, 2020 Filing 32 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to T. Park Central LLC, re: #17 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Charles R Acklin, Maribel Acutanza, Philip D Acutanza, Rachelle Adler, Scott Adler, Jatinder K Aggarwal, Sunil Aggarwal, Carolyn Allen, Carmelo Alu, Linda Alu, Joan A Beutler, Rodney M Bickford, Lois A Biello, Robert A Biello, Nicholas P Bigotti, Arla Bowers, Larry A Bowers, Robert R Burg, Michelle N Cabay, William Calamoneri, Deborah Carbo, Joseph M Carbo, Antoinette Castellano, George Castellano, Patricia Chen Feng, Wade Chilcoat, Gina C Chung, Albert M Clark, Laurel M Clark, Susan A Clark, Bonny K Collins, Rollin P Collins, Elizabeth Conwell, Judith Cooper, Joseph Coreno, Michelle Coreno, Carol A Dahir, Burt Danovitz, Patricia H Dayan, Raymond Dayan, Richard S Dillon, Susan H Dillon, John E Ditchburn, Lynne Ditchburn, Dana C Drew, Shapiro K Elaine, Bennett L Errol, Freda Feldman, Sidney T Feldman, Alexandra Feng, Joseph K Ferrara, Nancy A Ferrara, Rebecca Fitzmaurice, David W Foote, Andrea V Franklin, Daniel J Franklin, Linda Gagne, Janine Getek, Pamela P Gethard, Donna C Getreuer, Thomas R Getreuer, Lauren Gibaldi, Marriann T Gofonia, Robert D Gofonia, Linda Golay, Gerald N Goldman, Lucille Graessle, Kurt Grimm, Margaret A Grimm, Judith Grossman, Neil J Grossman, Mark Grunewald, Sally Grunewald, Katherine A Hayden, Janet H Hebert, Michael D Hebert, Karl Hess, Linda M Hooks, John D Houle, Mark D Hughes, Michelle R Hughes, Anne P Iverson, Melissa Jessup, Gregory P Johnson, Nancy A Johnson, Gail E Jordan, Paul A Jordan, Ulla P Jordan, Jerome D Kaplan, Patricia V Kaplan, Susan Kaplan, Sylwia Karwowska, Audrey Kaufman, Curtis Kautzer, Marilyn Kautzer, Mary Ann Kichline, Dale R Kichline, Jr., Nikolas Kontomanolis, Pauline Kontomanolis, Penny Kress Zimmerman, Carol C Kuhlthau, John S Kuhlthau, Camille Kurtz, Christine Lally, Thomas R Lally, Larry Lasker, Roger S Lichtman, Joseph A Magliato, Robin Magliato, David R Mann, Suzanne C Mann, Cynthia L Mapes, Joseph D Mapes, Richard J Marriott, Shirley Marriott, Cheryl D Marsh, Janet K Marth, Robert D Marth, Brian P McCue, Lucille M McCue, Jean McEwen Rodby, Charles McMonigle, Kathy McMonigle, Nikki Mcnicol, John Mikesh, Carol Miller, Robert C Miller, Deborah L Monlux, James R Moore III, Aretta B Muir, James D Muir, Charles J Neumann, Priscilla J Neumann, Paul Nisselle, Patrick O'Hara, Dennis O'Malley, Suzanne L O'Malley, Susan O'Neill, Joan H Orr, Gary J Paccagnini, Karen L Paccagnini, Deborah Lee Peters, Alexander K Peyer, Kathleen Peyer, Susan Pierson-O'Hara, Bernadette Pignatello, Kenneth A Pignatello, Carmen Y Polanco, Jose M Polanco, Carolyn B Press, David R Press, Eileen Price, Paul Price, David S Purvis, Thomas Reddy, Charles Robertson, Craig R Rodby, Robert Rodriguez, Charles S Roll, Marilyn Roll, Marcy D Rookey, Ronald J Rookey, Henry T Satt, Mary Anne Satt, Karen Schembre, Carolyn Schrock, Robert D Schrock, Jr., Diane K Schwartz, Edward S Schwartz, James Senn, Susan Senn, William Shain, Gene Silverman, Stanley Silverman, Robert A Staehle, Mark Stevens, Tracey Stevens, Myriam C Strauss, Linda Strohmeyer, John A Taylor, Karen M Taylor, Benjamin H Ticknor, Antonella Trisolino, Brigitte Tutschka, Sharon Van de Grift, Christopher Volpe, Athol L Wallace, Jill A Wallace, Laura C Warnock, Thomas C Warnock, Laurene Weaver, Andreas Weber, Kathleen L Weber, Susan Weir, Walter J Weir, Richard Weiss, David Wichers, Anne K Woodson, Thomas S Woodson, Michael Worsham, George M Worton, Rosanne E Worton, Arlo Young, Irene I Young, Neil D Young, Richard Zierdt, Michael J Zimmerman, Paul deWitt..(Zimmerman, Jean-Marc)
September 4, 2020 Filing 31 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Stuart Eichner, re: #17 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Charles R Acklin, Maribel Acutanza, Philip D Acutanza, Rachelle Adler, Scott Adler, Jatinder K Aggarwal, Sunil Aggarwal, Carolyn Allen, Carmelo Alu, Linda Alu, Joan A Beutler, Rodney M Bickford, Lois A Biello, Robert A Biello, Nicholas P Bigotti, Arla Bowers, Larry A Bowers, Robert R Burg, Michelle N Cabay, William Calamoneri, Deborah Carbo, Joseph M Carbo, Antoinette Castellano, George Castellano, Patricia Chen Feng, Wade Chilcoat, Gina C Chung, Albert M Clark, Laurel M Clark, Susan A Clark, Bonny K Collins, Rollin P Collins, Elizabeth Conwell, Judith Cooper, Joseph Coreno, Michelle Coreno, Carol A Dahir, Burt Danovitz, Patricia H Dayan, Raymond Dayan, Richard S Dillon, Susan H Dillon, John E Ditchburn, Lynne Ditchburn, Dana C Drew, Shapiro K Elaine, Bennett L Errol, Freda Feldman, Sidney T Feldman, Alexandra Feng, Joseph K Ferrara, Nancy A Ferrara, Rebecca Fitzmaurice, David W Foote, Andrea V Franklin, Daniel J Franklin, Linda Gagne, Janine Getek, Pamela P Gethard, Donna C Getreuer, Thomas R Getreuer, Lauren Gibaldi, Marriann T Gofonia, Robert D Gofonia, Linda Golay, Gerald N Goldman, Lucille Graessle, Kurt Grimm, Margaret A Grimm, Judith Grossman, Neil J Grossman, Mark Grunewald, Sally Grunewald, Katherine A Hayden, Janet H Hebert, Michael D Hebert, Karl Hess, Linda M Hooks, John D Houle, Mark D Hughes, Michelle R Hughes, Anne P Iverson, Melissa Jessup, Gregory P Johnson, Nancy A Johnson, Gail E Jordan, Paul A Jordan, Ulla P Jordan, Jerome D Kaplan, Patricia V Kaplan, Susan Kaplan, Sylwia Karwowska, Audrey Kaufman, Curtis Kautzer, Marilyn Kautzer, Mary Ann Kichline, Dale R Kichline, Jr., Nikolas Kontomanolis, Pauline Kontomanolis, Penny Kress Zimmerman, Carol C Kuhlthau, John S Kuhlthau, Camille Kurtz, Christine Lally, Thomas R Lally, Larry Lasker, Roger S Lichtman, Joseph A Magliato, Robin Magliato, David R Mann, Suzanne C Mann, Cynthia L Mapes, Joseph D Mapes, Richard J Marriott, Shirley Marriott, Cheryl D Marsh, Janet K Marth, Robert D Marth, Brian P McCue, Lucille M McCue, Jean McEwen Rodby, Charles McMonigle, Kathy McMonigle, Nikki Mcnicol, John Mikesh, Carol Miller, Robert C Miller, Deborah L Monlux, James R Moore III, Aretta B Muir, James D Muir, Charles J Neumann, Priscilla J Neumann, Paul Nisselle, Patrick O'Hara, Dennis O'Malley, Suzanne L O'Malley, Susan O'Neill, Joan H Orr, Gary J Paccagnini, Karen L Paccagnini, Deborah Lee Peters, Alexander K Peyer, Kathleen Peyer, Susan Pierson-O'Hara, Bernadette Pignatello, Kenneth A Pignatello, Carmen Y Polanco, Jose M Polanco, Carolyn B Press, David R Press, Eileen Price, Paul Price, David S Purvis, Thomas Reddy, Charles Robertson, Craig R Rodby, Robert Rodriguez, Charles S Roll, Marilyn Roll, Marcy D Rookey, Ronald J Rookey, Henry T Satt, Mary Anne Satt, Karen Schembre, Carolyn Schrock, Robert D Schrock, Jr., Diane K Schwartz, Edward S Schwartz, James Senn, Susan Senn, William Shain, Gene Silverman, Stanley Silverman, Robert A Staehle, Mark Stevens, Tracey Stevens, Myriam C Strauss, Linda Strohmeyer, John A Taylor, Karen M Taylor, Benjamin H Ticknor, Antonella Trisolino, Brigitte Tutschka, Sharon Van de Grift, Christopher Volpe, Athol L Wallace, Jill A Wallace, Laura C Warnock, Thomas C Warnock, Laurene Weaver, Andreas Weber, Kathleen L Weber, Susan Weir, Walter J Weir, Richard Weiss, David Wichers, Anne K Woodson, Thomas S Woodson, Michael Worsham, George M Worton, Rosanne E Worton, Arlo Young, Irene I Young, Neil D Young, Richard Zierdt, Michael J Zimmerman, Paul deWitt..(Zimmerman, Jean-Marc) Modified on 9/8/2020 (dnh).
September 4, 2020 Filing 30 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Leslie Eichner, re: #17 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Charles R Acklin, Maribel Acutanza, Philip D Acutanza, Rachelle Adler, Scott Adler, Jatinder K Aggarwal, Sunil Aggarwal, Carolyn Allen, Carmelo Alu, Linda Alu, Joan A Beutler, Rodney M Bickford, Lois A Biello, Robert A Biello, Nicholas P Bigotti, Arla Bowers, Larry A Bowers, Robert R Burg, Michelle N Cabay, William Calamoneri, Deborah Carbo, Joseph M Carbo, Antoinette Castellano, George Castellano, Patricia Chen Feng, Wade Chilcoat, Gina C Chung, Albert M Clark, Laurel M Clark, Susan A Clark, Bonny K Collins, Rollin P Collins, Elizabeth Conwell, Judith Cooper, Joseph Coreno, Michelle Coreno, Carol A Dahir, Burt Danovitz, Patricia H Dayan, Raymond Dayan, Richard S Dillon, Susan H Dillon, John E Ditchburn, Lynne Ditchburn, Dana C Drew, Shapiro K Elaine, Bennett L Errol, Freda Feldman, Sidney T Feldman, Alexandra Feng, Joseph K Ferrara, Nancy A Ferrara, Rebecca Fitzmaurice, David W Foote, Andrea V Franklin, Daniel J Franklin, Linda Gagne, Janine Getek, Pamela P Gethard, Donna C Getreuer, Thomas R Getreuer, Lauren Gibaldi, Marriann T Gofonia, Robert D Gofonia, Linda Golay, Gerald N Goldman, Lucille Graessle, Kurt Grimm, Margaret A Grimm, Judith Grossman, Neil J Grossman, Mark Grunewald, Sally Grunewald, Katherine A Hayden, Janet H Hebert, Michael D Hebert, Karl Hess, Linda M Hooks, John D Houle, Mark D Hughes, Michelle R Hughes, Anne P Iverson, Melissa Jessup, Gregory P Johnson, Nancy A Johnson, Gail E Jordan, Paul A Jordan, Ulla P Jordan, Jerome D Kaplan, Patricia V Kaplan, Susan Kaplan, Sylwia Karwowska, Audrey Kaufman, Curtis Kautzer, Marilyn Kautzer, Mary Ann Kichline, Dale R Kichline, Jr., Nikolas Kontomanolis, Pauline Kontomanolis, Penny Kress Zimmerman, Carol C Kuhlthau, John S Kuhlthau, Camille Kurtz, Christine Lally, Thomas R Lally, Larry Lasker, Roger S Lichtman, Joseph A Magliato, Robin Magliato, David R Mann, Suzanne C Mann, Cynthia L Mapes, Joseph D Mapes, Richard J Marriott, Shirley Marriott, Cheryl D Marsh, Janet K Marth, Robert D Marth, Brian P McCue, Lucille M McCue, Jean McEwen Rodby, Charles McMonigle, Kathy McMonigle, Nikki Mcnicol, John Mikesh, Carol Miller, Robert C Miller, Deborah L Monlux, James R Moore III, Aretta B Muir, James D Muir, Charles J Neumann, Priscilla J Neumann, Paul Nisselle, Patrick O'Hara, Dennis O'Malley, Suzanne L O'Malley, Susan O'Neill, Joan H Orr, Gary J Paccagnini, Karen L Paccagnini, Deborah Lee Peters, Alexander K Peyer, Kathleen Peyer, Susan Pierson-O'Hara, Bernadette Pignatello, Kenneth A Pignatello, Carmen Y Polanco, Jose M Polanco, Carolyn B Press, David R Press, Eileen Price, Paul Price, David S Purvis, Thomas Reddy, Charles Robertson, Craig R Rodby, Robert Rodriguez, Charles S Roll, Marilyn Roll, Marcy D Rookey, Ronald J Rookey, Henry T Satt, Mary Anne Satt, Karen Schembre, Carolyn Schrock, Robert D Schrock, Jr., Diane K Schwartz, Edward S Schwartz, James Senn, Susan Senn, William Shain, Gene Silverman, Stanley Silverman, Robert A Staehle, Mark Stevens, Tracey Stevens, Myriam C Strauss, Linda Strohmeyer, John A Taylor, Karen M Taylor, Benjamin H Ticknor, Antonella Trisolino, Brigitte Tutschka, Sharon Van de Grift, Christopher Volpe, Athol L Wallace, Jill A Wallace, Laura C Warnock, Thomas C Warnock, Laurene Weaver, Andreas Weber, Kathleen L Weber, Susan Weir, Walter J Weir, Richard Weiss, David Wichers, Anne K Woodson, Thomas S Woodson, Michael Worsham, George M Worton, Rosanne E Worton, Arlo Young, Irene I Young, Neil D Young, Richard Zierdt, Michael J Zimmerman, Paul deWitt..(Zimmerman, Jean-Marc) Modified on 9/8/2020 (dnh).
September 4, 2020 Filing 29 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Ian Bruce Eichner, re: #17 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Charles R Acklin, Maribel Acutanza, Philip D Acutanza, Rachelle Adler, Scott Adler, Jatinder K Aggarwal, Sunil Aggarwal, Carolyn Allen, Carmelo Alu, Linda Alu, Joan A Beutler, Rodney M Bickford, Lois A Biello, Robert A Biello, Nicholas P Bigotti, Arla Bowers, Larry A Bowers, Robert R Burg, Michelle N Cabay, William Calamoneri, Deborah Carbo, Joseph M Carbo, Antoinette Castellano, George Castellano, Patricia Chen Feng, Wade Chilcoat, Gina C Chung, Albert M Clark, Laurel M Clark, Susan A Clark, Bonny K Collins, Rollin P Collins, Elizabeth Conwell, Judith Cooper, Joseph Coreno, Michelle Coreno, Carol A Dahir, Burt Danovitz, Patricia H Dayan, Raymond Dayan, Richard S Dillon, Susan H Dillon, John E Ditchburn, Lynne Ditchburn, Dana C Drew, Shapiro K Elaine, Bennett L Errol, Freda Feldman, Sidney T Feldman, Alexandra Feng, Joseph K Ferrara, Nancy A Ferrara, Rebecca Fitzmaurice, David W Foote, Andrea V Franklin, Daniel J Franklin, Linda Gagne, Janine Getek, Pamela P Gethard, Donna C Getreuer, Thomas R Getreuer, Lauren Gibaldi, Marriann T Gofonia, Robert D Gofonia, Linda Golay, Gerald N Goldman, Lucille Graessle, Kurt Grimm, Margaret A Grimm, Judith Grossman, Neil J Grossman, Mark Grunewald, Sally Grunewald, Katherine A Hayden, Janet H Hebert, Michael D Hebert, Karl Hess, Linda M Hooks, John D Houle, Mark D Hughes, Michelle R Hughes, Anne P Iverson, Melissa Jessup, Gregory P Johnson, Nancy A Johnson, Gail E Jordan, Paul A Jordan, Ulla P Jordan, Jerome D Kaplan, Patricia V Kaplan, Susan Kaplan, Sylwia Karwowska, Audrey Kaufman, Curtis Kautzer, Marilyn Kautzer, Mary Ann Kichline, Dale R Kichline, Jr., Nikolas Kontomanolis, Pauline Kontomanolis, Penny Kress Zimmerman, Carol C Kuhlthau, John S Kuhlthau, Camille Kurtz, Christine Lally, Thomas R Lally, Larry Lasker, Roger S Lichtman, Joseph A Magliato, Robin Magliato, David R Mann, Suzanne C Mann, Cynthia L Mapes, Joseph D Mapes, Richard J Marriott, Shirley Marriott, Cheryl D Marsh, Janet K Marth, Robert D Marth, Brian P McCue, Lucille M McCue, Jean McEwen Rodby, Charles McMonigle, Kathy McMonigle, Nikki Mcnicol, John Mikesh, Carol Miller, Robert C Miller, Deborah L Monlux, James R Moore III, Aretta B Muir, James D Muir, Charles J Neumann, Priscilla J Neumann, Paul Nisselle, Patrick O'Hara, Dennis O'Malley, Suzanne L O'Malley, Susan O'Neill, Joan H Orr, Gary J Paccagnini, Karen L Paccagnini, Deborah Lee Peters, Alexander K Peyer, Kathleen Peyer, Susan Pierson-O'Hara, Bernadette Pignatello, Kenneth A Pignatello, Carmen Y Polanco, Jose M Polanco, Carolyn B Press, David R Press, Eileen Price, Paul Price, David S Purvis, Thomas Reddy, Charles Robertson, Craig R Rodby, Robert Rodriguez, Charles S Roll, Marilyn Roll, Marcy D Rookey, Ronald J Rookey, Henry T Satt, Mary Anne Satt, Karen Schembre, Carolyn Schrock, Robert D Schrock, Jr., Diane K Schwartz, Edward S Schwartz, James Senn, Susan Senn, William Shain, Gene Silverman, Stanley Silverman, Robert A Staehle, Mark Stevens, Tracey Stevens, Myriam C Strauss, Linda Strohmeyer, John A Taylor, Karen M Taylor, Benjamin H Ticknor, Antonella Trisolino, Brigitte Tutschka, Sharon Van de Grift, Christopher Volpe, Athol L Wallace, Jill A Wallace, Laura C Warnock, Thomas C Warnock, Laurene Weaver, Andreas Weber, Kathleen L Weber, Susan Weir, Walter J Weir, Richard Weiss, David Wichers, Anne K Woodson, Thomas S Woodson, Michael Worsham, George M Worton, Rosanne E Worton, Arlo Young, Irene I Young, Neil D Young, Richard Zierdt, Michael J Zimmerman, Paul deWitt..(Zimmerman, Jean-Marc)
September 4, 2020 Filing 28 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to BlueGreen Vacations Unlimited Inc...(gp)
September 3, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Jean-Marc Zimmerman to RE-FILE Document No. #20 Request for Issuance of Summons, #21 Request for Issuance of Summons, #23 Request for Issuance of Summons, #26 Request for Issuance of Summons, #18 Request for Issuance of Summons, #19 Request for Issuance of Summons, #22 Request for Issuance of Summons, #24 Request for Issuance of Summons, #25 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the form used for the summons is not the CORRECT A.O. Summons in a civil case form. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj)
September 3, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
September 3, 2020 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
September 3, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Gregory H. Woods. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
September 3, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Jean-Marc Zimmerman. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (sj)
September 2, 2020 Filing 27 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to BlueGreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc., re: #17 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Charles R Acklin, Maribel Acutanza, Philip D Acutanza, Rachelle Adler, Scott Adler, Jatinder K Aggarwal, Sunil Aggarwal, Carolyn Allen, Carmelo Alu, Linda Alu, Joan A Beutler, Rodney M Bickford, Lois A Biello, Robert A Biello, Nicholas P Bigotti, Arla Bowers, Larry A Bowers, Robert R Burg, Michelle N Cabay, William Calamoneri, Deborah Carbo, Joseph M Carbo, Antoinette Castellano, George Castellano, Patricia Chen Feng, Wade Chilcoat, Gina C Chung, Albert M Clark, Laurel M Clark, Susan A Clark, Bonny K Collins, Rollin P Collins, Elizabeth Conwell, Judith Cooper, Joseph Coreno, Michelle Coreno, Carol A Dahir, Burt Danovitz, Patricia H Dayan, Raymond Dayan, Richard S Dillon, Susan H Dillon, John E Ditchburn, Lynne Ditchburn, Dana C Drew, Shapiro K Elaine, Bennett L Errol, Freda Feldman, Sidney T Feldman, Alexandra Feng, Joseph K Ferrara, Nancy A Ferrara, Rebecca Fitzmaurice, David W Foote, Andrea V Franklin, Daniel J Franklin, Linda Gagne, Janine Getek, Pamela P Gethard, Donna C Getreuer, Thomas R Getreuer, Lauren Gibaldi, Marriann T Gofonia, Robert D Gofonia, Linda Golay, Gerald N Goldman, Lucille Graessle, Kurt Grimm, Margaret A Grimm, Judith Grossman, Neil J Grossman, Mark Grunewald, Sally Grunewald, Katherine A Hayden, Janet H Hebert, Michael D Hebert, Karl Hess, Linda M Hooks, John D Houle, Mark D Hughes, Michelle R Hughes, Anne P Iverson, Melissa Jessup, Gregory P Johnson, Nancy A Johnson, Gail E Jordan, Paul A Jordan, Ulla P Jordan, Jerome D Kaplan, Patricia V Kaplan, Susan Kaplan, Sylwia Karwowska, Audrey Kaufman, Curtis Kautzer, Marilyn Kautzer, Mary Ann Kichline, Dale R Kichline, Jr., Nikolas Kontomanolis, Pauline Kontomanolis, Penny Kress Zimmerman, Carol C Kuhlthau, John S Kuhlthau, Camille Kurtz, Christine Lally, Thomas R Lally, Larry Lasker, Roger S Lichtman, Joseph A Magliato, Robin Magliato, David R Mann, Suzanne C Mann, Cynthia L Mapes, Joseph D Mapes, Richard J Marriott, Shirley Marriott, Cheryl D Marsh, Janet K Marth, Robert D Marth, Brian P McCue, Lucille M McCue, Jean McEwen Rodby, Charles McMonigle, Kathy McMonigle, Nikki Mcnicol, John Mikesh, Carol Miller, Robert C Miller, Deborah L Monlux, James R Moore III, Aretta B Muir, James D Muir, Charles J Neumann, Priscilla J Neumann, Paul Nisselle, Patrick O'Hara, Dennis O'Malley, Suzanne L O'Malley, Susan O'Neill, Joan H Orr, Gary J Paccagnini, Karen L Paccagnini, Deborah Lee Peters, Alexander K Peyer, Kathleen Peyer, Susan Pierson-O'Hara, Bernadette Pignatello, Kenneth A Pignatello, Carmen Y Polanco, Jose M Polanco, Carolyn B Press, David R Press, Eileen Price, Paul Price, David S Purvis, Thomas Reddy, Charles Robertson, Craig R Rodby, Robert Rodriguez, Charles S Roll, Marilyn Roll, Marcy D Rookey, Ronald J Rookey, Henry T Satt, Mary Anne Satt, Karen Schembre, Carolyn Schrock, Robert D Schrock, Jr., Diane K Schwartz, Edward S Schwartz, James Senn, Susan Senn, William Shain, Gene Silverman, Stanley Silverman, Robert A Staehle, Mark Stevens, Tracey Stevens, Myriam C Strauss, Linda Strohmeyer, John A Taylor, Karen M Taylor, Benjamin H Ticknor, Antonella Trisolino, Brigitte Tutschka, Sharon Van de Grift, Christopher Volpe, Athol L Wallace, Jill A Wallace, Laura C Warnock, Thomas C Warnock, Laurene Weaver, Andreas Weber, Kathleen L Weber, Susan Weir, Walter J Weir, Richard Weiss, David Wichers, Anne K Woodson, Thomas S Woodson, Michael Worsham, George M Worton, Rosanne E Worton, Arlo Young, Irene I Young, Neil D Young, Richard Zierdt, Michael J Zimmerman, Paul deWitt..(Zimmerman, Jean-Marc)
September 2, 2020 Filing 26 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to New York Urban Ownership Management, LLC, re: #17 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Charles R Acklin, Maribel Acutanza, Philip D Acutanza, Rachelle Adler, Scott Adler, Jatinder K Aggarwal, Sunil Aggarwal, Carolyn Allen, Carmelo Alu, Linda Alu, Joan A Beutler, Rodney M Bickford, Lois A Biello, Robert A Biello, Nicholas P Bigotti, Arla Bowers, Larry A Bowers, Robert R Burg, Michelle N Cabay, William Calamoneri, Deborah Carbo, Joseph M Carbo, Antoinette Castellano, George Castellano, Patricia Chen Feng, Wade Chilcoat, Gina C Chung, Albert M Clark, Laurel M Clark, Susan A Clark, Bonny K Collins, Rollin P Collins, Elizabeth Conwell, Judith Cooper, Joseph Coreno, Michelle Coreno, Carol A Dahir, Burt Danovitz, Patricia H Dayan, Raymond Dayan, Richard S Dillon, Susan H Dillon, John E Ditchburn, Lynne Ditchburn, Dana C Drew, Shapiro K Elaine, Bennett L Errol, Freda Feldman, Sidney T Feldman, Alexandra Feng, Joseph K Ferrara, Nancy A Ferrara, Rebecca Fitzmaurice, David W Foote, Andrea V Franklin, Daniel J Franklin, Linda Gagne, Janine Getek, Pamela P Gethard, Donna C Getreuer, Thomas R Getreuer, Lauren Gibaldi, Marriann T Gofonia, Robert D Gofonia, Linda Golay, Gerald N Goldman, Lucille Graessle, Kurt Grimm, Margaret A Grimm, Judith Grossman, Neil J Grossman, Mark Grunewald, Sally Grunewald, Katherine A Hayden, Janet H Hebert, Michael D Hebert, Karl Hess, Linda M Hooks, John D Houle, Mark D Hughes, Michelle R Hughes, Anne P Iverson, Melissa Jessup, Gregory P Johnson, Nancy A Johnson, Gail E Jordan, Paul A Jordan, Ulla P Jordan, Jerome D Kaplan, Patricia V Kaplan, Susan Kaplan, Sylwia Karwowska, Audrey Kaufman, Curtis Kautzer, Marilyn Kautzer, Mary Ann Kichline, Dale R Kichline, Jr., Nikolas Kontomanolis, Pauline Kontomanolis, Penny Kress Zimmerman, Carol C Kuhlthau, John S Kuhlthau, Camille Kurtz, Christine Lally, Thomas R Lally, Larry Lasker, Roger S Lichtman, Joseph A Magliato, Robin Magliato, David R Mann, Suzanne C Mann, Cynthia L Mapes, Joseph D Mapes, Richard J Marriott, Shirley Marriott, Cheryl D Marsh, Janet K Marth, Robert D Marth, Brian P McCue, Lucille M McCue, Jean McEwen Rodby, Charles McMonigle, Kathy McMonigle, Nikki Mcnicol, John Mikesh, Carol Miller, Robert C Miller, Deborah L Monlux, James R Moore III, Aretta B Muir, James D Muir, Charles J Neumann, Priscilla J Neumann, Paul Nisselle, Patrick O'Hara, Dennis O'Malley, Suzanne L O'Malley, Susan O'Neill, Joan H Orr, Gary J Paccagnini, Karen L Paccagnini, Deborah Lee Peters, Alexander K Peyer, Kathleen Peyer, Susan Pierson-O'Hara, Bernadette Pignatello, Kenneth A Pignatello, Carmen Y Polanco, Jose M Polanco, Carolyn B Press, David R Press, Eileen Price, Paul Price, David S Purvis, Thomas Reddy, Charles Robertson, Craig R Rodby, Robert Rodriguez, Charles S Roll, Marilyn Roll, Marcy D Rookey, Ronald J Rookey, Henry T Satt, Mary Anne Satt, Karen Schembre, Carolyn Schrock, Robert D Schrock, Jr., Diane K Schwartz, Edward S Schwartz, James Senn, Susan Senn, William Shain, Gene Silverman, Stanley Silverman, Robert A Staehle, Mark Stevens, Tracey Stevens, Myriam C Strauss, Linda Strohmeyer, John A Taylor, Karen M Taylor, Benjamin H Ticknor, Antonella Trisolino, Brigitte Tutschka, Sharon Van de Grift, Christopher Volpe, Athol L Wallace, Jill A Wallace, Laura C Warnock, Thomas C Warnock, Laurene Weaver, Andreas Weber, Kathleen L Weber, Susan Weir, Walter J Weir, Richard Weiss, David Wichers, Anne K Woodson, Thomas S Woodson, Michael Worsham, George M Worton, Rosanne E Worton, Arlo Young, Irene I Young, Neil D Young, Richard Zierdt, Michael J Zimmerman, Paul deWitt..(Zimmerman, Jean-Marc)
September 2, 2020 Filing 25 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Scott L. Lager, re: #17 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Charles R Acklin, Maribel Acutanza, Philip D Acutanza, Rachelle Adler, Scott Adler, Jatinder K Aggarwal, Sunil Aggarwal, Carolyn Allen, Carmelo Alu, Linda Alu, Joan A Beutler, Rodney M Bickford, Lois A Biello, Robert A Biello, Nicholas P Bigotti, Arla Bowers, Larry A Bowers, Robert R Burg, Michelle N Cabay, William Calamoneri, Deborah Carbo, Joseph M Carbo, Antoinette Castellano, George Castellano, Patricia Chen Feng, Wade Chilcoat, Gina C Chung, Albert M Clark, Laurel M Clark, Susan A Clark, Bonny K Collins, Rollin P Collins, Elizabeth Conwell, Judith Cooper, Joseph Coreno, Michelle Coreno, Carol A Dahir, Burt Danovitz, Patricia H Dayan, Raymond Dayan, Richard S Dillon, Susan H Dillon, John E Ditchburn, Lynne Ditchburn, Dana C Drew, Shapiro K Elaine, Bennett L Errol, Freda Feldman, Sidney T Feldman, Alexandra Feng, Joseph K Ferrara, Nancy A Ferrara, Rebecca Fitzmaurice, David W Foote, Andrea V Franklin, Daniel J Franklin, Linda Gagne, Janine Getek, Pamela P Gethard, Donna C Getreuer, Thomas R Getreuer, Lauren Gibaldi, Marriann T Gofonia, Robert D Gofonia, Linda Golay, Gerald N Goldman, Lucille Graessle, Kurt Grimm, Margaret A Grimm, Judith Grossman, Neil J Grossman, Mark Grunewald, Sally Grunewald, Katherine A Hayden, Janet H Hebert, Michael D Hebert, Karl Hess, Linda M Hooks, John D Houle, Mark D Hughes, Michelle R Hughes, Anne P Iverson, Melissa Jessup, Gregory P Johnson, Nancy A Johnson, Gail E Jordan, Paul A Jordan, Ulla P Jordan, Jerome D Kaplan, Patricia V Kaplan, Susan Kaplan, Sylwia Karwowska, Audrey Kaufman, Curtis Kautzer, Marilyn Kautzer, Mary Ann Kichline, Dale R Kichline, Jr., Nikolas Kontomanolis, Pauline Kontomanolis, Penny Kress Zimmerman, Carol C Kuhlthau, John S Kuhlthau, Camille Kurtz, Christine Lally, Thomas R Lally, Larry Lasker, Roger S Lichtman, Joseph A Magliato, Robin Magliato, David R Mann, Suzanne C Mann, Cynthia L Mapes, Joseph D Mapes, Richard J Marriott, Shirley Marriott, Cheryl D Marsh, Janet K Marth, Robert D Marth, Brian P McCue, Lucille M McCue, Jean McEwen Rodby, Charles McMonigle, Kathy McMonigle, Nikki Mcnicol, John Mikesh, Carol Miller, Robert C Miller, Deborah L Monlux, James R Moore III, Aretta B Muir, James D Muir, Charles J Neumann, Priscilla J Neumann, Paul Nisselle, Patrick O'Hara, Dennis O'Malley, Suzanne L O'Malley, Susan O'Neill, Joan H Orr, Gary J Paccagnini, Karen L Paccagnini, Deborah Lee Peters, Alexander K Peyer, Kathleen Peyer, Susan Pierson-O'Hara, Bernadette Pignatello, Kenneth A Pignatello, Carmen Y Polanco, Jose M Polanco, Carolyn B Press, David R Press, Eileen Price, Paul Price, David S Purvis, Thomas Reddy, Charles Robertson, Craig R Rodby, Robert Rodriguez, Charles S Roll, Marilyn Roll, Marcy D Rookey, Ronald J Rookey, Henry T Satt, Mary Anne Satt, Karen Schembre, Carolyn Schrock, Robert D Schrock, Jr., Diane K Schwartz, Edward S Schwartz, James Senn, Susan Senn, William Shain, Gene Silverman, Stanley Silverman, Robert A Staehle, Mark Stevens, Tracey Stevens, Myriam C Strauss, Linda Strohmeyer, John A Taylor, Karen M Taylor, Benjamin H Ticknor, Antonella Trisolino, Brigitte Tutschka, Sharon Van de Grift, Christopher Volpe, Athol L Wallace, Jill A Wallace, Laura C Warnock, Thomas C Warnock, Laurene Weaver, Andreas Weber, Kathleen L Weber, Susan Weir, Walter J Weir, Richard Weiss, David Wichers, Anne K Woodson, Thomas S Woodson, Michael Worsham, George M Worton, Rosanne E Worton, Arlo Young, Irene I Young, Neil D Young..(Zimmerman, Jean-Marc)
September 2, 2020 Filing 24 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Manhattan Club Marketing Group LLC, re: #17 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Charles R Acklin, Maribel Acutanza, Philip D Acutanza, Rachelle Adler, Scott Adler, Jatinder K Aggarwal, Sunil Aggarwal, Carolyn Allen, Carmelo Alu, Linda Alu, Joan A Beutler, Rodney M Bickford, Lois A Biello, Robert A Biello, Nicholas P Bigotti, Arla Bowers, Larry A Bowers, Robert R Burg, Michelle N Cabay, William Calamoneri, Deborah Carbo, Joseph M Carbo, Antoinette Castellano, George Castellano, Patricia Chen Feng, Wade Chilcoat, Gina C Chung, Albert M Clark, Laurel M Clark, Susan A Clark, Bonny K Collins, Rollin P Collins, Elizabeth Conwell, Judith Cooper, Joseph Coreno, Michelle Coreno, Carol A Dahir, Burt Danovitz, Patricia H Dayan, Raymond Dayan, Richard S Dillon, Susan H Dillon, John E Ditchburn, Lynne Ditchburn, Dana C Drew, Shapiro K Elaine, Bennett L Errol, Freda Feldman, Sidney T Feldman, Alexandra Feng, Joseph K Ferrara, Nancy A Ferrara, Rebecca Fitzmaurice, David W Foote, Andrea V Franklin, Daniel J Franklin, Linda Gagne, Janine Getek, Pamela P Gethard, Donna C Getreuer, Thomas R Getreuer, Lauren Gibaldi, Marriann T Gofonia, Robert D Gofonia, Linda Golay, Gerald N Goldman, Lucille Graessle, Kurt Grimm, Margaret A Grimm, Judith Grossman, Neil J Grossman, Mark Grunewald, Sally Grunewald, Katherine A Hayden, Janet H Hebert, Michael D Hebert, Karl Hess, Linda M Hooks, John D Houle, Mark D Hughes, Michelle R Hughes, Anne P Iverson, Melissa Jessup, Gregory P Johnson, Nancy A Johnson, Gail E Jordan, Paul A Jordan, Ulla P Jordan, Jerome D Kaplan, Patricia V Kaplan, Susan Kaplan, Sylwia Karwowska, Audrey Kaufman, Curtis Kautzer, Marilyn Kautzer, Mary Ann Kichline, Dale R Kichline, Jr., Nikolas Kontomanolis, Pauline Kontomanolis, Penny Kress Zimmerman, Carol C Kuhlthau, John S Kuhlthau, Camille Kurtz, Christine Lally, Thomas R Lally, Larry Lasker, Roger S Lichtman, Joseph A Magliato, Robin Magliato, David R Mann, Suzanne C Mann, Cynthia L Mapes, Joseph D Mapes, Richard J Marriott, Shirley Marriott, Cheryl D Marsh, Janet K Marth, Robert D Marth, Brian P McCue, Lucille M McCue, Jean McEwen Rodby, Charles McMonigle, Kathy McMonigle, Nikki Mcnicol, John Mikesh, Carol Miller, Robert C Miller, Deborah L Monlux, James R Moore III, Aretta B Muir, James D Muir, Charles J Neumann, Priscilla J Neumann, Paul Nisselle, Patrick O'Hara, Dennis O'Malley, Suzanne L O'Malley, Susan O'Neill, Joan H Orr, Gary J Paccagnini, Karen L Paccagnini, Deborah Lee Peters, Alexander K Peyer, Kathleen Peyer, Susan Pierson-O'Hara, Bernadette Pignatello, Kenneth A Pignatello, Carmen Y Polanco, Jose M Polanco, Carolyn B Press, David R Press, Eileen Price, Paul Price, David S Purvis, Thomas Reddy, Charles Robertson, Craig R Rodby, Robert Rodriguez, Charles S Roll, Marilyn Roll, Marcy D Rookey, Ronald J Rookey, Henry T Satt, Mary Anne Satt, Karen Schembre, Carolyn Schrock, Robert D Schrock, Jr., Diane K Schwartz, Edward S Schwartz, James Senn, Susan Senn, William Shain, Gene Silverman, Stanley Silverman, Robert A Staehle, Mark Stevens, Tracey Stevens, Myriam C Strauss, Linda Strohmeyer, John A Taylor, Karen M Taylor, Benjamin H Ticknor, Antonella Trisolino, Brigitte Tutschka, Sharon Van de Grift, Christopher Volpe, Athol L Wallace, Jill A Wallace, Laura C Warnock, Thomas C Warnock, Laurene Weaver, Andreas Weber, Kathleen L Weber, Susan Weir, Walter J Weir, Richard Weiss, David Wichers, Anne K Woodson, Thomas S Woodson, Michael Worsham, George M Worton, Rosanne E Worton, Arlo Young, Irene I Young, Neil D Young, Richard Zierdt, Michael J Zimmerman, Paul deWitt..(Zimmerman, Jean-Marc)
September 2, 2020 Filing 23 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Park Central Management LLC, re: #17 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Charles R Acklin, Maribel Acutanza, Philip D Acutanza, Rachelle Adler, Scott Adler, Jatinder K Aggarwal, Sunil Aggarwal, Carolyn Allen, Carmelo Alu, Linda Alu, Joan A Beutler, Rodney M Bickford, Lois A Biello, Robert A Biello, Nicholas P Bigotti, Arla Bowers, Larry A Bowers, Robert R Burg, Michelle N Cabay, William Calamoneri, Deborah Carbo, Joseph M Carbo, Antoinette Castellano, George Castellano, Patricia Chen Feng, Wade Chilcoat, Gina C Chung, Albert M Clark, Laurel M Clark, Susan A Clark, Bonny K Collins, Rollin P Collins, Elizabeth Conwell, Judith Cooper, Joseph Coreno, Michelle Coreno, Carol A Dahir, Burt Danovitz, Patricia H Dayan, Raymond Dayan, Richard S Dillon, Susan H Dillon, John E Ditchburn, Lynne Ditchburn, Dana C Drew, Shapiro K Elaine, Bennett L Errol, Freda Feldman, Sidney T Feldman, Alexandra Feng, Joseph K Ferrara, Nancy A Ferrara, Rebecca Fitzmaurice, David W Foote, Andrea V Franklin, Daniel J Franklin, Linda Gagne, Janine Getek, Pamela P Gethard, Donna C Getreuer, Thomas R Getreuer, Lauren Gibaldi, Marriann T Gofonia, Robert D Gofonia, Linda Golay, Gerald N Goldman, Lucille Graessle, Kurt Grimm, Margaret A Grimm, Judith Grossman, Neil J Grossman, Mark Grunewald, Sally Grunewald, Katherine A Hayden, Janet H Hebert, Michael D Hebert, Karl Hess, Linda M Hooks, John D Houle, Mark D Hughes, Michelle R Hughes, Anne P Iverson, Melissa Jessup, Gregory P Johnson, Nancy A Johnson, Gail E Jordan, Paul A Jordan, Ulla P Jordan, Jerome D Kaplan, Patricia V Kaplan, Susan Kaplan, Sylwia Karwowska, Audrey Kaufman, Curtis Kautzer, Marilyn Kautzer, Mary Ann Kichline, Dale R Kichline, Jr., Nikolas Kontomanolis, Pauline Kontomanolis, Penny Kress Zimmerman, Carol C Kuhlthau, John S Kuhlthau, Camille Kurtz, Christine Lally, Thomas R Lally, Larry Lasker, Roger S Lichtman, Joseph A Magliato, Robin Magliato, David R Mann, Suzanne C Mann, Cynthia L Mapes, Joseph D Mapes, Richard J Marriott, Shirley Marriott, Cheryl D Marsh, Janet K Marth, Robert D Marth, Brian P McCue, Lucille M McCue, Jean McEwen Rodby, Charles McMonigle, Kathy McMonigle, Nikki Mcnicol, John Mikesh, Carol Miller, Robert C Miller, Deborah L Monlux, James R Moore III, Aretta B Muir, James D Muir, Charles J Neumann, Priscilla J Neumann, Paul Nisselle, Patrick O'Hara, Dennis O'Malley, Suzanne L O'Malley, Susan O'Neill, Joan H Orr, Gary J Paccagnini, Karen L Paccagnini, Deborah Lee Peters, Alexander K Peyer, Kathleen Peyer, Susan Pierson-O'Hara, Bernadette Pignatello, Kenneth A Pignatello, Carmen Y Polanco, Jose M Polanco, Carolyn B Press, David R Press, Eileen Price, Paul Price, David S Purvis, Thomas Reddy, Charles Robertson, Craig R Rodby, Robert Rodriguez, Charles S Roll, Marilyn Roll, Marcy D Rookey, Ronald J Rookey, Henry T Satt, Mary Anne Satt, Karen Schembre, Carolyn Schrock, Robert D Schrock, Jr., Diane K Schwartz, Edward S Schwartz, James Senn, Susan Senn, William Shain, Gene Silverman, Stanley Silverman, Robert A Staehle, Mark Stevens, Tracey Stevens, Myriam C Strauss, Linda Strohmeyer, John A Taylor, Karen M Taylor, Benjamin H Ticknor, Antonella Trisolino, Brigitte Tutschka, Sharon Van de Grift, Christopher Volpe, Athol L Wallace, Jill A Wallace, Laura C Warnock, Thomas C Warnock, Laurene Weaver, Andreas Weber, Kathleen L Weber, Susan Weir, Walter J Weir, Richard Weiss, David Wichers, Anne K Woodson, Thomas S Woodson, Michael Worsham, George M Worton, Rosanne E Worton, Arlo Young, Irene I Young, Neil D Young, Richard Zierdt, Michael J Zimmerman, Paul deWitt..(Zimmerman, Jean-Marc)
September 2, 2020 Filing 22 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to O. Park Central LLC, re: #17 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Charles R Acklin, Maribel Acutanza, Philip D Acutanza, Rachelle Adler, Scott Adler, Jatinder K Aggarwal, Sunil Aggarwal, Carolyn Allen, Carmelo Alu, Linda Alu, Joan A Beutler, Rodney M Bickford, Lois A Biello, Robert A Biello, Nicholas P Bigotti, Arla Bowers, Larry A Bowers, Robert R Burg, Michelle N Cabay, William Calamoneri, Deborah Carbo, Joseph M Carbo, Antoinette Castellano, George Castellano, Patricia Chen Feng, Wade Chilcoat, Gina C Chung, Albert M Clark, Laurel M Clark, Susan A Clark, Bonny K Collins, Rollin P Collins, Elizabeth Conwell, Judith Cooper, Joseph Coreno, Michelle Coreno, Carol A Dahir, Burt Danovitz, Patricia H Dayan, Raymond Dayan, Richard S Dillon, Susan H Dillon, John E Ditchburn, Lynne Ditchburn, Dana C Drew, Shapiro K Elaine, Bennett L Errol, Freda Feldman, Sidney T Feldman, Alexandra Feng, Joseph K Ferrara, Nancy A Ferrara, Rebecca Fitzmaurice, David W Foote, Andrea V Franklin, Daniel J Franklin, Linda Gagne, Janine Getek, Pamela P Gethard, Donna C Getreuer, Thomas R Getreuer, Lauren Gibaldi, Marriann T Gofonia, Robert D Gofonia, Linda Golay, Gerald N Goldman, Lucille Graessle, Kurt Grimm, Margaret A Grimm, Judith Grossman, Neil J Grossman, Mark Grunewald, Sally Grunewald, Katherine A Hayden, Janet H Hebert, Michael D Hebert, Karl Hess, Linda M Hooks, John D Houle, Mark D Hughes, Michelle R Hughes, Anne P Iverson, Melissa Jessup, Gregory P Johnson, Nancy A Johnson, Gail E Jordan, Paul A Jordan, Ulla P Jordan, Jerome D Kaplan, Patricia V Kaplan, Susan Kaplan, Sylwia Karwowska, Audrey Kaufman, Curtis Kautzer, Marilyn Kautzer, Mary Ann Kichline, Dale R Kichline, Jr., Nikolas Kontomanolis, Pauline Kontomanolis, Penny Kress Zimmerman, Carol C Kuhlthau, John S Kuhlthau, Camille Kurtz, Christine Lally, Thomas R Lally, Larry Lasker, Roger S Lichtman, Joseph A Magliato, Robin Magliato, David R Mann, Suzanne C Mann, Cynthia L Mapes, Joseph D Mapes, Richard J Marriott, Shirley Marriott, Cheryl D Marsh, Janet K Marth, Robert D Marth, Brian P McCue, Lucille M McCue, Jean McEwen Rodby, Charles McMonigle, Kathy McMonigle, Nikki Mcnicol, John Mikesh, Carol Miller, Robert C Miller, Deborah L Monlux, James R Moore III, Aretta B Muir, James D Muir, Charles J Neumann, Priscilla J Neumann, Paul Nisselle, Patrick O'Hara, Dennis O'Malley, Suzanne L O'Malley, Susan O'Neill, Joan H Orr, Gary J Paccagnini, Karen L Paccagnini, Deborah Lee Peters, Alexander K Peyer, Kathleen Peyer, Susan Pierson-O'Hara, Bernadette Pignatello, Kenneth A Pignatello, Carmen Y Polanco, Jose M Polanco, Carolyn B Press, David R Press, Eileen Price, Paul Price, David S Purvis, Thomas Reddy, Charles Robertson, Craig R Rodby, Robert Rodriguez, Charles S Roll, Marilyn Roll, Marcy D Rookey, Ronald J Rookey, Henry T Satt, Mary Anne Satt, Karen Schembre, Carolyn Schrock, Robert D Schrock, Jr., Diane K Schwartz, Edward S Schwartz, James Senn, Susan Senn, William Shain, Gene Silverman, Stanley Silverman, Robert A Staehle, Mark Stevens, Tracey Stevens, Myriam C Strauss, Linda Strohmeyer, John A Taylor, Karen M Taylor, Benjamin H Ticknor, Antonella Trisolino, Brigitte Tutschka, Sharon Van de Grift, Christopher Volpe, Athol L Wallace, Jill A Wallace, Laura C Warnock, Thomas C Warnock, Laurene Weaver, Andreas Weber, Kathleen L Weber, Susan Weir, Walter J Weir, Richard Weiss, David Wichers, Anne K Woodson, Thomas S Woodson, Michael Worsham, George M Worton, Rosanne E Worton, Arlo Young, Irene I Young, Neil D Young, Richard Zierdt, Michael J Zimmerman, Paul deWitt..(Zimmerman, Jean-Marc)
September 2, 2020 Filing 21 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to T. Park Central LLC, re: #17 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Charles R Acklin, Maribel Acutanza, Philip D Acutanza, Rachelle Adler, Scott Adler, Jatinder K Aggarwal, Sunil Aggarwal, Carolyn Allen, Carmelo Alu, Linda Alu, Joan A Beutler, Rodney M Bickford, Lois A Biello, Robert A Biello, Nicholas P Bigotti, Arla Bowers, Larry A Bowers, Robert R Burg, Michelle N Cabay, William Calamoneri, Deborah Carbo, Joseph M Carbo, Antoinette Castellano, George Castellano, Patricia Chen Feng, Wade Chilcoat, Gina C Chung, Albert M Clark, Laurel M Clark, Susan A Clark, Bonny K Collins, Rollin P Collins, Elizabeth Conwell, Judith Cooper, Joseph Coreno, Michelle Coreno, Carol A Dahir, Burt Danovitz, Patricia H Dayan, Raymond Dayan, Richard S Dillon, Susan H Dillon, John E Ditchburn, Lynne Ditchburn, Dana C Drew, Shapiro K Elaine, Bennett L Errol, Freda Feldman, Sidney T Feldman, Alexandra Feng, Joseph K Ferrara, Nancy A Ferrara, Rebecca Fitzmaurice, David W Foote, Andrea V Franklin, Daniel J Franklin, Linda Gagne, Janine Getek, Pamela P Gethard, Donna C Getreuer, Thomas R Getreuer, Lauren Gibaldi, Marriann T Gofonia, Robert D Gofonia, Linda Golay, Gerald N Goldman, Lucille Graessle, Kurt Grimm, Margaret A Grimm, Judith Grossman, Neil J Grossman, Mark Grunewald, Sally Grunewald, Katherine A Hayden, Janet H Hebert, Michael D Hebert, Karl Hess, Linda M Hooks, John D Houle, Mark D Hughes, Michelle R Hughes, Anne P Iverson, Melissa Jessup, Gregory P Johnson, Nancy A Johnson, Gail E Jordan, Paul A Jordan, Ulla P Jordan, Jerome D Kaplan, Patricia V Kaplan, Susan Kaplan, Sylwia Karwowska, Audrey Kaufman, Curtis Kautzer, Marilyn Kautzer, Mary Ann Kichline, Dale R Kichline, Jr., Nikolas Kontomanolis, Pauline Kontomanolis, Penny Kress Zimmerman, Carol C Kuhlthau, John S Kuhlthau, Camille Kurtz, Christine Lally, Thomas R Lally, Larry Lasker, Roger S Lichtman, Joseph A Magliato, Robin Magliato, David R Mann, Suzanne C Mann, Cynthia L Mapes, Joseph D Mapes, Richard J Marriott, Shirley Marriott, Cheryl D Marsh, Janet K Marth, Robert D Marth, Brian P McCue, Lucille M McCue, Jean McEwen Rodby, Charles McMonigle, Kathy McMonigle, Nikki Mcnicol, John Mikesh, Carol Miller, Robert C Miller, Deborah L Monlux, James R Moore III, Aretta B Muir, James D Muir, Charles J Neumann, Priscilla J Neumann, Paul Nisselle, Patrick O'Hara, Dennis O'Malley, Suzanne L O'Malley, Susan O'Neill, Joan H Orr, Gary J Paccagnini, Karen L Paccagnini, Deborah Lee Peters, Alexander K Peyer, Kathleen Peyer, Susan Pierson-O'Hara, Bernadette Pignatello, Kenneth A Pignatello, Carmen Y Polanco, Jose M Polanco, Carolyn B Press, David R Press, Eileen Price, Paul Price, David S Purvis, Thomas Reddy, Charles Robertson, Craig R Rodby, Robert Rodriguez, Charles S Roll, Marilyn Roll, Marcy D Rookey, Ronald J Rookey, Henry T Satt, Mary Anne Satt, Karen Schembre, Carolyn Schrock, Robert D Schrock, Jr., Diane K Schwartz, Edward S Schwartz, James Senn, Susan Senn, William Shain, Gene Silverman, Stanley Silverman, Robert A Staehle, Mark Stevens, Tracey Stevens, Myriam C Strauss, Linda Strohmeyer, John A Taylor, Karen M Taylor, Benjamin H Ticknor, Antonella Trisolino, Brigitte Tutschka, Sharon Van de Grift, Christopher Volpe, Athol L Wallace, Jill A Wallace, Laura C Warnock, Thomas C Warnock, Laurene Weaver, Andreas Weber, Kathleen L Weber, Susan Weir, Walter J Weir, Richard Weiss, David Wichers, Anne K Woodson, Thomas S Woodson, Michael Worsham, George M Worton, Rosanne E Worton, Arlo Young, Irene I Young, Neil D Young, Richard Zierdt, Michael J Zimmerman, Paul deWitt..(Zimmerman, Jean-Marc)
September 2, 2020 Filing 20 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Stuart Eichner, re: #17 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Charles R Acklin, Maribel Acutanza, Philip D Acutanza, Rachelle Adler, Scott Adler, Jatinder K Aggarwal, Sunil Aggarwal, Carolyn Allen, Carmelo Alu, Linda Alu, Joan A Beutler, Rodney M Bickford, Lois A Biello, Robert A Biello, Nicholas P Bigotti, Arla Bowers, Larry A Bowers, Robert R Burg, Michelle N Cabay, William Calamoneri, Deborah Carbo, Joseph M Carbo, Antoinette Castellano, George Castellano, Patricia Chen Feng, Wade Chilcoat, Gina C Chung, Albert M Clark, Laurel M Clark, Susan A Clark, Bonny K Collins, Rollin P Collins, Elizabeth Conwell, Judith Cooper, Joseph Coreno, Michelle Coreno, Carol A Dahir, Burt Danovitz, Patricia H Dayan, Raymond Dayan, Richard S Dillon, Susan H Dillon, John E Ditchburn, Lynne Ditchburn, Dana C Drew, Shapiro K Elaine, Bennett L Errol, Freda Feldman, Sidney T Feldman, Alexandra Feng, Joseph K Ferrara, Nancy A Ferrara, Rebecca Fitzmaurice, David W Foote, Andrea V Franklin, Daniel J Franklin, Linda Gagne, Janine Getek, Pamela P Gethard, Donna C Getreuer, Thomas R Getreuer, Lauren Gibaldi, Marriann T Gofonia, Robert D Gofonia, Linda Golay, Gerald N Goldman, Lucille Graessle, Kurt Grimm, Margaret A Grimm, Judith Grossman, Neil J Grossman, Mark Grunewald, Sally Grunewald, Katherine A Hayden, Janet H Hebert, Michael D Hebert, Karl Hess, Linda M Hooks, John D Houle, Mark D Hughes, Michelle R Hughes, Anne P Iverson, Melissa Jessup, Gregory P Johnson, Nancy A Johnson, Gail E Jordan, Paul A Jordan, Ulla P Jordan, Jerome D Kaplan, Patricia V Kaplan, Susan Kaplan, Sylwia Karwowska, Audrey Kaufman, Curtis Kautzer, Marilyn Kautzer, Mary Ann Kichline, Dale R Kichline, Jr., Nikolas Kontomanolis, Pauline Kontomanolis, Penny Kress Zimmerman, Carol C Kuhlthau, John S Kuhlthau, Camille Kurtz, Christine Lally, Thomas R Lally, Larry Lasker, Roger S Lichtman, Joseph A Magliato, Robin Magliato, David R Mann, Suzanne C Mann, Cynthia L Mapes, Joseph D Mapes, Richard J Marriott, Shirley Marriott, Cheryl D Marsh, Janet K Marth, Robert D Marth, Brian P McCue, Lucille M McCue, Jean McEwen Rodby, Charles McMonigle, Kathy McMonigle, Nikki Mcnicol, John Mikesh, Carol Miller, Robert C Miller, Deborah L Monlux, James R Moore III, Aretta B Muir, James D Muir, Charles J Neumann, Priscilla J Neumann, Paul Nisselle, Patrick O'Hara, Dennis O'Malley, Suzanne L O'Malley, Susan O'Neill, Joan H Orr, Gary J Paccagnini, Karen L Paccagnini, Deborah Lee Peters, Alexander K Peyer, Kathleen Peyer, Susan Pierson-O'Hara, Bernadette Pignatello, Kenneth A Pignatello, Carmen Y Polanco, Jose M Polanco, Carolyn B Press, David R Press, Eileen Price, Paul Price, David S Purvis, Thomas Reddy, Charles Robertson, Craig R Rodby, Robert Rodriguez, Charles S Roll, Marilyn Roll, Marcy D Rookey, Ronald J Rookey, Henry T Satt, Mary Anne Satt, Karen Schembre, Carolyn Schrock, Robert D Schrock, Jr., Diane K Schwartz, Edward S Schwartz, James Senn, Susan Senn, William Shain, Gene Silverman, Stanley Silverman, Robert A Staehle, Mark Stevens, Tracey Stevens, Myriam C Strauss, Linda Strohmeyer, John A Taylor, Karen M Taylor, Benjamin H Ticknor, Antonella Trisolino, Brigitte Tutschka, Sharon Van de Grift, Christopher Volpe, Athol L Wallace, Jill A Wallace, Laura C Warnock, Thomas C Warnock, Laurene Weaver, Andreas Weber, Kathleen L Weber, Susan Weir, Walter J Weir, Richard Weiss, David Wichers, Anne K Woodson, Thomas S Woodson, Michael Worsham, George M Worton, Rosanne E Worton, Arlo Young, Irene I Young, Neil D Young, Richard Zierdt, Michael J Zimmerman, Paul deWitt..(Zimmerman, Jean-Marc)
September 2, 2020 Filing 19 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Leslie Eichner, re: #17 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Charles R Acklin, Maribel Acutanza, Philip D Acutanza, Rachelle Adler, Scott Adler, Jatinder K Aggarwal, Sunil Aggarwal, Carolyn Allen, Carmelo Alu, Linda Alu, Joan A Beutler, Rodney M Bickford, Lois A Biello, Robert A Biello, Nicholas P Bigotti, Arla Bowers, Larry A Bowers, Robert R Burg, Michelle N Cabay, William Calamoneri, Deborah Carbo, Joseph M Carbo, Antoinette Castellano, George Castellano, Patricia Chen Feng, Wade Chilcoat, Gina C Chung, Albert M Clark, Laurel M Clark, Susan A Clark, Bonny K Collins, Rollin P Collins, Elizabeth Conwell, Judith Cooper, Joseph Coreno, Michelle Coreno, Carol A Dahir, Burt Danovitz, Patricia H Dayan, Raymond Dayan, Richard S Dillon, Susan H Dillon, John E Ditchburn, Lynne Ditchburn, Dana C Drew, Shapiro K Elaine, Bennett L Errol, Freda Feldman, Sidney T Feldman, Alexandra Feng, Joseph K Ferrara, Nancy A Ferrara, Rebecca Fitzmaurice, David W Foote, Andrea V Franklin, Daniel J Franklin, Linda Gagne, Janine Getek, Pamela P Gethard, Donna C Getreuer, Thomas R Getreuer, Lauren Gibaldi, Marriann T Gofonia, Robert D Gofonia, Linda Golay, Gerald N Goldman, Lucille Graessle, Kurt Grimm, Margaret A Grimm, Judith Grossman, Neil J Grossman, Mark Grunewald, Sally Grunewald, Katherine A Hayden, Janet H Hebert, Michael D Hebert, Karl Hess, Linda M Hooks, John D Houle, Mark D Hughes, Michelle R Hughes, Anne P Iverson, Melissa Jessup, Gregory P Johnson, Nancy A Johnson, Gail E Jordan, Paul A Jordan, Ulla P Jordan, Jerome D Kaplan, Patricia V Kaplan, Susan Kaplan, Sylwia Karwowska, Audrey Kaufman, Curtis Kautzer, Marilyn Kautzer, Mary Ann Kichline, Dale R Kichline, Jr., Nikolas Kontomanolis, Pauline Kontomanolis, Penny Kress Zimmerman, Carol C Kuhlthau, John S Kuhlthau, Camille Kurtz, Christine Lally, Thomas R Lally, Larry Lasker, Roger S Lichtman, Joseph A Magliato, Robin Magliato, David R Mann, Suzanne C Mann, Cynthia L Mapes, Joseph D Mapes, Richard J Marriott, Shirley Marriott, Cheryl D Marsh, Janet K Marth, Robert D Marth, Brian P McCue, Lucille M McCue, Jean McEwen Rodby, Charles McMonigle, Kathy McMonigle, Nikki Mcnicol, John Mikesh, Carol Miller, Robert C Miller, Deborah L Monlux, James R Moore III, Aretta B Muir, James D Muir, Charles J Neumann, Priscilla J Neumann, Paul Nisselle, Patrick O'Hara, Dennis O'Malley, Suzanne L O'Malley, Susan O'Neill, Joan H Orr, Gary J Paccagnini, Karen L Paccagnini, Deborah Lee Peters, Alexander K Peyer, Kathleen Peyer, Susan Pierson-O'Hara, Bernadette Pignatello, Kenneth A Pignatello, Carmen Y Polanco, Jose M Polanco, Carolyn B Press, David R Press, Eileen Price, Paul Price, David S Purvis, Thomas Reddy, Charles Robertson, Craig R Rodby, Robert Rodriguez, Charles S Roll, Marilyn Roll, Marcy D Rookey, Ronald J Rookey, Henry T Satt, Mary Anne Satt, Karen Schembre, Carolyn Schrock, Robert D Schrock, Jr., Diane K Schwartz, Edward S Schwartz, James Senn, Susan Senn, William Shain, Gene Silverman, Stanley Silverman, Robert A Staehle, Mark Stevens, Tracey Stevens, Myriam C Strauss, Linda Strohmeyer, John A Taylor, Karen M Taylor, Benjamin H Ticknor, Antonella Trisolino, Brigitte Tutschka, Sharon Van de Grift, Christopher Volpe, Athol L Wallace, Jill A Wallace, Laura C Warnock, Thomas C Warnock, Laurene Weaver, Andreas Weber, Kathleen L Weber, Susan Weir, Walter J Weir, Richard Weiss, David Wichers, Anne K Woodson, Thomas S Woodson, Michael Worsham, George M Worton, Rosanne E Worton, Arlo Young, Irene I Young, Neil D Young, Richard Zierdt, Michael J Zimmerman, Paul deWitt..(Zimmerman, Jean-Marc)
September 2, 2020 Filing 18 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Ian Bruce Eichner, re: #17 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Charles R Acklin, Maribel Acutanza, Philip D Acutanza, Rachelle Adler, Scott Adler, Jatinder K Aggarwal, Sunil Aggarwal, Carolyn Allen, Carmelo Alu, Linda Alu, Joan A Beutler, Rodney M Bickford, Lois A Biello, Robert A Biello, Nicholas P Bigotti, Arla Bowers, Larry A Bowers, Robert R Burg, Michelle N Cabay, William Calamoneri, Deborah Carbo, Joseph M Carbo, Antoinette Castellano, George Castellano, Patricia Chen Feng, Wade Chilcoat, Gina C Chung, Albert M Clark, Laurel M Clark, Susan A Clark, Bonny K Collins, Rollin P Collins, Elizabeth Conwell, Judith Cooper, Joseph Coreno, Michelle Coreno, Carol A Dahir, Burt Danovitz, Patricia H Dayan, Raymond Dayan, Richard S Dillon, Susan H Dillon, John E Ditchburn, Lynne Ditchburn, Dana C Drew, Shapiro K Elaine, Bennett L Errol, Freda Feldman, Sidney T Feldman, Alexandra Feng, Joseph K Ferrara, Nancy A Ferrara, Rebecca Fitzmaurice, David W Foote, Andrea V Franklin, Daniel J Franklin, Linda Gagne, Janine Getek, Pamela P Gethard, Donna C Getreuer, Thomas R Getreuer, Lauren Gibaldi, Marriann T Gofonia, Robert D Gofonia, Linda Golay, Gerald N Goldman, Lucille Graessle, Kurt Grimm, Margaret A Grimm, Judith Grossman, Neil J Grossman, Mark Grunewald, Sally Grunewald, Katherine A Hayden, Janet H Hebert, Michael D Hebert, Karl Hess, Linda M Hooks, John D Houle, Mark D Hughes, Michelle R Hughes, Anne P Iverson, Melissa Jessup, Gregory P Johnson, Nancy A Johnson, Gail E Jordan, Paul A Jordan, Ulla P Jordan, Jerome D Kaplan, Patricia V Kaplan, Susan Kaplan, Sylwia Karwowska, Audrey Kaufman, Curtis Kautzer, Marilyn Kautzer, Mary Ann Kichline, Dale R Kichline, Jr., Nikolas Kontomanolis, Pauline Kontomanolis, Penny Kress Zimmerman, Carol C Kuhlthau, John S Kuhlthau, Camille Kurtz, Christine Lally, Thomas R Lally, Larry Lasker, Roger S Lichtman, Joseph A Magliato, Robin Magliato, David R Mann, Suzanne C Mann, Cynthia L Mapes, Joseph D Mapes, Richard J Marriott, Shirley Marriott, Cheryl D Marsh, Janet K Marth, Robert D Marth, Brian P McCue, Lucille M McCue, Jean McEwen Rodby, Charles McMonigle, Kathy McMonigle, Nikki Mcnicol, John Mikesh, Carol Miller, Robert C Miller, Deborah L Monlux, James R Moore III, Aretta B Muir, James D Muir, Charles J Neumann, Priscilla J Neumann, Paul Nisselle, Patrick O'Hara, Dennis O'Malley, Suzanne L O'Malley, Susan O'Neill, Joan H Orr, Gary J Paccagnini, Karen L Paccagnini, Deborah Lee Peters, Alexander K Peyer, Kathleen Peyer, Susan Pierson-O'Hara, Bernadette Pignatello, Kenneth A Pignatello, Carmen Y Polanco, Jose M Polanco, Carolyn B Press, David R Press, Eileen Price, Paul Price, David S Purvis, Thomas Reddy, Charles Robertson, Craig R Rodby, Robert Rodriguez, Charles S Roll, Marilyn Roll, Marcy D Rookey, Ronald J Rookey, Henry T Satt, Mary Anne Satt, Karen Schembre, Carolyn Schrock, Robert D Schrock, Jr., Diane K Schwartz, Edward S Schwartz, James Senn, Susan Senn, William Shain, Gene Silverman, Stanley Silverman, Robert A Staehle, Mark Stevens, Tracey Stevens, Myriam C Strauss, Linda Strohmeyer, John A Taylor, Karen M Taylor, Benjamin H Ticknor, Antonella Trisolino, Brigitte Tutschka, Sharon Van de Grift, Christopher Volpe, Athol L Wallace, Jill A Wallace, Laura C Warnock, Thomas C Warnock, Laurene Weaver, Andreas Weber, Kathleen L Weber, Susan Weir, Walter J Weir, Richard Weiss, David Wichers, Anne K Woodson, Thomas S Woodson, Michael Worsham, George M Worton, Rosanne E Worton, Arlo Young, Irene I Young, Neil D Young, Richard Zierdt, Michael J Zimmerman, Paul deWitt..(Zimmerman, Jean-Marc)
September 2, 2020 Filing 17 COMPLAINT against BlueGreen Vacations Unlimited Inc., Ian Bruce Eichner, Leslie Eichner, Stuart Eichner, Scott L Lager, Manhattan Club Marketing Group LLC, New York Urban Ownership Management LLC, O. Park Central LLC, Park Central Management LLC, T. Park Central LLC. Document filed by Carol Miller, Elizabeth Conwell, Ulla P Jordan, Richard Zierdt, Richard J Marriott, Margaret A Grimm, Nikolas Kontomanolis, Michael Worsham, Robert R Burg, John Mikesh, Larry A Bowers, John E Ditchburn, Anne P Iverson, Michelle R Hughes, Laurel M Clark, Laurene Weaver, Charles S Roll, Walter J Weir, Sylwia Karwowska, Andrea V Franklin, William Calamoneri, Ronald J Rookey, Robin Magliato, David R Press, Paul A Jordan, Robert A Staehle, Bernadette Pignatello, Bonny K Collins, Joseph Coreno, Bennett L Errol, Penny Kress Zimmerman, Michael D Hebert, Susan Kaplan, Thomas R Lally, Jean McEwen Rodby, Marriann T Gofonia, Albert M Clark, David Wichers, Arlo Young, Joan H Orr, Anne K Woodson, Cheryl D Marsh, Linda Gagne, Paul Price, Nicholas P Bigotti, Susan O'Neill, Camille Kurtz, Pamela P Gethard, Pauline Kontomanolis, Judith Grossman, Gregory P Johnson, Katherine A Hayden, Donna C Getreuer, Gerald N Goldman, Neil D Young, Mary Anne Satt, Thomas S Woodson, Janine Getek, Deborah L Monlux, Maribel Acutanza, Arla Bowers, Athol L Wallace, David R Mann, Linda M Hooks, Kenneth A Pignatello, Rosanne E Worton, Edward S Schwartz, Sharon Van de Grift, Dennis O'Malley, Lois A Biello, Joseph D Mapes, Lucille Graessle, Andreas Weber, Shapiro K Elaine, Susan Pierson-O'Hara, Alexandra Feng, Tracey Stevens, George Castellano, Jill A Wallace, Gary J Paccagnini, Nikki Mcnicol, Carol C Kuhlthau, Aretta B Muir, Karen M Taylor, Lucille M McCue, Janet H Hebert, Eileen Price, Deborah Carbo, Audrey Kaufman, Robert C Miller, Robert Rodriguez, Marilyn Roll, Gina C Chung, Sidney T Feldman, Carolyn Allen, Curtis Kautzer, Carol A Dahir, Janet K Marth, Richard S Dillon, Susan Weir, Rachelle Adler, Susan Senn, Charles Robertson, Karen Schembre, Lauren Gibaldi, Jatinder K Aggarwal, Wade Chilcoat, Karl Hess, William Shain, Shirley Marriott, John A Taylor, Dale R Kichline, Jr., Linda Strohmeyer, Marcy D Rookey, Neil J Grossman, Mark Grunewald, Antonella Trisolino, Thomas R Getreuer, Joseph A Magliato, Benjamin H Ticknor, Jerome D Kaplan, John S Kuhlthau, George M Worton, Linda Alu, Cynthia L Mapes, Carolyn B Press, Laura C Warnock, Michael J Zimmerman, Deborah Lee Peters, Patricia V Kaplan, Carolyn Schrock, Freda Feldman, Roger S Lichtman, Nancy A Johnson, Gene Silverman, John D Houle, Charles J Neumann, Jose M Polanco, Charles McMonigle, Patricia Chen Feng, Raymond Dayan, Robert D Gofonia, Marilyn Kautzer, Paul deWitt, Joan A Beutler, Nancy A Ferrara, Stanley Silverman, Daniel J Franklin, Lynne Ditchburn, Linda Golay, Michelle N Cabay, David W Foote, Kurt Grimm, Thomas C Warnock, Myriam C Strauss, Robert D Schrock, Jr., Charles R Acklin, Suzanne L O'Malley, Gail E Jordan, Robert D Marth, Kathleen Peyer, Karen L Paccagnini, Rollin P Collins, Mary Ann Kichline, Antoinette Castellano, James R Moore III, Susan A Clark, Brian P McCue, Thomas Reddy, Priscilla J Neumann, Patricia H Dayan, Sally Grunewald, Mark D Hughes, Kathleen L Weber, Rodney M Bickford, Mark Stevens, Carmen Y Polanco, David S Purvis, James D Muir, Rebecca Fitzmaurice, Kathy McMonigle, Alexander K Peyer, Irene I Young, Craig R Rodby, Susan H Dillon, Joseph M Carbo, Dana C Drew, Robert A Biello, Christine Lally, Sunil Aggarwal, Melissa Jessup, Christopher Volpe, Philip D Acutanza, Michelle Coreno, Brigitte Tutschka, Larry Lasker, Patrick O'Hara, Joseph K Ferrara, Carmelo Alu, Suzanne C Mann, Burt Danovitz, Scott Adler, Judith Cooper, Diane K Schwartz, Henry T Satt, Paul Nisselle, Richard Weiss, James Senn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit AOD 8-14-17, #2 Exhibit Second Farooq Affirmation 7-2-15, #3 Exhibit TMC 2019 Operating Budget, #4 Exhibit TMC Nightly Rates).(Zimmerman, Jean-Marc)
September 1, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Jean-Marc Zimmerman to RE-FILE Document No. #8 Request for Issuance of Summons, #5 Request for Issuance of Summons,, #13 Request for Issuance of Amended Summons, Request for Issuance of Summons, #11 Request for Issuance of Summons, #6 Request for Issuance of Summons, #12 Request for Issuance of Summons, #15 Request for Issuance of Summons, #9 Request for Issuance of Summons, #14 Request for Issuance of Summons, #4 Request for Issuance of Summons,, #7 Request for Issuance of Summons, #10 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the summons requests were not processed due to the deficient pleading; re-file your summons request after you have properly re-filed your pleading. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the summons form PDF. (pne)
September 1, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Jean-Marc Zimmerman to RE-FILE Document No. #16 Amended Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the pleading is not correct; correct the Court name on the PDF ("NITED STATES"); the wrong event type was used to file the pleading; an Amended Pleading cannot be filed if the original Complaint has not been properly filed. Re-file the pleading using the event type COMPLAINT found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. If the deficiency/deficiencies are not corrected within five (5) days per Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131 this case will be administratively closed. Initial Pleading due by 9/8/2020. (pne)
August 31, 2020 Filing 16 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, against BlueGreen Vacations Unlimited Inc., Ian Bruce Eichner, Leslie Eichner, Stuart Eichner, Scott L Lager, Manhattan Club Marketing Group LLC, New York Urban Ownership Management LLC, O. Park Central LLC, Park Central Management LLC, T. Park Central LLC with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Carol Miller, Elizabeth Conwell, Ulla P Jordan, Richard Zierdt, Richard J Marriott, Margaret A Grimm, Nikolas Kontomanolis, Michael Worsham, Robert R Burg, John Mikesh, Larry A Bowers, John E Ditchburn, Anne P Iverson, Michelle R Hughes, Laurel M Clark, Laurene Weaver, Charles S Roll, Walter J Weir, Sylwia Karwowska, Andrea V Franklin, William Calamoneri, Ronald J Rookey, Robin Magliato, David R Press, Paul A Jordan, Robert A Staehle, Bernadette Pignatello, Bonny K Collins, Joseph Coreno, Bennett L Errol, Penny Kress Zimmerman, Michael D Hebert, Susan Kaplan, Thomas R Lally, Jean McEwen Rodby, Marriann T Gofonia, Albert M Clark, David Wichers, Arlo Young, Joan H Orr, Anne K Woodson, Cheryl D Marsh, Linda Gagne, Paul Price, Nicholas P Bigotti, Susan O'Neill, Camille Kurtz, Pamela P Gethard, Pauline Kontomanolis, Judith Grossman, Gregory P Johnson, Katherine A Hayden, Donna C Getreuer, Gerald N Goldman, Neil D Young, Mary Anne Satt, Thomas S Woodson, Janine Getek, Deborah L Monlux, Maribel Acutanza, Arla Bowers, Athol L Wallace, David R Mann, Linda M Hooks, Kenneth A Pignatello, Rosanne E Worton, Edward S Schwartz, Sharon Van de Grift, Dennis O'Malley, Lois A Biello, Joseph D Mapes, Lucille Graessle, Andreas Weber, Shapiro K Elaine, Susan Pierson-O'Hara, Alexandra Feng, Tracey Stevens, George Castellano, Jill A Wallace, Gary J Paccagnini, Nikki Mcnicol, Carol C Kuhlthau, Aretta B Muir, Karen M Taylor, Lucille M McCue, Janet H Hebert, Eileen Price, Deborah Carbo, Audrey Kaufman, Robert C Miller, Robert Rodriguez, Marilyn Roll, Gina C Chung, Sidney T Feldman, Carolyn Allen, Curtis Kautzer, Carol A Dahir, Janet K Marth, Richard S Dillon, Susan Weir, Rachelle Adler, Susan Senn, Charles Robertson, Karen Schembre, Lauren Gibaldi, Jatinder K Aggarwal, Wade Chilcoat, Karl Hess, William Shain, Shirley Marriott, John A Taylor, Dale R Kichline, Jr., Linda Strohmeyer, Marcy D Rookey, Neil J Grossman, Mark Grunewald, Antonella Trisolino, Thomas R Getreuer, Joseph A Magliato, Benjamin H Ticknor, Jerome D Kaplan, John S Kuhlthau, George M Worton, Linda Alu, Cynthia L Mapes, Carolyn B Press, Laura C Warnock, Michael J Zimmerman, Deborah Lee Peters, Patricia V Kaplan, Carolyn Schrock, Freda Feldman, Roger S Lichtman, Nancy A Johnson, Gene Silverman, John D Houle, Charles J Neumann, Jose M Polanco, Charles McMonigle, Patricia Chen Feng, Raymond Dayan, Robert D Gofonia, Marilyn Kautzer, Paul deWitt, Joan A Beutler, Nancy A Ferrara, Stanley Silverman, Daniel J Franklin, Lynne Ditchburn, Linda Golay, Michelle N Cabay, David W Foote, Kurt Grimm, Thomas C Warnock, Myriam C Strauss, Robert D Schrock, Jr., Charles R Acklin, Suzanne L O'Malley, Gail E Jordan, Robert D Marth, Kathleen Peyer, Karen L Paccagnini, Rollin P Collins, Mary Ann Kichline, Antoinette Castellano, James R Moore III, Susan A Clark, Brian P McCue, Thomas Reddy, Priscilla J Neumann, Patricia H Dayan, Sally Grunewald, Mark D Hughes, Kathleen L Weber, Rodney M Bickford, Mark Stevens, Carmen Y Polanco, David S Purvis, James D Muir, Rebecca Fitzmaurice, Kathy McMonigle, Alexander K Peyer, Irene I Young, Craig R Rodby, Susan H Dillon, Joseph M Carbo, Dana C Drew, Robert A Biello, Christine Lally, Sunil Aggarwal, Melissa Jessup, Christopher Volpe, Philip D Acutanza, Michelle Coreno, Brigitte Tutschka, Larry Lasker, Patrick O'Hara, Joseph K Ferrara, Carmelo Alu, Suzanne C Mann, Burt Danovitz, Scott Adler, Judith Cooper, Diane K Schwartz, Henry T Satt, Paul Nisselle, Richard Weiss, James Senn. Related document: #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit AOD, #2 Exhibit Second Farooq Affirmation, #3 Exhibit 2019 TMC Operating Budget, #4 Exhibit TMC Nightly Rates).(Zimmerman, Jean-Marc) Modified on 9/1/2020 (pne).
August 31, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Jean-Marc Zimmerman to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the pleading is not correct; All parties must be listed on pleading, "et al" is not accepted. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. If the deficiency/deficiencies are not corrected within five (5) days per Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131 this case will be administratively closed. Initial Pleading due by 9/8/2020. (sj)
August 31, 2020 Filing 15 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to BlueGreen Vacations Unlimited Inc., re: #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Charles R Acklin, Maribel Acutanza, Philip D Acutanza, Rachelle Adler, Scott Adler, Jatinder K Aggarwal, Sunil Aggarwal, Carolyn Allen, Carmelo Alu, Linda Alu, Joan A Beutler, Rodney M Bickford, Lois A Biello, Robert A Biello, Nicholas P Bigotti, Arla Bowers, Larry A Bowers, Robert R Burg, Michelle N Cabay, William Calamoneri, Deborah Carbo, Joseph M Carbo, Antoinette Castellano, George Castellano, Patricia Chen Feng, Wade Chilcoat, Gina C Chung, Albert M Clark, Laurel M Clark, Susan A Clark, Bonny K Collins, Rollin P Collins, Elizabeth Conwell, Judith Cooper, Joseph Coreno, Michelle Coreno, Carol A Dahir, Burt Danovitz, Patricia H Dayan, Raymond Dayan, Richard S Dillon, Susan H Dillon, John E Ditchburn, Lynne Ditchburn, Dana C Drew, Shapiro K Elaine, Bennett L Errol, Freda Feldman, Sidney T Feldman, Alexandra Feng, Joseph K Ferrara, Nancy A Ferrara, Rebecca Fitzmaurice, David W Foote, Andrea V Franklin, Daniel J Franklin, Linda Gagne, Janine Getek, Pamela P Gethard, Donna C Getreuer, Thomas R Getreuer, Lauren Gibaldi, Marriann T Gofonia, Robert D Gofonia, Linda Golay, Gerald N Goldman, Lucille Graessle, Kurt Grimm, Margaret A Grimm, Judith Grossman, Neil J Grossman, Mark Grunewald, Sally Grunewald, Katherine A Hayden, Janet H Hebert, Michael D Hebert, Karl Hess, Linda M Hooks, John D Houle, Mark D Hughes, Michelle R Hughes, Anne P Iverson, Melissa Jessup, Gregory P Johnson, Nancy A Johnson, Gail E Jordan, Paul A Jordan, Ulla P Jordan, Jerome D Kaplan, Patricia V Kaplan, Susan Kaplan, Sylwia Karwowska, Audrey Kaufman, Curtis Kautzer, Marilyn Kautzer, Mary Ann Kichline, Dale R Kichline, Jr., Nikolas Kontomanolis, Pauline Kontomanolis, Penny Kress Zimmerman, Carol C Kuhlthau, John S Kuhlthau, Camille Kurtz, Christine Lally, Thomas R Lally, Larry Lasker, Roger S Lichtman, Joseph A Magliato, Robin Magliato, David R Mann, Suzanne C Mann, Cynthia L Mapes, Joseph D Mapes, Richard J Marriott, Shirley Marriott, Cheryl D Marsh, Janet K Marth, Robert D Marth, Brian P McCue, Lucille M McCue, Jean McEwen Rodby, Charles McMonigle, Kathy McMonigle, Nikki Mcnicol, John Mikesh, Carol Miller, Robert C Miller, Deborah L Monlux, James R Moore III, Aretta B Muir, James D Muir, Charles J Neumann, Priscilla J Neumann, Paul Nisselle, Patrick O'Hara, Dennis O'Malley, Suzanne L O'Malley, Susan O'Neill, Joan H Orr, Gary J Paccagnini, Karen L Paccagnini, Deborah Lee Peters, Alexander K Peyer, Kathleen Peyer, Susan Pierson-O'Hara, Bernadette Pignatello, Kenneth A Pignatello, Carmen Y Polanco, Jose M Polanco, Carolyn B Press, David R Press, Eileen Price, Paul Price, David S Purvis, Thomas Reddy, Charles Robertson, Craig R Rodby, Robert Rodriguez, Charles S Roll, Marilyn Roll, Marcy D Rookey, Ronald J Rookey, Henry T Satt, Mary Anne Satt, Karen Schembre, Carolyn Schrock, Robert D Schrock, Jr., Diane K Schwartz, Edward S Schwartz, James Senn, Susan Senn, William Shain, Gene Silverman, Stanley Silverman, Robert A Staehle, Mark Stevens, Tracey Stevens, Myriam C Strauss, Linda Strohmeyer, John A Taylor, Karen M Taylor, Benjamin H Ticknor, Antonella Trisolino, Brigitte Tutschka, Sharon Van de Grift, Christopher Volpe, Athol L Wallace, Jill A Wallace, Laura C Warnock, Thomas C Warnock, Laurene Weaver, Andreas Weber, Kathleen L Weber, Susan Weir, Walter J Weir, Richard Weiss, David Wichers, Anne K Woodson, Thomas S Woodson, Michael Worsham, George M Worton, Rosanne E Worton, Arlo Young, Irene I Young, Neil D Young, Richard Zierdt, Michael J Zimmerman, Paul deWitt..(Zimmerman, Jean-Marc) Modified on 9/1/2020 (pne).
August 31, 2020 Filing 14 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Leslie Eichner, re: #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Charles R Acklin, Maribel Acutanza, Philip D Acutanza, Rachelle Adler, Scott Adler, Jatinder K Aggarwal, Sunil Aggarwal, Carolyn Allen, Carmelo Alu, Linda Alu, Joan A Beutler, Rodney M Bickford, Lois A Biello, Robert A Biello, Nicholas P Bigotti, Arla Bowers, Larry A Bowers, Robert R Burg, Michelle N Cabay, William Calamoneri, Deborah Carbo, Joseph M Carbo, Antoinette Castellano, George Castellano, Patricia Chen Feng, Wade Chilcoat, Gina C Chung, Albert M Clark, Laurel M Clark, Susan A Clark, Bonny K Collins, Rollin P Collins, Elizabeth Conwell, Judith Cooper, Joseph Coreno, Michelle Coreno, Carol A Dahir, Burt Danovitz, Patricia H Dayan, Raymond Dayan, Richard S Dillon, Susan H Dillon, John E Ditchburn, Lynne Ditchburn, Dana C Drew, Shapiro K Elaine, Bennett L Errol, Freda Feldman, Sidney T Feldman, Alexandra Feng, Joseph K Ferrara, Nancy A Ferrara, Rebecca Fitzmaurice, David W Foote, Andrea V Franklin, Daniel J Franklin, Linda Gagne, Janine Getek, Pamela P Gethard, Donna C Getreuer, Thomas R Getreuer, Lauren Gibaldi, Marriann T Gofonia, Robert D Gofonia, Linda Golay, Gerald N Goldman, Lucille Graessle, Kurt Grimm, Margaret A Grimm, Judith Grossman, Neil J Grossman, Mark Grunewald, Sally Grunewald, Katherine A Hayden, Janet H Hebert, Michael D Hebert, Karl Hess, Linda M Hooks, John D Houle, Mark D Hughes, Michelle R Hughes, Anne P Iverson, Melissa Jessup, Gregory P Johnson, Nancy A Johnson, Gail E Jordan, Paul A Jordan, Ulla P Jordan, Jerome D Kaplan, Patricia V Kaplan, Susan Kaplan, Sylwia Karwowska, Audrey Kaufman, Curtis Kautzer, Marilyn Kautzer, Mary Ann Kichline, Dale R Kichline, Jr., Nikolas Kontomanolis, Pauline Kontomanolis, Penny Kress Zimmerman, Carol C Kuhlthau, John S Kuhlthau, Camille Kurtz, Christine Lally, Thomas R Lally, Larry Lasker, Roger S Lichtman, Joseph A Magliato, Robin Magliato, David R Mann, Suzanne C Mann, Cynthia L Mapes, Joseph D Mapes, Richard J Marriott, Shirley Marriott, Cheryl D Marsh, Janet K Marth, Robert D Marth, Brian P McCue, Lucille M McCue, Jean McEwen Rodby, Charles McMonigle, Kathy McMonigle, Nikki Mcnicol, John Mikesh, Carol Miller, Robert C Miller, Deborah L Monlux, James R Moore III, Aretta B Muir, James D Muir, Charles J Neumann, Priscilla J Neumann, Paul Nisselle, Patrick O'Hara, Dennis O'Malley, Suzanne L O'Malley, Susan O'Neill, Joan H Orr, Gary J Paccagnini, Karen L Paccagnini, Deborah Lee Peters, Alexander K Peyer, Kathleen Peyer, Susan Pierson-O'Hara, Bernadette Pignatello, Kenneth A Pignatello, Carmen Y Polanco, Jose M Polanco, Carolyn B Press, David R Press, Eileen Price, Paul Price, David S Purvis, Thomas Reddy, Charles Robertson, Craig R Rodby, Robert Rodriguez, Charles S Roll, Marilyn Roll, Marcy D Rookey, Ronald J Rookey, Henry T Satt, Mary Anne Satt, Karen Schembre, Carolyn Schrock, Robert D Schrock, Jr., Diane K Schwartz, Edward S Schwartz, James Senn, Susan Senn, William Shain, Gene Silverman, Stanley Silverman, Robert A Staehle, Mark Stevens, Tracey Stevens, Myriam C Strauss, Linda Strohmeyer, John A Taylor, Karen M Taylor, Benjamin H Ticknor, Antonella Trisolino, Brigitte Tutschka, Sharon Van de Grift, Christopher Volpe, Athol L Wallace, Jill A Wallace, Laura C Warnock, Thomas C Warnock, Laurene Weaver, Andreas Weber, Kathleen L Weber, Susan Weir, Walter J Weir, Richard Weiss, David Wichers, Anne K Woodson, Thomas S Woodson, Michael Worsham, George M Worton, Rosanne E Worton, Arlo Young, Irene I Young, Neil D Young, Richard Zierdt, Michael J Zimmerman, Paul deWitt..(Zimmerman, Jean-Marc) Modified on 9/1/2020 (pne).
August 31, 2020 Filing 13 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to BlueGreen Vacations Unlimited Inc., re: #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Charles R Acklin, Maribel Acutanza, Philip D Acutanza, Rachelle Adler, Scott Adler, Jatinder K Aggarwal, Sunil Aggarwal, Carolyn Allen, Carmelo Alu, Linda Alu, Joan A Beutler, Rodney M Bickford, Lois A Biello, Robert A Biello, Nicholas P Bigotti, Arla Bowers, Larry A Bowers, Robert R Burg, Michelle N Cabay, William Calamoneri, Deborah Carbo, Joseph M Carbo, Antoinette Castellano, George Castellano, Patricia Chen Feng, Wade Chilcoat, Gina C Chung, Albert M Clark, Laurel M Clark, Susan A Clark, Bonny K Collins, Rollin P Collins, Elizabeth Conwell, Judith Cooper, Joseph Coreno, Michelle Coreno, Carol A Dahir, Burt Danovitz, Patricia H Dayan, Raymond Dayan, Richard S Dillon, Susan H Dillon, John E Ditchburn, Lynne Ditchburn, Dana C Drew, Shapiro K Elaine, Bennett L Errol, Freda Feldman, Sidney T Feldman, Alexandra Feng, Joseph K Ferrara, Nancy A Ferrara, Rebecca Fitzmaurice, David W Foote, Andrea V Franklin, Daniel J Franklin, Linda Gagne, Janine Getek, Pamela P Gethard, Donna C Getreuer, Thomas R Getreuer, Lauren Gibaldi, Marriann T Gofonia, Robert D Gofonia, Linda Golay, Gerald N Goldman, Lucille Graessle, Kurt Grimm, Margaret A Grimm, Judith Grossman, Neil J Grossman, Mark Grunewald, Sally Grunewald, Katherine A Hayden, Janet H Hebert, Michael D Hebert, Karl Hess, Linda M Hooks, John D Houle, Mark D Hughes, Michelle R Hughes, Anne P Iverson, Melissa Jessup, Gregory P Johnson, Nancy A Johnson, Gail E Jordan, Paul A Jordan, Ulla P Jordan, Jerome D Kaplan, Patricia V Kaplan, Susan Kaplan, Sylwia Karwowska, Audrey Kaufman, Curtis Kautzer, Marilyn Kautzer, Mary Ann Kichline, Dale R Kichline, Jr., Nikolas Kontomanolis, Pauline Kontomanolis, Penny Kress Zimmerman, Carol C Kuhlthau, John S Kuhlthau, Camille Kurtz, Christine Lally, Thomas R Lally, Larry Lasker, Roger S Lichtman, Joseph A Magliato, Robin Magliato, David R Mann, Suzanne C Mann, Cynthia L Mapes, Joseph D Mapes, Richard J Marriott, Shirley Marriott, Cheryl D Marsh, Janet K Marth, Robert D Marth, Brian P McCue, Lucille M McCue, Jean McEwen Rodby, Charles McMonigle, Kathy McMonigle, Nikki Mcnicol, John Mikesh, Carol Miller, Robert C Miller, Deborah L Monlux, James R Moore III, Aretta B Muir, James D Muir, Charles J Neumann, Priscilla J Neumann, Paul Nisselle, Patrick O'Hara, Dennis O'Malley, Suzanne L O'Malley, Susan O'Neill, Joan H Orr, Gary J Paccagnini, Karen L Paccagnini, Deborah Lee Peters, Alexander K Peyer, Kathleen Peyer, Susan Pierson-O'Hara, Bernadette Pignatello, Kenneth A Pignatello, Carmen Y Polanco, Jose M Polanco, Carolyn B Press, David R Press, Eileen Price, Paul Price, David S Purvis, Thomas Reddy, Charles Robertson, Craig R Rodby, Robert Rodriguez, Charles S Roll, Marilyn Roll, Marcy D Rookey, Ronald J Rookey, Henry T Satt, Mary Anne Satt, Karen Schembre, Carolyn Schrock, Robert D Schrock, Jr., Diane K Schwartz, Edward S Schwartz, James Senn, Susan Senn, William Shain, Gene Silverman, Stanley Silverman, Robert A Staehle, Mark Stevens, Tracey Stevens, Myriam C Strauss, Linda Strohmeyer, John A Taylor, Karen M Taylor, Benjamin H Ticknor, Antonella Trisolino, Brigitte Tutschka, Sharon Van de Grift, Christopher Volpe, Athol L Wallace, Jill A Wallace, Laura C Warnock, Thomas C Warnock, Laurene Weaver, Andreas Weber, Kathleen L Weber, Susan Weir, Walter J Weir, Richard Weiss, David Wichers, Anne K Woodson, Thomas S Woodson, Michael Worsham, George M Worton, Rosanne E Worton, Arlo Young, Irene I Young, Neil D Young, Richard Zierdt, Michael J Zimmerman, Paul deWitt., REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to BlueGreen Vacations Unlimited Inc., re: #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Charles R Acklin, Maribel Acutanza, Philip D Acutanza, Rachelle Adler, Scott Adler, Jatinder K Aggarwal, Sunil Aggarwal, Carolyn Allen, Carmelo Alu, Linda Alu, Joan A Beutler, Rodney M Bickford, Lois A Biello, Robert A Biello, Nicholas P Bigotti, Arla Bowers, Larry A Bowers, Robert R Burg, Michelle N Cabay, William Calamoneri, Deborah Carbo, Joseph M Carbo, Antoinette Castellano, George Castellano, Patricia Chen Feng, Wade Chilcoat, Gina C Chung, Albert M Clark, Laurel M Clark, Susan A Clark, Bonny K Collins, Rollin P Collins, Elizabeth Conwell, Judith Cooper, Joseph Coreno, Michelle Coreno, Carol A Dahir, Burt Danovitz, Patricia H Dayan, Raymond Dayan, Richard S Dillon, Susan H Dillon, John E Ditchburn, Lynne Ditchburn, Dana C Drew, Shapiro K Elaine, Bennett L Errol, Freda Feldman, Sidney T Feldman, Alexandra Feng, Joseph K Ferrara, Nancy A Ferrara, Rebecca Fitzmaurice, David W Foote, Andrea V Franklin, Daniel J Franklin, Linda Gagne, Janine Getek, Pamela P Gethard, Donna C Getreuer, Thomas R Getreuer, Lauren Gibaldi, Marriann T Gofonia, Robert D Gofonia, Linda Golay, Gerald N Goldman, Lucille Graessle, Kurt Grimm, Margaret A Grimm, Judith Grossman, Neil J Grossman, Mark Grunewald, Sally Grunewald, Katherine A Hayden, Janet H Hebert, Michael D Hebert, Karl Hess, Linda M Hooks, John D Houle, Mark D Hughes, Michelle R Hughes, Anne P Iverson, Melissa Jessup, Gregory P Johnson, Nancy A Johnson, Gail E Jordan, Paul A Jordan, Ulla P Jordan, Jerome D Kaplan, Patricia V Kaplan, Susan Kaplan, Sylwia Karwowska, Audrey Kaufman, Curtis Kautzer, Marilyn Kautzer, Mary Ann Kichline, Dale R Kichline, Jr., Nikolas Kontomanolis, Pauline Kontomanolis, Penny Kress Zimmerman, Carol C Kuhlthau, John S Kuhlthau, Camille Kurtz, Christine Lally, Thomas R Lally, Larry Lasker, Roger S Lichtman, Joseph A Magliato, Robin Magliato, David R Mann, Suzanne C Mann, Cynthia L Mapes, Joseph D Mapes, Richard J Marriott, Shirley Marriott, Cheryl D Marsh, Janet K Marth, Robert D Marth, Brian P McCue, Lucille M McCue, Jean McEwen Rodby, Charles McMonigle, Kathy McMonigle, Nikki Mcnicol, John Mikesh, Carol Miller, Robert C Miller, Deborah L Monlux, James R Moore III, Aretta B Muir, James D Muir, Charles J Neumann, Priscilla J Neumann, Paul Nisselle, Patrick O'Hara, Dennis O'Malley, Suzanne L O'Malley, Susan O'Neill, Joan H Orr, Gary J Paccagnini, Karen L Paccagnini, Deborah Lee Peters, Alexander K Peyer, Kathleen Peyer, Susan Pierson-O'Hara, Bernadette Pignatello, Kenneth A Pignatello, Carmen Y Polanco, Jose M Polanco, Carolyn B Press, David R Press, Eileen Price, Paul Price, David S Purvis, Thomas Reddy, Charles Robertson, Craig R Rodby, Robert Rodriguez, Charles S Roll, Marilyn Roll, Marcy D Rookey, Ronald J Rookey, Henry T Satt, Mary Anne Satt, Karen Schembre, Carolyn Schrock, Robert D Schrock, Jr., Diane K Schwartz, Edward S Schwartz, James Senn, Susan Senn, William Shain, Gene Silverman, Stanley Silverman, Robert A Staehle, Mark Stevens, Tracey Stevens, Myriam C Strauss, Linda Strohmeyer, John A Taylor, Karen M Taylor, Benjamin H Ticknor, Antonella Trisolino, Brigitte Tutschka, Sharon Van de Grift, Christopher Volpe, Athol L Wallace, Jill A Wallace, Laura C Warnock, Thomas C Warnock, Laurene Weaver, Andreas Weber, Kathleen L Weber, Susan Weir, Walter J Weir, Richard Weiss, David Wichers, Anne K Woodson, Thomas S Woodson, Michael Worsham, George M Worton, Rosanne E Worton, Arlo Young, Irene I Young, Neil D Young, Richard Zierdt, Michael J Zimmerman, Paul deWitt..(Zimmerman, Jean-Marc) Modified on 9/1/2020 (pne).
August 31, 2020 Filing 12 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to New York Urban Ownership Management LLC, re: #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Charles R Acklin, Maribel Acutanza, Philip D Acutanza, Rachelle Adler, Scott Adler, Jatinder K Aggarwal, Sunil Aggarwal, Carolyn Allen, Carmelo Alu, Linda Alu, Joan A Beutler, Rodney M Bickford, Lois A Biello, Robert A Biello, Nicholas P Bigotti, Arla Bowers, Larry A Bowers, Robert R Burg, Michelle N Cabay, William Calamoneri, Deborah Carbo, Joseph M Carbo, Antoinette Castellano, George Castellano, Patricia Chen Feng, Wade Chilcoat, Gina C Chung, Albert M Clark, Laurel M Clark, Susan A Clark, Bonny K Collins, Rollin P Collins, Elizabeth Conwell, Judith Cooper, Joseph Coreno, Michelle Coreno, Carol A Dahir, Burt Danovitz, Patricia H Dayan, Raymond Dayan, Richard S Dillon, Susan H Dillon, John E Ditchburn, Lynne Ditchburn, Dana C Drew, Shapiro K Elaine, Bennett L Errol, Freda Feldman, Sidney T Feldman, Alexandra Feng, Joseph K Ferrara, Nancy A Ferrara, Rebecca Fitzmaurice, David W Foote, Andrea V Franklin, Daniel J Franklin, Linda Gagne, Janine Getek, Pamela P Gethard, Donna C Getreuer, Thomas R Getreuer, Lauren Gibaldi, Marriann T Gofonia, Robert D Gofonia, Linda Golay, Gerald N Goldman, Lucille Graessle, Kurt Grimm, Margaret A Grimm, Judith Grossman, Neil J Grossman, Mark Grunewald, Sally Grunewald, Katherine A Hayden, Janet H Hebert, Michael D Hebert, Karl Hess, Linda M Hooks, John D Houle, Mark D Hughes, Michelle R Hughes, Anne P Iverson, Melissa Jessup, Gregory P Johnson, Nancy A Johnson, Gail E Jordan, Paul A Jordan, Ulla P Jordan, Jerome D Kaplan, Patricia V Kaplan, Susan Kaplan, Sylwia Karwowska, Audrey Kaufman, Curtis Kautzer, Marilyn Kautzer, Mary Ann Kichline, Dale R Kichline, Jr., Nikolas Kontomanolis, Pauline Kontomanolis, Penny Kress Zimmerman, Carol C Kuhlthau, John S Kuhlthau, Camille Kurtz, Christine Lally, Thomas R Lally, Larry Lasker, Roger S Lichtman, Joseph A Magliato, Robin Magliato, David R Mann, Suzanne C Mann, Cynthia L Mapes, Joseph D Mapes, Richard J Marriott, Shirley Marriott, Cheryl D Marsh, Janet K Marth, Robert D Marth, Brian P McCue, Lucille M McCue, Jean McEwen Rodby, Charles McMonigle, Kathy McMonigle, Nikki Mcnicol, John Mikesh, Carol Miller, Robert C Miller, Deborah L Monlux, James R Moore III, Aretta B Muir, James D Muir, Charles J Neumann, Priscilla J Neumann, Paul Nisselle, Patrick O'Hara, Dennis O'Malley, Suzanne L O'Malley, Susan O'Neill, Joan H Orr, Gary J Paccagnini, Karen L Paccagnini, Deborah Lee Peters, Alexander K Peyer, Kathleen Peyer, Susan Pierson-O'Hara, Bernadette Pignatello, Kenneth A Pignatello, Carmen Y Polanco, Jose M Polanco, Carolyn B Press, David R Press, Eileen Price, Paul Price, David S Purvis, Thomas Reddy, Charles Robertson, Craig R Rodby, Robert Rodriguez, Charles S Roll, Marilyn Roll, Marcy D Rookey, Ronald J Rookey, Henry T Satt, Mary Anne Satt, Karen Schembre, Carolyn Schrock, Robert D Schrock, Jr., Diane K Schwartz, Edward S Schwartz, James Senn, Susan Senn, William Shain, Gene Silverman, Stanley Silverman, Robert A Staehle, Mark Stevens, Tracey Stevens, Myriam C Strauss, Linda Strohmeyer, John A Taylor, Karen M Taylor, Benjamin H Ticknor, Antonella Trisolino, Brigitte Tutschka, Sharon Van de Grift, Christopher Volpe, Athol L Wallace, Jill A Wallace, Laura C Warnock, Thomas C Warnock, Laurene Weaver, Andreas Weber, Kathleen L Weber, Susan Weir, Walter J Weir, Richard Weiss, David Wichers, Anne K Woodson, Thomas S Woodson, Michael Worsham, George M Worton, Rosanne E Worton, Arlo Young, Irene I Young, Neil D Young, Richard Zierdt, Michael J Zimmerman, Paul deWitt..(Zimmerman, Jean-Marc) Modified on 9/1/2020 (pne).
August 31, 2020 Filing 11 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Manhattan Club Marketing Group LLC, re: #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Charles R Acklin, Maribel Acutanza, Philip D Acutanza, Rachelle Adler, Scott Adler, Jatinder K Aggarwal, Sunil Aggarwal, Carolyn Allen, Carmelo Alu, Linda Alu, Joan A Beutler, Rodney M Bickford, Lois A Biello, Robert A Biello, Nicholas P Bigotti, Arla Bowers, Larry A Bowers, Robert R Burg, Michelle N Cabay, William Calamoneri, Deborah Carbo, Joseph M Carbo, Antoinette Castellano, George Castellano, Patricia Chen Feng, Wade Chilcoat, Gina C Chung, Albert M Clark, Laurel M Clark, Susan A Clark, Bonny K Collins, Rollin P Collins, Elizabeth Conwell, Judith Cooper, Joseph Coreno, Michelle Coreno, Carol A Dahir, Burt Danovitz, Patricia H Dayan, Raymond Dayan, Richard S Dillon, Susan H Dillon, John E Ditchburn, Lynne Ditchburn, Dana C Drew, Shapiro K Elaine, Bennett L Errol, Freda Feldman, Sidney T Feldman, Alexandra Feng, Joseph K Ferrara, Nancy A Ferrara, Rebecca Fitzmaurice, David W Foote, Andrea V Franklin, Daniel J Franklin, Linda Gagne, Janine Getek, Pamela P Gethard, Donna C Getreuer, Thomas R Getreuer, Lauren Gibaldi, Marriann T Gofonia, Robert D Gofonia, Linda Golay, Gerald N Goldman, Lucille Graessle, Kurt Grimm, Margaret A Grimm, Judith Grossman, Neil J Grossman, Mark Grunewald, Sally Grunewald, Katherine A Hayden, Janet H Hebert, Michael D Hebert, Karl Hess, Linda M Hooks, John D Houle, Mark D Hughes, Michelle R Hughes, Anne P Iverson, Melissa Jessup, Gregory P Johnson, Nancy A Johnson, Gail E Jordan, Paul A Jordan, Ulla P Jordan, Jerome D Kaplan, Patricia V Kaplan, Susan Kaplan, Sylwia Karwowska, Audrey Kaufman, Curtis Kautzer, Marilyn Kautzer, Mary Ann Kichline, Dale R Kichline, Jr., Nikolas Kontomanolis, Pauline Kontomanolis, Penny Kress Zimmerman, Carol C Kuhlthau, John S Kuhlthau, Camille Kurtz, Christine Lally, Thomas R Lally, Larry Lasker, Roger S Lichtman, Joseph A Magliato, Robin Magliato, David R Mann, Suzanne C Mann, Cynthia L Mapes, Joseph D Mapes, Richard J Marriott, Shirley Marriott, Cheryl D Marsh, Janet K Marth, Robert D Marth, Brian P McCue, Lucille M McCue, Jean McEwen Rodby, Charles McMonigle, Kathy McMonigle, Nikki Mcnicol, John Mikesh, Carol Miller, Robert C Miller, Deborah L Monlux, James R Moore III, Aretta B Muir, James D Muir, Charles J Neumann, Priscilla J Neumann, Paul Nisselle, Patrick O'Hara, Dennis O'Malley, Suzanne L O'Malley, Susan O'Neill, Joan H Orr, Gary J Paccagnini, Karen L Paccagnini, Deborah Lee Peters, Alexander K Peyer, Kathleen Peyer, Susan Pierson-O'Hara, Bernadette Pignatello, Kenneth A Pignatello, Carmen Y Polanco, Jose M Polanco, Carolyn B Press, David R Press, Eileen Price, Paul Price, David S Purvis, Thomas Reddy, Charles Robertson, Craig R Rodby, Robert Rodriguez, Charles S Roll, Marilyn Roll, Marcy D Rookey, Ronald J Rookey, Henry T Satt, Mary Anne Satt, Karen Schembre, Carolyn Schrock, Robert D Schrock, Jr., Diane K Schwartz, Edward S Schwartz, James Senn, Susan Senn, William Shain, Gene Silverman, Stanley Silverman, Robert A Staehle, Mark Stevens, Tracey Stevens, Myriam C Strauss, Linda Strohmeyer, John A Taylor, Karen M Taylor, Benjamin H Ticknor, Antonella Trisolino, Brigitte Tutschka, Sharon Van de Grift, Christopher Volpe, Athol L Wallace, Jill A Wallace, Laura C Warnock, Thomas C Warnock, Laurene Weaver, Andreas Weber, Kathleen L Weber, Susan Weir, Walter J Weir, Richard Weiss, David Wichers, Anne K Woodson, Thomas S Woodson, Michael Worsham, George M Worton, Rosanne E Worton, Arlo Young, Irene I Young, Neil D Young, Richard Zierdt, Michael J Zimmerman, Paul deWitt..(Zimmerman, Jean-Marc) Modified on 9/1/2020 (pne).
August 31, 2020 Filing 10 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Park Central Management LLC, re: #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Charles R Acklin, Maribel Acutanza, Philip D Acutanza, Rachelle Adler, Scott Adler, Jatinder K Aggarwal, Sunil Aggarwal, Carolyn Allen, Carmelo Alu, Linda Alu, Joan A Beutler, Rodney M Bickford, Lois A Biello, Robert A Biello, Nicholas P Bigotti, Arla Bowers, Larry A Bowers, Robert R Burg, Michelle N Cabay, William Calamoneri, Deborah Carbo, Joseph M Carbo, Antoinette Castellano, George Castellano, Patricia Chen Feng, Wade Chilcoat, Gina C Chung, Albert M Clark, Laurel M Clark, Susan A Clark, Bonny K Collins, Rollin P Collins, Elizabeth Conwell, Judith Cooper, Joseph Coreno, Michelle Coreno, Carol A Dahir, Burt Danovitz, Patricia H Dayan, Raymond Dayan, Richard S Dillon, Susan H Dillon, John E Ditchburn, Lynne Ditchburn, Dana C Drew, Shapiro K Elaine, Bennett L Errol, Freda Feldman, Sidney T Feldman, Alexandra Feng, Joseph K Ferrara, Nancy A Ferrara, Rebecca Fitzmaurice, David W Foote, Andrea V Franklin, Daniel J Franklin, Linda Gagne, Janine Getek, Pamela P Gethard, Donna C Getreuer, Thomas R Getreuer, Lauren Gibaldi, Marriann T Gofonia, Robert D Gofonia, Linda Golay, Gerald N Goldman, Lucille Graessle, Kurt Grimm, Margaret A Grimm, Judith Grossman, Neil J Grossman, Mark Grunewald, Sally Grunewald, Katherine A Hayden, Janet H Hebert, Michael D Hebert, Karl Hess, Linda M Hooks, John D Houle, Mark D Hughes, Michelle R Hughes, Anne P Iverson, Melissa Jessup, Gregory P Johnson, Nancy A Johnson, Gail E Jordan, Paul A Jordan, Ulla P Jordan, Jerome D Kaplan, Patricia V Kaplan, Susan Kaplan, Sylwia Karwowska, Audrey Kaufman, Curtis Kautzer, Marilyn Kautzer, Mary Ann Kichline, Dale R Kichline, Jr., Nikolas Kontomanolis, Pauline Kontomanolis, Penny Kress Zimmerman, Carol C Kuhlthau, John S Kuhlthau, Camille Kurtz, Christine Lally, Thomas R Lally, Larry Lasker, Roger S Lichtman, Joseph A Magliato, Robin Magliato, David R Mann, Suzanne C Mann, Cynthia L Mapes, Joseph D Mapes, Richard J Marriott, Shirley Marriott, Cheryl D Marsh, Janet K Marth, Robert D Marth, Brian P McCue, Lucille M McCue, Jean McEwen Rodby, Charles McMonigle, Kathy McMonigle, Nikki Mcnicol, John Mikesh, Carol Miller, Robert C Miller, Deborah L Monlux, James R Moore III, Aretta B Muir, James D Muir, Charles J Neumann, Priscilla J Neumann, Paul Nisselle, Patrick O'Hara, Dennis O'Malley, Suzanne L O'Malley, Susan O'Neill, Joan H Orr, Gary J Paccagnini, Karen L Paccagnini, Deborah Lee Peters, Alexander K Peyer, Kathleen Peyer, Susan Pierson-O'Hara, Bernadette Pignatello, Kenneth A Pignatello, Carmen Y Polanco, Jose M Polanco, Carolyn B Press, David R Press, Eileen Price, Paul Price, David S Purvis, Thomas Reddy, Charles Robertson, Craig R Rodby, Robert Rodriguez, Charles S Roll, Marilyn Roll, Marcy D Rookey, Ronald J Rookey, Henry T Satt, Mary Anne Satt, Karen Schembre, Carolyn Schrock, Robert D Schrock, Jr., Diane K Schwartz, Edward S Schwartz, James Senn, Susan Senn, William Shain, Gene Silverman, Stanley Silverman, Robert A Staehle, Mark Stevens, Tracey Stevens, Myriam C Strauss, Linda Strohmeyer, John A Taylor, Karen M Taylor, Benjamin H Ticknor, Antonella Trisolino, Brigitte Tutschka, Sharon Van de Grift, Christopher Volpe, Athol L Wallace, Jill A Wallace, Laura C Warnock, Thomas C Warnock, Laurene Weaver, Andreas Weber, Kathleen L Weber, Susan Weir, Walter J Weir, Richard Weiss, David Wichers, Anne K Woodson, Thomas S Woodson, Michael Worsham, George M Worton, Rosanne E Worton, Arlo Young, Irene I Young, Neil D Young, Richard Zierdt, Michael J Zimmerman, Paul deWitt..(Zimmerman, Jean-Marc) Modified on 9/1/2020 (pne).
August 31, 2020 Filing 9 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to O. Park Central LLC, re: #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Charles R Acklin, Maribel Acutanza, Philip D Acutanza, Rachelle Adler, Scott Adler, Jatinder K Aggarwal, Sunil Aggarwal, Carolyn Allen, Carmelo Alu, Linda Alu, Joan A Beutler, Rodney M Bickford, Lois A Biello, Robert A Biello, Nicholas P Bigotti, Arla Bowers, Larry A Bowers, Robert R Burg, Michelle N Cabay, William Calamoneri, Deborah Carbo, Joseph M Carbo, Antoinette Castellano, George Castellano, Patricia Chen Feng, Wade Chilcoat, Gina C Chung, Albert M Clark, Laurel M Clark, Susan A Clark, Bonny K Collins, Rollin P Collins, Elizabeth Conwell, Judith Cooper, Joseph Coreno, Michelle Coreno, Carol A Dahir, Burt Danovitz, Patricia H Dayan, Raymond Dayan, Richard S Dillon, Susan H Dillon, John E Ditchburn, Lynne Ditchburn, Dana C Drew, Shapiro K Elaine, Bennett L Errol, Freda Feldman, Sidney T Feldman, Alexandra Feng, Joseph K Ferrara, Nancy A Ferrara, Rebecca Fitzmaurice, David W Foote, Andrea V Franklin, Daniel J Franklin, Linda Gagne, Janine Getek, Pamela P Gethard, Donna C Getreuer, Thomas R Getreuer, Lauren Gibaldi, Marriann T Gofonia, Robert D Gofonia, Linda Golay, Gerald N Goldman, Lucille Graessle, Kurt Grimm, Margaret A Grimm, Judith Grossman, Neil J Grossman, Mark Grunewald, Sally Grunewald, Katherine A Hayden, Janet H Hebert, Michael D Hebert, Karl Hess, Linda M Hooks, John D Houle, Mark D Hughes, Michelle R Hughes, Anne P Iverson, Melissa Jessup, Gregory P Johnson, Nancy A Johnson, Gail E Jordan, Paul A Jordan, Ulla P Jordan, Jerome D Kaplan, Patricia V Kaplan, Susan Kaplan, Sylwia Karwowska, Audrey Kaufman, Curtis Kautzer, Marilyn Kautzer, Mary Ann Kichline, Dale R Kichline, Jr., Nikolas Kontomanolis, Pauline Kontomanolis, Penny Kress Zimmerman, Carol C Kuhlthau, John S Kuhlthau, Camille Kurtz, Christine Lally, Thomas R Lally, Larry Lasker, Roger S Lichtman, Joseph A Magliato, Robin Magliato, David R Mann, Suzanne C Mann, Cynthia L Mapes, Joseph D Mapes, Richard J Marriott, Shirley Marriott, Cheryl D Marsh, Janet K Marth, Robert D Marth, Brian P McCue, Lucille M McCue, Jean McEwen Rodby, Charles McMonigle, Kathy McMonigle, Nikki Mcnicol, John Mikesh, Carol Miller, Robert C Miller, Deborah L Monlux, James R Moore III, Aretta B Muir, James D Muir, Charles J Neumann, Priscilla J Neumann, Paul Nisselle, Patrick O'Hara, Dennis O'Malley, Suzanne L O'Malley, Susan O'Neill, Joan H Orr, Gary J Paccagnini, Karen L Paccagnini, Deborah Lee Peters, Alexander K Peyer, Kathleen Peyer, Susan Pierson-O'Hara, Bernadette Pignatello, Kenneth A Pignatello, Carmen Y Polanco, Jose M Polanco, Carolyn B Press, David R Press, Eileen Price, Paul Price, David S Purvis, Thomas Reddy, Charles Robertson, Craig R Rodby, Robert Rodriguez, Charles S Roll, Marilyn Roll, Marcy D Rookey, Ronald J Rookey, Henry T Satt, Mary Anne Satt, Karen Schembre, Carolyn Schrock, Robert D Schrock, Jr., Diane K Schwartz, Edward S Schwartz, James Senn, Susan Senn, William Shain, Gene Silverman, Stanley Silverman, Robert A Staehle, Mark Stevens, Tracey Stevens, Myriam C Strauss, Linda Strohmeyer, John A Taylor, Karen M Taylor, Benjamin H Ticknor, Antonella Trisolino, Brigitte Tutschka, Sharon Van de Grift, Christopher Volpe, Athol L Wallace, Jill A Wallace, Laura C Warnock, Thomas C Warnock, Laurene Weaver, Andreas Weber, Kathleen L Weber, Susan Weir, Walter J Weir, Richard Weiss, David Wichers, Anne K Woodson, Thomas S Woodson, Michael Worsham, George M Worton, Rosanne E Worton, Arlo Young, Irene I Young, Neil D Young, Richard Zierdt, Michael J Zimmerman, Paul deWitt..(Zimmerman, Jean-Marc) Modified on 9/1/2020 (pne).
August 31, 2020 Filing 8 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to T. Park Central LLC, re: #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Charles R Acklin, Maribel Acutanza, Philip D Acutanza, Rachelle Adler, Scott Adler, Jatinder K Aggarwal, Sunil Aggarwal, Carolyn Allen, Carmelo Alu, Linda Alu, Joan A Beutler, Rodney M Bickford, Lois A Biello, Robert A Biello, Nicholas P Bigotti, Arla Bowers, Larry A Bowers, Robert R Burg, Michelle N Cabay, William Calamoneri, Deborah Carbo, Joseph M Carbo, Antoinette Castellano, George Castellano, Patricia Chen Feng, Wade Chilcoat, Gina C Chung, Albert M Clark, Laurel M Clark, Susan A Clark, Bonny K Collins, Rollin P Collins, Elizabeth Conwell, Judith Cooper, Joseph Coreno, Michelle Coreno, Carol A Dahir, Burt Danovitz, Patricia H Dayan, Raymond Dayan, Richard S Dillon, Susan H Dillon, John E Ditchburn, Lynne Ditchburn, Dana C Drew, Shapiro K Elaine, Bennett L Errol, Freda Feldman, Sidney T Feldman, Alexandra Feng, Joseph K Ferrara, Nancy A Ferrara, Rebecca Fitzmaurice, David W Foote, Andrea V Franklin, Daniel J Franklin, Linda Gagne, Janine Getek, Pamela P Gethard, Donna C Getreuer, Thomas R Getreuer, Lauren Gibaldi, Marriann T Gofonia, Robert D Gofonia, Linda Golay, Gerald N Goldman, Lucille Graessle, Kurt Grimm, Margaret A Grimm, Judith Grossman, Neil J Grossman, Mark Grunewald, Sally Grunewald, Katherine A Hayden, Janet H Hebert, Michael D Hebert, Karl Hess, Linda M Hooks, John D Houle, Mark D Hughes, Michelle R Hughes, Anne P Iverson, Melissa Jessup, Gregory P Johnson, Nancy A Johnson, Gail E Jordan, Paul A Jordan, Ulla P Jordan, Jerome D Kaplan, Patricia V Kaplan, Susan Kaplan, Sylwia Karwowska, Audrey Kaufman, Curtis Kautzer, Marilyn Kautzer, Mary Ann Kichline, Dale R Kichline, Jr., Nikolas Kontomanolis, Pauline Kontomanolis, Penny Kress Zimmerman, Carol C Kuhlthau, John S Kuhlthau, Camille Kurtz, Christine Lally, Thomas R Lally, Larry Lasker, Roger S Lichtman, Joseph A Magliato, Robin Magliato, David R Mann, Suzanne C Mann, Cynthia L Mapes, Joseph D Mapes, Richard J Marriott, Shirley Marriott, Cheryl D Marsh, Janet K Marth, Robert D Marth, Brian P McCue, Lucille M McCue, Jean McEwen Rodby, Charles McMonigle, Kathy McMonigle, Nikki Mcnicol, John Mikesh, Carol Miller, Robert C Miller, Deborah L Monlux, James R Moore III, Aretta B Muir, James D Muir, Charles J Neumann, Priscilla J Neumann, Paul Nisselle, Patrick O'Hara, Dennis O'Malley, Suzanne L O'Malley, Susan O'Neill, Joan H Orr, Gary J Paccagnini, Karen L Paccagnini, Deborah Lee Peters, Alexander K Peyer, Kathleen Peyer, Susan Pierson-O'Hara, Bernadette Pignatello, Kenneth A Pignatello, Carmen Y Polanco, Jose M Polanco, Carolyn B Press, David R Press, Eileen Price, Paul Price, David S Purvis, Thomas Reddy, Charles Robertson, Craig R Rodby, Robert Rodriguez, Charles S Roll, Marilyn Roll, Marcy D Rookey, Ronald J Rookey, Henry T Satt, Mary Anne Satt, Karen Schembre, Carolyn Schrock, Robert D Schrock, Jr., Diane K Schwartz, Edward S Schwartz, James Senn, Susan Senn, William Shain, Gene Silverman, Stanley Silverman, Robert A Staehle, Mark Stevens, Tracey Stevens, Myriam C Strauss, Linda Strohmeyer, John A Taylor, Karen M Taylor, Benjamin H Ticknor, Antonella Trisolino, Brigitte Tutschka, Sharon Van de Grift, Christopher Volpe, Athol L Wallace, Jill A Wallace, Laura C Warnock, Thomas C Warnock, Laurene Weaver, Andreas Weber, Kathleen L Weber, Susan Weir, Walter J Weir, Richard Weiss, David Wichers, Anne K Woodson, Thomas S Woodson, Michael Worsham, George M Worton, Rosanne E Worton, Arlo Young, Irene I Young, Neil D Young, Richard Zierdt, Michael J Zimmerman, Paul deWitt..(Zimmerman, Jean-Marc) Modified on 9/1/2020 (pne).
August 31, 2020 Filing 7 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Scott L. Lager, re: #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Charles R Acklin, Maribel Acutanza, Philip D Acutanza, Rachelle Adler, Scott Adler, Jatinder K Aggarwal, Sunil Aggarwal, Carolyn Allen, Carmelo Alu, Linda Alu, Joan A Beutler, Rodney M Bickford, Lois A Biello, Robert A Biello, Nicholas P Bigotti, Arla Bowers, Larry A Bowers, Robert R Burg, Michelle N Cabay, William Calamoneri, Deborah Carbo, Joseph M Carbo, Antoinette Castellano, George Castellano, Patricia Chen Feng, Wade Chilcoat, Gina C Chung, Albert M Clark, Laurel M Clark, Susan A Clark, Bonny K Collins, Rollin P Collins, Elizabeth Conwell, Judith Cooper, Joseph Coreno, Michelle Coreno, Carol A Dahir, Burt Danovitz, Patricia H Dayan, Raymond Dayan, Richard S Dillon, Susan H Dillon, John E Ditchburn, Lynne Ditchburn, Dana C Drew, Shapiro K Elaine, Bennett L Errol, Freda Feldman, Sidney T Feldman, Alexandra Feng, Joseph K Ferrara, Nancy A Ferrara, Rebecca Fitzmaurice, David W Foote, Andrea V Franklin, Daniel J Franklin, Linda Gagne, Janine Getek, Pamela P Gethard, Donna C Getreuer, Thomas R Getreuer, Lauren Gibaldi, Marriann T Gofonia, Robert D Gofonia, Linda Golay, Gerald N Goldman, Lucille Graessle, Kurt Grimm, Margaret A Grimm, Judith Grossman, Neil J Grossman, Mark Grunewald, Sally Grunewald, Katherine A Hayden, Janet H Hebert, Michael D Hebert, Karl Hess, Linda M Hooks, John D Houle, Mark D Hughes, Michelle R Hughes, Anne P Iverson, Melissa Jessup, Gregory P Johnson, Nancy A Johnson, Gail E Jordan, Paul A Jordan, Ulla P Jordan, Jerome D Kaplan, Patricia V Kaplan, Susan Kaplan, Sylwia Karwowska, Audrey Kaufman, Curtis Kautzer, Marilyn Kautzer, Mary Ann Kichline, Dale R Kichline, Jr., Nikolas Kontomanolis, Pauline Kontomanolis, Penny Kress Zimmerman, Carol C Kuhlthau, John S Kuhlthau, Camille Kurtz, Christine Lally, Thomas R Lally, Larry Lasker, Roger S Lichtman, Joseph A Magliato, Robin Magliato, David R Mann, Suzanne C Mann, Cynthia L Mapes, Joseph D Mapes, Richard J Marriott, Shirley Marriott, Cheryl D Marsh, Janet K Marth, Robert D Marth, Brian P McCue, Lucille M McCue, Jean McEwen Rodby, Charles McMonigle, Kathy McMonigle, Nikki Mcnicol, John Mikesh, Carol Miller, Robert C Miller, Deborah L Monlux, James R Moore III, Aretta B Muir, James D Muir, Charles J Neumann, Priscilla J Neumann, Paul Nisselle, Patrick O'Hara, Dennis O'Malley, Suzanne L O'Malley, Susan O'Neill, Joan H Orr, Gary J Paccagnini, Karen L Paccagnini, Deborah Lee Peters, Alexander K Peyer, Kathleen Peyer, Susan Pierson-O'Hara, Bernadette Pignatello, Kenneth A Pignatello, Carmen Y Polanco, Jose M Polanco, Carolyn B Press, David R Press, Eileen Price, Paul Price, David S Purvis, Thomas Reddy, Charles Robertson, Craig R Rodby, Robert Rodriguez, Charles S Roll, Marilyn Roll, Marcy D Rookey, Ronald J Rookey, Henry T Satt, Mary Anne Satt, Karen Schembre, Carolyn Schrock, Robert D Schrock, Jr., Diane K Schwartz, Edward S Schwartz, James Senn, Susan Senn, William Shain, Gene Silverman, Stanley Silverman, Robert A Staehle, Mark Stevens, Tracey Stevens, Myriam C Strauss, Linda Strohmeyer, John A Taylor, Karen M Taylor, Benjamin H Ticknor, Antonella Trisolino, Brigitte Tutschka, Sharon Van de Grift, Christopher Volpe, Athol L Wallace, Jill A Wallace, Laura C Warnock, Thomas C Warnock, Laurene Weaver, Andreas Weber, Kathleen L Weber, Susan Weir, Walter J Weir, Richard Weiss, David Wichers, Anne K Woodson, Thomas S Woodson, Michael Worsham, George M Worton, Rosanne E Worton, Arlo Young, Irene I Young, Neil D Young, Richard Zierdt, Michael J Zimmerman, Paul deWitt..(Zimmerman, Jean-Marc) Modified on 9/1/2020 (pne).
August 31, 2020 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Stuart Eichner, re: #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Charles R Acklin, Maribel Acutanza, Philip D Acutanza, Rachelle Adler, Scott Adler, Jatinder K Aggarwal, Sunil Aggarwal, Carolyn Allen, Carmelo Alu, Linda Alu, Joan A Beutler, Rodney M Bickford, Lois A Biello, Robert A Biello, Nicholas P Bigotti, Arla Bowers, Larry A Bowers, Robert R Burg, Michelle N Cabay, William Calamoneri, Deborah Carbo, Joseph M Carbo, Antoinette Castellano, George Castellano, Patricia Chen Feng, Wade Chilcoat, Gina C Chung, Albert M Clark, Laurel M Clark, Susan A Clark, Bonny K Collins, Rollin P Collins, Elizabeth Conwell, Judith Cooper, Joseph Coreno, Michelle Coreno, Carol A Dahir, Burt Danovitz, Patricia H Dayan, Raymond Dayan, Richard S Dillon, Susan H Dillon, John E Ditchburn, Lynne Ditchburn, Dana C Drew, Shapiro K Elaine, Bennett L Errol, Freda Feldman, Sidney T Feldman, Alexandra Feng, Joseph K Ferrara, Nancy A Ferrara, Rebecca Fitzmaurice, David W Foote, Andrea V Franklin, Daniel J Franklin, Linda Gagne, Janine Getek, Pamela P Gethard, Donna C Getreuer, Thomas R Getreuer, Lauren Gibaldi, Marriann T Gofonia, Robert D Gofonia, Linda Golay, Gerald N Goldman, Lucille Graessle, Kurt Grimm, Margaret A Grimm, Judith Grossman, Neil J Grossman, Mark Grunewald, Sally Grunewald, Katherine A Hayden, Janet H Hebert, Michael D Hebert, Karl Hess, Linda M Hooks, John D Houle, Mark D Hughes, Michelle R Hughes, Anne P Iverson, Melissa Jessup, Gregory P Johnson, Nancy A Johnson, Gail E Jordan, Paul A Jordan, Ulla P Jordan, Jerome D Kaplan, Patricia V Kaplan, Susan Kaplan, Sylwia Karwowska, Audrey Kaufman, Curtis Kautzer, Marilyn Kautzer, Mary Ann Kichline, Dale R Kichline, Jr., Nikolas Kontomanolis, Pauline Kontomanolis, Penny Kress Zimmerman, Carol C Kuhlthau, John S Kuhlthau, Camille Kurtz, Christine Lally, Thomas R Lally, Larry Lasker, Roger S Lichtman, Joseph A Magliato, Robin Magliato, David R Mann, Suzanne C Mann, Cynthia L Mapes, Joseph D Mapes, Richard J Marriott, Shirley Marriott, Cheryl D Marsh, Janet K Marth, Robert D Marth, Brian P McCue, Lucille M McCue, Jean McEwen Rodby, Charles McMonigle, Kathy McMonigle, Nikki Mcnicol, John Mikesh, Carol Miller, Robert C Miller, Deborah L Monlux, James R Moore III, Aretta B Muir, James D Muir, Charles J Neumann, Priscilla J Neumann, Paul Nisselle, Patrick O'Hara, Dennis O'Malley, Suzanne L O'Malley, Susan O'Neill, Joan H Orr, Gary J Paccagnini, Karen L Paccagnini, Deborah Lee Peters, Alexander K Peyer, Kathleen Peyer, Susan Pierson-O'Hara, Bernadette Pignatello, Kenneth A Pignatello, Carmen Y Polanco, Jose M Polanco, Carolyn B Press, David R Press, Eileen Price, Paul Price, David S Purvis, Thomas Reddy, Charles Robertson, Craig R Rodby, Robert Rodriguez, Charles S Roll, Marilyn Roll, Marcy D Rookey, Ronald J Rookey, Henry T Satt, Mary Anne Satt, Karen Schembre, Carolyn Schrock, Robert D Schrock, Jr., Diane K Schwartz, Edward S Schwartz, James Senn, Susan Senn, William Shain, Gene Silverman, Stanley Silverman, Robert A Staehle, Mark Stevens, Tracey Stevens, Myriam C Strauss, Linda Strohmeyer, John A Taylor, Karen M Taylor, Benjamin H Ticknor, Antonella Trisolino, Brigitte Tutschka, Sharon Van de Grift, Christopher Volpe, Athol L Wallace, Jill A Wallace, Laura C Warnock, Thomas C Warnock, Laurene Weaver, Andreas Weber, Kathleen L Weber, Susan Weir, Walter J Weir, Richard Weiss, David Wichers, Anne K Woodson, Thomas S Woodson, Michael Worsham, George M Worton, Rosanne E Worton, Arlo Young, Irene I Young, Neil D Young, Richard Zierdt, Michael J Zimmerman, Paul deWitt..(Zimmerman, Jean-Marc) Modified on 9/1/2020 (pne).
August 31, 2020 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Leslie Eichner, re: #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by John A Taylor, Karen M Taylor, Benjamin H Ticknor, Antonella Trisolino, Brigitte Tutschka, Sharon Van de Grift, Christopher Volpe, Athol L Wallace, Jill A Wallace, Laura C Warnock, Thomas C Warnock, Laurene Weaver, Andreas Weber, Kathleen L Weber, Susan Weir, Walter J Weir, Richard Weiss, David Wichers, Anne K Woodson, Thomas S Woodson, Michael Worsham, George M Worton, Rosanne E Worton, Arlo Young, Irene I Young, Neil D Young, Richard Zierdt, Michael J Zimmerman, Paul deWitt..(Zimmerman, Jean-Marc) Modified on 9/1/2020 (pne).
August 31, 2020 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Ian Bruce Eichner, re: #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Charles R Acklin, Maribel Acutanza, Philip D Acutanza, Rachelle Adler, Scott Adler, Jatinder K Aggarwal, Sunil Aggarwal, Carolyn Allen, Carmelo Alu, Linda Alu, Joan A Beutler, Rodney M Bickford, Lois A Biello, Robert A Biello, Nicholas P Bigotti, Arla Bowers, Larry A Bowers, Robert R Burg, Michelle N Cabay, William Calamoneri, Deborah Carbo, Joseph M Carbo, Antoinette Castellano, George Castellano, Patricia Chen Feng, Wade Chilcoat, Gina C Chung, Albert M Clark, Laurel M Clark, Susan A Clark, Bonny K Collins, Rollin P Collins, Elizabeth Conwell, Judith Cooper, Joseph Coreno, Michelle Coreno, Carol A Dahir, Burt Danovitz, Patricia H Dayan, Raymond Dayan, Richard S Dillon, Susan H Dillon, John E Ditchburn, Lynne Ditchburn, Dana C Drew, Shapiro K Elaine, Bennett L Errol, Freda Feldman, Sidney T Feldman, Alexandra Feng, Joseph K Ferrara, Nancy A Ferrara, Rebecca Fitzmaurice, David W Foote, Andrea V Franklin, Daniel J Franklin, Linda Gagne, Janine Getek, Pamela P Gethard, Donna C Getreuer, Thomas R Getreuer, Lauren Gibaldi, Marriann T Gofonia, Robert D Gofonia, Linda Golay, Gerald N Goldman, Lucille Graessle, Kurt Grimm, Margaret A Grimm, Judith Grossman, Neil J Grossman, Mark Grunewald, Sally Grunewald, Katherine A Hayden, Janet H Hebert, Michael D Hebert, Karl Hess, Linda M Hooks, John D Houle, Mark D Hughes, Michelle R Hughes, Anne P Iverson, Melissa Jessup, Gregory P Johnson, Nancy A Johnson, Gail E Jordan, Paul A Jordan, Ulla P Jordan, Jerome D Kaplan, Patricia V Kaplan, Susan Kaplan, Sylwia Karwowska, Audrey Kaufman, Curtis Kautzer, Marilyn Kautzer, Mary Ann Kichline, Dale R Kichline, Jr., Nikolas Kontomanolis, Pauline Kontomanolis, Penny Kress Zimmerman, Carol C Kuhlthau, John S Kuhlthau, Camille Kurtz, Christine Lally, Thomas R Lally, Larry Lasker, Roger S Lichtman, Joseph A Magliato, Robin Magliato, David R Mann, Suzanne C Mann, Cynthia L Mapes, Joseph D Mapes, Richard J Marriott, Shirley Marriott, Cheryl D Marsh, Janet K Marth, Robert D Marth, Brian P McCue, Lucille M McCue, Jean McEwen Rodby, Charles McMonigle, Kathy McMonigle, Nikki Mcnicol, John Mikesh, Carol Miller, Robert C Miller, Deborah L Monlux, James R Moore III, Aretta B Muir, James D Muir, Charles J Neumann, Priscilla J Neumann, Paul Nisselle, Patrick O'Hara, Dennis O'Malley, Suzanne L O'Malley, Susan O'Neill, Joan H Orr, Gary J Paccagnini, Karen L Paccagnini, Deborah Lee Peters, Alexander K Peyer, Kathleen Peyer, Susan Pierson-O'Hara, Bernadette Pignatello, Kenneth A Pignatello, Carmen Y Polanco, Jose M Polanco, Carolyn B Press, David R Press, Eileen Price, Paul Price, David S Purvis, Thomas Reddy, Charles Robertson, Craig R Rodby, Robert Rodriguez, Charles S Roll, Marilyn Roll, Marcy D Rookey, Ronald J Rookey, Henry T Satt, Mary Anne Satt, Karen Schembre, Carolyn Schrock, Robert D Schrock, Jr., Diane K Schwartz, Edward S Schwartz, James Senn, Susan Senn, William Shain, Gene Silverman, Stanley Silverman, Robert A Staehle, Mark Stevens, Tracey Stevens, Myriam C Strauss, Linda Strohmeyer, John A Taylor, Karen M Taylor, Benjamin H Ticknor, Antonella Trisolino, Brigitte Tutschka, Sharon Van de Grift, Christopher Volpe, Athol L Wallace, Jill A Wallace, Laura C Warnock, Thomas C Warnock, Laurene Weaver, Andreas Weber, Kathleen L Weber, Susan Weir, Walter J Weir, Richard Weiss, David Wichers, Anne K Woodson, Thomas S Woodson, Michael Worsham, George M Worton, Rosanne E Worton, Arlo Young, Irene I Young, Neil D Young, Richard Zierdt, Michael J Zimmerman, Paul deWitt..(Zimmerman, Jean-Marc) Modified on 9/1/2020 (pne).
August 31, 2020 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Charles R Acklin, Maribel Acutanza, Philip D Acutanza, Rachelle Adler, Scott Adler, Jatinder K Aggarwal, Sunil Aggarwal, Carolyn Allen, Carmelo Alu, Linda Alu, Joan A Beutler, Rodney M Bickford, Lois A Biello, Robert A Biello, Nicholas P Bigotti, Arla Bowers, Larry A Bowers, Robert R Burg, Michelle N Cabay, William Calamoneri, Deborah Carbo, Joseph M Carbo, Antoinette Castellano, George Castellano, Patricia Chen Feng, Wade Chilcoat, Gina C Chung, Albert M Clark, Laurel M Clark, Susan A Clark, Bonny K Collins, Rollin P Collins, Elizabeth Conwell, Judith Cooper, Joseph Coreno, Michelle Coreno, Carol A Dahir, Burt Danovitz, Patricia H Dayan, Raymond Dayan, Richard S Dillon, Susan H Dillon, John E Ditchburn, Lynne Ditchburn, Dana C Drew, Shapiro K Elaine, Bennett L Errol, Freda Feldman, Sidney T Feldman, Alexandra Feng, Joseph K Ferrara, Nancy A Ferrara, Rebecca Fitzmaurice, David W Foote, Andrea V Franklin, Daniel J Franklin, Linda Gagne, Janine Getek, Pamela P Gethard, Donna C Getreuer, Thomas R Getreuer, Lauren Gibaldi, Marriann T Gofonia, Robert D Gofonia, Linda Golay, Gerald N Goldman, Lucille Graessle, Kurt Grimm, Margaret A Grimm, Judith Grossman, Neil J Grossman, Mark Grunewald, Sally Grunewald, Katherine A Hayden, Janet H Hebert, Michael D Hebert, Karl Hess, Linda M Hooks, John D Houle, Mark D Hughes, Michelle R Hughes, Anne P Iverson, Melissa Jessup, Gregory P Johnson, Nancy A Johnson, Gail E Jordan, Paul A Jordan, Ulla P Jordan, Jerome D Kaplan, Patricia V Kaplan, Susan Kaplan, Sylwia Karwowska, Audrey Kaufman, Curtis Kautzer, Marilyn Kautzer, Mary Ann Kichline, Dale R Kichline, Jr., Nikolas Kontomanolis, Pauline Kontomanolis, Penny Kress Zimmerman, Carol C Kuhlthau, John S Kuhlthau, Camille Kurtz, Christine Lally, Thomas R Lally, Larry Lasker, Roger S Lichtman, Joseph A Magliato, Robin Magliato, David R Mann, Suzanne C Mann, Cynthia L Mapes, Joseph D Mapes, Richard J Marriott, Shirley Marriott, Cheryl D Marsh, Janet K Marth, Robert D Marth, Brian P McCue, Lucille M McCue, Jean McEwen Rodby, Charles McMonigle, Kathy McMonigle, Nikki Mcnicol, John Mikesh, Carol Miller, Robert C Miller, Deborah L Monlux, James R Moore III, Aretta B Muir, James D Muir, Charles J Neumann, Priscilla J Neumann, Paul Nisselle, Patrick O'Hara, Dennis O'Malley, Suzanne L O'Malley, Susan O'Neill, Joan H Orr, Gary J Paccagnini, Karen L Paccagnini, Deborah Lee Peters, Alexander K Peyer, Kathleen Peyer, Susan Pierson-O'Hara, Bernadette Pignatello, Kenneth A Pignatello, Carmen Y Polanco, Jose M Polanco, Carolyn B Press, David R Press, Eileen Price, Paul Price, David S Purvis, Thomas Reddy, Charles Robertson, Craig R Rodby, Robert Rodriguez, Charles S Roll, Marilyn Roll, Marcy D Rookey, Ronald J Rookey, Henry T Satt, Mary Anne Satt, Karen Schembre, Carolyn Schrock, Robert D Schrock, Jr., Diane K Schwartz, Edward S Schwartz, James Senn, Susan Senn, William Shain, Gene Silverman, Stanley Silverman, Robert A Staehle, Mark Stevens, Tracey Stevens, Myriam C Strauss, Linda Strohmeyer, John A Taylor, Karen M Taylor, Benjamin H Ticknor, Antonella Trisolino, Brigitte Tutschka, Sharon Van de Grift, Christopher Volpe, Athol L Wallace, Jill A Wallace, Laura C Warnock, Thomas C Warnock, Laurene Weaver, Andreas Weber, Kathleen L Weber, Susan Weir, Walter J Weir, Richard Weiss, David Wichers, Anne K Woodson, Thomas S Woodson, Michael Worsham, George M Worton, Rosanne E Worton, Arlo Young, Irene I Young, Neil D Young, Richard Zierdt, Michael J Zimmerman, Paul deWitt..(Zimmerman, Jean-Marc)
August 31, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Zimmerman, Jean-Marc)
August 30, 2020 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - PDF ERROR - COMPLAINT against BlueGreen Vacations Unlimited Inc., Ian Bruce Eichner, Leslie Eichner, Stuart Eichner, Scott L Lager, Manhattan Club Marketing Group LLC, New York Urban Ownership Management LLC, O. Park Central LLC, Park Central Management LLC, T. Park Central LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21397573)Document filed by Carol Miller, Elizabeth Conwell, Ulla P Jordan, Richard Zierdt, Richard J Marriott, Margaret A Grimm, Nikolas Kontomanolis, Michael Worsham, Robert R Burg, John Mikesh, Larry A Bowers, John E Ditchburn, Anne P Iverson, Michelle R Hughes, Laurel M Clark, Laurene Weaver, Charles S Roll, Walter J Weir, Sylwia Karwowska, Andrea V Franklin, William Calamoneri, Ronald J Rookey, Robin Magliato, David R Press, Paul A Jordan, Robert A Staehle, Bernadette Pignatello, Bonny K Collins, Joseph Coreno, Bennett L Errol, Penny Kress Zimmerman, Michael D Hebert, Susan Kaplan, Thomas R Lally, Jean McEwen Rodby, Marriann T Gofonia, Albert M Clark, David Wichers, Arlo Young, Joan H Orr, Anne K Woodson, Cheryl D Marsh, Linda Gagne, Paul Price, Nicholas P Bigotti, Susan O'Neill, Camille Kurtz, Pamela P Gethard, Pauline Kontomanolis, Judith Grossman, Gregory P Johnson, Katherine A Hayden, Donna C Getreuer, Gerald N Goldman, Neil D Young, Mary Anne Satt, Thomas S Woodson, Janine Getek, Deborah L Monlux, Maribel Acutanza, Arla Bowers, Athol L Wallace, David R Mann, Linda M Hooks, Kenneth A Pignatello, Rosanne E Worton, Edward S Schwartz, Sharon Van de Grift, Dennis O'Malley, Lois A Biello, Joseph D Mapes, Lucille Graessle, Andreas Weber, Shapiro K Elaine, Susan Pierson-O'Hara, Alexandra Feng, Tracey Stevens, George Castellano, Jill A Wallace, Gary J Paccagnini, Nikki Mcnicol, Carol C Kuhlthau, Aretta B Muir, Karen M Taylor, Lucille M McCue, Janet H Hebert, Eileen Price, Deborah Carbo, Audrey Kaufman, Robert C Miller, Robert Rodriguez, Marilyn Roll, Gina C Chung, Sidney T Feldman, Carolyn Allen, Curtis Kautzer, Carol A Dahir, Janet K Marth, Richard S Dillon, Susan Weir, Rachelle Adler, Susan Senn, Charles Robertson, Karen Schembre, Lauren Gibaldi, Jatinder K Aggarwal, Wade Chilcoat, Karl Hess, William Shain, Shirley Marriott, John A Taylor, Dale R Kichline, Jr., Linda Strohmeyer, Marcy D Rookey, Neil J Grossman, Mark Grunewald, Antonella Trisolino, Thomas R Getreuer, Joseph A Magliato, Benjamin H Ticknor, Jerome D Kaplan, John S Kuhlthau, George M Worton, Linda Alu, Cynthia L Mapes, Carolyn B Press, Laura C Warnock, Michael J Zimmerman, Deborah Lee Peters, Patricia V Kaplan, Carolyn Schrock, Freda Feldman, Roger S Lichtman, Nancy A Johnson, Gene Silverman, John D Houle, Charles J Neumann, Jose M Polanco, Charles McMonigle, Patricia Chen Feng, Raymond Dayan, Robert D Gofonia, Marilyn Kautzer, Paul deWitt, Joan A Beutler, Nancy A Ferrara, Stanley Silverman, Daniel J Franklin, Lynne Ditchburn, Linda Golay, Michelle N Cabay, David W Foote, Kurt Grimm, Thomas C Warnock, Myriam C Strauss, Robert D Schrock, Jr., Charles R Acklin, Suzanne L O'Malley, Gail E Jordan, Robert D Marth, Kathleen Peyer, Karen L Paccagnini, Rollin P Collins, Mary Ann Kichline, Antoinette Castellano, James R Moore III, Susan A Clark, Brian P McCue, Thomas Reddy, Priscilla J Neumann, Patricia H Dayan, Sally Grunewald, Mark D Hughes, Kathleen L Weber, Rodney M Bickford, Mark Stevens, Carmen Y Polanco, David S Purvis, James D Muir, Rebecca Fitzmaurice, Kathy McMonigle, Alexander K Peyer, Irene I Young, Craig R Rodby, Susan H Dillon, Joseph M Carbo, Dana C Drew, Robert A Biello, Christine Lally, Sunil Aggarwal, Melissa Jessup, Christopher Volpe, Philip D Acutanza, Michelle Coreno, Brigitte Tutschka, Larry Lasker, Patrick O'Hara, Joseph K Ferrara, Carmelo Alu, Suzanne C Mann, Burt Danovitz, Scott Adler, Judith Cooper, Diane K Schwartz, Henry T Satt, Paul Nisselle, Richard Weiss, James Senn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Assurance of Discontinuance 8-14-17, #2 Exhibit Second Farooq Affirmation 7-2-15, #3 Exhibit 2019 TMC Operating Budget, #4 Exhibit TMC Nightly Rates 8-22-20).(Zimmerman, Jean-Marc) Modified on 8/31/2020 (sj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Acklin et al v. Eichner et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jatinder K Aggarwal
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John A Taylor
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan O'Neill
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Reddy
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas P Bigotti
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary J Paccagnini
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis Kautzer
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda M Hooks
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn Allen
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmelo Alu
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn B Press
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rollin P Collins
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Carbo
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul A Jordan
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Wichers
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David W Foote
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Price
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet H Hebert
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neil J Grossman
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul deWitt
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nikki Mcnicol
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel J Franklin
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nikolas Kontomanolis
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suzanne L O'Malley
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Fitzmaurice
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan H Dillon
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter J Weir
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick O'Hara
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Mikesh
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lois A Biello
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stanley Silverman
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis O'Malley
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anne K Woodson
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Ann Kichline
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James R Moore III
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert D Schrock, Jr.
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard S Dillon
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gene Silverman
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marilyn Roll
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John D Houle
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles McMonigle
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Volpe
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karl Hess
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger S Lichtman
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ulla P Jordan
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David S Purvis
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Adler
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Athol L Wallace
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle N Cabay
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas S Woodson
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janine Getek
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Audrey Kaufman
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suzanne C Mann
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pauline Kontomanolis
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael D Hebert
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dana C Drew
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl D Marsh
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anne P Iverson
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles R Acklin
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Anne Satt
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neil D Young
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah L Monlux
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Robertson
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen L Weber
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sylwia Karwowska
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sally Grunewald
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle R Hughes
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wade Chilcoat
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert A Biello
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin Magliato
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret A Grimm
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irene I Young
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander K Peyer
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Rodriguez
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexandra Feng
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert C Miller
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian P McCue
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Lee Peters
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bennett L Errol
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Schembre
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sidney T Feldman
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David R Press
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Senn
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia V Kaplan
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert D Marth
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laurene Weaver
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Castellano
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol A Dahir
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynne Ditchburn
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lauren Gibaldi
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert D Gofonia
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas R Getreuer
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Zierdt
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eileen Price
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth A Pignatello
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Miller
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerome D Kaplan
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Shain
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Alu
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George M Worton
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Peyer
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Priscilla J Neumann
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Myriam C Strauss
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph M Carbo
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Calamoneri
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald J Rookey
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark D Hughes
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Jessup
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marilyn Kautzer
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin H Ticknor
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea V Franklin
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia L Mapes
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Conwell
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antoinette Castellano
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura C Warnock
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry T Satt
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Chen Feng
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Van de Grift
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marriann T Gofonia
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale R Kichline, Jr.
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Coreno
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aretta B Muir
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gail E Jordan
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles S Roll
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy A Ferrara
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Penny Kress Zimmerman
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joan H Orr
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John S Kuhlthau
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Gagne
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela P Gethard
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonella Trisolino
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert M Clark
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy A Johnson
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Burt Danovitz
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Worsham
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward S Schwartz
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Dayan
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph A Magliato
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jean McEwen Rodby
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Pierson-O'Hara
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory P Johnson
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph D Mapes
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas C Warnock
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith Cooper
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan A Clark
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arla Bowers
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathy McMonigle
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn Schrock
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith Grossman
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Lasker
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Stevens
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol C Kuhlthau
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcy D Rookey
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernadette Pignatello
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jill A Wallace
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert A Staehle
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen L Paccagnini
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maribel Acutanza
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Freda Feldman
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracey Stevens
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard J Marriott
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael J Zimmerman
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph K Ferrara
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley Marriott
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katherine A Hayden
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucille M McCue
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonny K Collins
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry A Bowers
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Camille Kurtz
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen M Taylor
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmen Y Polanco
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arlo Young
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Senn
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Strohmeyer
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig R Rodby
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Coreno
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philip D Acutanza
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Kaplan
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles J Neumann
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Nisselle
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gina C Chung
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas R Lally
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Grunewald
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andreas Weber
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John E Ditchburn
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachelle Adler
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joan A Beutler
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brigitte Tutschka
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Golay
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia H Dayan
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosanne E Worton
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose M Polanco
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laurel M Clark
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Weir
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald N Goldman
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet K Marth
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert R Burg
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane K Schwartz
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sunil Aggarwal
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Lally
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James D Muir
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shapiro K Elaine
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kurt Grimm
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Weiss
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna C Getreuer
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David R Mann
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucille Graessle
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Alternative dispute resolution (adr) provider: Rodney M Bickford
Represented By: Jean-Marc Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York Urban Ownership Management LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ian Bruce Eichner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: O. Park Central LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Park Central Management LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott L Lager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leslie Eichner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Park Central LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BlueGreen Vacations Unlimited Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stuart Eichner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manhattan Club Marketing Group LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?