Galvez Duran et al v. T&S Restaurant LLC et al
Plaintiff: NESTOR ISMAEL GALVEZ DURAN
Defendant: ANASTACIUS KATSAROS, STAVROS NIKOLAKAKOS, T&S RESTAURANT LLC doing business as Gracie's Diner On 2nd and T&S Restaurant LLC doing business as Gracie's On 2nd
Case Number: 1:2020cv07090
Filed: August 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul A Engelmayer
Referring Judge: Sarah Netburn
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Clifford Ryan Tucker on behalf of Nestor Ismael Galvez Duran, Nestor Ismael Galvez Duran..(Tucker, Clifford)
October 8, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Antonio Faillace on behalf of Nestor Ismael Galvez Duran, Nestor Ismael Galvez Duran..(Faillace, Michael)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 9/1/2020) (jwh)
September 1, 2020 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Anastacius Katsaros..(dnh)
September 1, 2020 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Stavros Nikolakakos..(dnh)
September 1, 2020 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to T&S Restaurant LLC..(dnh)
September 1, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
September 1, 2020 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (dnh)
September 1, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(dnh)
September 1, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Michael Antonio Faillace. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Jury Demand code n (None); County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Jury Demand code has been modified to p (Plaintiff); the County code has been modified to Bronx. (dnh)
September 1, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Michael Antonio Faillace. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: NESTOR ISMAEL GALVEZ DURAN, ANASTACIUS KATSAROS, STAVROS NIKOLAKAKOS, T&S RESTAURANT LLC. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; alias party name contained a typographical error. (dnh)
August 31, 2020 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to ANASTACIUS KATSAROS, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by NESTOR ISMAEL GALVEZ DURAN(individually), Nestor Ismael Galvez Duran(on behalf of others similarly situated)..(Faillace, Michael)
August 31, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to STAVROS NIKOLAKAKOS, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by NESTOR ISMAEL GALVEZ DURAN(individually), Nestor Ismael Galvez Duran(on behalf of others similarly situated)..(Faillace, Michael)
August 31, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to T&S Restaurant LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by NESTOR ISMAEL GALVEZ DURAN(individually), Nestor Ismael Galvez Duran(on behalf of others similarly situated)..(Faillace, Michael)
August 31, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Faillace, Michael)
August 31, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ANASTACIUS KATSAROS, STAVROS NIKOLAKAKOS, T&S RESTAURANT LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21415932)Document filed by NESTOR ISMAEL GALVEZ DURAN(individually), Nestor Ismael Galvez Duran(on behalf of others similarly situated)..(Faillace, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Galvez Duran et al v. T&S Restaurant LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANASTACIUS KATSAROS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STAVROS NIKOLAKAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T&S RESTAURANT LLC doing business as Gracie's Diner On 2nd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T&S Restaurant LLC doing business as Gracie's On 2nd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NESTOR ISMAEL GALVEZ DURAN
Represented By: Michael Antonio Faillace
Represented By: Clifford Ryan Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?