Shamis v. Solil Management, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Ilona Shamis
Defendant: JOHN DOE "1-5", Doe Corporations 1 through 5, Solil Management, LLC, Jane Goldman, Doe Corporations 1-5 and John Doe 1-5
Case Number: 1:2020cv07064
Filed: August 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Vernon S Broderick
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #8 Letter, filed by Solil Management, LLC, Jane Goldman, ENDORSEMENT: APPLICATION GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 10/15/2020) Jane Goldman(individually) answer due 12/7/2020; Jane Goldman(as officer of Solil Management, LLC) answer due 12/7/2020; Solil Management, LLC answer due 12/7/2020. (ks)
October 13, 2020 Filing 8 LETTER addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Joshua S. Bauchner, Esq. dated October 13, 2020 re: Stipulation Extending Time to Answer. Document filed by Jane Goldman(individually), Jane Goldman(as officer of Solil Management, LLC), Solil Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Stipulation Extending Time for Defendant, Solil Managment, LLC to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond).(Bauchner, Joshua)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Plaintiff filed this action on August 31, 2020, (Doc. 1), and filed an affidavit of service on September 21, 2020, (Doc. 5). The deadline for Defendants to respond to Plaintiff's complaint was October 8, 2020. (See id.). To date, Defendants have not responded to the complaint. Plaintiff, however, has taken no action to prosecute this case. Accordingly, if Plaintiff intends to seek a default judgment, she is directed to do so in accordance with Rule 4(H) of my Individual Rules and Practices in Civil Cases by no later than November 16, 2020. If Plaintiff fails to do so or otherwise demonstrate that she intends to prosecute this litigation, I may dismiss this case for failure to prosecute pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 10/13/2020) (rro)
October 8, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joshua Scott Bauchner on behalf of Jane Goldman(individually), Jane Goldman(as officer of Solil Management, LLC), Solil Management, LLC..(Bauchner, Joshua)
September 21, 2020 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Solil Management, LLC served on 9/17/2020, answer due 10/8/2020. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky, Legal Clerk. Document filed by Ilona Shamis..(Kovel, Daniel)
September 2, 2020 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Defendants/Respondents Jane Goldman added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint.Document filed by Ilona Shamis. Related document: #1 Complaint..(Kovel, Daniel)
September 1, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Daniel Harris Kovel. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: John Doe 1-5. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps. (pne)
September 1, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Daniel Harris Kovel re: Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; Jane Goldman must be added to the case a second time, with party text "as officer of Solil Management, LLC". Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents. **DO NOT USE GOOGLE CHROME OR SAFARI BROWSERS** (pne)
September 1, 2020 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jane Goldman, Solil Management, LLC..(pne)
September 1, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
September 1, 2020 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pne)
September 1, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pne)
August 31, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Solil Management, LLC; Jane Goldman, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Ilona Shamis..(Kovel, Daniel)
August 31, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Kovel, Daniel)
August 31, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JOHN DOE "1-5", Doe Corporations 1 through 5, Jane Goldman, Solil Management, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21409925)Document filed by Ilona Shamis..(Kovel, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shamis v. Solil Management, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE "1-5"
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Corporations 1 through 5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Solil Management, LLC
Represented By: Joshua Scott Bauchner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Goldman
Represented By: Joshua Scott Bauchner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Corporations 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ilona Shamis
Represented By: Daniel Harris Kovel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?