Maritza Angeles v. Reckitt Benckiser LLC et al
Plaintiff: Maritza Angeles and Martiza Angeles
Defendant: RB Health (US) LLC and Reckitt Benckiser LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv07138
Filed: September 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Ronnie Abrams
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332dtp
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: RB Health (US) LLC answer due 12/15/2020; Reckitt Benckiser LLC answer due 12/15/2020. (kv)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference; granting #15 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File. Application granted. The initial conference is hereby adjourned from October 23, 2020 to December 18, 2020 at 3:00 pm. The parties shall file their joint letter and proposed case management plan no later than December 11, 2020. Defendants shall respond to the Complaint no later than December 15, 2020. SO ORDERED. ( Initial Conference set for 12/18/2020 at 03:00 PM before Judge Ronnie Abrams.). (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 10/15/2020) (kv)
October 14, 2020 Filing 15 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Adam H. Schuman dated October 14. 2020., LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Response to the Complaint addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Adam H. Schuman dated October 14. 2020. Document filed by RB Health (US) LLC, Reckitt Benckiser LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Revised Scheduling Order).(Schuman, Adam)
October 14, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Adam Ross Mandelsberg on behalf of RB Health (US) LLC, Reckitt Benckiser LLC..(Mandelsberg, Adam)
October 14, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Adam Hugh Schuman on behalf of RB Health (US) LLC, Reckitt Benckiser LLC..(Schuman, Adam)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Amend/Correct. Plaintiff's motion to amend the case caption is hereby granted. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to amend Plaintiff's name in the case caption to "Maritza Angeles" and terminate the motion pending at Docket Entry 10. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 10/6/2020) (rj)
October 5, 2020 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #10 MOTION to Amend/Correct Case Caption. . Document filed by Martiza Angeles..(Shub, Jonathan)
October 5, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Amend/Correct Case Caption. Document filed by Martiza Angeles..(Shub, Jonathan)
October 2, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. RB Health (US) LLC waiver sent on 9/9/2020, answer due 11/9/2020. Document filed by Martiza Angeles..(Shub, Jonathan)
October 2, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Reckitt Benckiser LLC waiver sent on 9/9/2020, answer due 11/9/2020. Document filed by Martiza Angeles..(Shub, Jonathan)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER AND NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an initial status conference on October 23, 2020 at 1:30 p.m. In light of the COVID-19 crisis, the Court will hold this conference by telephone. The parties shall use the dial-in information provided below to call into the conference: Call-in Number: (888) 363-4749; Access Code: 1015508. This conference line is open to the public. Plaintiff is ordered to serve Defendants with a copy of this order and to file an affidavit on ECF certifying that such service has been effectuated. Initial Conference set for 10/23/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Ronnie Abrams. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 9/4/2020) (rj)
September 3, 2020 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Reckitt Benckiser LLC..(jgo)
September 3, 2020 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to RB Health (US) LLC..(jgo)
September 3, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
September 3, 2020 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
September 3, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Ronnie Abrams. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
September 3, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Jonathan Shub to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): party name on the PDF case caption does not exactly match as it appears on the pleading caption;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo)
September 3, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Jonathan Shub. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Maritza Angeles. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error;. (jgo)
September 2, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to RB Health (US) LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Maritza Angeles..(Shub, Jonathan)
September 2, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Reckitt Benckiser LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Maritza Angeles..(Shub, Jonathan)
September 2, 2020 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Shub, Jonathan) Modified on 9/3/2020 (jgo).
September 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against RB Health (US) LLC, Reckitt Benckiser LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21450634)Document filed by Maritza Angeles..(Shub, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maritza Angeles v. Reckitt Benckiser LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RB Health (US) LLC
Represented By: Adam Ross Mandelsberg
Represented By: Adam Hugh Schuman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reckitt Benckiser LLC
Represented By: Adam Ross Mandelsberg
Represented By: Adam Hugh Schuman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maritza Angeles
Represented By: Jonathan Shub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martiza Angeles
Represented By: Jonathan Shub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?