Stanley v. Saul
Plaintiff: Cheryl Stanley
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul and Andrew Saul
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2020cv07057
Filed: August 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: James L Cott
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2020 Filing 12 CONSENT TO JURISDICTION BY A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE (Case No Longer Referred to Magistrate Judge) CASE ASSIGNED to Magistrate Judge James L. Cott. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 10/20/2020) (mro)
October 20, 2020 Filing 11 PROPOSED CONSENT ORDER. Document filed by Andrew Saul..(Brennan, Mary)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: To conserve resources, to promote judicial efficiency, and in an effort to achieve a faster disposition of this matter, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties must discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge; as further set forth herein. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 10/15/2020) (mro)
October 14, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mary Ellen Brennan on behalf of Andrew Saul..(Brennan, Mary)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Social Security. Referred to Magistrate Judge James L. Cott. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 9/2/2020) (ks)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that, unless otherwise ordered by the Court, the Commissioner of Social Security shall file an Electronic Certified Administrative Record (e-CAR) on the date on which it files its answer or other responsive pleading. If the Commissioner wishes to file a motion for judgment on the pleadings, any other motion, or a stipulation to remand to the Commissioner, the Commissioner shall do so within thirty (30) days from the filing of the answer and the e-CAR. If Plaintiff wishes to file a cross-motion, Plaintiff must do so within thirty days after the Commissioner's filing of a motion. Opposition to any motion shall be filed within thirty days from service of the motion. Any reply must be filed within fourteen days thereafter. Any motion or opposition must be accompanied by a supporting memorandum of law and include specific citation to the parts of the record on which the party relies. Requests for an extension of any of the dates set forth herein must be made in accordance with the Court's Individual Rule 1(E). In addition, if the Commissioner anticipates that the Commissioner will require an extension of the date by which it must file a motion for judgment on the pleadings, any other motion, or a stipulation of remand to the Commissioner, the Commissioner should request the extension no less than two business days prior to the filing of the e-CAR and answer or other responsive pleading. This order does not relieve Plaintiff of her obligation to serve the Commissioner in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(i). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 9/2/2020) (ks)
September 1, 2020 Filing 6 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Merritt, Hannalore)
September 1, 2020 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Andrew Saul..(jgo)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER IN RE MOTIONS FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS IN SOCIAL SECURITY CASES (See 16-MISC-171 Standing Order filed April 28, 2016). ORDERED that in all Social Security cases hereafter filed under 42 U.S.C. 405(g) and 42 U.S.C. 1383(c)(3), the defendant shall within 90 days after service file the certified transcript of administrative proceedings, which shall constitute the defendants' answer, or otherwise move against the complaint... that unless otherwise ordered by the judge to whom the case is assigned, in cases where the plaintiff is represented by counsel, the plaintiff shall file a motion for judgment on the pleadings within 60 days of the date on which the defendant files the certified transcript of the administrative proceedings... that in cases where the plaintiff is appearing pro se, the defendant shall file its motion for judgment on the pleadings within 60 days of the date on which the certified transcript of administrative proceedings have been filed... (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 4/20/2016) (jgo)
September 1, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Hannalore B. Merritt to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Courthouse Assignment code was not selected; the PDF was not signed or dated by the attorney;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo)
September 1, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Hannalore B. Merritt. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Andrew M. Saul. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party text was omitted;. (jgo)
September 1, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Gregory H. Woods. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
September 1, 2020 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
September 1, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
August 31, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Andrew Saul, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Cheryl Stanley..(Merritt, Hannalore)
August 31, 2020 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Merritt, Hannalore) Modified on 9/1/2020 (jgo).
August 31, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew M. Saul. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21406654)Document filed by Cheryl Stanley..(Merritt, Hannalore)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stanley v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl Stanley
Represented By: Hannalore B. Merritt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Mary Ellen Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?