CSX Transportation, Inc. v. Newhaven Distribution Services, Inc
Plaintiff: CSX Transportation, Inc.
Defendant: Newhaven Distribution Services, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv07123
Filed: September 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Alison J Nathan
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 49:10101
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Newhaven Distribution Services, Inc...(Mauro, Michael)
September 28, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Denise M. Cossu on behalf of CSX Transportation, Inc...(Cossu, Denise)
September 28, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John Martin Murtagh, Jr on behalf of CSX Transportation, Inc...(Murtagh, John)
September 9, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Newhaven Distribution Services, Inc. served on 9/3/2020, answer due 9/24/2020. Service was accepted by Steve Ryan, Operations Manager. Document filed by CSX Transportation, Inc...(Hubner, Nicholas)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court on Friday, December 18, 2020 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 906 of the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York, Thurgood Marshall U.S. Courthouse at 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. Parties ordered to submit via ECF proposed case management plan and joint letter seven days before conference. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Initial Conference set for 12/18/2020 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 906, U.S. Courthouse, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alison J. Nathan). (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 9/8/2020) (rjm)
September 2, 2020 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Hubner, Nicholas)
September 2, 2020 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Newhaven Distribution Services, Inc.. (sj)
September 2, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
September 2, 2020 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
September 2, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alison J. Nathan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
September 2, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Nicholas John Hubner. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Albany; Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (sj)
September 2, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Nicholas John Hubner to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the event wrong event type was used to file the civil cover sheet. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. (sj)
September 1, 2020 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent CSX Corporation for CSX Transportation, Inc.. Document filed by CSX Transportation, Inc...(Hubner, Nicholas)
September 1, 2020 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Newhaven Distribution Services, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by CSX Transportation, Inc...(Hubner, Nicholas)
September 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Newhaven Distribution Services, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21434243)Document filed by CSX Transportation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Coversheet).(Hubner, Nicholas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CSX Transportation, Inc. v. Newhaven Distribution Services, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CSX Transportation, Inc.
Represented By: Nicholas John Hubner
Represented By: John Martin Murtagh, Jr
Represented By: Denise M. Cossu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Newhaven Distribution Services, Inc.
Represented By: Michael James Mauro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?